Veasey et al v. Abbott et al
Plaintiff: Anna Burns, John Mellor-Crummey, Marc Veasey, JOHN DOE, Gordon Benjamin, Sergio DeLeon, Ken Gandy, Oscar Ortiz, JANE DOE, Dallas County, Texas, Koby Ozias, Michael Montez, Evelyn Brickner, Jane Hamilton, Floyd Carrier, Penny Pope and League Of United Latin American Citizens
Defendant: Rolando B. Pablos, John Steen, Secretary of State Carlos H Cascos, State Of Texas, Greg Abbott, Secretary of State David Whitley and Ruth R. Hughs
Petitioner: Lon Burnam, True the Vote, Armando Walle, Royce West, John Whitmire, Helen Giddings, Juan Hinojosa, Chris Turner, Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives, Borris Miles, Sergio Munoz, Jr., Jose Rodriguez, Roland Gutierrez, Jessica Farrar, Kirk P Watson, Rodney Ellis, Ron Reynolds, Yvonne Davis, Judith Zaffirini and Carlos Uresti
Respondent: Office of The Attorney General
3Rd Party Defendant: Third Party Legislators and Texas Health and Human Services Commission
Consolidated Plaintiff: Lydia Lara, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Eulalio Mendez, Jr., La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Margarito Martinez Lara, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Belinda Ortiz, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Maximina Martinez Lara, Roxanne Hernandez, Sgt Lenard Taylor and United States Of America
Consolidated Defendant: Steve McGraw
Intervenor Plaintiff: Michelle Bessiake, IMANI CLARK, Maria Longoria Benavides, Aurica Washington, Hidalgo County, Crystal Owens, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund and Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners
Interested Party: Robert M Allensworth, Samuel Sosa, C. Richard Quade, Ward Larkin and S. Christopher Suprun, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00193
Filed: June 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1973
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1219 Order of USCA; PER CURIAM Judgment issued as mandate 11/20/2020 re: #1215 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 20-40428. The appeal as to Appellee Lenard Taylor is Dismissed as Moot., filed. (Attachments: #1 USCA Letter)(RochelleLimon, 2).
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided BY 5TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS (DIRECTLY)to counsel for appellant and counsel for appellee re: #1215 Notice of Appeal. (USCA No. 20-40428), filed.(srussell, 2)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Supplemental Record on Appeal: Supplemental Record 8 transmitted to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #1215 Notice of Appeal ; (USCA No. 20-40428), filed. (****NOTE: THIS APPEAL RECORD WAS CREATED AND CERTIFIED BY 5TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS)(srussell, 2)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Supplemental Record on Appeal: Supplemental Record 7 transmitted to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #1215 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 20-40428), filed. (****NOTE: THIS APPEAL RECORD WAS CREATED AND CERTIFIED BY 5TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS)(srussell, 2)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Supplemental Records on Appeal: Supplemental Record 4, Supplemental Record 5, Supplemental Record 6 transmitted to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #1215 Notice of Appeal ; (USCA No. 20-40428), filed. (****NOTE: THIS APPEAL RECORD WAS CREATED AND CERTIFIED BY 5TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS)(srussell, 2)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1218 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to S. Christopher Suprun, Jr re: #1216 Clerk's Notice of Filing of an Appeal,, filed. (FOEl Does not Live Here)(sguevara, 4)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Supplemental Record on Appeal: Supplemental Record 3 transmitted to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #1215 Notice of Appeal ; (USCA No. 20-40428), filed. (****NOTE: THIS APPEAL RECORD WAS CREATED AND CERTIFIED BY 5TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS)(srussell, 2)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #1215 Notice of Appeal; USCA No. 20-40428, filed. (****NOTE: THIS APPEAL RECORD CREATED AND CERTIFIED BY 5TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS)(srussell, 2)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Supplemental Records on Appeal: Supplemental Record 1 and Supplemental Record 2 transmitted to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #1215 Notice of Appeal ; (USCA No. 20-40428), filed. (****NOTE: THIS APPEAL RECORD WAS CREATED AND CERTIFIED BY 5TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS)(srussell, 2)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1217 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1216 Clerk's Notice of Filing of an Appeal,, filed. [RTS/Inmate No Longer Here] (BeverlyWright, 4)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1216 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal, The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #1215 Notice of Appeal re: DE #1211 Order on Motions for Attorney's Fees (granting). Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): n/a, filed. (srussell, 2)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Appeal Review Notes re: #1215 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted., filed.(srussell, 2)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1215 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit by Greg Abbott, State Of Texas, Ruth R. Hughs (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-24844260), filed. (Stafford, Dominique)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1214 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Natasha Korgaonkar re: #1211 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, filed. An updated address could not be found. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1213 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to S. Christopher Suprun, Jr re: #1211 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,,,,,,,,,,, filed. (agould, 3)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1212 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1211 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,,,,,,,,,,, filed. (RTS; refused)(sguevara, 4)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1211 ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES granting #1142 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting #1143 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting #1144 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting #1145 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting #1146 Motion for Attorney Fees; #1172 , granting #1174 Motion for Attorney Fees, #1187 .(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1210 DECLARATION of J. Gerald Hebert re: #1207 Reply in Support of Motion,, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Chad Dunn, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Neil Baron, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Armand Derfner)(Hebert, J)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1209 REPLY in Support of #1146 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by Imani Clark. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan E. Paikin)(Aden, Leah)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1208 REPLY in Support of #1174 AMENDED MOTION MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rosenberg Declaration, #2 Exhibit Rosenberg Exh. 1, #3 Exhibit Rosenberg Exh. 2, #4 Exhibit Rosenberg Exh. 3, #5 Exhibit Rosenberg Exh. 4, #6 Affidavit Steiner Declaration, #7 Affidavit Perez Declaration, #8 Affidavit Garza Declaration, #9 Affidavit Bledsoe Declaration)(Cohan, Lindsey)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1207 Joint REPLY in Support of #1143 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: In re SQLC, #2 Exhibit 2: In re Autoseis, #3 Exhibit 3: Sherwin Alumina)(Hebert, J)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1206 Supplemental REPLY to Response to #1144 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Lenard Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Declaration of Jose Garza, #2 Exhibit summary of expenses, #3 Exhibit filing, service fees, #4 Exhibit expert costs, #5 Exhibit travel/clients, #6 Exhibit travel ct hearings trial, #7 Exhibit interpreter)(Garza, Jose)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1205 REPLY in Support of #1142 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rios, Rolando)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1204 ORDER granting #1203 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #1174 AMENDED MOTION MOTION for Attorney Fees, #1142 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees, #1145 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees, #1143 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees, #1146 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees, #1144 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees. Replies due by 2/7/2020.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1203 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time OF THE DEADLINE FOR FILING REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, EXPENSES, AND COSTS by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, Hidalgo County, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1202 ORDER granting #1201 Motion for Extension of Time to File Replies to Motions for Attorneys' Fees. Reply briefs are due by 1/17/2020..(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1201 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time FOR THE DEADLINE FOR FILING REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, EXPENSES, AND COSTS by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Imani Clark, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1200 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Sidney S Rosdeitcher as to S. Christopher Suprun, Jr re: #1198 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1199 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1198 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, filed. (YeseniaIbarra, 7)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1198 ORDER ON PRIVATE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF THE DEADLINE FOR FILING REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, EXPENSES, AND COSTS granting #1197 Motion for Extension of Time Brief due by 12/2/2019.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to File Replies in Support of Motions for Attorneys' Fees by Imani Clark, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1196 RESPONSE to #1144 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees, #1174 AMENDED MOTION MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Greg Abbott, State Of Texas, David Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6, #7 Exhibit A-7, #8 Exhibit A-8, #9 Exhibit B-1, #10 Exhibit B-2, #11 Exhibit B-3, #12 Exhibit B-4, #13 Exhibit B-5, #14 Exhibit B-6, #15 Exhibit B-7, #16 Exhibit B-8, #17 Exhibit C-1, #18 Exhibit C-3, #19 Exhibit C-4, #20 Exhibit C-5, #21 Exhibit C-6, #22 Exhibit C-7, #23 Exhibit C-8, #24 Exhibit D-1, #25 Exhibit D-2, #26 Exhibit D-3, #27 Exhibit D-4, #28 Exhibit D-5, #29 Exhibit D-6, #30 Exhibit D-7, #31 Exhibit D-8, #32 Exhibit E-1, #33 Exhibit E-2, #34 Exhibit E-3, #35 Exhibit E-4, #36 Exhibit E-5, #37 Exhibit E-6, #38 Exhibit E-7, #39 Exhibit E-8, #40 Exhibit F, #41 Exhibit G, #42 Exhibit H)(Stafford, Dominique)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1195 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to S. Christopher Suprun, Jr re: #1189 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (hlerma, 4)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1194 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1189 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (agould, 3)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1193 ORDER granting #1192 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees. State Defendants' responses are due by October 17, 2019. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1192 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Greg Abbott, State Of Texas, David Whitley, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stafford, Dominique)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1191 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to S. Christopher Suprun, Jr re: #1185 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney, filed. (scastillo, 1)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1190 ORDER granting #1187 Motion to Supplement.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(AnnSalazar, 2)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1189 ORDER granting #1188 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Private Plaintiffs' Motions for Attorneys' fees. Responses due by 10/3/2019..(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1188 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Greg Abbott, State Of Texas, David Whitley, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stafford, Dominique)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 Unopposed MOTION to Supplement as to #1174 AMENDED MOTION MOTION for Attorney Fees by Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Covich Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Covich Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Covich Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1185 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney, filed. (sgonzalez, 5)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1185 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO SUBSTITUTE KYLE D. HAWKINS FOR SCOTT A. KELLER AS COUNSEL granting #1184 Motion to Substitute Attorney Attorney Kyle D. Hawkins terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1184 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Kyle D. Hawkins in place of Scott A. Keller by Greg Abbott, Steve McGraw, State Of Texas, John Steen, David Whitley, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hawkins, Kyle)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1183 ORDER granting #1182 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' response are due by September 27, 2019.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1182 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Greg Abbott, State Of Texas, David Whitley, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stafford, Dominique)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to S. Christopher Suprun, Jr re: #1178 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (hlerma, 4)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1180 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1178 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1179 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to S. Christopher Suprun, Jr re: #1173 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1178 ORDER granting #1177 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(jmarks, 2)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE RESPONSE TO PRIVATE PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES by State Of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stafford, Dominique)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1176 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1173 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (RobertTenorio, 5)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 SUPPLEMENT to #1143 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Neil Baron, #2 Supplement Declaration of Chad Dunn, #3 Supplement Declaration of Armand Derfner, #4 Supplement Declaration of J. Gerald Hebert)(Lang, Danielle)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1174 AMENDED MOTION, MOTION for Attorney Fees( Motion Docket Date 8/5/2019.) by Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Decl. of E. Rosenberg, #3 Exhibit Rosenberg Decl. Att. A, #4 Exhibit Rosenberg Decl. Att. B, #5 Exhibit Rosenberg Decl. Att. C, #6 Affidavit Decl. of N. Steiner, #7 Exhibit Steiner Decl. Exh. 1, #8 Exhibit Steiner Decl. Exh. 2, #9 Exhibit Steiner Decl. Exh. 3, #10 Exhibit Steiner Decl. Exh. 4, #11 Affidavit Decl. of M. Perez, #12 Exhibit Perez Decl. Att. A, #13 Exhibit Perez Decl. Att. B, #14 Exhibit Perez Decl. Att. C, #15 Exhibit Perez Decl. Att. D, #16 Affidavit Decl. of J. Garza, #17 Exhibit Garza Decl. Att. 1, #18 Exhibit Garza Decl. Att. 2, #19 Exhibit Garza Decl. Att. 3, #20 Affidavit Decl. of G. Bledsoe, #21 Exhibit Bledsoe Decl. Att. 1, #22 Exhibit Bledsoe Decl. Att. 2, #23 Exhibit Bledsoe Decl. Att. 3, #24 Affidavit Decl. of R. Notzon, #25 Exhibit Notzon Decl. Exh. 1, #26 Exhibit Notzon Decl. Exh. 2)(Cohan, Lindsey) Modified on 2/10/2020 (bcortez, 2). Modified on 2/10/2020 (bcortez, 2).
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 ORDER granting #1171 Motion for Extension of Time Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2019.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 SUPPLEMENT to #1146 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees by IMANI CLARK, filed. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leah C. Aden, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit D)(Aden, Leah)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Revised Attorneys' Fees & Costs Materials by Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to S. Christopher Suprun, Jr re: #1166 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1166 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 Letter from Robert Allensworth, filed. (mserpa, 2)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1167 Letter from Robert M. Allensworth re: Voting, filed. (lcorbett, 7)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1166 ORDER granting #1164 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 8/2/2019.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1164 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees by Greg Abbott, State Of Texas, David Whitley, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stafford, Dominique)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1162 Letter from Robert M Allensworth, filed. (scastillo, 1)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1165 Letter from Robert M Allensworth re: limited voting backup ballot, filed. (srussell, 2)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1163 Letter from Robert M Allensworth, filed. (scastillo, 1)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1161 Letter from Robert M Allensworth, filed. (scastillo, 1)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to S. Christopher Suprun, Jr re: #1156 Order, filed. (sgonzalez, 5)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1159 Letter from Robert Allensworth re: release, prepaid phone account, filed. (srussell, 2)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1158 Letter to Court from Allenwood re: waiver, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1157 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1156 Order, filed. (sgonzalez, 5)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1156 ORDER Granting #1153 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motions for Attorneys' Fees. ( Defendants' Responses due by 6/20/2019.)(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amartinez, 2)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1154 NOTICE of Appearance by Summer R. Lee on behalf of Greg Abbott, State Of Texas, David Whitley, filed. (Lee, Summer)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motions for Attorneys' Fees by Greg Abbott, State Of Texas, David Whitley, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stafford, Dominique)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1155 Letter from Robert M Allensworth re: Waiver, filed. (bcortez, 2)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1152 Letter from Robert M Allensworth (w/self-addressed stamped envelope) re: copies of documents (DE #1053 and #1147), filed. Requested documents mailed to Allensworth in enclosed self-addressed envelope. (srussell, 2)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1151 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1148 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (dterrell, 2)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1150 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to S. Christopher Suprun, Jr re: #1148 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (nortiz, 5)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1149 NOTICE of Appearance by Dominique G. Stafford on behalf of State Of Texas, filed. (Stafford, Dominique)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 ORDER granting #1147 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses due by 5/20/2019..(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1147 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiffs Motions for Attorneys Fees by Greg Abbott, State Of Texas, David Whitley, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Frederick, Matthew)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1146 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees by IMANI CLARK, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leah C. Aden, #2 Exhibit A to Aden Dec., #3 Exhibit B to Aden Dec., #4 Exhibit C to Aden Dec., #5 Exhibit D to Aden Dec., #6 Declaration of Jonathan E. Paikin, #7 Exhibit A to Paikin Dec., #8 Proposed Order)(Aden, Leah)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1145 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees by Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rosenberg Declaration, #2 Exhibit Rosenberg Attachment A, #3 Exhibit Rosenberg Attachment B, #4 Affidavit Steiner Declaration, #5 Exhibit Steiner Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Steiner Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Steiner Exhibit 3, #8 Affidavit Perez Declaration, #9 Exhibit Perez Attachment A, #10 Exhibit Perez Attachment B, #11 Affidavit Bledsoe Declaration, #12 Exhibit Bledsoe Attachment 1, #13 Exhibit Bledsoe Attachment 2, #14 Affidavit Notzon Declaration, #15 Exhibit Notzon Exhibit 1, #16 Exhibit Notzon Exhibit 2, #17 Affidavit Garza Declaration, #18 Exhibit Garza Attachment 1, #19 Exhibit Garza Attachment 2, #20 Exhibit Garza Attachment 3, #21 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees by Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Lenard Taylor, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exh. 1, Jose Garza declaration, #2 Exhibit exh. 2, van Dalen declaration, #3 Exhibit time records for MvD, #4 Exhibit exh. 3, R. Doggett declaration, #5 Exhibit Doggett resume, #6 Exhibit Doggett time records, #7 Exhibit exh. 4, costs description, #8 Exhibit exh. 5, costs summary, #9 Proposed Order)(Garza, Jose)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 (Private Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs), #2 Exhibit (USA Attorneys Fees Rate Matrix), #3 Exhibit Edwards Declaration, #4 Exhibit Hebert Declaration, #5 Exhibit Dunn Declaration, #6 Exhibit Brazil Declaration, #7 Exhibit Derfner Declaration, #8 Exhibit Baron Declaration, #9 Proposed Order)(Hebert, J)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees by Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Rios, Rolando)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1141 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1138 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, filed. (dhansen, 4)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to S. Christopher Suprun, Jr re: #1138 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, filed. (dwilkerson, 3)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1139 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to S. Christopher Suprun, Jr re: #1134 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 ORDER ON PRIVATE PLAINTIFFS' SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF THE DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, EXPENSES AND COSTS granting #1137 Motion for Extension of Time Submission Date 4/11/2019.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of the Deadline for Filing Motions for Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Costs by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Margarito Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Belinda Ortiz, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1136 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1134 Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Inmate No Longer Here), filed. (dmorales, 5)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 ORDER granting #1132 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Samuel G. Oliker-Friedland terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(AnnSalazar, 2)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 ORDER granting #1133 Motion for Extension of Deadline for Filing Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Expenes and Costs. The Deadline to file is March 21, 2019.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Costs by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, Hidalgo County, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Margarito Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 MOTION for Samuel G. Oliker Friedland to Withdraw as Attorney by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Daniel)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to S. Christopher Suprun, Jr re: #1129 Order, filed. (srussell, 2)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1129 Order,,, filed. No new address found. (amartinez, 2)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 ORDER ON DEADLINE FOR MOTIONS SEEKING ATTORNEYS' FEES granting #1123 . Any motions for attorneys' fees, expenses and costs relating to this case may be filed no later than February 28, 2019, unless proceedings in this case are pending before any court on or after January 14, 2019, in which case the deadline for filing any motions for attorneys' fees, expenses and costs shall be adjourned until further order of the Court. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1128 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa [inmate no longer in custody] re: #1125 Final Judgment, filed. (sgonzalez, 5)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1127 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to S. Christopher Suprun, Jr re: #1125 Final Judgment, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1125 FINAL JUDGMENT (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 Letter from Ro9bert Allensworth re: Contemporary Issues, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 Letter from Robert Allensworth, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 Opposed MOTION to Modify the Deadline for Filing Motions for Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Costs by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, Hidalgo County, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 ORDER granting #1121 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Angela V Colmenero terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 Unopposed MOTION for Angela V. Colmenero to Withdraw as Attorney by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 REPLY in Support of #1107 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims, or, In The Alternative, Enter Final Judgment for Defendants on Plaintiffs' Claims, filed by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas. (Colmenero, Angela)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 Letter by C. Richard Quade, filed.(bcortez, 2)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1118 Letter by C. Richard Quade, filed.(bcortez, 2)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1117 Letter from Robert M Allensworth requesting cost of various documents, filed. (srussell, 2)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Copy of letter DE #1117, mailed to Robert Allensworth with prices of documents requested mailed via first class mail on 8/13/18, filed. (srussell, 2)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply re: #1107 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims, or, In The Alternative, Enter Final Judgment for Defendants on Plaintiffs' Claims by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, filed. (Colmenero, Angela)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 RESPONSE in Opposition to #1107 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims, or, In The Alternative, Enter Final Judgment for Defendants on Plaintiffs' Claims, filed by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, Hidalgo County, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Margarito Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches. (Cohan, Lindsey)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1114 RESPONSE to #1107 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims, or, In The Alternative, Enter Final Judgment for Defendants on Plaintiffs' Claims filed by United States Of America. (Freeman, Daniel)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 Letter by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(bcortez, 2)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1111 Letter from Robert Allenswall, filed. (mperez, 1)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1112 Letter from Robert Allensworth, filed. (grogan, 2)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 ORDER granting #1109 Motion for Extension of Time Responses to Texas's Motion to Dismiss due by 8/8/2018..