MedVision Inc et al v. Medigain LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
MedVision Inc, MediTech Medical Billing Services Inc, Phycom Group Inc, Kenneth S Alston and Alexander Wang |
Defendant: |
Medigain LLC, Butani Capital Investment Fund II LLC, Gregory Hackney and Dinesh K Butani |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00077 |
Filed: |
January 12, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Dallas Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Sam A Lindsay |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 31, 2017 |
Filing
162
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER accepting as herein modified the 140 Findings and Conclusions of the Magistrate Judge. The court rejects the magistrate judge's findings and conclusions regarding an agreed judgment; accepts the magistrate judg e's findings and conclusions that Plaintiffs have not established an uncured default by Defendants; and accepts the magistrate judge's findings and conclusions regarding Plaintiffs' request for attorney's fees and sanctions. P laintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Objections to Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge (Doc. 158 ) is granted, and the clerk shall file under seal wit h a file date of 9/7/2016. The parties are, therefore, directed to file by 5/1/2017, a joint stipulation or notice of dismissal of this action or an agreed motion to dismiss. The court denies Plaintiffs' Motions (Docs. 100 , 115 ). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/31/2017) (ndt)
|
February 23, 2016 |
Filing
131
Order Accepting 125 Findings and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. The court grants Defendant Butani Capital Investment Fund II, LLC's and Dinesh K. Butani's Unopposed Motion for Substitution of Counsel (Doc. 120 ) and allows Jonathan R. Childers, Michael K. Hurst, Steven W. Hopkins, and the law firm of Gruber Hurst Elrod Johansen Hail Shank LLP to withdraw as their counsel of record. Kristin A. Regel and The Law Offices of Kenneth G. Wincorn & Associates, P.C. are substituted as counsel for Defendants Butani Capital Investment Fund II, LLC and Dinesh K. Butani. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/23/2016) (axm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?