Gallagher v. Ole Miss et al

Plaintiff: Ryan Gallagher and Rev. Ryan
Defendant: Ole Miss, DEA, US Attorney General and FDA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01251
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #38 Motion to Vacate. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/14/2019) (Judge Jane J. Boyle)
July 11, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-10715 in USCA5 for #32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ryan Gallagher, #28 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ryan Gallagher. (epm)
July 11, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Vacate #25 Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations, #26 Judgment,, THIS IS NOT A NARCOTICS CASE filed by Ryan Gallagher (Gallagher, Ryan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 37 Appellant's BRIEF by Ryan Gallagher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Africa v. Commonwealth, the DEA will Cite this when deciding if something is a Religion, so we will get in to this, #2 Exhibit(s) The Philidelphia PD Bombed the MOVE Organization and killed John Africa after declaring that MOVE was not a Religious Organization, they Sanctioned Murder by Declaring that MOVE was not Religious) (Gallagher, Ryan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 36 Appendix in Support filed by Ryan Gallagher re #35 Petition for Writ of Mandamus,, USCA Case Number, #34 Appellant's Brief, #33 Appellant's Brief Sherman Act (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Clayton Act: (c) Publication of summaries in newspapers The United States shall also cause to be published, commencing at least 60 days prior to the effective date of the judgment described in subsection (b) of this section, for 7 days over a period of 2 weeks in newspapers of general circulation of the district in which the case has been filed, in the District of Columbia, and in such other districts as the court may direct -(i) a summary of the terms of the proposal for consent judgment,(ii) a summary of the competitive impact statement filed under subsection (b) of this section,(iii) and a list of the materials and documents under subsection (b) of this section which the United States shall make available for purposes of meaningful public comment, and the place where such materials and documents are available for public inspection.) (Gallagher, Ryan)
July 2, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-10715 in USCA5 for #32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ryan Gallagher, #28 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ryan Gallagher. (epm)
June 30, 2019 Filing 35 Petition For Writ of Mandamus filed by Ryan Gallagher. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 30, 2019 Filing 34 Appellant's BRIEF by Ryan Gallagher. (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 29, 2019 Filing 33 Appellant's BRIEF by Ryan Gallagher. (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by Ryan Gallagher. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER on #29 Motion for Sanctions and #30 Motion to Reopen Case. The Court DENIES the request to reopen this case. And, to the extent that the Motion for Sanctions requests reconsideration of the filing restrictions the Court imposed on Gallagher in the judgment entered on 6/26/2019, see Dkt. No. #26 , the Motion for Sanctions is also DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/27/2019) (zkc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Reopen Case DEA ACKNOWLEDGING ADMINISTRATIVE TORT CLAIM filed by Ryan Gallagher (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 26, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Sanctions APPEAL OF SANCTION DEMAND FOR HEARING filed by Ryan Gallagher (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 26, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by Ryan Gallagher. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 26, 2019 Filing 27 ***DISREGARD - - DUPLICATE OF DOCKET #28 *** NOTICE OF APPEAL of a Magistrate Judge order to the District Judge by Ryan Gallagher. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Gallagher, Ryan) Modified docket text on 6/26/2019 (cea).
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT: This action is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and - to the extent that there is subject matter jurisdictionas malicious because it is barred by res judicata. The Court further IMPOSES as a SANCTION the filing restrictions set out in the Magistrate Judge's findings, conclusions, and recommendation: Plaintiff Ryan Gallagher is prohibited from filing new actions without the representation of a licensed attorney admitted to practice in the Court unless he obtains permission to proceed pro se. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/26/2019) (zkc)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order Accepting #5 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/26/2019) (zkc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 24 Appendix in Support filed by Ryan Gallagher re #3 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Witchcraft and Stewardship, #2 Exhibit(s) Witchcraft and Stewardship, #3 Exhibit(s) Witchcraft and Stewardship) (Gallagher, Ryan) Modified docket text on 6/20/2019 (ajb).
June 19, 2019 Filing 23 Appendix in Support filed by Ryan Gallagher re #3 Complaint (Gallagher, Ryan) Modified docket text on 6/20/2019 (ajb).
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 Appendix in Support filed by Ryan Gallagher re #3 Complaint (Gallagher, Ryan) Modified docket text on 6/20/2019 (ajb).
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Ryan Gallagher re #19 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Articles of Incorporation in the State of Colorado (Gallagher, Ryan) Modified docket text on 6/19/2019 (ajb).