(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Responses to Texas's Motion to Dismiss by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, Hidalgo County, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1106 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (JenniferLongoria, 1)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1107 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims, or, In The Alternative, Enter Final Judgment for Defendants on Plaintiffs' Claims by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 ORDER granting #1103 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Zachary P Jones terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 Order of USCA; - OPINION - Judgment issued as mandate 6/19/18 re: #1072 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 17-40884. I find that the District Court did not abuse its discretion in enjoining S.B. 14 and S.B. 5. Because the majority does not do so, I respectfully dissent, filed. (Attachments: #1 USCA Letter)(dterrell, 2)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 Order of USCA; - JUDGEMENT - Judgment issued as mandate 6/19/18 re: #1072 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 17-40884. It is ordered and adjudged that the Judgment of the District Court is reversed and rendered, filed.(dterrell, 2)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 MOTION for Zachary Jones to Withdraw as Attorney by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Daniel)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1101 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed. (BelindaSaenz, 7)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1101 ORDER granting #1100 Motion..(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 Unopposed MOTION to Postpone Filing of Motions for Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Costs by IMANI CLARK, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aden, Leah)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 Amicus Curiae Brief Cont'd by C. Richard Quade, filed.(bcortez, 2)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 Letter by C. Richard Quade, filed.(bcortez, 2)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 Letter by C. Richard Quade, filed.(bcortez, 2)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1094 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (cvillegas, 7)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 Letter by C. Richard Quade, filed.(bcortez, 2)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 ORDER granting #1093 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amy Lynne Rudd terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 MOTION for Amy L. Rudd to Withdraw as Attorney by Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/8/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 Order of USCA re: #1072 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 2:13cv193. It is ordered that appellants' unopposed motion for all counsel to view and obtain all sealed documents is granted, filed. (Attachments: #1 USCA Letter)(dterrell, 2)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 Letter from R Allensworth re: Docket Entries, filed. (jmarks, 2)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #1072 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 17-40884, filed.(vrios, 2)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #1072 Notice of Appeal to counsel. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 17-40884), filed.(vrios, 2)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #1089 Transcript - Appeal,. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT re HEARING ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE held on 1/20/17 before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party: 361 949-2988 x 0. This transcript relates to the following: #1072 Notice of Appeal, #1084 Appeal Transcript Request, #1083 AO435 Transcript Request,. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2017., filed. (thudson, )
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 Document by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(vrios, 2)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 ORDER granting #1086 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Avner Michael Shapiro terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(srussell, 2)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 MOTION for Avner Shapiro to Withdraw as Attorney by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/10/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Daniel)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1078 Order, filed. (SandraSilva, 7)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Defendants/Angela V. Colmenero. This is to order a transcript of Motion Hearing on 1/20/17 before Magistrate Judge Libby. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services. This order form relates to the following: Telephone Conference,,, filed. (Colmenero, Angela)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Angela Colmenero for Transcript of Telephone Conference on 1/20/17 before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Colmenero, Angela)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1070 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (sanderson, 3)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1081 Order of USCA; Opinion issued as mandate 9/5/17 re: #1072 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 17-40884. The Motion to Stay should be denied, filed. (Attachments: #1 USCA Letter)(idavis, 2)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1080 ORDER re: #1079 Advisory (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
September 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 ADVISORY by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 **THIS IS A DUPLICATE OF INSTRUMENT #1077***ORDER GRANTING LIMITED STAY #1075 Response,, #1076 Reply, (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 ORDER GRANTING LIMITED STAY. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 REPLY to #1074 Advisory Regarding Upcoming Elections, and in the alternative, Motion to Stay Court's August 23 Order, filed by Greg Abbott, Steve McGraw, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
August 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 RESPONSE to #1074 Advisory Regarding Upcoming Elections, filed by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Imani Clark, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey. (Aden, Leah)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 ADVISORY by Greg Abbott, Steve McGraw, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, filed.(Colmenero, Angela)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Greg Abbott, Steve McGraw, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #1071 Order, by Greg Abbott, Steve McGraw, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-18835424), filed. (Colmenero, Angela)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1071 ORDER GRANTING SECTION 2 REMEDIES AND TERMINATING INTERIM ORDER. The Court DENIES Defendants' motion for reconsideration (D.E. 1050), and GRANTS declaratory and injunctive relief for the Section 2 violations, superseding and terminating the Order Regarding Agreed Interim Plan for Elections (D.E. 895).(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 ORDER granting #1069 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina A Swarns terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 MOTION for Christina A. Swarns to Withdraw as Attorney by IMANI CLARK, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aden, Leah)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 RESPONSE to #1067 Advisory,, on Supplemental Authority Relating to the Parties' Remedies Briefs, filed by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas. (Colmenero, Angela)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 ADVISORY by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Imani Clark, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Aden, Leah)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 RESPONSE in Opposition to #1050 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration of #1023 Order, filed by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Imani Clark, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey. (Cohan, Lindsey)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 ADVISORY by United States Of America, filed.(Freeman, Daniel)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 ADVISORY by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aden, Leah)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendants' Motion to Issue Second Interim Remedy or to Clarify First Interim Remedy re: #1047 Opposed MOTION to Issue Second Interim Remedy or to Clarify First Interim Remedy by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, filed. (Colmenero, Angela)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 SUPPLEMENT to #1061 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Imani Clark, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Cohan, Lindsey)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 RESPONSE in Opposition to #1047 Opposed MOTION to Issue Second Interim Remedy or to Clarify First Interim Remedy, filed by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Lang, Danielle)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 RESPONSE Brief Regarding Remedies, filed by United States Of America. (Freeman, Daniel)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 RESPONSE to Texas's and United States' Briefing Regarding the Proper Remedies for SB 14's Intentional Discrimination, filed by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Imani Clark, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey. (Cohan, Lindsey)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 BRIEF Response Defendants' Response Brief on Remedies re: #1044 Order by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, filed.(Colmenero, Angela)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 RESPONSE to #1047 Opposed MOTION to Issue Second Interim Remedy or to Clarify First Interim Remedy filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Freeman, Daniel)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 ADVISORY by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, filed.(Colmenero, Angela)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1046 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (cjones, 7)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1044 Order, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 Letter from Robert M. Allensworth re: order on procedure #1044 , filed. (sgonzalez, 5)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 BRIEF Regarding Remedies by United States Of America, filed.(Freeman, Daniel)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1051 BRIEF of Private Plaintiffs Regarding the Proper Remedies for SB 14's Racial Discrimination by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed.(Lang, Danielle)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration of #1023 Order by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 BRIEF on Remedies re: #1044 Order by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Colmenero, Angela)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1048 BRIEF on Remedy by Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, filed.(Rios, Rolando)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 Opposed MOTION to Issue Second Interim Remedy or to Clarify First Interim Remedy by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1046 ORDER granting #1045 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thaddeus C Eagles terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 Unopposed MOTION for Thaddeus Eagles to Withdraw as Attorney by IMANI CLARK, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2017. (Aden, Leah)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 ORDER ON PROCEDURE FOR ADDRESSING REMEDIES. Opening Briefs due by 7/5/2017 Responsive Briefs due by 7/17/2017.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amireles, 2)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #1042 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 TRANSCRIPT re: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/7/17 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party ANGELA V. COLMENERO Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2017., filed. (thudson, )
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 BRIEF Concerning Remedial Proceedings by United States Of America, filed.(Freeman, Daniel)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 BRIEF of Private Plaintiffs Proposing A Briefing Procedure & Schedule by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed.(Cohan, Lindsey)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1039 BRIEF Defendants' Proposal for a Briefing Schedule on the Issue of Remedies by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Colmenero, Angela)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendants/ Angela V. Colmenero for Transcript of Status Conference, 6/07/17, Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Colmenero, Angela)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States for Transcript of Status Conference on 6/7/2017 before Judge Ramos. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Freeman, Daniel)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/7/2017. Discussion held regarding remedies. Parties are ordered to file briefs regarding the scheduling issue for the remedies, limited to 10 pages, by June 12, 2017. Appearances:Chad Dunn, Armand Derfner, Gerry Hebert, Danielle Lang, Myrna Perez, Ezra Rosenberg, Adam Gitlin, Jose Garza, Rolando Rios, Tania Faransso, Leah Aden, Janai Nelson, Richard Dellheim, John Smith, John Gore, Angela Colmenero, Matthew Frederick.(Digital # 9:00-9:40)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1034 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (agarcia, 7)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 ADVISORY by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Colmenero, Angela)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 ORDER granting #1033 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Marinda van Dalen terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amireles, 2)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 Unopposed MOTION for Marinda van Dalen to Withdraw as Attorney by Lenard Taylor, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(van Dalen, Marinda)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1027 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (drodriguez, 7)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #1025 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (BelindaSaenz, 7)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 ORDER granting #1029 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer Clark terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 Unopposed MOTION for Jennifer Clark to Withdraw as Attorney by Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 Letter regarding limited voting retention ballot by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(mserpa, 2)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 ORDER granting #1026 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kathryn Trenholm Newell terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 Unopposed MOTION for Kathryn Newell to Withdraw as Attorney by Lenard Taylor, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(van Dalen, Marinda)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 ORDER granting #1024 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sonya Lebsack terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 Unopposed MOTION for Sonya L. Lebsack to Withdraw as Attorney by IMANI CLARK, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/18/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lebsack, Sonya)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 ORDER ON CLAIM OF DISCRIMINATORY PURPOSE. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 ORDER ON GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DISCRIMINATORY PURPOSE CLAIM AND ASSERTION OF MOOTNESS granting #1001 Motion.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/7/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (bcortez, 2)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 ADVISORY by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, filed.(Colmenero, Angela)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 ORDER ON VEASEY-LULAC PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ORDER THE PAYMENT OF CERTAIN EXPERT WITNESS EXPENSES granting in part and denying in part #824 Motion.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 REPLY to #1015 Brief , filed by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Imani Clark, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Cohan, Lindsey)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 RESPONSE to #1010 Brief,, of Private Plaintiffs Regarding Effect of New Voter ID Legislation on this Case, filed by United States Of America. (Freeman, Daniel)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 ORDER granting #1014 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 RESPONSE to #1011 Advisory , filed by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Imani Clark, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey. (Cohan, Lindsey)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 BRIEF Regarding the Effect of Voter-ID Legislation on Plaintiffs' Claims of Intentional Racial Discrimination by Greg Abbott, Rolando B. Pablos, State Of Texas, filed.(Colmenero, Angela)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Reply Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Daniel)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 SUPPLEMENT to #1010 Brief,, by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, John Mellor-Crummey, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dunn, Chad)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 Letter from WilmerHale re: Cadene Russell., filed.(bcortez, 2)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 ADVISORY by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, State Of Texas, Rolando B. Pablos, filed.(Colmenero, Angela)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 BRIEF of Private Plaintiffs Regarding Effect of New Voter ID Legislation on This Case by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Imani Clark, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed.(Cohan, Lindsey)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #1008 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
March 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 TRANSCRIPT re: AMENDED TRANSCRIPT TO DE 1006 / ORAL ARGUMENTS held on 2/28/17 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party LINDSEY COHAN Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2017., filed. (thudson, )
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #1006 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 TRANSCRIPT re: ORAL ARGUMENTS held on 2/28/17 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party LINDSEY COHAN Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/30/2017., filed. (thudson, )
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 NOTICE of Filing Defendants' Oral Argument Presentation on the Issue of Discriminatory Purpose by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, State Of Texas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colmenero, Angela)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Angela V. Colmenero for Transcript of Motion hearing on 2/28/17 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Colmenero, Angela)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lindsey Cohan for Transcript of Hearing on 2/28/17 before Judge Ramos. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Cohan, Lindsey) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional on 2-28-17 by gr.
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. ORAL ARGUMENTS held on 2/28/2017. Arguments heard on discriminatory intent. Court takes matter under advisement. Briefing schedule regarding SB 5 and how it affects current case is as follows: Plaintiffs briefing due by 3/7/2017. Defendants response due by 3/14/2017. Plaintiffs reply due by 3/21/2017. Appearances:Chad Dunn, Myrna Perez, Ezra Rosenberg, Jose Garza, Janai Nelson, John Gore, Angela Colmenero, Jen Clark, Marinda Van Dalen, Deuel Ross, Tania Faransso, John Smith, Daniel Freeman, Matthew Frederick , Jason La Fond, Lindsey Wolf, Armand Derfner, Gerry Hebert, Danielle Lang, Neil Baron, Lindsey Winer.(Digital # 8:59-11:12, 11:34-12:04)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 ORDER granting #999 Motion for John M Gore to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(dterrell, 2)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 MOTION VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DISCRIMINATORY PURPOSE CLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oliker-Friedland, Samuel)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 ORDER granting #998 Motion for Jason R LaFond to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(dterrell, 2)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 999 MOTION for John M. Gore to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/20/2017. (Oliker-Friedland, Samuel)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 998 MOTION for Jason R. LaFond to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Greg Abbott, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/17/2017. (Frederick, Matthew)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 997 ORDER DENYING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE denying #995 Motion for Continuance.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 996 Joint RESPONSE in Opposition to #995 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Joint Motion to Continue February 28, 2017 Hearing on Plaintiffs' Discriminatory Purpose Claims, filed by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey. (Hebert, J)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 995 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Joint Motion to Continue February 28, 2017 Hearing on Plaintiffs' Discriminatory Purpose Claims by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 994 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jennifer L. Clark, counsel for Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, filed. (drodriguez, 7)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 993 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #990 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (dgonzalez, 5)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 992 Notice re: ballots by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(lcayce, 2)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 991 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa (Inmate no longer here - return to sender) re: #985 Notice of Setting, filed. (rnieto, 1)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 990 ORDER granting #989 Motion for Paul Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 989 MOTION for Paul Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/21/2017. (Lang, Danielle)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 988 ORDER granting #978 Motion to Seal.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 987 Order of USCA re: #634 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 14-41127. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied, filed. (Attachments: #1 USCA Letter)(dterrell, 2)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 986 ORDER granting #984 Motion for Continuance Miscellaneous Hearing reset for 2/28/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 985 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 1/20/2017 at 05:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. (arodriguez, 2)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 984 MOTION for Continuance of January 24 Hearing by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/10/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Daniel)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 1/20/2017 granting #984 MOTION for Continuance of January 24 Hearing ( Miscellaneous Hearing set for 2/28/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos). Argument heard by all parties; Court grants U.S. Gvmt's motion. Appearances:Plaintiffs' Counsel: Chad Dunn, Myrna Perz, Ezra Rosenberg, Jose Garza, Janai Nelson, Daniel Freeman; Defense Counsel: Angela Colmenero.(Digital # 5:04 - 5:17)(ERO: Judy Alvarez), filed.(arodriguez, 2)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 983 Letter from Robert M. Allensworth, filed. (mserpa, 2)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 982 Amicus Curiae Brief with letters attached by C. Richard Quade, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(bcortez, 2)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 981 Letter by S. Christopher Suprun, Jr, filed.(bcortez, 2)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 980 RESPONSE to #961 Proposed Findings of Fact,, Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Joint Proposed Findings of Fact (Redacted), filed by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, State Of Texas. (Colmenero, Angela)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 979 Sealed Event, filed.
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 978 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Joint Proposed Findings of Facts by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, State Of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 977 RESPONSE to #966 Document Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, filed by United States Of America. (Freeman, Daniel)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 976 RESPONSE to #960 Memorandum, #962 Post-Trial Brief, #963 Post-Trial Brief,, Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Briefs Concerning Discriminatory Intent, filed by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, State Of Texas. (Colmenero, Angela)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 975 RESPONSE to #966 Document Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, filed by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Imani Clark, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey. (Cohan, Lindsey)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 974 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #969 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed.(RTS; Inmate No Longer Here) (sguevara, 4)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 973 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Samuel Sosa re: #967 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed. (dwilkerson, 3)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 972 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to C. Richard Quade re: #969 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (ssilva, 7)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 971 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to C. Richard Quade re: #967 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 970 Letter by C. Richard Quade, filed. (bcortez, 2)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 969 ORDER granting #968 Motion for Matthew Robinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(dterrell, 2)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 968 MOTION for Matthew N. Robinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by IMANI CLARK, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/13/2016. (Aden, Leah)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 967 ORDER granting #964 Motion.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 966 Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law - Redacted by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Colmenero, Angela)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 965 Sealed Event, filed.
