Flowers v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Shirley A Flowers
Defendant: David Hobden, Vincent Timmons, DART, Jacob James, Kathy Phillips, Anthony Ragins, Kenneth Day, Gary C Thomas and ATU
Case Number: 3:2019cv01355
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 8. Thu Jul 25 16:44:10 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This action should be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with a court order and for lack of prosecution. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/25/2019) (zkc)
July 24, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed Jul 24 16:30:04 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ACCEPTING #5 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Emergency Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/23/2019) (rekc)
June 7, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri Jun 7 16:33:34 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 7, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Jun 7 16:33:13 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint specifying her legal claims in compliance with Rule 8(a); submit either a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or payment of the $400.00 fee; and register to use the Courts electronic filing system. Plaintiff's failure to fully comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this case under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 6/24/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/7/2019) (mcrd)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDING, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiff's motion for an emergency restraining order and injunctive relief should be DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/7/2019) (mcrd)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (please see doc. #1 for image) filed by Shirley A Flowers. (ndt)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against ATU, DART, Kenneth Day, David Hobden, Jacob James, Kathy Phillips, Anthony Ragins, Gary C Thomas, Vincent Timmons filed by Shirley A Flowers. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hobden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Timmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Ragins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary C Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley A Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?