Reeves v. LNU et al

Plaintiff: Jerry Don Reeves, Jr
Defendant: Ruth LNU, FNU LNU, FNU Roland, Roland LNU and Eastland County Jail
Case Number: 1:2019cv00010
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Referring Judge: E Scott Frost
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10, 11. Mon Mar 4 16:32:33 CST 2019 (crt)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. After an initial review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, the Court is of the opinion that this case should be TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable E. Scott Frost, United States Magistrate Judge, for further proceedings. This case shall hereafter be numbered Civil Action No. 1:19-CV-00010-BL. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/4/2019) (jmc)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PLRA Filing Fee Order. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiff will not be assessed an initial partial filing fee because he lacks the requisite funds in his prison account to pay an initial fee; however, Plaintiff will be required to pay the full filing fee of $350.00 pursuant to the PLRA in monthly installments as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/4/2019) (jmc)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Trust Account by Jerry Don Reeves, Jr TDCJ # 2162015. (jmc)
February 21, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Thu Feb 21 11:22:00 CST 2019 (crt)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SHOW CAUSE ORDER. On 01/25/2019, this Court ordered Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400.00 or to file a certified copy of his inmate trust account (or institutional equivalent) for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint, certified by one of the officers at the institution where Plaintiff is incarcerated within 20 days from the date of that Order. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the prior Order. It is, therefore, ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have 20 days from the date of this Order file the above document; or file a sworn affidavit or unsworn declaration setting forth the specific steps he has taken to attempt to comply with the prior Order, or his reasons for failing to comply and attach copies of any relevant consent forms or other supporting information to Plaintiff's sworn affidavit or unsworn declaration. Failure of Plaintiff to respond to this Order shall result in the dismissal of this cause without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/21/2019) (mmg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Jerry Don Reeves, Jr. New address: TDCJ/Sanchez Unit, 3901 State Jail Rd, El Paso, TX 79938. (jak)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jerry Don Reeves, Jr. (jmc)
January 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri Jan 25 09:32:34 CST 2019 (crt)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Jerry Don Reeves, Jr must address the following deficiency: failure to pay the filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis and certificate of his inmate trust account. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 20 days. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/25/2019) (mmg) (Attachment(s) : #1 Application to Proceed IFP) (mmg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Consent returned unsigned by Jerry Don Reeves, Jr to Trial by Magistrate Judge. (mmg)
January 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 3. Fri Jan 18 10:59:03 CST 2019 (crt)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jmc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jerry Don Reeves, Jr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (jmc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeves v. LNU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Don Reeves, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Roland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastland County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?