Perez v. Brennan
Plaintiff: Perez and Rodolfo Perez
Defendant: Brennan and Megan Brennan
Case Number: 1:2017cv00043
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Brownsville Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order of USCA Judgment re: #37 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 18-40520. the district court's ruling are affirmed, filed.(dbenavides, 1)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order of USCA Judgment re: #37 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 18-40520. It is ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed, filed.(dbenavides, 1)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #37 Notice of Appeal to Rebecca L Fisher, counsel for appellant and Chritopher Daniel Pineda, counsel for appellee. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 18-40520), filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #37 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 18-40520, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Appellant's Attorney. Transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes This order form relates to the following: #37 Notice of Appeal, filed.(Fisher, Rebecca)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Notice of Non-Compliance. Appellant has failed to: Submit the DKT13 transcript order form. Parties notified, filed. (JenniferLongoria, 1)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 18-40520 re: #37 Notice of Appeal, filed.(scastillo, 1)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #37 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): Sheila Perales, Court Reporter, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (bcampos, 1)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Appeal Review Notes re: #37 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid. Hearings were held in the case. DKT13 transcript order form(s) due within 14 days of the filing of the notice of appeal. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 1, filed.(bcampos, 1)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #36 Memorandum and Order by Rodolfo Perez (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-20145058), filed.(Fisher, Rebecca)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment . All other pending motions in this case are denied as moot(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Vacation by Rodolfo Perez, filed. (Fisher, Rebecca)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE re Amended Summary Judgment Exhibit List re: #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #27 Exhibits, by Megan Brennan, filed. (Pineda, Christopher)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY to Response to #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Megan Brennan. (Pineda, Christopher)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE to #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rodolfo Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Rebecca)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition to #25 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, filed by Megan Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Pineda, Christopher)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE Plaintiff Does Not Oppose Defendant's Motion to Extend by Rodolfo Perez, filed. (Fisher, Rebecca)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file First Amended Complaint by Megan Brennan, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pineda, Christopher)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Other EXHIBITS re: #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Megan Brennan, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4A, #5 Exhibit 4B, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Pineda, Christopher)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Megan Brennan, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pineda, Christopher)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Rodolfo Perez, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attached First Amended Complaint)(Fisher, Rebecca)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Megan Brennan, filed.(Pineda, Christopher)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 MOTION to Dismiss . The Court grants Defendant's Motion to Dismiss as to Plaintiff's claims of discrimination, hostile work environment, and the retaliation claim that arose out of the letter of warning. The Court denies Defendant's motion as to the claim of retaliation that arose out of the "drunk-on-duty" incident.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Amended SCHEDULING ORDER #21 Unopposed MOTION to Abate. ETT: 3 days. ( Pltf Expert Witness List due by 12/22/2017. Pltf Expert Report due by 12/22/2017., Deft Expert Witness List due by 1/19/2018. Deft Expert Report due by 1/19/2018. Discovery due by 3/16/2018. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 1/19/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 4/6/2018. Responses due by 2/2/2018. Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/6/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Andrew S Hanen, Jury Selection set for 5/3/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew S Hanen)(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Abate by Megan Brennan, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pineda, Christopher)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Rodolfo Perez, filed.(Fisher, Rebecca)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Rodolfo Perez, filed.(Fisher, Rebecca)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Megan Brennan. (Pineda, Christopher)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Replies due by 8/9/2017.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Megan Brennan, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pineda, Christopher)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Rodolfo Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Rebecca)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RETURN of Service, filed.(Fisher, Rebecca)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER GRANTING #11 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #7 Unopposed MOTION for Rebecca L. Fisher to Withdraw as Attorney (by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(csustaeta, 1)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 3 days. Jury Trial. Pltf Expert Witness List and Expert Report due by 9/22/2017. Deft Expert Witness List and Expert Report due by 10/20/2017. Discovery due by 12/15/2017. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/20/2017. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 1/5/2018. Responses to dispositive motions due by 11/3/2017. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/5/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Andrew S Hanen Jury Selection set for 2/1/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Andrew S Hanen(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/27/2017. Appearances: Rebecca Leona Fisher, Atty f/Plaintiff; Christopher D Pineda, AUSA f/Defendant;(Court Reporter: S. Perales)(01:45-01:57) Discussion held. Plaintiffs ORAL request to withdraw #7 Unopposed MOTION for Rebecca L. Fisher to Withdraw as Attorney by Rodolfo Perez-GRANTED. #11 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Rodolfo Perez-GRANTED. Plaintiffs response to #10 due by 07/26/17. Defendants response due by 08/02/17. Scheduling Order dates given orally to all parties. Court order will follow., filed.(csustaeta, 1)
June 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Megan Brennan, filed.(Pineda, Christopher)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Rodolfo Perez, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Rebecca)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Rodolfo Perez, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Rebecca)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Megan Brennan, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Appendix of Government's Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Pineda, Christopher)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER entered. The Court hereby orders Rebecca Fisher and her client, Rudolfo Perez, to appear before the Court on 6/27/2017 at 01:30 PM for a hearing to resolve the #7 Motion to Withdraw. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified. (rnieto, 1)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Rebecca L. Fisher to Withdraw as Attorney by Rodolfo Perez, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Rebecca)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER D. PINEDA on behalf of Megan Brennan, filed. (Pineda, Christopher)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Continuance. Initial Conference set for 6/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Andrew S Hanen.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
April 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Conference by Rodolfo Perez, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Rebecca)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rodolfo Perez, filed.(Fisher, Rebecca)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/2/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Andrew S Hanen(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(bcampos, 1)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to 1.) Megan Brennan, 2.) U.S. Attorney and 3.) U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by: First-class mail, filed.(bcampos, 1)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Megan Brennan, Postmaster General, United States Postal Service (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-17963233) filed by Rodolfo Perez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons 1, #3 Summons 2, #4 Summons 3)(Fisher, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Perez
Represented By: Rebecca Leona Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Brennan
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?