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 964 Unopposed MOTION Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/9/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 963 POST-TRIAL BRIEF in Support of a Finding of Intentional Discrimination by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey(Cohan, Lindsey)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 962 POST-TRIAL BRIEF Concerning Discriminatory Intent by United States Of America(Freeman, Daniel)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 961 Proposed Findings of Fact by Gordon Benjamin, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey(Freeman, Daniel)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 960 Opposed MEMORANDUM ON INTENT TO DISCRIMINATE re: #922 Order, by Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, filed.(Rios, Rolando)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 958 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiff-Intervenor the Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund by IMANI CLARK, filed. (Aden, Leah)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 957 ORDER granting #956 Motion for Sidney Rosdeitcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(dterrell, 2)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 956 MOTION for Sidney S. Rosdeitcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/5/2016. (Cohan, Lindsey)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 959 Letter re: voters by Robert M Allensworth, filed. Copy of current docket sheet mailed to Allensworth. (lcayce, 2)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 955 Letter by C. Richard Quade, filed.(bcortez, 2)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 954 Letter re: limited voting backup ballot by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(lcayce, 2)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 953 Letter and Ballot by C. Richard Quade, filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 952 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #951 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 951 TRANSCRIPT re: TELEPHONIC MOTIONS HEARING held on 9/19/16 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOSH EIDELSON Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2016., filed. (thudson, )
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 950 Letter by Samuel Sosa, filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 949 Letter by Samuel Sosa, filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 948 Letter by Ward Larkin, filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 947 ORDER granting #945 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 946 ADVISORY by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, State Of Texas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Colmenero, Angela)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 945 MOTION for Zachary P. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/12/2016. (Oliker-Friedland, Samuel)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 944 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by State Defendants/ Angela V. Colmenero for Transcript of Motions hearing, 9/19/2016, Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Colmenero, Angela) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional on 9-22-16 by gr.
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 943 ORDER granting #924 United States Motion to Enforce InterimRemedial Order; denying #926 Private Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors Motion forFurther Relief to Enforce Interim Remedial Order.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(sscotch, 2)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. MOTIONS HEARING held on 9/19/2016. Arguments heard re: #924 and #926 Motions to Enforce. Rulings made on the record. Written order to be entered. Appearances:Chad Dunn, Danielle Lang, Gerry Hebert, Neil Baron, Abby Kamin, Lindsey Cohan, Leah Aden, Tania Faransso, Brendan Downes, Ezra Rosenberg, Jen Clark, Marinda Van Dalen,.(Digital # 12:02-1:20)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 942 Amended PROPOSED ORDER of Clarification of Interim Remedial Order re: #926 MOTION Further Relief to Enforce Interim Remedial Order, filed.(Cohan, Lindsey)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 941 Letter by Samuel Sosa, filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 940 REPLY in Support of #924 MOTION to Enforce Interim Remedial Order as to #895 Order,, filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(lcayce, 2)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 939 ORDER granting #938 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 938 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Errata 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Freeman, Daniel)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 937 NOTICE of Resetting as to #924 MOTION to Enforce Interim Remedial Order as to #895 Order,, #926 MOTION Further Relief to Enforce Interim Remedial Order. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2016 at 12:00 PM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (grogan, 2)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 936 ORDER granting #935 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Thaddeus C. Eagles granted leave to appear for Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund and Imani Clark.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 935 MOTION for Thaddeus C. Eagles to Appear Pro Hac Vice by IMANI CLARK, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2016. (Aden, Leah)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 933 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #930 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 934 Letter from Robert M Allensworth re: limited voting backup ballot and request for partial docket sheet, filed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (srussell, 2)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 932 RESPONSE in Opposition to #924 MOTION to Enforce Interim Remedial Order as to #895 Order,, #926 MOTION Further Relief to Enforce Interim Remedial Order, filed by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, State Of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Proposed Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 931 ORDER granting #929 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Natasha Korgaonkar terminated for Plaintiff-Intervenors: Imani Clark and Texas League of Young Voters Educational Fund.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(sscotch, 2)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 930 TRANSCRIPT re: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/12/16 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party ANGELA V. COLMENERO Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2016., filed. (thudson, )
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 929 Unopposed MOTION for Natasha Korgaonkar to Withdraw as Attorney by IMANI CLARK, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Korgaonkar, Natasha)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 928 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendants/Angela V. Colmenero for Transcript of Status Conference, 8/12/16, Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Colmenero, Angela)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 927 AMENDED ORDER SETTING RESPONSE DEADLINE AND HEARING ; Motion-related deadline set re: #926 MOTION Further Relief to Enforce Interim Remedial Order, #924 MOTION to Enforce Interim Remedial Order as to #895 Order, Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2016 at 05:00 PM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Responses due by 9/12/2016.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 926 MOTION Further Relief to Enforce Interim Remedial Order by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Imani Clark, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, Hidalgo County, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Cohan, Lindsey)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 925 ORDER SETTING RESPONSE DEADLINE AND HEARING ; Motion-related deadline set re: #924 MOTION to Enforce Interim Remedial Order as to #895 Order, Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Responses due by 9/9/2016.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 924 MOTION to Enforce Interim Remedial Order as to #895 Order, by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Aug. 12 Email, #2 Exhibit 2: VoteTexas Webpage, #3 Exhibit 3: Aug. 19 Press Release, #4 Exhibit 4: Aug. 30 Email, #5 Exhibit 5: Sept. 6 Email, #6 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Daniel)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 923 Letter by Samuel Sosa, filed.(bcortez, 2)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 922 ORDER SETTING DEADLINES FOR BRIEFING. The parties shall file their proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law on or before 11/18/16. The parties shall file responsive briefing on or before 12/16/16. Oral Argument set for 1/24/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 921 RESPONSE to #917 Memorandum,,, #918 Notice (Other) Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' and The United States' Proposed Briefing Schedules for Claims of Discriminatory Purpose, filed by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, State Of Texas. (Colmenero, Angela)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 920 RESPONSE to Defendants' Proposed Schedule for Claims of Discriminatory Purpose, filed by United States Of America. (Oliker-Friedland, Samuel)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 919 REPLY to #917 Memorandum,,, , filed by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, Hidalgo County, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey. (Cohan, Lindsey)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 918 NOTICE of United States' Proposed Schedule for Proceedings on Discriminatory Purpose Claims by United States Of America, filed. (Oliker-Friedland, Samuel)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 917 MEMORANDUM in Support of Proposed Schedule for Determination of Intentional Discrimination Claims by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Imani Clark, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, Hidalgo County, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cohan, Lindsey)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 916 ADVISORY by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, State Of Texas, filed.(Colmenero, Angela)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 915 Letter re: limited voting backup ballot by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(lcayce, 2)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 914 Letter re: limited voting backup election by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(lcayce, 2)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 913 NOTICE Defendants' Advisory Regarding Modifications to Portions of the VoteTexas.Gov Website by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, part 2)(Colmenero, Angela)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 912 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #905 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (idavis, 2)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 911 ORDER granting #909 Amended Motion for Janai Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund and Imani Clark.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(sscotch, 2)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 910 ORDER granting #908 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Coty Montag granted leave to appear for Texas League of Young Voters Educ. Fund and Imani Clark.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 909 AMENDED #904 MOTION, MOTION for Janai Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Motion Docket Date 9/8/2016.) by IMANI CLARK, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, filed. (Aden, Leah)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 908 AMENDED #903 MOTION, MOTION for Coty Montag to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Motion Docket Date 9/8/2016.) by IMANI CLARK, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, filed. (Aden, Leah)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 907 ORDER granting #903 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Coty Montag.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(srussell, 2)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 906 ORDER granting #904 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Janai Nelson.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(srussell, 2)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 905 TRANSCRIPT re: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/10/16 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party ANGELA V. COLMENERO Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2016., filed. (thudson, )
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 904 MOTION for Janai Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2016. (Aden, Leah)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 903 MOTION for Coty Montag to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2016. (Aden, Leah)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ORDER granting #901 Motion to Unseal.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified. (Clerk's notes: D.E. 899 - Motion and Proposed Order ONLY and D.E. 900 - Order unsealed.)(bcortez, 2)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 901 Unopposed MOTION to Unseal Portions of Document No. 899 by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/6/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 900 Order Granting Motion to Seal, filed. Modified on 8/16/2016 (bcortez, 2).
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 899 Motion to Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to Submission Regarding Voter Education Plan and Election Official Training Program, filed. (With attachments) Modified on 8/16/2016 (bcortez, 2).
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 898 Defendants' Submission Regarding Voter Education Plan and Election Official Training Program by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, filed.(Colmenero, Angela)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 897 Letter re: limited voting backup ballot by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(lcayce, 2)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/12/2016. The Court heard from the parties regarding the status of the voter education plan and election official training program for the November 2016 election. The parties agreed that: (1) the State will give Plaintiffs an opportunity to review in advance the documents to be used in revisions of the qualifying voter handbook, inspector handbook, pollwatcher handbook, and online training module (none of which have Spanish language translations), with Plaintiffs to have 24 hours to seek relief from the Court should the parties not be able to agree to the content of those documents; (2) the State will accept from Plaintiffs recommendations regarding appropriate recipients for the education and training materials; and (3) the State will add to its list of recipients of its election toolkits elected officials Plaintiffs request. The State has provided to Plaintiffs their intended revisions to the voting FAQs and Plaintiffs have provided responses seeking additional changes that the parties are negotiating. The State advised that the FAQs are expected to go live online by the end of the day. The State represented that no additional changes will be made to the FAQs. The Court DENIED Plaintiffs requests for: (1) the State to conduct an additional training session for county election administrators; (2) 24 hour advance notice of media broadcast copy; and (3) a dispute resolution process other than the parties ongoing right to seek relief from this Court on a regular or expedited basis. The State is ORDERED to file its detailed voter education and election worker training plan on or before Monday, August 15, 2016. Appearances: Angela V Colmenero, Matthew Hamilton Frederick, Rolando L Rios, Chad W Dunn, J Gerald Hebert, Abby Kamin, Danielle M Lang, Jose Garza, Marinda van Dalen, Lindsey Beth Cohan, Jennifer Clark, Ezra D Rosenberg, Brendan Downes, Victor Goode, Myrna Perez, Tania C. Faransso, Bruce I Gear, Meredith Bell-Platts, John Albert Smith, III, Richard Dellheim, Avner Shapiro.(Digital # 2:30 - 3:05)(ERO:F. Carbia), filed.(grogan, 2)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 896 Letter re: limited voting backup ballot by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(lcayce, 2)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 895 ORDER REGARDING AGREED INTERIM PLAN FOR ELECTIONS. Defendants shall develop a detailed election training program for the November 2016 general election no later than August 15, 2016. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 894 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendants/Angela Colmenero for Transcript of Status Conference on 8/10/16 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Colmenero, Angela) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional on 8-10-16.
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 893 Supplement to Submission of Agreed Terms by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, Steve McGraw, State Of Texas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colmenero, Angela)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/10/2016. The Court heard arguments regarding an interim plan to address the discriminatory effects of SB 14 for the November 8, 2016 general elections. The Court APPROVES the Joint Submission of Agreed Terms (D.E. 877) with slight revisions to be filed as an amended or supplemental joint submission. With respect to the Plaintiffs additional submission (D.E. 878), the Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer regarding the formulation of the educational and training program in advance of the Courts status conference on August 12, 2016. With respect to the Defendants additional submissions (D.E. 879), the Court DENIES the first request regarding the purpose and limits of the interim plan, the Court DENIES the second request regarding additional language for the impediment declaration, and the Court GRANTS the third request for non-waiver language. The Court ORDERS the parties to appear for a Status Conference on August 12, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. Appearances:Chad Dunn, Armand Derfner, Danielle Lang, Gerry Hebert, Neil Baron, Abby Kamin, Myrna Perez, Lindsey Cohan, Brendan Downes, Ezra Rosenberg, Victor Goode, Jen Clark, Marinda Van Dalen, Jose Garza, Rolando Rios, Deuel Ross, Tania Faransso, Leah Aden, Avner Shapiro, Meredith Bell-Platts, John Smith, Sam Oliker-Friedland, Brittany Wake, Chris Herren, Bruce Gear, Angela Colmenero, Matthew Frederick.(Digital # 8:33-9:40)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 892 ORDER granting #891 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 891 MOTION for Neil A. Steiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/30/2016. (Cohan, Lindsey)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 890 NOTICE of Submission of Materials for August 10, 2016 Hearing by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, Hidalgo County, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment 1, #2 Unredacted attachment 2, #3 Unredacted attachment 3)(Cohan, Lindsey)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 889 ORDER granting #888 Joint Motion for Entry of Temporary Remedial Order.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 888 Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Temporary Remedial Order by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, Steve McGraw, State Of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/30/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 887 Letter by Samuel Sosa, filed.(bcortez, 2)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 886 Copy of Bill of Costs by USCA in the amount of $335.25 against Appellants (USCA No. 14-41127), filed. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(dterrell, 2)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 885 Document re: limited voting backup ballot by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(lcayce, 2)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 884 NOTICE of Death of Plaintiff Margarito Lara by Lenard Taylor, filed. (van Dalen, Marinda)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 883 NOTICE Response of Private Plaintiffs and Plaintffs-Intervenors to Defendants' Brief Regarding Proposed Interim Remedial Plan by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, Hidalgo County, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. (Cohan, Lindsey)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 882 NOTICE Defendants' Response to Submission of All Private Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors of Additional Term re: #878 Notice (Other),,, by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, Steve McCraw, State Of Texas, filed. (Colmenero, Angela)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 881 NOTICE United States' Response to Submissions of Additional Terms re: #879 Notice (Other), #878 Notice (Other),,, by United States Of America, filed. (Gear, Bruce)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 880 Document re: limited voting backup ballot by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(lcayce, 2)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 879 NOTICE of Defendants' Brief Regarding Proposed Interim Remedial Plan by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, Steve McCraw, State Of Texas, filed. (Colmenero, Angela)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 878 NOTICE of Submission of Additional Term by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, Hidalgo County, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed. (Cohan, Lindsey)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 877 NOTICE of Joint Submission of Agreed Terms by United States Of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Freeman, Daniel)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 876 ORDER granting #875 Motion for Entry of Order.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 875 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Consent Motion for Entry of Temporary Remedial Order by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, Steve McGraw, State Of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/19/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 874 ORDER granting #864 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Samuel G. Oliker-Friedland granted leave to appear as counsel for United States.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 873 ORDER granting #867 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jon M. Greenbaum granted leave to appear as counsel for Texas State Conference of the NAACP Branches and the Mexican American Legislative Caucus of the Texas House of Representatives.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 872 ORDER granting #865 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Shoshana J. Krieger granted leave to appear as counsel for "Taylor Plaintiffs" - Leonard Taylor, Eulalio Mendez, Jr., Lionel Estrada, Estela Garcia Espinoza, et al.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 871 ORDER granting #866 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 870 ORDER granting #863 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 869 ORDER granting #868 Joint MOTION to Expedite the Interim Remedy Schedule. Joint plan regarding all agreed upon terms and their respective plans regarding all disputed terms and supportive briefing to address the infirmities in SB 14 shall be filed by August 2, 2016. Responses shall be filed by August 5, 2016. This matter will be called for hearing on 8/10/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 868 Joint MOTION to Expedite the Interim Remedy Schedule by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, Sergio DeLeon, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hebert, J)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 867 MOTION for Jon Greenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2016. (Cohan, Lindsey)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 866 MOTION for Brendan Downes to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2016. (Cohan, Lindsey)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 865 Unopposed MOTION for Shoshana J. Krieger to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lenard Taylor, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/15/2016. (van Dalen, Marinda)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 864 MOTION for Samuel G. Oliker-Friedland to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/15/2016. (Freeman, Daniel)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 863 Unopposed MOTION for Danielle M. Lang to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, Sergio DeLeon, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/15/2016. (Hebert, J)
July 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 862 ORDER granting #861 Consent Motion for Entry of Temporary Remedial Order.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
July 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 861 MOTION Consent Motion for Entry of Temporary Remedial Order by Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, Steve McCraw, State Of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/15/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 860 ADVISORY by Steve McCraw, State Of Texas, Greg Abbott, Carlos H Cascos, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Colmenero, Angela)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 859 ORDER. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer on or before July 29, 2016 to determine what plan terms may be subject to agreement. The parties are ORDERED to submit their respective plans and supportive briefing to address the infirmities in SB 14 on or before August 5, 2016. The parties may then file responses to any other plan for interim relief on or before August 11, 2016. Arguments on any remaining differences set for 8/17/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 858 Judgment and Court's Opinion Order of USCA; Judgment issued as mandate 7/20/16 re: #634 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 14-41127, filed. (Attachments: #1 opinion, #2 continuation, #3 continuation, #4 cover letter)(lrivera, 2)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 857 Letter by C. Richard Quade, filed.(bcortez, 2)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #634 Notice of Appeal to Marc Rotenberg. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 14-41127), filed.(amireles, 2)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #634 Notice of Appeal to Andrew M. Leblanc and Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 15-41127), filed.(amireles, 2)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #634 Notice of Appeal to Jon Marshall Greenbaum, Danielle Marie Lang, Thomas Molnar Fisher, Sean Young,Stuart Kyle Duncan, Charles Justin Cooper, and William Consovoy. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 14-41127), filed.(amireles, 2)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order The Court hereby amends the previously entered scheduling order to include the following:Any party wishing to make any discovery motions should arrange for a premotion conference with the Court before the preparation and submission of any motion papers. That includes a motion to compel, to quash, or for protection. Email Mrs. Cortez at Brandy_Cortez@txs.uscourts.gov to arrange for a premotion conference. Notify your adversary of the date and time for the conference., filed. (dkellyadi, 4)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 856 Letter re: voting ballot by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(lcayce, 2)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 855 Letter by C. Richard Quade, filed.(bcortez, 2)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 854 Letter by C. Richard Quade, filed.(bcortez, 2)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 853 Letter by C. Richard Quade, filed.(bcortez, 2)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 851 ORDER granting #850 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth S Westfall terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 850 MOTION for Elizabeth S. Westfall to Withdraw as Attorney by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/15/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Westfall, Elizabeth)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 849 Letter by Robert M Allensworth, filed. Copy of docket sheet mailed to Allensworth.(lcayce, 2)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 848 Order of USCA re: #634 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 14-41127. The judgment of the District Court is affirmed in part, vacated in part, and dismissed in part. This cause is remanded to the District Court for further proceedings in accordance with the opinion of the Fifth Circuit Court.. Case reopened on 10/6/2015, filed.(lcayce, 2)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 852 Letter by C. Richard Quade, filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 847 ORDER granting #846 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anna Baldwin terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 846 MOTION for Anna M. Baldwin to Withdraw as Attorney by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Daniel)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 845 ORDER granting #844 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vishal Agraharkar terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 844 MOTION for Vishal Agraharkar to Withdraw as Attorney by Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2015. (Cohan, Lindsey)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 843 ORDER granting #842 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joshua James Bone terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 842 Unopposed MOTION for Joshua James Bone to Withdraw as Attorney by Gordon Benjamin, Evelyn Brickner, Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Ken Gandy, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crummey, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/31/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hebert, J)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 841 ORDER granting #840 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark A Posner terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 840 MOTION for Mark Posner to Withdraw as Attorney by Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 839 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to C. Richard Quade re: #838 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (mserpa, 2)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ORDER granting #837 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Danielle Conley terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 837 Unopposed MOTION for Danielle Conley to Withdraw as Attorney by Imani Clark, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/18/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Korgaonkar, Natasha)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 836 Document by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(lcayce, 2)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 835 Transmittal Letter on Appeal re: #634 Notice of Appeal. The supplemental record is being sent to Chad W. Dunn, Erin Helen Flynn, Ezra D. Rosenberg, Marinda Van Dalen, Angela Colmenero, and Ryan Haygood via regular first class mail. (USCA No. 14-41127), filed. (amireles, 2)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order First Supplemental Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #634 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 14-41127, filed.DE # 807-834. (amireles, 2) First Supplemental record on appeal certified as to DE # 834 only per request of Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals Modified on 4/7/2015 (amireles, 2).
