Gardner v. Mays et al
Plaintiff: Detra Katrine Gardner
Defendant: Sarine Crystal Mays Johnson, Catherine Shannon, Jaylyn A Miller, Marion Mays, Silas Graves, Douglas L Wright, Taunya Wright, Jeffrey A Gardner, Dennis Gardner, Doreen F Graves, Juan Arreguin, NFN Art, George Mays, Dale Mays, Kimberly Epps, Earl Shannon, Paul L Wright, Frank McKay and Michael Williams
Case Number: 3:2020cv03112
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Detra Katrine Gardner. (hml)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CONSTRUED MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL BUT GRANTING CONSTRUED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: While the Court denies Gardner's current request to appoint counsel, it will extend her deadline to file a written response to the 10/15/2020 order concerning subject matter jurisdiction. That written response must now be filed by 12/3/2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/19/2020) (ctf)
November 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Email Address for Pro Se litigant Detra Katrine Gardner. New email address: iretupmoc17@gmail.com. (Filed using the emergency filing procedures.) (rekc) Modified text on 11/18/2020 (rekc).
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 Additional Requests filed by Detra Katrine Gardner. (jmg)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE: Plaintiff Detra Katrine Gardner has requested an extension of time to file her written response to show the Court that it has subject matter jurisdiction over this lawsuit. See Dkt. No. #9 at 2. The Court, finding good cause, GRANTS Gardner's request, and her response must be filed by 11/19/2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/9/2020) (ctf)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 Additional Information by Detra Katrine Gardner. (mjr)
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 Additional Information by Detra Katrine Gardner. (hml)
October 15, 2020 Hearing/Deadline Modification: Deadlines/hearings set per #7 ORDER REGARDING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Show Cause Response due by 11/16/2020. (mcrd)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/15/2020) (ndt)
October 15, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Oct 15 17:25:06 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 14, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Oct 14 10:04:43 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Summons issued as to NFN Art, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (hml)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Detra Katrine Gardner. (hml)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Detra Katrine Gardner. (hml)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Juan Arreguin, NFN Art, Kimberly Epps, Dennis Gardner, Jeffrey A Gardner, Doreen F Graves, Silas Graves, Sarine Crystal Mays Johnson, Dale Mays, George Mays, Marion Mays, Frank McKay, Jaylyn A Miller, Catherine Shannon, Earl Shannon, Michael Williams, Douglas L Wright, Paul L Wright, Taunya Wright filed by Detra Katrine Gardner. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number DS127155) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (hml)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (hml)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Mays et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarine Crystal Mays Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaylyn A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silas Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas L Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taunya Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doreen F Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Arreguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Art
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul L Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detra Katrine Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?