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 Appendix in Support filed by Ryan Gallagher re #11 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion Indian Hemp Drugs Commission Report, 7 Volume Study by British Empire on Indian SubContinent, Single Largest most Comprehensive Marijuana study in Human History (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Ryan Gallagher re: #5 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: #3 Complaint, filed by Ryan Gallagher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) My Brother Mason Wight's Death Certificate, Died From Edema, Reversable by Cannabinoids, Doctors were afraid of Federal Law (DEA, FDA, Ole Miss Monopoly), #2 Exhibit(s) My Brother Mason Wight's Death Certificate, Died From Edema, Reversable by Cannabinoids, Doctors were afraid of Federal Law (DEA, FDA, Ole Miss Monopoly), #3 Exhibit(s) My Brother Mason Wight's Death Certificate, Died From Edema, Reversable by Cannabinoids, Doctors were afraid of Federal Law (DEA, FDA, Ole Miss Monopoly), #4 Exhibit(s) My Brother Mason Wight's Death Certificate, Died From Edema, Reversable by Cannabinoids, Doctors were afraid of Federal Law (DEA, FDA, Ole Miss Monopoly), #5 Exhibit(s) My Brother Mason Wight's Death Certificate, Died From Edema, Reversable by Cannabinoids, Doctors were afraid of Federal Law (DEA, FDA, Ole Miss Monopoly), #6 Exhibit(s) My Brother Mason Wight's Death Certificate, Died From Edema, Reversable by Cannabinoids, Doctors were afraid of Federal Law (DEA, FDA, Ole Miss Monopoly), #7 Exhibit(s) My Brother Mason Wight's Death Certificate, Died From Edema, Reversable by Cannabinoids, Doctors were afraid of Federal Law (DEA, FDA, Ole Miss Monopoly), #8 Exhibit(s) My Brother Mason Wight's Death Certificate, Died From Edema, Reversable by Cannabinoids, Doctors were afraid of Federal Law (DEA, FDA, Ole Miss Monopoly), #9 Exhibit(s) My Brother Mason Wight's Death Certificate, Died From Edema, Reversable by Cannabinoids, Doctors were afraid of Federal Law (DEA, FDA, Ole Miss Monopoly)) (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Ryan Gallagher re: #5 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: #3 Complaint,, filed by Ryan Gallagher. (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Ryan Gallagher re: #5 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: #3 Complaint filed by Ryan Gallagher. (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 Appendix in Support filed by Ryan Gallagher re #11 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 Appendix in Support filed by Ryan Gallagher re #9 Response/Objection From DEA RFRA Guidelines, "CSA is subject to RFRA", in THE DEA GUIDELINES, Controlled Substances Act is SUBJECT (SUB = BELOW) the Religious Freedom Restoration Act (Amendments are above Laws) (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 Appendix in Support filed by Ryan Gallagher re #9 Response/Objection Damages Caused by DEA and FDA, I was made Homeless and Homelessness is not Free (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Damages Caused by DEA and FDA, I was made Homeless and Homelessness is not Free, #2 Exhibit(s) Damages Caused by DEA and FDA, I was made Homeless and Homelessness is not Free) (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 Appendix in Support filed by Ryan Gallagher re #12 First MOTION to Compel Demand for 3 Judge Review Washington et al v. Sessions et al, No. 1:2017cv05625 - Document 64 (S.D.N.Y. 2018) (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 9, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Compel Demand for 3 Judge Review filed by Ryan Gallagher (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 9, 2019 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ryan Gallagher re #3 Complaint,, ANTINOMY BRIEF (Gallagher, Ryan)
June 9, 2019 Filing 10 Appendix in Support filed by Ryan Gallagher re #3 Complaint,, DEA statements to me via SBA SBREFA Fairness Board process - SELF AUTHENTICATING EVIDENCE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Rules of Evidence) (Gallagher, Ryan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION filed by Ryan Gallagher re: #5 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: #3 Complaint, filed by Ryan Gallagher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Attainder) (Gallagher, Ryan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 Appendix in Support filed by Ryan Gallagher re #5 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: #3 Complaint,, filed by Ryan Gallagher., #3 Complaint,, FDA NIDA Contract with Ole Miss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Non-Religious Companies Given Licenses to "Import" or "Manufacture" Marijuana by the DEA, #2 Exhibit(s) Non-Religious Companies Given Licenses to "Import" or "Manufacture" Marijuana by the DEA, #3 Exhibit(s) Non-Religious Companies Given Licenses to "Import" or "Manufacture" Marijuana by the DEA) (Gallagher, Ryan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT Statement of Plaintiff's Religion, from the Age of 14 and Earlier by Ryan Gallagher. (Gallagher, Ryan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Appendix in Support filed by Ryan Gallagher re #3 Complaint, "THE ELOQUENT PEASANT", a 4,000 year old Ancient Egyptian court case. This story is a Lesson about Appeals, Determination, the Scales of Justice, and the Goddess Ma'at (Gallagher, Ryan)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should dismiss this action without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and - to the extent that there is subject matter jurisdiction - as malicious because it is barred by res judicata and should impose sanctions in the form of filing restrictions. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 5/28/2019) (zkc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ryan Gallagher. (zkc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against DEA, FDA, Ole Miss, US Attorney General filed by Ryan Gallagher. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallagher v. Ole Miss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rev. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ole Miss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?