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 834 Order of USCA re: #634 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 14-41127. To Clerk: The image of the supplemental material w/ appellant's motion is included. Please file the supplemental record within 15 days of this notice or by 4/8/15., filed.(lcayce, 2) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2015: #2 Motion of Amici Curiae, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (amireles, 2).
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 833 ORDER granting #832 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ryan Haygood terminated. Natasha M. Korgaonkar is substituted as attorney in charge for Imani Clark and the Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 832 MOTION for Ryan P. Haygood to Withdraw as Attorney by IMANI CLARK, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haygood, Ryan)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 831 Transmittal Letter on Appeal re: #634 Notice of Appeal. The electronic record on CD containing sealed documents per DE #830 is being sent to Chad W. Dunn, Erin Helen Flynn, Ezra D. Rosenberg, Marinda Van Dalen, Angela Colmenero, and Ryan Haygood via regular first class mail with the exception of Ryan Haygood sent via FedEx. (USCA No. 14-41127), filed. (amireles, 2)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 830 Order of USCA re: #634 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 14-41127. It is ordered that the joint motion of the parties to view and for the release of the sealed portions of the record on appeal (ROA 101571-114547) to all counsel is granted., filed.(amireles, 2)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 829 ORDER granting #827 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lindsey Elizabeth Wolf terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 828 REPLY to Response to #824 Opposed MOTION ordering Defendants to pay fees and expenses for expert depositions, filed by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Herron Receipts)(Bone, Joshua)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 827 Unopposed MOTION for Lindsey Elizabeth Wolf to Withdraw as Attorney by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/12/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wolf, Lindsey)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 826 RESPONSE to #824 Opposed MOTION ordering Defendants to pay fees and expenses for expert depositions filed by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Proposed Order Order)(Colmenero, Angela)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ORDER granting #821 Motion for Disbursement of Funds.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 824 Opposed MOTION ordering Defendants to pay fees and expenses for expert depositions by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/13/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hebert, J)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 823 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Frederick on behalf of Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Frederick, Matthew)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 822 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela V. Colmenero on behalf of Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Colmenero, Angela)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 821 Unopposed MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hebert, J)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 820 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO SUBSTITUTE SCOTT A. KELLER FOR JONATHAN F. MITCHELL AS COUNSEL granting #819 Motion to Substitute Attorney Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 819 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Scott A. Keller in place of Jonathan F. Mitchell by Steve McCraw, Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keller, Scott)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 818 ORDER granting #817 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Adam Warren Aston terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 817 Unopposed MOTION for Adam W. Aston to Withdraw as Attorney by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wolf, Lindsey)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 816 ORDER granting #814 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen Lyle Tatum, Jr terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(sscotch, 2)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 815 Document by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(vrios, 2)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 814 MOTION for Stephen Lyle Tatum to Withdraw as Attorney by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aston, Adam)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 813 Transmittal Letter re: cds containing electronic record on appeal, filed.(amireles, 2)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: USCA Case Number, #634 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 14-41127, filed. DE 1-806. (amireles, 2)
November 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 812 Letter from Robert M. Allensworth, filed. (ssyler, 2)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER granting #808 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gregory David Whitley; John Reed Clay, Jr and John Barret Scott terminated; granting #809 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gregory David Whitley; John Reed Clay, Jr and John Barret Scott terminated; granting #810 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gregory David Whitley; John Reed Clay, Jr and John Barret Scott terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(sscotch, 2)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 810 MOTION for John B. Scott to Withdraw as Attorney by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, John)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 809 MOTION for G. David Whitley to Withdraw as Attorney by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, John)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 808 MOTION for J. Reed Clay, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, John)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 807 Letter from Robert Allensworth, filed. (lrivera, 2)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 806 SEALED NOTICE by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Scott, John) Modified on 11/24/2014 (bcortez, 2).
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 805 NOTICE of Trial Exhibits Not Available for ECF Filing by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Scott, John)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 804 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NO. DEF1092 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1092)(Scott, John)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 803 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2754-2768 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2754, #2 Exhibit DEF2755, #3 Exhibit DEF2756, #4 Exhibit DEF2757, #5 Exhibit DEF2758, #6 Exhibit DEF2762, #7 Exhibit DEF2763, #8 Exhibit DEF2764, #9 Exhibit DEF2765, #10 Exhibit DEF2766, #11 Exhibit DEF2767, #12 Exhibit DEF2768)(Scott, John)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 802 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2726-2753 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2726, #2 Exhibit DEF2727, #3 Exhibit DEF2728, #4 Exhibit DEF2732-PART 1, #5 Exhibit DEF2732-PART 2, #6 Exhibit DEF2733, #7 Exhibit DEF2734-PART 1, #8 Exhibit DEF2734-PART 2, #9 Exhibit DEF2734-PART 3, #10 Exhibit DEF2734-PART 4, #11 Exhibit DEF2735, #12 Exhibit DEF2736, #13 Exhibit DEF2738, #14 Exhibit DEF2739, #15 Exhibit DEF2740, #16 Exhibit DEF2741, #17 Exhibit DEF2742, #18 Exhibit DEF2743, #19 Exhibit DEF2744, #20 Exhibit DEF2745, #21 Exhibit DEF2746, #22 Exhibit DEF2749, #23 Exhibit DEF2750, #24 Exhibit DEF2751, #25 Exhibit DEF2752, #26 Exhibit DEF2753)(Scott, John)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 801 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2681-2725 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2681-PART 1, #2 Exhibit DEF2681-PART 2, #3 Exhibit DEF2682, #4 Exhibit DEF2683, #5 Exhibit DEF2684, #6 Exhibit DEF2685-PART 1, #7 Exhibit DEF2685-PART 2, #8 Exhibit DEF2685-PART 3, #9 Exhibit DEF2686, #10 Exhibit DEF2687, #11 Exhibit DEF2688, #12 Exhibit DEF2689, #13 Exhibit DEF2690, #14 Exhibit DEF2691, #15 Exhibit DEF2692, #16 Exhibit DEF2693, #17 Exhibit DEF2694, #18 Exhibit DEF2695, #19 Exhibit DEF2696, #20 Exhibit DEF2697, #21 Exhibit DEF2698, #22 Exhibit DEF2699, #23 Exhibit DEF2700, #24 Exhibit DEF2701, #25 Exhibit DEF2702, #26 Exhibit DEF2703, #27 Exhibit DEF2704, #28 Exhibit DEF2705, #29 Exhibit DEF2706, #30 Exhibit DEF2707, #31 Exhibit DEF2708, #32 Exhibit DEF2709, #33 Exhibit DEF2710, #34 Exhibit DEF2711, #35 Exhibit DEF2712, #36 Exhibit DEF2713, #37 Exhibit DEF2714, #38 Exhibit DEF2715, #39 Exhibit DEF2716, #40 Exhibit DEF2717, #41 Exhibit DEF2718, #42 Exhibit DEF2719, #43 Exhibit DEF2720, #44 Exhibit DEF2721, #45 Exhibit DEF2722, #46 Exhibit DEF2724, #47 Exhibit DEF2725)(Scott, John)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 800 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2641-2680 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2641, #2 Exhibit DEF2642, #3 Exhibit DEF2643, #4 Exhibit DEF2644-PART 1, #5 Exhibit DEF2644-PART 2, #6 Exhibit DEF2644-PART 3, #7 Exhibit DEF2644-PART 4, #8 Exhibit DEF2645, #9 Exhibit DEF2646, #10 Exhibit DEF2647, #11 Exhibit DEF2648, #12 Exhibit DEF2649, #13 Exhibit DEF2650, #14 Exhibit DEF2651, #15 Exhibit DEF2652, #16 Exhibit DEF2653, #17 Exhibit DEF2654, #18 Exhibit DEF2655, #19 Exhibit DEF2656, #20 Exhibit DEF2657, #21 Exhibit DEF2658, #22 Exhibit DEF2659, #23 Exhibit DEF2660, #24 Exhibit DEF2661, #25 Exhibit DEF2662-PART 1, #26 Exhibit DEF2662-PART 2, #27 Exhibit DEF2662-PART 3, #28 Exhibit DEF2663, #29 Exhibit DEF2664, #30 Exhibit DEF2665, #31 Exhibit DEF2666, #32 Exhibit DEF2667, #33 Exhibit DEF2668-PART 1, #34 Exhibit DEF2668-PART 2, #35 Exhibit DEF2668-PART 3, #36 Exhibit DEF2668-PART 4, #37 Exhibit DEF2668-PART 5, #38 Exhibit DEF2669, #39 Exhibit DEF2670-PART 1, #40 Exhibit DEF2670-PART2, #41 Exhibit DEF2670-PART 3, #42 Exhibit DEF2671, #43 Exhibit DEF2672, #44 Exhibit DEF2673, #45 Exhibit DEF2674, #46 Exhibit DEF2675, #47 Exhibit DEF2676, #48 Exhibit DEF2677, #49 Exhibit DEF2678, #50 Exhibit DEF2679, #51 Exhibit DEF2680)(Scott, John)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 799 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2601-2640 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2601, #2 Exhibit DEF2602, #3 Exhibit DEF2603, #4 Exhibit DEF2604, #5 Exhibit DEF2605, #6 Exhibit DEF2606, #7 Exhibit DEF2607, #8 Exhibit DEF2608, #9 Exhibit DEF2609, #10 Exhibit DEF2610-PART 1, #11 Exhibit DEF2610-PART 2, #12 Exhibit DEF2611, #13 Exhibit DEF2612, #14 Exhibit DEF2613, #15 Exhibit DEF2614, #16 Exhibit DEF2615, #17 Exhibit DEF2616, #18 Exhibit DEF2617, #19 Exhibit DEF2618, #20 Exhibit DEF2619, #21 Exhibit DEF2620, #22 Exhibit DEF2621, #23 Exhibit DEF2622, #24 Exhibit DEF2623, #25 Exhibit DEF2624, #26 Exhibit DEF2625, #27 Exhibit DEF2626, #28 Exhibit DEF2627, #29 Exhibit DEF2628, #30 Exhibit DEF2629, #31 Exhibit DEF2630, #32 Exhibit DEF2631, #33 Exhibit DEF2632, #34 Exhibit DEF2633, #35 Exhibit DEF2634, #36 Exhibit DEF2635, #37 Exhibit DEF2636-PART 1, #38 Exhibit DEF2636-PART 2, #39 Exhibit DEF2636-PART 3, #40 Exhibit DEF2636-PART 4, #41 Exhibit DEF2636-PART 5, #42 Exhibit DEF2637, #43 Exhibit DEF2638, #44 Exhibit DEF2639, #45 Exhibit DEF2640)(Scott, John)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 798 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2542-2600 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2542-PART 1, #2 Exhibit DEF2542-PART 2, #3 Exhibit DEF2542-PART 3, #4 Exhibit DEF2542-PART 4, #5 Exhibit DEF2542-PART 5, #6 Exhibit DEF2543, #7 Exhibit DEF2544, #8 Exhibit DEF2556, #9 Exhibit DEF2557, #10 Exhibit DEF2577, #11 Exhibit DEF2578, #12 Exhibit DEF2579, #13 Exhibit DEF2580, #14 Exhibit DEF2581, #15 Exhibit DEF2583, #16 Exhibit DEF2584, #17 Exhibit DEF2585, #18 Exhibit DEF2586, #19 Exhibit DEF2587, #20 Exhibit DEF2588, #21 Exhibit DEF2589, #22 Exhibit DEF2590, #23 Exhibit DEF2591, #24 Exhibit DEF2592, #25 Exhibit DEF2593, #26 Exhibit DEF2594, #27 Exhibit DEF2595, #28 Exhibit DEF2596, #29 Exhibit DEF2597, #30 Exhibit DEF2598, #31 Exhibit DEF2599, #32 Exhibit DEF2600)(Scott, John)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 797 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2481-2541 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2481, #2 Exhibit DEF2482, #3 Exhibit DEF2483, #4 Exhibit DEF2484, #5 Exhibit DEF2485, #6 Exhibit DEF2486, #7 Exhibit DEF2487, #8 Exhibit DEF2488, #9 Exhibit DEF2490, #10 Exhibit DEF2491, #11 Exhibit DEF2492, #12 Exhibit DEF2493, #13 Exhibit DEF2494, #14 Exhibit DEF2495, #15 Exhibit DEF2496, #16 Exhibit DEF2498, #17 Exhibit DEF2500, #18 Exhibit DEF2503, #19 Exhibit DEF2504, #20 Exhibit DEF2505, #21 Exhibit DEF2506, #22 Exhibit DEF2507, #23 Exhibit DEF2508, #24 Exhibit DEF2509, #25 Exhibit DEF2510, #26 Exhibit DEF2511, #27 Exhibit DEF2512, #28 Exhibit DEF2513, #29 Exhibit DEF2514, #30 Exhibit DEF2515, #31 Exhibit DEF2516, #32 Exhibit DEF2517, #33 Exhibit DEF2518, #34 Exhibit DEF2519, #35 Exhibit DEF2523, #36 Exhibit DEF2524, #37 Exhibit DEF2525, #38 Exhibit DEF2536, #39 Exhibit DEF2537-PART 1, #40 Exhibit DEF2537-PART 2, #41 Exhibit DEF2539, #42 Exhibit DEF2540, #43 Exhibit DEF2541)(Scott, John)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 796 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2476-2480 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2476, #2 Exhibit DEF2477, #3 Exhibit DEF2478, #4 Exhibit DEF2479, #5 Exhibit DEF2480)(Scott, John)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 795 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2437-2475 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2437, #2 Exhibit DEF2438, #3 Exhibit DEF2439, #4 Exhibit DEF2440, #5 Exhibit DEF2441, #6 Exhibit DEF2442, #7 Exhibit DEF2443, #8 Exhibit DEF2444, #9 Exhibit DEF2445, #10 Exhibit DEF2446, #11 Exhibit DEF2447, #12 Exhibit DEF2448, #13 Exhibit DEF2449, #14 Exhibit DEF2456, #15 Exhibit DEF2457, #16 Exhibit DEF2458, #17 Exhibit DEF2459, #18 Exhibit DEF2460, #19 Exhibit DEF2461, #20 Exhibit DEF2462, #21 Exhibit DEF2463, #22 Exhibit DEF2464, #23 Exhibit DEF2465, #24 Exhibit DEF2468, #25 Exhibit DEF2469, #26 Exhibit DEF2470, #27 Exhibit DEF2471, #28 Exhibit DEF2472, #29 Exhibit DEF2473, #30 