M.D. et al v. Perry et al
Plaintiff: M.D., D.I., Z.H., S.A., A.M., J.S., K. E., D.P. and T.C.
Defendant: Rick Perry, Thomas Suehs and Anne Heiligenstein
Case Number: 2:2011cv00084
Filed: March 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Nueces
Presiding Judge: Janis Graham Jack
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ORDER. It is ORDERED that Defendants shall be held in civil contempt of Court for violating this Court's order to provide 24-hour awake-night supervision, and that a sanction of $50,000 per day starting Friday November 8, 2019 for seven business days, then $100,000 per day until Defendants are compliant be paid to the Clerk of Court.(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) Parties notified.(jmarks, 2)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 500 INTERIM ORDER REGARDING SPECIAL MASTERS' RECOMMENDATIONS. (Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND VERDICT OF THE COURT. Within 30 days of this Opinion, the Court will hold a hearing to select a Special Master.(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(sscotch, 2)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 160 Motion to Certify Class; denying as moot 199 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 205 Motion for Leave to File; granting 212 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(mserpa, )
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 76 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(amireles, )
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 43 Sealed Motion. Defendants Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(bcortez, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.D. et al v. Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D.
Represented By: Patrick Almonrode
Represented By: Richad Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Patricia Canales Bell
Represented By: Hector Antonio Canales
Represented By: J A Tony Canales
Represented By: Amelia Jean Cardenas
Represented By: Stephen Dixon
Represented By: Dori Kornfeld Goldman
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Barry F McNeil
Represented By: Jessica Polansky
Represented By: Christopher D Porter
Represented By: Olivia Sohmer
Represented By: R Paul Yetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.I.
Represented By: Patrick Almonrode
Represented By: Richad Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Patricia Canales Bell
Represented By: Hector Antonio Canales
Represented By: J A Tony Canales
Represented By: Amelia Jean Cardenas
Represented By: Stephen Dixon
Represented By: Dori Kornfeld Goldman
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Barry F McNeil
Represented By: Jessica Polansky
Represented By: Christopher D Porter
Represented By: Olivia Sohmer
Represented By: R Paul Yetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z.H.
Represented By: Patrick Almonrode
Represented By: Richad Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Patricia Canales Bell
Represented By: Hector Antonio Canales
Represented By: J A Tony Canales
Represented By: Amelia Jean Cardenas
Represented By: Stephen Dixon
Represented By: Dori Kornfeld Goldman
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Barry F McNeil
Represented By: Jessica Polansky
Represented By: Christopher D Porter
Represented By: Olivia Sohmer
Represented By: R Paul Yetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.A.
Represented By: Patrick Almonrode
Represented By: Richad Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Patricia Canales Bell
Represented By: Hector Antonio Canales
Represented By: J A Tony Canales
Represented By: Amelia Jean Cardenas
Represented By: Stephen Dixon
Represented By: Dori Kornfeld Goldman
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Barry F McNeil
Represented By: Jessica Polansky
Represented By: Christopher D Porter
Represented By: Olivia Sohmer
Represented By: R Paul Yetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.
Represented By: Patrick Almonrode
Represented By: Richad Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Patricia Canales Bell
Represented By: Hector Antonio Canales
Represented By: J A Tony Canales
Represented By: Amelia Jean Cardenas
Represented By: Stephen Dixon
Represented By: Dori Kornfeld Goldman
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Barry F McNeil
Represented By: Jessica Polansky
Represented By: Christopher D Porter
Represented By: Olivia Sohmer
Represented By: R Paul Yetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.S.
Represented By: Patrick Almonrode
Represented By: Richad Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Patricia Canales Bell
Represented By: Hector Antonio Canales
Represented By: J A Tony Canales
Represented By: Amelia Jean Cardenas
Represented By: Stephen Dixon
Represented By: Dori Kornfeld Goldman
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Barry F McNeil
Represented By: Jessica Polansky
Represented By: Christopher D Porter
Represented By: Olivia Sohmer
Represented By: R Paul Yetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. E.
Represented By: Patrick Almonrode
Represented By: Richad Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Patricia Canales Bell
Represented By: Hector Antonio Canales
Represented By: J A Tony Canales
Represented By: Amelia Jean Cardenas
Represented By: Stephen Dixon
Represented By: Dori Kornfeld Goldman
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Barry F McNeil
Represented By: Jessica Polansky
Represented By: Christopher D Porter
Represented By: Olivia Sohmer
Represented By: R Paul Yetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.P.
Represented By: Patrick Almonrode
Represented By: Richad Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Patricia Canales Bell
Represented By: Hector Antonio Canales
Represented By: J A Tony Canales
Represented By: Amelia Jean Cardenas
Represented By: Stephen Dixon
Represented By: Dori Kornfeld Goldman
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Barry F McNeil
Represented By: Jessica Polansky
Represented By: Christopher D Porter
Represented By: Olivia Sohmer
Represented By: R Paul Yetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.C.
Represented By: Patrick Almonrode
Represented By: Richad Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: Patricia Canales Bell
Represented By: Hector Antonio Canales
Represented By: J A Tony Canales
Represented By: Amelia Jean Cardenas
Represented By: Stephen Dixon
Represented By: Dori Kornfeld Goldman
Represented By: Marcia Robinson Lowry
Represented By: Barry F McNeil
Represented By: Jessica Polansky
Represented By: Christopher D Porter
Represented By: Olivia Sohmer
Represented By: R Paul Yetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Perry
Represented By: James C Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Suehs
Represented By: James C Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Heiligenstein
Represented By: James C Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?