Jones v. Holmes et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Jerome Jones
Defendant: NFN Thurp, NFN Curry, Towona Holmes, K Hutto, John D Stubblefield, B Johnson and Mark Roberts
Case Number: 3:2019cv02076
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Wed Oct 23 09:38:02 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The court dismissed this case without prejudice under 28 USC 1915(g) on 10/03/2019. See docket entries #6 , #7 , and #8 . Some two weeks later, plaintiff filed a #9 motion to amend his complaint. The court DENIES this motion and WARNS plaintiff that if he continues his practice in past litigation of filing baseless motions in closed cases, he will be SANCTIONED. Such sanctions will include limiting his ability to file motions and may include monetary sanctions. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/22/2019) (twd)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Kevin Jerome Jones. (axm)
October 3, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7,8. Thu Oct 3 14:39:59 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED this action is DISMISSED without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/3/2019) (ndt)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Accepting #6 Findings and Recommendations re: #3 Complaint filed by Kevin Jerome Jones. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/3/2019) (ndt)
September 10, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Sep 10 12:20:00 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should summarily dismiss this action without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) unless, within the time for filing objections to this recommendation or by some other deadline established by the Court, Plaintiff Kevin Jerome Jones pays the full filing fee of $400.00. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/10/2019) (aaa)
September 3, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Sep 3 11:24:49 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Kevin Jerome Jones re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (sre)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kevin Jerome Jones (sre)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against NFN Curry, Towona Holmes, K Hutto, B Johnson, Mark Roberts, John D Stubblefield, NFN Thurp filed by Kevin Jerome Jones. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sre)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sre)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Holmes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Thurp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towona Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Hutto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D Stubblefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Jerome Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?