Exhibit DEF2474, #31 Exhibit DEF2475)(Scott, John)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 794 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2401-2436 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2401, #2 Exhibit DEF2402, #3 Exhibit DEF2403, #4 Exhibit DEF2404, #5 Exhibit DEF2405, #6 Exhibit DEF2406, #7 Exhibit DEF2407, #8 Exhibit DEF2408, #9 Exhibit DEF2409, #10 Exhibit DEF2410, #11 Exhibit DEF2411, #12 Exhibit DEF2412, #13 Exhibit DEF2413, #14 Exhibit DEF2414, #15 Exhibit DEF2415, #16 Exhibit DEF2416, #17 Exhibit DEF2417, #18 Exhibit DEF2418, #19 Exhibit DEF2419, #20 Exhibit DEF2420, #21 Exhibit DEF2421, #22 Exhibit DEF2422, #23 Exhibit DEF2423, #24 Exhibit DEF2424, #25 Exhibit DEF2425, #26 Exhibit DEF2426, #27 Exhibit DEF2427, #28 Exhibit DEF2428, #29 Exhibit DEF2429, #30 Exhibit DEF2430, #31 Exhibit DEF2431, #32 Exhibit DEF2432, #33 Exhibit DEF2433, #34 Exhibit DEF2434, #35 Exhibit DEF2436)(Scott, John)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 793 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2376-2400 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2376, #2 Exhibit DEF2377, #3 Exhibit DEF2378, #4 Exhibit DEF2379, #5 Exhibit DEF2380, #6 Exhibit DEF2381, #7 Exhibit DEF2382, #8 Exhibit DEF2383, #9 Exhibit DEF2384, #10 Exhibit DEF2385, #11 Exhibit DEF2386, #12 Exhibit DEF2389, #13 Exhibit DEF2390, #14 Exhibit DEF2391, #15 Exhibit DEF2392, #16 Exhibit DEF2393, #17 Exhibit DEF2394, #18 Exhibit DEF2395, #19 Exhibit DEF2396, #20 Exhibit DEF2397, #21 Exhibit DEF2398, #22 Exhibit DEF2399, #23 Exhibit DEF2400)(Scott, John)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 792 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2301-2375 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2301, #2 Exhibit DEF2302, #3 Exhibit DEF2303, #4 Exhibit DEF2304, #5 Exhibit DEF2305, #6 Exhibit DEF2306, #7 Exhibit DEF2307, #8 Exhibit DEF2308, #9 Exhibit DEF2309, #10 Exhibit DEF2310, #11 Exhibit DEF2311, #12 Exhibit DEF2312, #13 Exhibit DEF2313, #14 Exhibit DEF2314, #15 Exhibit DEF2315, #16 Exhibit DEF2316, #17 Exhibit DEF2317, #18 Exhibit DEF2318, #19 Exhibit DEF2319, #20 Exhibit DEF2320, #21 Exhibit DEF2321, #22 Exhibit DEF2322, #23 Exhibit DEF2323, #24 Exhibit DEF2324, #25 Exhibit DEF2325-Part 1, #26 Exhibit DEF2325-Part 2, #27 Exhibit DEF2326, #28 Exhibit DEF2327, #29 Exhibit DEF2328, #30 Exhibit DEF2329, #31 Exhibit DEF2330, #32 Exhibit DEF2331, #33 Exhibit DEF2339, #34 Exhibit DEF2340, #35 Exhibit DEF2358, #36 Exhibit DEF2359, #37 Exhibit DEF2360, #38 Exhibit DEF2361, #39 Exhibit DEF2362, #40 Exhibit DEF2363, #41 Exhibit DEF2364, #42 Exhibit DEF2365, #43 Exhibit DEF2366, #44 Exhibit DEF2367, #45 Exhibit DEF2368, #46 Exhibit DEF2369, #47 Exhibit DEF2370, #48 Exhibit DEF2371, #49 Exhibit DEF2372, #50 Exhibit DEF2373, #51 Exhibit DEF2374, #52 Exhibit DEF2375)(Scott, John)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 791 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2246-2300 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2246, #2 Exhibit DEF2247, #3 Exhibit DEF2248, #4 Exhibit DEF2249, #5 Exhibit DEF2250, #6 Exhibit DEF2251, #7 Exhibit DEF2252, #8 Exhibit DEF2253, #9 Exhibit DEF2254, #10 Exhibit DEF2255, #11 Exhibit DEF2256, #12 Exhibit DEF2257, #13 Exhibit DEF2258, #14 Exhibit DEF2259, #15 Exhibit DEF2260, #16 Exhibit DEF2261, #17 Exhibit DEF2262, #18 Exhibit DEF2263, #19 Exhibit DEF2264, #20 Exhibit DEF2265, #21 Exhibit DEF2266, #22 Exhibit DEF2267, #23 Exhibit DEF2268, #24 Exhibit DEF2269, #25 Exhibit DEF2270, #26 Exhibit DEF2274, #27 Exhibit DEF2275, #28 Exhibit DEF2276, #29 Exhibit DEF2277, #30 Exhibit DEF2287, #31 Exhibit DEF2288, #32 Exhibit DEF2289, #33 Exhibit DEF2290, #34 Exhibit DEF2291, #35 Exhibit DEF2292, #36 Exhibit DEF2293, #37 Exhibit DEF2294, #38 Exhibit DEF2295, #39 Exhibit DEF2296, #40 Exhibit DEF2297, #41 Exhibit DEF2298, #42 Exhibit DEF2299, #43 Exhibit DEF2300)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 790 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2162-2208 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2162, #2 Exhibit DEF2163, #3 Exhibit DEF2164, #4 Exhibit DEF2165, #5 Exhibit DEF2166, #6 Exhibit DEF2167, #7 Exhibit DEF2168, #8 Exhibit DEF2169, #9 Exhibit DEF2170, #10 Exhibit DEF2171, #11 Exhibit DEF2172, #12 Exhibit DEF2173, #13 Exhibit DEF2174, #14 Exhibit DEF2177, #15 Exhibit DEF2178, #16 Exhibit DEF2179, #17 Exhibit DEF2180, #18 Exhibit DEF2181, #19 Exhibit DEF2182, #20 Exhibit DEF2183, #21 Exhibit DEF2184, #22 Exhibit DEF2185, #23 Exhibit DEF2186-PART 1, #24 Exhibit DEF2186-PART 2, #25 Exhibit DEF2186-PART 3, #26 Exhibit DEF2186-PART 4, #27 Exhibit DEF2186-PART 5, #28 Exhibit DEF2187, #29 Exhibit DEF2188, #30 Exhibit DEF2189, #31 Exhibit DEF2190, #32 Exhibit DEF2191, #33 Exhibit DEF2192-PART 1, #34 Exhibit DEF2192-PART 2, #35 Exhibit DEF2192-PART 3, #36 Exhibit DEF2192-PART 4, #37 Exhibit DEF2192-PART 5, #38 Exhibit DEF2192-PART 6, #39 Exhibit DEF2193, #40 Exhibit DEF2198, #41 Exhibit DEF2199, #42 Exhibit DEF2206, #43 Exhibit DEF2207, #44 Exhibit DEF2208)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 789 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2111-2161 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2111, #2 Exhibit DEF2112, #3 Exhibit DEF2113, #4 Exhibit DEF2114, #5 Exhibit DEF2115, #6 Exhibit DEF2117, #7 Exhibit DEF2118, #8 Exhibit DEF2119, #9 Exhibit DEF2120, #10 Exhibit DEF2121, #11 Exhibit DEF2123, #12 Exhibit DEF2124, #13 Exhibit DEF2125, #14 Exhibit DEF2126, #15 Exhibit DEF2127, #16 Exhibit DEF2128, #17 Exhibit DEF2129, #18 Exhibit DEF2130, #19 Exhibit DEF2131, #20 Exhibit DEF2132, #21 Exhibit DEF2133, #22 Exhibit DEF2134, #23 Exhibit DEF2135, #24 Exhibit DEF2136, #25 Exhibit DEF2138, #26 Exhibit DEF2139, #27 Exhibit DEF2140, #28 Exhibit DEF2141, #29 Exhibit DEF2143, #30 Exhibit DEF2144, #31 Exhibit DEF2146, #32 Exhibit DEF2148, #33 Exhibit DEF2149, #34 Exhibit DEF2150, #35 Exhibit DEF2152, #36 Exhibit DEF2153, #37 Exhibit DEF2154, #38 Exhibit DEF2155, #39 Exhibit DEF2156, #40 Exhibit DEF2157, #41 Exhibit DEF2158, #42 Exhibit DEF2159, #43 Exhibit DEF2160, #44 Exhibit DEF2161)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 788 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2063-2110 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2063, #2 Exhibit DEF2065, #3 Exhibit DEF2066, #4 Exhibit DEF2067, #5 Exhibit DEF2068, #6 Exhibit DEF2069, #7 Exhibit DEF2070, #8 Exhibit DEF2071, #9 Exhibit DEF2072, #10 Exhibit DEF2073, #11 Exhibit DEF2074, #12 Exhibit DEF2075, #13 Exhibit DEF2076, #14 Exhibit DEF2077, #15 Exhibit DEF2078, #16 Exhibit DEF2082, #17 Exhibit DEF2084, #18 Exhibit DEF2085, #19 Exhibit DEF2086, #20 Exhibit DEF2087, #21 Exhibit DEF2088, #22 Exhibit DEF2089, #23 Exhibit DEF2090, #24 Exhibit DEF2091, #25 Exhibit DEF2092, #26 Exhibit DEF2093, #27 Exhibit DEF2094, #28 Exhibit DEF2095, #29 Exhibit DEF2096, #30 Exhibit DEF2097, #31 Exhibit DEF2098, #32 Exhibit DEF2099, #33 Exhibit DEF2100, #34 Exhibit DEF2101, #35 Exhibit DEF2102, #36 Exhibit DEF2103, #37 Exhibit DEF2104, #38 Exhibit DEF2105, #39 Exhibit DEF2106, #40 Exhibit DEF2107, #41 Exhibit DEF2108, #42 Exhibit DEF2109, #43 Exhibit DEF2110)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 787 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 2001-2060 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2001, #2 Exhibit DEF2002, #3 Exhibit DEF2003, #4 Exhibit DEF2004, #5 Exhibit DEF2005, #6 Exhibit DEF2006, #7 Exhibit DEF2007, #8 Exhibit DEF2008, #9 Exhibit DEF2009, #10 Exhibit DEF2010, #11 Exhibit DEF2011, #12 Exhibit DEF2012, #13 Exhibit DEF2013, #14 Exhibit DEF2014, #15 Exhibit DEF2015, #16 Exhibit DEF2016, #17 Exhibit DEF2017, #18 Exhibit DEF2018, #19 Exhibit DEF2019, #20 Exhibit DEF2020, #21 Exhibit DEF2021, #22 Exhibit DEF2022, #23 Exhibit DEF2023, #24 Exhibit DEF2024, #25 Exhibit DEF2025, #26 Exhibit DEF2026, #27 Exhibit DEF2027, #28 Exhibit DEF2028, #29 Exhibit DEF2029, #30 Exhibit DEF2030, #31 Exhibit DEF2031, #32 Exhibit DEF2032, #33 Exhibit DEF2033, #34 Exhibit DEF2034, #35 Exhibit DEF2035, #36 Exhibit DEF2036, #37 Exhibit DEF2037, #38 Exhibit DEF2038, #39 Exhibit DEF2039, #40 Exhibit DEF2040, #41 Exhibit DEF2041, #42 Exhibit DEF2042, #43 Exhibit DEF2043, #44 Exhibit DEF2044, #45 Exhibit DEF2045, #46 Exhibit DEF2053, #47 Exhibit DEF2054, #48 Exhibit DEF2055, #49 Exhibit DEF2056, #50 Exhibit DEF2059, #51 Exhibit DEF2060)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 786 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 1951-2000 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1951, #2 Exhibit DEF1953, #3 Exhibit DEF1955, #4 Exhibit DEF1957, #5 Exhibit DEF1958, #6 Exhibit DEF1959, #7 Exhibit DEF1961, #8 Exhibit DEF1963, #9 Exhibit DEF1965, #10 Exhibit DEF1969, #11 Exhibit DEF1971, #12 Exhibit DEF1973, #13 Exhibit DEF1975, #14 Exhibit DEF1977, #15 Exhibit DEF1979, #16 Exhibit DEF1980, #17 Exhibit DEF1982, #18 Exhibit DEF1984, #19 Exhibit DEF1985, #20 Exhibit DEF1987, #21 Exhibit DEF1990, #22 Exhibit DEF1992, #23 Exhibit DEF1994, #24 Exhibit DEF1995, #25 Exhibit DEF1996, #26 Exhibit DEF1997, #27 Exhibit DEF1999, #28 Exhibit DEF2000)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 785 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 1902-1949 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1902, #2 Exhibit DEF1904, #3 Exhibit DEF1906, #4 Exhibit DEF1908, #5 Exhibit DEF1912, #6 Exhibit DEF1914, #7 Exhibit DEF1916, #8 Exhibit DEF1917, #9 Exhibit DEF1919, #10 Exhibit DEF1920, #11 Exhibit DEF1922, #12 Exhibit DEF1924, #13 Exhibit DEF1926, #14 Exhibit DEF1927, #15 Exhibit DEF1929, #16 Exhibit DEF1931, #17 Exhibit DEF1933, #18 Exhibit DEF1935, #19 Exhibit DEF1937, #20 Exhibit DEF1939, #21 Exhibit DEF1941, #22 Exhibit DEF1949)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 784 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 1851-1900 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1851, #2 Exhibit DEF1852, #3 Exhibit DEF1853, #4 Exhibit DEF1854, #5 Exhibit DEF1855, #6 Exhibit DEF1856, #7 Exhibit DEF1857, #8 Exhibit DEF1858, #9 Exhibit DEF1859, #10 Exhibit DEF1861, #11 Exhibit DEF1863, #12 Exhibit DEF1865, #13 Exhibit DEF1867, #14 Exhibit DEF1869, #15 Exhibit DEF1871, #16 Exhibit DEF1873, #17 Exhibit DEF1875, #18 Exhibit DEF1877, #19 Exhibit DEF1879, #20 Exhibit DEF1881, #21 Exhibit DEF1883, #22 Exhibit DEF1885, #23 Exhibit DEF1886, #24 Exhibit DEF1888, #25 Exhibit DEF1890, #26 Exhibit DEF1892, #27 Exhibit DEF1894, #28 Exhibit DEF1896, #29 Exhibit DEF1898, #30 Exhibit DEF1900)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 783 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 1801-1850 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1801, #2 Exhibit DEF1802, #3 Exhibit DEF1803, #4 Exhibit DEF1804, #5 Exhibit DEF1805, #6 Exhibit DEF1806, #7 Exhibit DEF1807, #8 Exhibit DEF1808, #9 Exhibit DEF1809, #10 Exhibit DEF1810, #11 Exhibit DEF1811, #12 Exhibit DEF1812, #13 Exhibit DEF1813, #14 Exhibit DEF1814, #15 Exhibit DEF1815, #16 Exhibit DEF1816, #17 Exhibit DEF1817, #18 Exhibit DEF1818, #19 Exhibit DEF1819, #20 Exhibit DEF1820, #21 Exhibit DEF1821, #22 Exhibit DEF1822, #23 Exhibit DEF1823, #24 Exhibit DEF1824, #25 Exhibit DEF1826, #26 Exhibit DEF1827, #27 Exhibit DEF1831, #28 Exhibit DEF1833, #29 Exhibit DEF1835, #30 Exhibit DEF1836, #31 Exhibit DEF1837, #32 Exhibit DEF1838, #33 Exhibit DEF1839, #34 Exhibit DEF1840, #35 Exhibit DEF1841, #36 Exhibit DEF1842, #37 Exhibit DEF1843, #38 Exhibit DEF1844, #39 Exhibit DEF1845, #40 Exhibit DEF1846, #41 Exhibit DEF1847, #42 Exhibit DEF1848, #43 Exhibit DEF1849, #44 Exhibit DEF1850)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 782 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 1766-1800 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1766, #2 Exhibit DEF1767, #3 Exhibit DEF1768, #4 Exhibit DEF1769, #5 Exhibit DEF1770, #6 Exhibit DEF1771, #7 Exhibit DEF1772, #8 Exhibit DEF1773, #9 Exhibit DEF1775, #10 Exhibit DEF1776, #11 Exhibit DEF1777, #12 Exhibit DEF1778, #13 Exhibit DEF1779, #14 Exhibit DEF1780, #15 Exhibit DEF1781, #16 Exhibit DEF1782, #17 Exhibit DEF1783, #18 Exhibit DEF1784, #19 Exhibit DEF1785, #20 Exhibit DEF1786, #21 Exhibit DEF1787, #22 Exhibit DEF1788, #23 Exhibit DEF1789, #24 Exhibit DEF1790, #25 Exhibit DEF1791, #26 Exhibit DEF1792, #27 Exhibit DEF1793, #28 Exhibit DEF1794, #29 Exhibit DEF1795, #30 Exhibit DEF1796, #31 Exhibit DEF1797, #32 Exhibit DEF1798, #33 Exhibit DEF1799, #34 Exhibit DEF1800)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 781 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 1701-1749 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1701, #2 Exhibit DEF1702, #3 Exhibit DEF1703, #4 Exhibit DEF1704, #5 Exhibit DEF1705, #6 Exhibit DEF1706, #7 Exhibit DEF1707, #8 Exhibit DEF1708, #9 Exhibit DEF1709, #10 Exhibit DEF1710, #11 Exhibit DEF1711, #12 Exhibit DEF1712, #13 Exhibit DEF1713, #14 Exhibit DEF1714, #15 Exhibit DEF1715, #16 Exhibit DEF1716, #17 Exhibit DEF1717, #18 Exhibit DEF1718, #19 Exhibit DEF1719, #20 Exhibit DEF1720, #21 Exhibit DEF1721, #22 Exhibit DEF1722, #23 Exhibit DEF1723, #24 Exhibit DEF1724, #25 Exhibit DEF1725, #26 Exhibit DEF1726, #27 Exhibit DEF1727, #28 Exhibit DEF1728, #29 Exhibit DEF1729, #30 Exhibit DEF1730, #31 Exhibit DEF1731, #32 Exhibit DEF1732, #33 Exhibit DEF1733, #34 Exhibit DEF1734, #35 Exhibit DEF1735, #36 Exhibit DEF1736, #37 Exhibit DEF1737, #38 Exhibit DEF1738, #39 Exhibit DEF1739, #40 Exhibit DEF1740, #41 Exhibit DEF1741, #42 Exhibit DEF1742, #43 Exhibit DEF1743, #44 Exhibit DEF1744, #45 Exhibit DEF1745, #46 Exhibit DEF1746, #47 Exhibit DEF1747, #48 Exhibit DEF1748, #49 Exhibit DEF1749)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 780 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 1651-1700 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF 1651, #2 Exhibit DEF 1652, #3 Exhibit DEF 1653, #4 Exhibit DEF 1654, #5 Exhibit DEF 1655, #6 Exhibit DEF 1656, #7 Exhibit DEF 1657, #8 Exhibit DEF 1658, #9 Exhibit DEF 1659, #10 Exhibit DEF 1660, #11 Exhibit DEF 1661, #12 Exhibit DEF 1662, #13 Exhibit DEF 1663, #14 Exhibit DEF 1664, #15 Exhibit DEF 1665, #16 Exhibit DEF 1666, #17 Exhibit DEF 1667, #18 Exhibit DEF 1668, #19 Exhibit DEF 1669, #20 Exhibit DEF 1670, #21 Exhibit DEF 1671, #22 Exhibit DEF 1672, #23 Exhibit DEF 1673, #24 Exhibit DEF 1674, #25 Exhibit DEF 1675, #26 Exhibit DEF 1676, #27 Exhibit DEF 1677, #28 Exhibit DEF 1678, #29 Exhibit DEF 1679, #30 Exhibit DEF 1680, #31 Exhibit DEF 1681, #32 Exhibit DEF 1682, #33 Exhibit DEF 1683, #34 Exhibit DEF 1684, #35 Exhibit DEF 1685, #36 Exhibit DEF 1686, #37 Exhibit DEF 1687, #38 Exhibit DEF 1688, #39 Exhibit DEF 1689, #40 Exhibit DEF 1690, #41 Exhibit DEF 1691, #42 Exhibit DEF 1692, #43 Exhibit DEF 1693, #44 Exhibit DEF 1694, #45 