Gillaspie v. Ward et al
Plaintiff: Zachary Don Gillaspie
Defendant: David Vernon, Terry Brown, Robert Ward, City of Alvarado and Lisa Powell
Case Number: 3:2019cv01809
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,4,5. Tue Jul 30 12:28:38 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The plaintiff's Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) [overall] motion, received on May 7, 2019 (docket entry 46 ), is CONSTRUED as a successive petition and TRANSFERRED to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. The clerk of court is DIRECTED to: (1) terminate the motion in this civil rights case; (2) open a new habeas case for administrative purposes only; (3) docket the motion in that new case as a 2254 petition filed on May 7, 2019; (4) directly assign the new case to the same district judge and magistrate judge as in this case; (5) file a copy of the findings, conclusions, and recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge, and the order accepting the findings, conclusions, and recommendation in the new case; and (6) without further judicial action, immediately TRANSFER the newly opened 2254 action to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 7/29/2019) (aaa)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation re: the plaintiff's 46 Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) [overall] motion. Based on the relevant findings and applicable law, the motion should be construed as a successive habeas petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 and TRANSFERRED to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 7/2/2019) (mcrd) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (aaa)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Zachary Don Gillaspie. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillaspie v. Ward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Don Gillaspie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?