Arispe v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Amanda Arispe
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00459
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 11. Fri Mar 29 09:28:47 CDT 2019 (crt)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on 1/6/2020. The setting is for a one week docket before Judge David C Godbey. Deadline for mediation is on or before 10/15/2019. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/28/2019) (ndt)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lee, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Target Corporation. (Lee, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND Amanda Arispe against Target Corporation filed by Amanda Arispe. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bergquist, David)
February 26, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Tue Feb 26 10:09:05 CST 2019 (crt)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/25/2019) (mla)
February 22, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Feb 22 11:20:11 CST 2019 (crt)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ala)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Target Corporation. (Cain, Erwin)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Target Corporation (Cain, Erwin)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Target Corporation re #2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Cain, Erwin)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cain, Erwin)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 44th Judicial District, Dallas County, TX, case number DC-19-00324 filed by Target Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9799466) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Index, #2 Exhibit B: State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C, Tab 1: Original Petition, #4 Exhibit C, Tab 2: Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit C, Tab 3: Citation and Return, #6 Exhibit C, Tab 4: Order Status Conference, #7 Exhibit D: Certificate of Interested Persons, #8 Cover Sheet, #9 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Cain, Erwin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arispe v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Arispe
Represented By: Courtny Nicole Haning
Represented By: David W Bergquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Erwin A Cain
Represented By: Michael G Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?