Hill v. IRS

Plaintiff: Andrew Hill
Defendant: IRS
Case Number: 3:2018cv02742
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Mon Nov 5 16:13:12 CST 2018 (crt) Modified document number on 11/6/2018 (axm).
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party received back from Andrew Hill as RTS-Insufficient Address. Address updated from document #3 , to include "#322". Address updated: 2121 Bear Creek Pkwy #322 Euless, TX 76039. The current document not remailed per #7 Sanction Order. (epm) Modified on 11/6/2018 (epm).
October 18, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Oct 18 12:19:44 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 Notice that the clerk has been instructed to apply the attached sanction order to the submissions indexed under number: 3:18cv2742. The sanction order was originally filed in: 4:12cv372 and states: All claims in the action are dismissed pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B); Hill is assessed a monetary sanction of $500.00 which must be paid to Clerk; no lesser sanction would adequately address plaintiff's conduct; Hill is BARRED FROM FILING ANY NEW CIVIL ACTION OR LAWSUIT IN THE NDTX UNTIL HE HAS PAID IN FULL THE $500 MONETARY SANCTION IMPOSED IN THIS CASE. That order prohibits the filing of a case, so the number assigned to this closed matter remains for indexing purposes only. (twd)
October 17, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Oct 17 09:06:16 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Andrew Hill. (ndt)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Andrew Hill. (ndt)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Speedy Trial filed by Andrew Hill. (ndt)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against IRS filed by Andrew Hill. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) Docket text modified on 10/18/2018 (twd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. IRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?