Garcia v. Terry Rose

Plaintiff: John Gonzales Garcia
Defendant: Terry Rose, Talmadge Trammell and NFN NLN
Case Number: 5:2019cv00005
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
0 Judge: D Gordon Bryant
1 Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant John Gonzales Garcia. New address: Jester III Unit, 3 Jester Road, Richmond, Texas 77406. (bmg)
February 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11,12. Clerk mailed a copy of this Order 11 and a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint to the above listed addresses. Mon Feb 25 10:40:29 CST 2019 (crt)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO EXERCISE JURISDICTION: If appropriate, party(ies) should return the signed consent form to the clerk within thirty (30) days from the receipt of this Notice. It is ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail this Notice, Lubbock Miscellaneous Order No. 14, and the attached consent form to Plaintiff. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 2/25/2019) (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Order No. 14) (bmg)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR AUTHENTICATED RECORDS: It is therefore ORDERED that the above listed officials shall provide the court with authenticated and verified copies of any and all records pertaining to the specific allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint. The records and executed Certification must be provided to the court on or before March 24, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 2/25/2019) (bmg)
February 21, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Thu Feb 21 11:31:42 CST 2019 (crt)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: It is ORDERED that all claims against Defendant Talmadge Trammell, M.D., (5:19-CV-0035-BQ) alleged to have occurred in Abilene, Texas, shall be severed from the instant Complaint and transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Abilene Division, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Clerk to open new case for severed matter. All claims against Clements Unit Defendants Jane Doe (Nurse Practitioner), John Doe (Head Nurse), and John Doe (Doctor),(5:19-CV-0036-BQ) alleged to have occurred at the Clements Unit in Amarillo, Texas, shall be severed from the instant Amended Complaint and transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Amarillo Division, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The caption of this Civil Action No. 5:19-CV-005-BQ shall become John GonzalesGarcia v. Terry Rose, et al., and shall reflect that Talmadge Trammell, M.D., and Clements Unit Defendants Jane Doe (Nurse Practitioner), John Doe (Head Nurse), and John Doe (Doctor) are no longer defendants. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 2/21/2019) (bmg)
February 19, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Tue Feb 19 13:25:11 CST 2019 (crt)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Sam R Cummings no longer assigned to case. This case shall hereinafter be numbered Civil Action No. 5:19-CV-0005-BQ. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/19/2019) (bmg)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PLRA FILING FEE ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis #6 . Plaintiff will not be assessed an initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 in monthly installments. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/19/2019) (bmg)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Trust Account by John Gonzales Garcia TDCJ # 2007276. (bmg)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Gonzales Garcia. (bmg)
January 28, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. The Clerk mailed an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and a Certificate of Inmate Trust Account and Authorization to Plaintiff along with a copy of this Order. Mon Jan 28 13:21:15 CST 2019 (crt)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILING FEE DEFICIENCY ORDER: The Court finds that Plaintiff should, within twenty (20) days from the date of this Order, pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file with the Clerk the following: A signed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and a signed copy of the AUTHORIZATION portion of the Certificate of Inmate Trust Account. The Clerk mailed an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and a Certificate of Inmate Trust Account and Authorization to Plaintiff along with a copy of this Order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/28/2019) (bmg)
January 14, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,3,4. Mon Jan 14 13:58:29 CST 2019 (crt)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (bmg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Trust Account by John Gonzales Garcia TDCJ # 02007276. (bmg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John Gonzales Garcia. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Terry Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gonzales Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talmadge Trammell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN NLN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?