Johnson v. The Kroger Company
Plaintiff: Wayne Johnson
Defendant: The Kroger Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00371
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on 4/6/2020 before Judge David C Godbey. The setting is for a one week docket. Deadline for mediation is on or before 2/3/2020. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/15/2019) (zkc)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures filed by The Kroger Company (Ormond, John)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Disclosure filed by Wayne Johnson (Sparks, Mark)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by The Kroger Company. (Ormond, John)
February 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Feb 15 16:35:28 CST 2019 (crt)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/15/2019) (rekc)
February 14, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Thu Feb 14 16:37:01 CST 2019 (crt)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Kroger Company. (Ormond, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 101st Judicial District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-19-00837 filed by The Kroger Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9782642) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B) (Attachment 3 replaced with flattened image on 2/14/2019) (ajb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. The Kroger Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Johnson
Represented By: Mark C Sparks
Represented By: Mark Christophe Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Company
Represented By: John D Ormond
Represented By: B Kyle Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?