Exhibit DEF 1695, #46 Exhibit DEF 1696, #47 Exhibit DEF 1697, #48 Exhibit DEF 1698, #49 Exhibit DEF 1699, #50 Exhibit DEF 1700)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 779 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 1601-1650 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF 1601, #2 Exhibit DEF 1602, #3 Exhibit DEF 1603, #4 Exhibit DEF 1604, #5 Exhibit DEF 1605, #6 Exhibit DEF 1606, #7 Exhibit DEF 1607, #8 Exhibit DEF 1608, #9 Exhibit DEF 1609, #10 Exhibit DEF 1610, #11 Exhibit DEF 1611, #12 Exhibit DEF 1612, #13 Exhibit DEF 1613, #14 Exhibit DEF 1614, #15 Exhibit DEF 1615, #16 Exhibit DEF 1616, #17 Exhibit DEF 1617, #18 Exhibit DEF 1618, #19 Exhibit DEF 1619, #20 Exhibit DEF 1620, #21 Exhibit DEF 1621, #22 Exhibit DEF 1622, #23 Exhibit DEF 1623, #24 Exhibit DEF 1624, #25 Exhibit DEF 1625, #26 Exhibit DEF 1626, #27 Exhibit DEF 1627, #28 Exhibit DEF 1628, #29 Exhibit DEF 1629, #30 Exhibit DEF 1630, #31 Exhibit DEF 1631, #32 Exhibit DEF 1632, #33 Exhibit DEF 1633, #34 Exhibit DEF 1634, #35 Exhibit DEF 1635, #36 Exhibit DEF 1636, #37 Exhibit DEF 1637, #38 Exhibit DEF 1638, #39 Exhibit DEF 1639, #40 Exhibit DEF 1640, #41 Exhibit DEF 1641, #42 Exhibit DEF 1642, #43 Exhibit DEF 1643, #44 Exhibit DEF 1644, #45 Exhibit DEF 1645, #46 Exhibit DEF 1646, #47 Exhibit DEF 1647, #48 Exhibit DEF 1648, #49 Exhibit DEF 1649, #50 Exhibit DEF 1650)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 778 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 1561-1600 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF 1561, #2 Exhibit DEF 1562, #3 Exhibit DEF 1563, #4 Exhibit DEF 1564, #5 Exhibit DEF 1565, #6 Exhibit DEF 1566, #7 Exhibit DEF 1567, #8 Exhibit DEF 1568, #9 Exhibit DEF 1569, #10 Exhibit DEF 1570, #11 Exhibit DEF 1571, #12 Exhibit DEF 1572, #13 Exhibit DEF 1573, #14 Exhibit DEF 1574, #15 Exhibit DEF 1575, #16 Exhibit DEF 1576, #17 Exhibit DEF 1577, #18 Exhibit DEF 1578, #19 Exhibit DEF 1579, #20 Exhibit DEF 1580, #21 Exhibit DEF 1581, #22 Exhibit DEF 1582, #23 Exhibit DEF 1583, #24 Exhibit DEF 1584, #25 Exhibit DEF 1585, #26 Exhibit DEF 1586, #27 Exhibit DEF 1587, #28 Exhibit DEF 1588, #29 Exhibit DEF 1589, #30 Exhibit DEF 1590, #31 Exhibit DEF 1591, #32 Exhibit DEF 1592, #33 Exhibit DEF 1593, #34 Exhibit DEF 1594, #35 Exhibit DEF 1595, #36 Exhibit DEF 1596, #37 Exhibit DEF 1597, #38 Exhibit DEF 1598, #39 Exhibit DEF 1599, #40 Exhibit DEF 1600)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 777 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 1521-1560 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF 1521, #2 Exhibit DEF 1522, #3 Exhibit DEF 1523, #4 Exhibit DEF 1524, #5 Exhibit DEF 1525, #6 Exhibit DEF 1526, #7 Exhibit DEF 1527, #8 Exhibit DEF 1528, #9 Exhibit DEF 1529, #10 Exhibit DEF 1530, #11 Exhibit DEF 1531, #12 Exhibit DEF 1532, #13 Exhibit DEF 1533, #14 Exhibit DEF 1534, #15 Exhibit DEF 1535, #16 Exhibit DEF 1536, #17 Exhibit DEF 1538, #18 Exhibit DEF 1539, #19 Exhibit DEF 1540, #20 Exhibit DEF 1541, #21 Exhibit DEF 1542, #22 Exhibit DEF 1543, #23 Exhibit DEF 1544, #24 Exhibit DEF 1545, #25 Exhibit DEF 1546, #26 Exhibit DEF 1547, #27 Exhibit DEF 1548, #28 Exhibit DEF 1549, #29 Exhibit DEF 1550, #30 Exhibit DEF 1551, #31 Exhibit DEF 1552, #32 Exhibit DEF 1553, #33 Exhibit DEF 1554, #34 Exhibit DEF 1555, #35 Exhibit DEF1556, #36 Exhibit DEF 1557, #37 Exhibit DEF 1558, #38 Exhibit DEF 1559, #39 Exhibit DEF 1560)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 776 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 1481-1520 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF 1481, #2 Exhibit DEF 1482, #3 Exhibit DEF 1483, #4 Exhibit DEF 1484, #5 Exhibit DEF 1485, #6 Exhibit DEF 1486, #7 Exhibit DEF 1487, #8 Exhibit DEF 1488, #9 Exhibit DEF 1489, #10 Exhibit DEF 1490, #11 Exhibit DEF 1491, #12 Exhibit DEF 1492, #13 Exhibit DEF 1493, #14 Exhibit DEF 1494, #15 Exhibit DEF 1495, #16 Exhibit DEF 1496, #17 Exhibit DEF 1497-PART 1, #18 Exhibit DEF 1497-PART 2, #19 Exhibit DEF 1497-PART 3, #20 Exhibit DEF 1497-PART 4, #21 Exhibit DEF 1497-PART 5, #22 Exhibit DEF 1497-PART 6, #23 Exhibit DEF 1498, #24 Exhibit DEF 1499, #25 Exhibit DEF 1500, #26 Exhibit DEF 1501, #27 Exhibit DEF 1502, #28 Exhibit DEF 1503, #29 Exhibit DEF 1504, #30 Exhibit DEF 1505, #31 Exhibit DEF 1506, #32 Exhibit DEF 1507, #33 Exhibit DEF 1508, #34 Exhibit DEF 1509, #35 Exhibit DEF 1510, #36 Exhibit DEF 1511, #37 Exhibit DEF 1512, #38 Exhibit DEF 1513, #39 Exhibit DEF 1514, #40 Exhibit DEF 1516, #41 Exhibit DEF 1517, #42 Exhibit DEF 1518, #43 Exhibit DEF 1519, #44 Exhibit DEF 1520)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 775 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 1441-1480 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1441, #2 Exhibit DEF1442, #3 Exhibit DEF1443-PART 1, #4 Exhibit DEF1443-PART 2, #5 Exhibit DEF1443-PART 3, #6 Exhibit DEF1443-PART 4, #7 Exhibit DEF1443-PART 5, #8 Exhibit DEF1443-PART 6, #9 Exhibit DEF 1444, #10 Exhibit DEF 1445, #11 Exhibit DEF 1446, #12 Exhibit DEF 1447, #13 Exhibit DEF 1448, #14 Exhibit DEF 1449, #15 Exhibit DEF 1450, #16 Exhibit DEF 1451, #17 Exhibit DEF 1452, #18 Exhibit DEF 1453, #19 Exhibit DEF 1454, #20 Exhibit DEF 1455, #21 Exhibit DEF 1456, #22 Exhibit DEF 1457, #23 Exhibit DEF 1458, #24 Exhibit DEF 1459, #25 Exhibit DEF 1460, #26 Exhibit DEF 1461, #27 Exhibit DEF 1462, #28 Exhibit DEF 1465, #29 Exhibit DEF 1466, #30 Exhibit DEF 1467, #31 Exhibit DEF 1468, #32 Exhibit DEF 1469, #33 Exhibit DEF 1470, #34 Exhibit DEF 1471, #35 Exhibit DEF 1472, #36 Exhibit DEF 1473, #37 Exhibit DEF 1474, #38 Exhibit DEF 1475, #39 Exhibit DEF 1476, #40 Exhibit DEF 1477, #41 Exhibit DEF 1478, #42 Exhibit DEF 1479, #43 Exhibit DEF 1480)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 774 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 1406-1440 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1406, #2 Exhibit DEF1407, #3 Exhibit DEF1408, #4 Exhibit DEF1409, #5 Exhibit DEF1410, #6 Exhibit DEF1411, #7 Exhibit DEF1412, #8 Exhibit DEF1413, #9 Exhibit DEF1414, #10 Exhibit DEF1415, #11 Exhibit DEF1416, #12 Exhibit DEF1417-PART 1, #13 Exhibit DEF1417-PART 2, #14 Exhibit DEF1418, #15 Exhibit DEF1419, #16 Exhibit DEF1420, #17 Exhibit DEF1421, #18 Exhibit DEF1422, #19 Exhibit DEF1423, #20 Exhibit DEF1424, #21 Exhibit DEF1425, #22 Exhibit DEF1426, #23 Exhibit DEF1427, #24 Exhibit DEF1428, #25 Exhibit DEF1429, #26 Exhibit DEF1430, #27 Exhibit DEF1431, #28 Exhibit DEF1432, #29 Exhibit DEF1433, #30 Exhibit DEF1434, #31 Exhibit DEF1435, #32 Exhibit DEF1436, #33 Exhibit DEF1437, #34 Exhibit DEF1438, #35 Exhibit DEF1439, #36 Exhibit DEF1440)(Scott, John)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 773 NOTICE OF FILING TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 1376-1405 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1376, #2 Exhibit DEF1377, #3 Exhibit DEF1378, #4 Exhibit DEF1379, #5 Exhibit DEF1380, #6 Exhibit DEF1381, #7 Exhibit DEF1382, #8 Exhibit DEF1383, #9 Exhibit DEF1384, #10 Exhibit DEF1385, #11 Exhibit DEF1386, #12 Exhibit DEF1387, #13 Exhibit DEF1388, #14 Exhibit DEF1389, #15 Exhibit DEF1390, #16 Exhibit DEF1391, #17 Exhibit DEF1392, #18 Exhibit DEF1393, #19 Exhibit DEF1394-PART 1, #20 Exhibit DEF1394-PART 2, #21 Exhibit DEF1395, #22 Exhibit DEF1396, #23 Exhibit DEF1397, #24 Exhibit DEF1398, #25 Exhibit DEF1399, #26 Exhibit DEF1400, #27 Exhibit DEF1401-PART 1, #28 Exhibit DEF1401-PART 2, #29 Exhibit DEF1402, #30 Exhibit DEF1403, #31 Exhibit DEF1404, #32 Exhibit DEF1405)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 772 NOTICE of Filing Trial Exhibit Nos. 1336-1375 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1336, #2 Exhibit DEF1337, #3 Exhibit DEF1338, #4 Exhibit DEF1339, #5 Exhibit DEF1340, #6 Exhibit DEF1341, #7 Exhibit DEF1342, #8 Exhibit DEF1343, #9 Exhibit DEF1344, #10 Exhibit DEF1345, #11 Exhibit DEF1346, #12 Exhibit DEF1347, #13 Exhibit DEF1348, #14 Exhibit DEF1349, #15 Exhibit DEF1350, #16 Exhibit DEF1351, #17 Exhibit DEF1352, #18 Exhibit DEF1353, #19 Exhibit DEF1354, #20 Exhibit DEF1355, #21 Exhibit DEF1356, #22 Exhibit DEF1357, #23 Exhibit DEF1358, #24 Exhibit DEF1359, #25 Exhibit DEF1360, #26 Exhibit DEF1361, #27 Exhibit DEF1362, #28 Exhibit DEF1363, #29 Exhibit DEF1364, #30 Exhibit DEF1365, #31 Exhibit DEF1366, #32 Exhibit DEF1367, #33 Exhibit DEF1368, #34 Exhibit DEF1369, #35 Exhibit DEF1370, #36 Exhibit DEF1371, #37 Exhibit DEF1372, #38 Exhibit DEF1373, #39 Exhibit DEF1374, #40 Exhibit DEF1375)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 771 NOTICE of Filing Trial Exhibit Nos. 1296-1335 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1296, #2 Exhibit DEF1297, #3 Exhibit DEF1298, #4 Exhibit DEF1299, #5 Exhibit DEF1300, #6 Exhibit DEF1301, #7 Exhibit DEF1302, #8 Exhibit DEF1303, #9 Exhibit DEF1304, #10 Exhibit DEF1305, #11 Exhibit DEF1306, #12 Exhibit DEF1307, #13 Exhibit DEF1308, #14 Exhibit DEF1309, #15 Exhibit DEF1311, #16 Exhibit DEF1312, #17 Exhibit DEF1313, #18 Exhibit DEF1314, #19 Exhibit DEF1315, #20 Exhibit DEF1317, #21 Exhibit DEF1318, #22 Exhibit DEF1319, #23 Exhibit DEF1320, #24 Exhibit DEF1321, #25 Exhibit DEF1322, #26 Exhibit DEF1323, #27 Exhibit DEF1324, #28 Exhibit DEF1325, #29 Exhibit DEF1326, #30 Exhibit DEF1327, #31 Exhibit DEF1328, #32 Exhibit DEF1329, #33 Exhibit DEF1330, #34 Exhibit DEF1331, #35 Exhibit DEF1333, #36 Exhibit DEF1334, #37 Exhibit DEF1335)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 770 NOTICE of Filing Trial Exhibit Nos. 1256-1295 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1256, #2 Exhibit DEF1257, #3 Exhibit DEF1258, #4 Exhibit DEF1259, #5 Exhibit DEF1260, #6 Exhibit DEF1261, #7 Exhibit DEF1262, #8 Exhibit DEF1263, #9 Exhibit DEF1264, #10 Exhibit DEF1266, #11 Exhibit DEF1267, #12 Exhibit DEF1268, #13 Exhibit DEF1269, #14 Exhibit DEF1270, #15 Exhibit DEF271, #16 Exhibit DEF1272, #17 Exhibit DEF1273, #18 Exhibit DEF1274, #19 Exhibit DEF1275, #20 Exhibit DEF1276, #21 Exhibit DEF1277, #22 Exhibit DEF1278, #23 Exhibit DEF1279, #24 Exhibit DEF1281, #25 Exhibit DEF1282, #26 Exhibit DEF1283, #27 Exhibit DEF1284, #28 Exhibit DEF1285, #29 Exhibit DEF1286, #30 Exhibit DEF1287, #31 Exhibit DEF1289, #32 Exhibit DEF1290, #33 Exhibit DEF1291, #34 Exhibit DEF1292, #35 Exhibit DEF1293, #36 Exhibit DEF1294, #37 Exhibit DEF1295)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 769 NOTICE of Filing Trial Exhibit Nos. 1221-1255 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1221, #2 Exhibit DEF1222, #3 Exhibit DEF1223, #4 Exhibit DEF1224, #5 Exhibit DEF1225, #6 Exhibit DEF1226, #7 Exhibit DEF1227, #8 Exhibit DEF1228, #9 Exhibit DEF1229, #10 Exhibit DEF1230, #11 Exhibit DEF1231, #12 Exhibit DEF1232, #13 Exhibit DEF1233, #14 Exhibit DEF1234, #15 Exhibit DEF1235, #16 Exhibit DEF1236, #17 Exhibit DEF1237, #18 Exhibit DEF1238, #19 Exhibit DEF1239, #20 Exhibit DEF1240, #21 Exhibit DEF1241, #22 Exhibit DEF1242, #23 Exhibit DEF1243, #24 Exhibit DEF1244, #25 Exhibit DEF1245, #26 Exhibit DEF1246, #27 Exhibit DEF1247, #28 Exhibit DEF1248, #29 Exhibit DEF1249, #30 Exhibit DEF1250, #31 Exhibit DEF1251, #32 Exhibit DEF1252, #33 Exhibit DEF1253, #34 Exhibit DEF1254, #35 Exhibit DEF1255)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 768 NOTICE of Filing Trial Exhibit Nos. 1200-1220 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1200, #2 Exhibit DEF1201, #3 Exhibit DEF1202, #4 Exhibit DEF1203, #5 Exhibit DEF1204, #6 Exhibit DEF1205, #7 Exhibit DEF1206, #8 Exhibit DEF1207, #9 Exhibit DEF1208, #10 Exhibit DEF1209, #11 Exhibit DEF1210, #12 Exhibit DEF1211, #13 Exhibit DEF1212, #14 Exhibit DEF1213, #15 Exhibit DEF1214, #16 Exhibit DEF1215, #17 Exhibit DEF1216, #18 Exhibit DEF1217, #19 Exhibit DEF1218, #20 Exhibit DEF1219, #21 Exhibit DEF1220)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 767 NOTICE of Filing Trial Exhibit No. 1199 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1199-Part 1, #2 Exhibit DEF1199-Part 2, #3 Exhibit DEF1199-Part 3, #4 Exhibit DEF1199-Part 4, #5 Exhibit DEF1199-Part 5, #6 Exhibit DEF1199-Part 6)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 766 NOTICE of Filing of Trial Exhibit Nos. 1183-1197 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1183, #2 Exhibit DEF1184, #3 Exhibit DEEF1185, #4 Exhibit DEF1187, #5 Exhibit DEF1189, #6 Exhibit DEF1190, #7 Exhibit DEF1191, #8 Exhibit DEF1192, #9 Exhibit DEF1193, #10 Exhibit DEF1197)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 765 NOTICE of Filing Trial Exhibit No. 1182 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1182)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 764 NOTICE of Filing Trial Exhibit No. 1181 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1181)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 763 NOTICE of Filing Trial Exhibit Nos. 1156-1171 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1156, #2 Exhibit DEF1158, #3 Exhibit DEF1160, #4 Exhibit DEF1161, #5 Exhibit DEF1162, #6 Exhibit DEF1163, #7 Exhibit DEF1165, #8 Exhibit DEF1167, #9 Exhibit DEF1169, #10 Exhibit DEF1171)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 762 NOTICE of Filing Trial Exhibit Nos. 1135-1154 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1135, #2 Exhibit DEF1136, #3 Exhibit DEF1138, #4 Exhibit DEF1139, #5 Exhibit DEF1141, #6 Exhibit DEF1143, #7 Exhibit DEF1145, #8 Exhibit DEF1148, #9 Exhibit DEF1149, #10 Exhibit DEF1152, #11 Exhibit DEF1154)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 761 NOTICE of Filing of Trial Exhibit Nos. 1117-1133 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1117, #2 Exhibit DEF1119, #3 Exhibit DEF1120, #4 Exhibit DEF1121, #5 Exhibit DEF1123, #6 Exhibit DEF1124, #7 Exhibit DEF1126, #8 Exhibit DEF1127, #9 Exhibit DEF1129, #10 Exhibit DEF1130, #11 Exhibit DEF1132, #12 Exhibit DEF1133)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 760 NOTICE of Filing of Trial Exhibit Nos. 1093-1115 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1093, #2 Exhibit DEF1094, #3 Exhibit DEF1095, #4 Exhibit DEF1096, #5 Exhibit DEF1097, #6 Exhibit DEF1098, #7 Exhibit DEF1102, #8 Exhibit DEF1106, #9 Exhibit DEF1107, #10 Exhibit DEF1108, #11 Exhibit DEF1110, #12 Exhibit DEF1113, #13 Exhibit DEF1115)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 759 NOTICE OF FILING OF TRIAL EXHIBIT NOS. 1071-1091 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1071, #2 Exhibit DEF1072, #3 Exhibit DEF1073, #4 Exhibit DEF1074, #5 Exhibit DEF1075, #6 Exhibit DEF1076, #7 Exhibit DEF1077, #8 Exhibit DEF1078, #9 Exhibit DEF1079, #10 Exhibit DEF1080, #11 Exhibit DEF1081, #12 Exhibit DEF1082, #13 Exhibit DEF1083, #14 Exhibit DEF1084, #15 Exhibit DEF1085, #16 Exhibit DEF1086, #17 Exhibit DEF1087, #18 Exhibit DEF1088, #19 Exhibit DEF1089, #20 Exhibit DEF1090, #21 Exhibit DEF1091)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 758 NOTICE of Filing of Trial Exhibit Nos. 1041-1070 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1041, #2 Exhibit DEF1042, #3 Exhibit DEF1043, #4 Exhibit DEF1044, #5 Exhibit DEF1045, #6 Exhibit DEF1046, #7 Exhibit DEF1047, #8 Exhibit DEF1048, #9 Exhibit DEF1049, #10 Exhibit DEF1050, #11 Exhibit DEF1051, #12 Exhibit DEF1052, #13 Exhibit DEF1053, #14 Exhibit DEF1054, #15 Exhibit DEF1055, #16 Exhibit DEF1057, #17 Exhibit DEF1058, #18 Exhibit DEF1059, #19 Exhibit DEF1060, #20 Exhibit DEF1061, #21 Exhibit DEF1062, #22 Exhibit DEF1063, #23 Exhibit DEF1064, #24 Exhibit DEF1065, #25 Exhibit DEF1066, #26 Exhibit DEF1067, #27 Exhibit DEF1068, #28 Exhibit DEF1069, #29 Exhibit DEF1070)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 757 NOTICE of Filing Trial Exhibit Nos. DEF1001-DEF1040 re: #725 Notice (Other),,,,,, by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF1001, #2 Exhibit DEF1012, #3 Exhibit DEF1015, #4 Exhibit DEF1016, #5 Exhibit DEF1017, #6 Exhibit DEF1018, #7 Exhibit DEF1019, #8 Exhibit DEF1020, #9 Exhibit DEF1021, #10 Exhibit DEF1022, #11 Exhibit DEF1023, #12 Exhibit DEF1024, #13 Exhibit DEF1025-Part 1, #14 Exhibit DEF1025-Part 2, #15 Exhibit DEF1025-Part 3, #16 Exhibit DEF1026, #17 Exhibit DEF1027, #18 Exhibit DEF1028, #19 Exhibit DEF1029, #20 Exhibit DEF1032, #21 Exhibit DEF1034, #22 Exhibit DEF1035, #23 Exhibit DEF1036, #24 Exhibit DEF1037, #25 Exhibit DEF1038, #26 Exhibit DEF1039, #27 Exhibit DEF1040)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 756 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0956, #2 Exhibit DEF0957, #3 Exhibit DEF0958, #4 Exhibit DEF0959, #5 Exhibit DEF0960, #6 Exhibit DEF0961, #7 Exhibit DEF0962, #8 Exhibit DEF0963, #9 Exhibit DEF0964, #10 Exhibit DEF0965, #11 Exhibit DEF0966, #12 Exhibit DEF0967, #13 Exhibit DEF0968, #14 Exhibit DEF0969, #15 Exhibit DEF0970, #16 Exhibit DEF0971, #17 Exhibit DEF0972, #18 Exhibit DEF0973, #19 Exhibit DEF0974, #20 Exhibit DEF0975, #21 Exhibit DEF0976, #22 Exhibit DEF0977, #23 Exhibit DEF0978, #24 Exhibit DEF0979, #25 Exhibit DEF0980, #26 Exhibit DEF0981, #27 Exhibit DEF982, #28 Exhibit DEF0984, #29 Exhibit DEF0984, #30 Exhibit DEF0985, #31 Exhibit DEF0986, #32 Exhibit DEF0987, #33 Exhibit DEF0988, #34 Exhibit DEF0989, #35 Exhibit DEF0990, #36 Exhibit DEF0991, #37 Exhibit DEF0992, #38 Exhibit DEF0993, #39 Exhibit DEF0994, #40 Exhibit DEF0995, #41 Exhibit DEF0998, #42 Exhibit DEF0999, #43 Exhibit DEF1000)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 755 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0921, #2 Exhibit DEF0922, #3 Exhibit DEF0923, #4 Exhibit DEF0923, #5 Exhibit DEF0924, #6 Exhibit DEF0925, #7 Exhibit DEF0929, #8 Exhibit DEF0931, #9 Exhibit DEF0935, #10 Exhibit DEF0936, #11 Exhibit DEF0937, #12 Exhibit DEF0938, #13 Exhibit DEF0939, #14 Exhibit DEF0940, #15 Exhibit DEF0941, #16 Exhibit DEF0942, #17 Exhibit DEF0943, #18 Exhibit DEF0944, #19 Exhibit DEF0945, #20 Exhibit DEF0946, #21 Exhibit DEF0947, #22 Exhibit DEF0948, #23 Exhibit DEF0949, #24 Exhibit DEF0950, #25 Exhibit DEF0951, #26 Exhibit DEF0952, #27 Exhibit DEF0953, #28 Exhibit DEF0954, #29 Exhibit DEF0955)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 754 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0881, #2 Exhibit DEF0882, #3 Exhibit DEF0883, #4 Exhibit DEF0884, #5 Exhibit DEF0885, #6 Exhibit DEF0886, #7 Exhibit DEF0887, #8 Exhibit DEF0888, #9 Exhibit DEF0889, #10 Exhibit DEF0890, #11 Exhibit DEF0891, #12 Exhibit DEF0892, #13 Exhibit DEF0893, #14 Exhibit DEF0894, #15 Exhibit DEF0895, #16 Exhibit DEF0896, #17 Exhibit DEF0897, #18 Exhibit DEF0898, #19 Exhibit DEF0899, #20 Exhibit DEF0900, #21 Exhibit DEF0902, #22 Exhibit DEF0906, #23 Exhibit DEF0907, #24 Exhibit DEF0908, #25 Exhibit DEF0909, #26 Exhibit DEF0910, #27 Exhibit DEF0911, #28 Exhibit DEF0912, #29 Exhibit DEF0913, #30 Exhibit DEF0916, #31 Exhibit DEF0917, #32 Exhibit DEF0918, #33 Exhibit DEF0919, #34 Exhibit DEF0020)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 753 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0846, #2 Exhibit DEF0847, #3 Exhibit DEF0848, #4 Exhibit DEF0849, #5 Exhibit DEF0850, #6 Exhibit DEF0851, #7 Exhibit DEF0852, #8 Exhibit DEF0853 - Part 1, #9 Exhibit DEF0853 - Part 2, #10 Exhibit DEF0853 - Part 3, #11 Exhibit DEF0854, #12 Exhibit DEF0855 - Part 1, #13 Exhibit DEF0855 - Part 2, #14 Exhibit DEF0856, #15 Exhibit DEF0857, #16 Exhibit DEF0862, #17 Exhibit DEF0863, #18 Exhibit DEF0864 - Part 1, #19 Exhibit DEF0864 - Part 2, #20 Exhibit DEF0865, #21 Exhibit DEF0866, #22 Exhibit DEF0867, #23 Exhibit DEF0868, #24 Exhibit DEF0869, #25 Exhibit DEF0870, #26 Exhibit DEF0871, #27 Exhibit DEF0872 - Part 1, #28 Exhibit DEF0872 - Part 2, #29 Exhibit DEF0873, #30 Exhibit DEF0874, #31 Exhibit DEF0875, #32 Exhibit DEF0876, #33 Exhibit DEF0877, #34 Exhibit DEF0878, #35 Exhibit DEF0879, #36 Exhibit DEF0880)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 752 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0811, #2 Exhibit DEF0812, #3 Exhibit DEF0813, #4 Exhibit DEF0814, #5 Exhibit DEF0815, #6 Exhibit DEF0816, #7 Exhibit DEF0817, #8 Exhibit DEF0818, #9 Exhibit DEF0819, #10 Exhibit DEF0820, #11 Exhibit DEF0821, #12 Exhibit DEF0822, #13 Exhibit DEF0823, #14 Exhibit DEF0824, #15 Exhibit DEF0825, #16 Exhibit DEF0826, #17 Exhibit DEF0827, #18 Exhibit DEF0828, #19 Exhibit DEF0829, #20 Exhibit DEF0830, #21 Exhibit DEF0831, #22 Exhibit DEF0832, #23 Exhibit DEF0833, #24 Exhibit DEDF0834, #25 Exhibit DEF0835, #26 Exhibit DEF0836, #27 Exhibit DEF0837, #28 Exhibit DEF0838, #29 Exhibit DEF0839, #30 Exhibit DEF0840, #31 Exhibit DEF0841, #32 Exhibit DEF0842, #33 Exhibit DEF0843, #34 Exhibit DEF0844, #35 Exhibit DEF0845)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 751 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0778, #2 Exhibit DEF0779, #3 Exhibit DEF0780, #4 Exhibit DEF0781, #5 Exhibit DEF0782, #6 Exhibit DEF0783, #7 Exhibit DEF0784, #8 Exhibit DEF0785, #9 Exhibit DEF0786, #10 Exhibit DEF0787, #11 Exhibit DEF0788, #12 Exhibit DEF0789, #13 Exhibit DEF0790, #14 Exhibit DEF0791, #15 Exhibit DEF0792, #16 Exhibit DEF0793, #17 Exhibit DEF0794, #18 Exhibit DEF0795, #19 Exhibit DEF0796, #20 Exhibit DEF0797 - Part 1, #21 Exhibit DEF0797 - Part 2, #22 Exhibit DEF0798 - Part 1, #23 Exhibit DEF0798 - Part 2, #24 Exhibit DEF0799, #25 Exhibit DEF0800, #26 Exhibit DEF0801, #27 Exhibit DEF0802, #28 Exhibit DEF0803, #29 Exhibit DEF0804, #30 Exhibit DEF0806, #31 Exhibit DEF0809, #32 Exhibit DEF0810)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 750 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0736, #2 Exhibit DEF0737, #3 Exhibit DEF0738, #4 Exhibit DEF0739, #5 Exhibit DEF0740, #6 Exhibit DEF0741, #7 Exhibit DEF0742, #8 Exhibit DEF0743, #9 Exhibit DEF0744, #10 Exhibit DEF0747, #11 Exhibit DEF0748, #12 Exhibit DEF0755, #13 Exhibit DEF0756, #14 Exhibit DEF0757, #15 Exhibit DEF0758, #16 Exhibit DEF0559 - Part 1, #17 Exhibit DEF0759 - Part 2, #18 Exhibit DEF0760, #19 Exhibit DEF0761, #20 Exhibit DEF0762, #21 Exhibit DEF0763, #22 Exhibit DEF0764, #23 Exhibit DEF0765, #24 Exhibit DEF0766, #25 Exhibit DEF0767, #26 Exhibit DEF0768, #27 Exhibit DEF0769, #28 Exhibit DEF0770, #29 Exhibit DEF0771, #30 Exhibit DEF0772, #31 Exhibit DEF0773, #32 Exhibit DEF0774, #33 Exhibit DEF0775)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 749 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0693, #2 Exhibit DEF0694, #3 Exhibit DEF0695, #4 Exhibit DEF0705, #5 Exhibit DEF0706, #6 Exhibit DEF0707, #7 Exhibit DEF0708, #8 Exhibit DEF0709, #9 Exhibit DEF0710, #10 Exhibit DEF0711, #11 Exhibit DEF0712 - Part 1, #12 Exhibit DEF0712 - Part 2, #13 Exhibit DEF0713., #14 Exhibit DEF0714, #15 Exhibit DEF0715, #16 Exhibit DEF0716, #17 Exhibit DEF0717, #18 Exhibit DEF0718, #19 Exhibit DEF0720, #20 Exhibit DEF0721, #21 Exhibit DEF0722, #22 Exhibit DEF0723, #23 Exhibit DEF0725 - Part 1, #24 Exhibit DEF0725 - Part 2, #25 Exhibit DEF0726, #26 Exhibit DEF0727, #27 Exhibit DEF0728, #28 Exhibit DEF0729, #29 Exhibit DEF0730, #30 Exhibit DEF0731, #31 Exhibit DEF0732, #32 Exhibit DEF0733, #33 Exhibit DEF0734, #34 Exhibit DEF0735)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 748 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF651, #2 Exhibit DEF652, #3 Exhibit DEF653, #4 Exhibit DEF654, #5 Exhibit DEF655, #6 Exhibit DEF656, #7 Exhibit DEF657, #8 Exhibit DEF658, #9 Exhibit DEF659, #10 Exhibit DEF660, #11 Exhibit DEF661 - Part 1, #12 Exhibit DEF661 - Part 2, #13 Exhibit DEF661 - Part 3, #14 Exhibit DEF662, #15 Exhibit DEF663, #16 Exhibit DEF664, #17 Exhibit DEF665 - Part 1, #18 Exhibit DEF665 - Part 2, #19 Exhibit DEF666, #20 Exhibit DEF667, #21 Exhibit DEF668, #22 Exhibit DEF671, #23 Exhibit DEF673, #24 Exhibit DEF674, #25 Exhibit DEF675, #26 Exhibit DEF678, #27 Exhibit DEF679, #28 Exhibit DEF680, #29 Exhibit DEF681, #30 Exhibit DEF683, #31 Exhibit DEF686, #32 Exhibit DEF689, #33 Exhibit DEF690)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 747 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0611, #2 Exhibit DEF0612, #3 Exhibit DEF0613, #4 Exhibit DEF0614, #5 Exhibit DEF0615, #6 Exhibit DEF0616, #7 Exhibit DEF0617, #8 Exhibit DEF0618, #9 Exhibit DEF0619, #10 Exhibit DEF0620, #11 Exhibit DEF0621, #12 Exhibit DEF0624, #13 Exhibit DEF0625, #14 Exhibit DEF0626 - Part 1, #15 Exhibit DEF0626 - Part 2, #16 Exhibit DEF0626 - Part 3, #17 Exhibit DEF0626 - Part 4, #18 Exhibit DEF0627, #19 Exhibit DEF0628, #20 Exhibit DEF0629, #21 Exhibit DEF0630, #22 Exhibit DEF0631, #23 Exhibit DEF0632, #24 Exhibit DEF0633, #25 Exhibit DEF0634, #26 Exhibit DEF0635, #27 Exhibit DEF0636, #28 Exhibit DEF0637, #29 Exhibit DEF0638, #30 Exhibit DEF0639, #31 Exhibit DEF0640, #32 Exhibit DEF0641, #33 Exhibit DEF0642, #34 Exhibit DEF0643, #35 Exhibit DEF0644, #36 Exhibit DEF0645, #37 Exhibit DEF0646, #38 Exhibit DEF0647, #39 Exhibit DEF0648, #40 Exhibit DEF0649, #41 Exhibit DEF0650)(Scott, John)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 746 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0546, #2 Exhibit DEF0547, #3 Exhibit DEF0548, #4 Exhibit DEF0549, #5 Exhibit DEF0550, #6 Exhibit DEF0551, #7 Exhibit DEF0552, #8 Exhibit DEF0553, #9 Exhibit DEF0554, #10 Exhibit DEF0555, #11 Exhibit DEF0556, #12 Exhibit DEF0557, #13 Exhibit DEF0558, #14 Exhibit DEF0559, #15 Exhibit DEF0560, #16 Exhibit DEF0561 - Part 1, #17 Exhibit DEF0561 - Part 2, #18 Exhibit DEF0561 - Part 3, #19 Exhibit DEF0562, #20 Exhibit DEF0563, #21 Exhibit DEF0564, #22 Exhibit DEF0566, #23 Exhibit DEF0567, #24 Exhibit DEF0568, #25 Exhibit DEF0569, #26 Exhibit DEF0570, #27 Exhibit DEF0571, #28 Exhibit DEF0572, #29 Exhibit DEF0573, #30 Exhibit DEF0574, #31 Exhibit DEF0580, #32 Exhibit DEF0589, #33 Exhibit DEF0591, #34 Exhibit DEF0592, #35 Exhibit DEF0596, #36 Exhibit DEF0597, #37 Exhibit DEF0609, #38 Exhibit DEF0610)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 745 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0512 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit DEF0512- Part 2, #3 Exhibit DEF0512 - Part 3, #4 Exhibit DEF0512 - Part 4, #5 Exhibit DEF0513 - Part 1, #6 Exhibit DEF0513 - Part 2, #7 Exhibit DEF0513 - Part 3, #8 Exhibit DEF0514, #9 Exhibit DEF0515, #10 Exhibit DEF0516, #11 Exhibit DEF0517, #12 Exhibit DEF0518, #13 Exhibit DEF0519, #14 Exhibit DEF0523, #15 Exhibit DEF0526, #16 Exhibit DEF0527, #17 Exhibit DEF0528, #18 Exhibit DEF0529, #19 Exhibit DEF0530, #20 Exhibit DEF0531, #21 Exhibit DEF0532, #22 Exhibit DEF0533, #23 Exhibit DEF0534, #24 Exhibit DEF0535, #25 Exhibit DEF0536, #26 Exhibit DEF0537, #27 Exhibit DEF0538, #28 Exhibit DEF0539, #29 Exhibit DEF0540, #30 Exhibit DEF0541, #31 Exhibit DEF0542, #32 Exhibit DEF0543, #33 Exhibit DEF0544, #34 Exhibit DEF0545)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 744 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0488 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit DEF0488 - Part 2, #3 Exhibit DEF0489, #4 Exhibit DEF0490, #5 Exhibit DEF0491, #6 Exhibit DEF0492, #7 Exhibit DEF0493, #8 Exhibit DEF0494, #9 Exhibit DEF0495, #10 Exhibit DEF0496, #11 Exhibit DEF0497, #12 Exhibit DEF0498, #13 Exhibit DEF0499, #14 Exhibit DEF0500, #15 Exhibit DEF0501, #16 Exhibit DEF0502, #17 Exhibit DEF0503, #18 Exhibit DEF0504, #19 Exhibit DEF0505, #20 Exhibit DEF0506, #21 Errata DEF0507, #22 Exhibit DEF0508, #23 Exhibit DEF0509, #24 Exhibit DEF0510, #25 Exhibit DEF0511)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 743 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0458, #2 Exhibit DEF0459, #3 Exhibit DEF0460, #4 Exhibit DEF0461, #5 Exhibit DEF0465, #6 Exhibit DEF0466, #7 Exhibit DEF0467, #8 Exhibit DEF0468, #9 Exhibit DEF0469, #10 Exhibit DEF0470, #11 Exhibit DEF0471, #12 Exhibit DEF0472, #13 Exhibit DEF0473, #14 Exhibit DEF0474 - Part 1, #15 Exhibit DEF0474 - Part 2, #16 Exhibit DEF0475, #17 Exhibit DEF0476, #18 Exhibit DEF0477 - Part 1, #19 Exhibit DEF0477 - Part 2, #20 Exhibit DEF0477 - Part 3, #21 Exhibit DEF0477 - Part 4, #22 Exhibit DEF0477 - Part 5, #23 Exhibit DEF0477 - Part 6, #24 Exhibit DEF0477 - Part 7, #25 Exhibit DEF0478, #26 Exhibit DEF0479, #27 Exhibit DEF0480, #28 Exhibit DEF0481, #29 Exhibit DEF0482, #30 Exhibit DEF0483, #31 Exhibit DEF0484, #32 Exhibit DEF0485, #33 Errata DEF0486, #34 Exhibit DEF0487)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 742 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0426, #2 Exhibit DEF0427, #3 Exhibit DEF0428, #4 Exhibit DEF0429, #5 Exhibit DEF0450, #6 Exhibit DEF0451, #7 Exhibit DEF0452, #8 Exhibit DEF0453, #9 Exhibit DEF0454, #10 Exhibit DEF0455, #11 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 1, #12 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 2, #13 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 3, #14 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 4, #15 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 5, #16 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 6, #17 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 7, #18 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 8, #19 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 9, #20 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 10, #21 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 11, #22 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 12, #23 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 13, #24 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 14, #25 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 15, #26 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 16, #27 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 17, #28 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 18, #29 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 19, #30 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 20, #31 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 21, #32 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 22, #33 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 23, #34 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 24, #35 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 25, #36 Exhibit DEF0456 - Part 26)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 741 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0391, #2 Exhibit DEF0392, #3 Exhibit DEF0393, #4 Exhibit DEF0394, #5 Exhibit DEF0395, #6 Exhibit DEF0396, #7 Exhibit DEF0397, #8 Exhibit DEF0398, #9 Exhibit DEF0399, #10 Exhibit DEF0400, #11 Exhibit DEF0401, #12 Exhibit DEF0402, #13 Exhibit DEF0403, #14 Exhibit DEF0404, #15 Exhibit DEF0405, #16 Exhibit DEF0406, #17 Exhibit DEF0407, #18 Exhibit DEF0408, #19 Exhibit DEF0409, #20 Exhibit DEF0410, #21 Exhibit DEF0411, #22 Exhibit DEF0412 - Part 1, #23 Exhibit DEF0412 - Part 2, #24 Exhibit DEF0413, #25 Exhibit DEF0414, #26 Exhibit DEF0415, #27 Exhibit DEF0416, #28 Exhibit DEF0417, #29 Exhibit DEF0421, #30 Exhibit DEF0422, #31 Exhibit DEF0423, #32 Exhibit DEF0424, #33 Exhibit DEF0425)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 740 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0360, #2 Exhibit DEF0361, #3 Exhibit DEF0362, #4 Exhibit DEF0363, #5 Exhibit DEF0364 - Part 1, #6 Exhibit DEF0364 - Part 2, #7 Exhibit DEF0365, #8 Exhibit DEF0366, #9 Exhibit DEF0367, #10 Exhibit DEF0368, #11 Exhibit DEF0369, #12 Exhibit DEF0370, #13 Exhibit DEF0371, #14 Exhibit DEF0372, #15 Exhibit DEF0373, #16 Exhibit DEF0374, #17 Exhibit DEF0375, #18 Exhibit DEF0376, #19 Exhibit DEF0377, #20 Exhibit DEF0378, #21 Exhibit DEF0379, #22 Exhibit DEF0380, #23 Exhibit DEF0381, #24 Exhibit DEF0382, #25 Exhibit DEF0383, #26 Exhibit DEF0384, #27 Exhibit DEF0385, #28 Exhibit DEF0386, #29 Exhibit DEF0387, #30 Exhibit DEF0388, #31 Exhibit DEF0389, #32 Exhibit DEF0390)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 739 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0291, #2 Exhibit DEF0292, #3 Exhibit DEF0293, #4 Exhibit DEF0294, #5 Exhibit DEF0295, #6 Exhibit DEF0296, #7 Exhibit DEF0297, #8 Exhibit DEF0298, #9 Exhibit DEF0299, #10 Exhibit DEF0300, #11 Exhibit DEF0301, #12 Exhibit DEF0302, #13 Exhibit DEF0303, #14 Exhibit DEF0304, #15 Exhibit DEF0305, #16 Exhibit DEF0306, #17 Exhibit DEF0307, #18 Exhibit DEF0308, #19 Exhibit DEF0309, #20 Exhibit DEF0310, #21 Exhibit DEF0311, #22 Exhibit DEF0313, #23 Exhibit DEF0314, #24 Exhibit DEF0316, #25 Exhibit DEF0323, #26 Exhibit DEF0324, #27 Exhibit DEF0325, #28 Exhibit DEF0352, #29 Exhibit DEF0353, #30 Exhibit DEF0354, #31 Exhibit DEF0355, #32 Exhibit DEF0356, #33 Exhibit DEF0357, #34 Exhibit DEF0358, #35 Exhibit DEF0359)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 738 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0256, #2 Exhibit DEF0257, #3 Exhibit DEF0258, #4 Exhibit DEF0259, #5 Exhibit DEF0261, #6 Exhibit DEF0263, #7 Exhibit DEF0264, #8 Exhibit DEF0265, #9 Exhibit DEF0266, #10 Exhibit DEF0267, #11 Exhibit DEF0268, #12 Exhibit DEF0269, #13 Exhibit DEF0271, #14 Exhibit DEF0272, #15 Exhibit DEF0273, #16 Exhibit DEF0274, #17 Exhibit DEF0275, #18 Exhibit DEF0276, #19 Exhibit DEF0277, #20 Exhibit DEF0278, #21 Exhibit DEF0279, #22 Exhibit DEF0280 - Part 1, #23 Exhibit DEF0280 - Part 2, #24 Exhibit DEF0281, #25 Exhibit DEF0282, #26 Exhibit DEF0283, #27 Exhibit DEF0284, #28 Exhibit DEF0285, #29 Exhibit DEF0286, #30 Exhibit DEF0287, #31 Exhibit DEF0288, #32 Exhibit DEF0289, #33 Exhibit DEF0290)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 737 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0239 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit DEF0239 - Part 2, #3 Exhibit DEF0239 - Part 3, #4 Exhibit DEF0239 - Part 4, #5 Exhibit DEF0239 - Part 5, #6 Exhibit DEF0239 - Part 6, #7 Exhibit DEF0239 - Part 7, #8 Exhibit DEF0239 - Part 8, #9 Exhibit DEF0239 - Part 9, #10 Exhibit DEF0239 - Part 10, #11 Exhibit DEF0239 - Part 11, #12 Exhibit DEF0239 - Part 12, #13 Exhibit DEF0240, #14 Exhibit DEF0241, #15 Exhibit DEF0242, #16 Exhibit DEF0243, #17 Exhibit DEF0244, #18 Exhibit DEF0245, #19 Exhibit DEF0246, #20 Exhibit DEF0247, #21 Exhibit DEF0248, #22 Exhibit DEF0249, #23 Exhibit DEF0252, #24 Exhibit DEF0254, #25 Exhibit DEF0255)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 736 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0201, #2 Exhibit DEF0202, #3 Exhibit DEF0203, #4 Exhibit DEF0204, #5 Exhibit DEF0205, #6 Exhibit DEF0206, #7 Exhibit DEF0207, #8 Exhibit DEF0208, #9 Exhibit DEF0209, #10 Exhibit DEF0210, #11 Exhibit DEF0211, #12 Exhibit DEF0215, #13 Exhibit DEF0222, #14 Exhibit DEF0228, #15 Exhibit DEF0229, #16 Exhibit DEF0231, #17 Exhibit DEF0232, #18 Exhibit DEF0233, #19 Exhibit DEF0234, #20 Exhibit DEF0235, #21 Exhibit DEF0236, #22 Exhibit DEF0238)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 735 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0159, #2 Exhibit DEF0161, #3 Exhibit DEF0168, #4 Exhibit DEF0169, #5 Exhibit DEF0170, #6 Exhibit DEF0171, #7 Exhibit DEF0172, #8 Exhibit DEF0173, #9 Exhibit DEF0174, #10 Exhibit DEF0175, #11 Exhibit DEF0176, #12 Exhibit DEF0177, #13 Exhibit DEF0178, #14 Exhibit DEF0179, #15 Exhibit DEF0180, #16 Exhibit DEF0181, #17 Exhibit DEF0182, #18 Exhibit DEF0183, #19 Exhibit DEF0184, #20 Exhibit DEF0190, #21 Exhibit DEF0191, #22 Exhibit DEF0192, #23 Exhibit DEF0193, #24 Exhibit DEF0195, #25 Exhibit DEF0197, #26 Exhibit DEF0198, #27 Exhibit DEF0199, #28 Exhibit DEF0200)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 734 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0121, #2 Exhibit DEF0122, #3 Exhibit DEF0123, #4 Exhibit DEF0124, #5 Exhibit DEF0126, #6 Exhibit DEF0128, #7 Exhibit DEF0129, #8 Exhibit DEF0130, #9 Exhibit DEF0131, #10 Exhibit DEF0132, #11 Exhibit DEF0134, #12 Exhibit DEF0135, #13 Exhibit DEF0136, #14 Exhibit DEF0137, #15 Exhibit DEF0138, #16 Exhibit DEF0139, #17 Exhibit DEF0140, #18 Exhibit DEF0142, #19 Exhibit DEF0151, #20 Exhibit DEF0152, #21 Exhibit DEF0153, #22 Exhibit DEF0155, #23 Exhibit DEF0156, #24 Exhibit DEF0158)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 733 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0101, #2 Exhibit DEF0102, #3 Exhibit DEF0103, #4 Exhibit DEF0104, #5 Exhibit DEF0105, #6 Exhibit DEF0106, #7 Exhibit DEF0107, #8 Exhibit DEF0108, #9 Exhibit DEF0109, #10 Exhibit DEF0110, #11 Exhibit DEF0111, #12 Exhibit DEF0112, #13 Exhibit DEF0113, #14 Exhibit DEF0114, #15 Exhibit DEF0115, #16 Exhibit DEF0116, #17 Exhibit DEF0117, #18 Exhibit DEF0119, #19 Exhibit DEF0120)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 732 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0081, #2 Exhibit DEF0083, #3 Exhibit DEF0084, #4 Exhibit DEF0085, #5 Exhibit DEF0086, #6 Exhibit DEF0088, #7 Exhibit DEF0089, #8 Exhibit DEF0090, #9 Exhibit DEF0091, #10 Exhibit DEF0092, #11 Exhibit DEF0093, #12 Exhibit DEF0094, #13 Exhibit DEF0095, #14 Exhibit DEF0096, #15 Exhibit DEF0097, #16 Exhibit DEF0098, #17 Exhibit DEF0099, #18 Exhibit DEF0100)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 731 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0068, #2 Exhibit DEF0069, #3 Exhibit DEF0070, #4 Exhibit DEF0071, #5 Exhibit DEF0072, #6 Exhibit DEF0073, #7 Exhibit DEF0074, #8 Exhibit DEF0075 - Part 1, #9 Exhibit DEF0075 - Part 2, #10 Exhibit DEF0076, #11 Exhibit DEF0077, #12 Exhibit DEF0078 - Part 1, #13 Exhibit DEF0078 - Part 2, #14 Exhibit DEF0080)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 730 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0051, #2 Exhibit DEF0052, #3 Exhibit DEF0053, #4 Exhibit DEF0054, #5 Exhibit DEF0055, #6 Exhibit DEF0056, #7 Exhibit DEF0057, #8 Exhibit DEF0058, #9 Exhibit DEF0059, #10 Exhibit DEF0060, #11 Exhibit DEF0061, #12 Exhibit DEF0062, #13 Exhibit DEF0063, #14 Exhibit DEF0064)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 729 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 2, #3 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 3, #4 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 4, #5 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 5, #6 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 6, #7 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 7, #8 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 8, #9 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 9, #10 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 10, #11 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 11, #12 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 12, #13 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 13, #14 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 14, #15 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 15, #16 Exhibit DEF0040 - Part 16, #17 Exhibit DEF0041, #18 Exhibit DEF0042, #19 Exhibit DEF0043, #20 Exhibit DEF0044, #21 Exhibit DEF0045, #22 Exhibit DEF0046, #23 Exhibit DEF0047, #24 Exhibit DEF0048, #25 Exhibit DEF0049, #26 Exhibit DEF0050)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 728 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0021, #2 Exhibit DEF0022, #3 Exhibit DEF0023, #4 Exhibit DEF0024, #5 Exhibit DEF0025, #6 Exhibit DEF0026, #7 Exhibit DEF0027, #8 Exhibit DEF0028, #9 Exhibit DEF0029, #10 Exhibit DEF0030, #11 Exhibit DEF0031, #12 Exhibit DEF0032, #13 Exhibit DEF0033, #14 Exhibit DEF0034, #15 Exhibit DEF0035, #16 Exhibit DEF0036, #17 Exhibit DEF0037, #18 Exhibit DEF0038, #19 Exhibit DEF0039)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 727 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0011, #2 Exhibit DEF0012, #3 Exhibit DEF0013 - Part 1, #4 Exhibit DEF0013 - Part 2, #5 Exhibit DEF0013 - Part 3, #6 Exhibit DEF0014, #7 Exhibit DEF0015, #8 Exhibit DEF0016, #9 Exhibit DEF0017, #10 Exhibit DEF0018 - Part 1, #11 Exhibit DEF0018 - Part 2, #12 Exhibit DEF0018 - Part 3, #13 Exhibit DEF0018 - Part 4, #14 Exhibit DEF0018 - Part 5, #15 Exhibit DEF0018 - Part 6, #16 Exhibit DEF0018 - Part 7, #17 Exhibit DEF0018 - Part 8, #18 Exhibit DEF0018 - Part 9, #19 Exhibit DEF0019, #20 Exhibit DEF0020)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 726 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0002 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit DEF0002 - Part 2, #3 Exhibit DEF0002 - Part 3, #4 Exhibit DEF0002 - Part 4, #5 Exhibit DEF0002 - Part 5, #6 Exhibit DEF0002 - Part 6, #7 Exhibit DEF0003 - Part 1, #8 Exhibit DEF0003 - Part 2, #9 Exhibit DEF0003 - Part 3, #10 Exhibit DEF0004, #11 Exhibit DEF0005, #12 Exhibit DEF0006, #13 Exhibit DEF0007, #14 Exhibit DEF0008, #15 Exhibit DEF0009, #16 Exhibit DEF0010)(Scott, John)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 725 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 1, #2 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 2, #3 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 3, #4 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 4, #5 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 5, #6 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 6, #7 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 7, #8 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 8, #9 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 9, #10 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 10, #11 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 11, #12 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 12, #13 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 13, #14 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 14, #15 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 15, #16 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 16, #17 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 17, #18 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 18, #19 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 19, #20 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 20, #21 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 21, #22 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 22, #23 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 23, #24 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 24, #25 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 25, #26 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 26, #27 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 27, #28 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 28, #29 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 29, #30 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 30, #31 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 31, #32 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 32, #33 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 33, #34 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 34, #35 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 35, #36 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 36, #37 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 37, #38 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 38, #39 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 39, #40 Exhibit DEF0001-Part 40, #41 Exhibit DEF001-Part 41, #42 Exhibit DEF001-Part 42, #43 Exhibit DEF001-Part 43, #44 Exhibit DEF001-Part 44, #45 Exhibit DEF001-Part 45, #46 Exhibit DEF001-Part 46, #47 Exhibit DEF001-Part 47, #48 Exhibit DEF001-Part 48)(Scott, John)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 724 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 723 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Designation by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Duncan)(Scott, John)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 722 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Designations by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Parson, #2 Exhibit Patrick, #3 Exhibit Rathgeber, #4 Exhibit Salazar, #5 Exhibit Schofield, #6 Exhibit Smith, #7 Exhibit Straus, #8 Exhibit Uresti, #9 Exhibit Veasey, #10 Exhibit Williams)(Scott, John)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 721 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Designations by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fowler, #2 Exhibit Fraser-Part 1, #3 Exhibit Fraser-Part 2, #4 Exhibit Garduno, #5 Exhibit Giddings, #6 Exhibit Gonzalez, #7 Exhibit Harless, #8 Exhibit Hebert, #9 Exhibit Martinez-Fischer, #10 Exhibit Germaine Martinez, #11 Exhibit Gloria Martinez, #12 Exhibit McCoy, #13 Exhibit McGeehan, #14 Exhibit Mitchell)(Scott, John)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 720 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Designations by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Anchia, #2 Exhibit Armbrister, #3 Exhibit Banks, #4 Exhibit Bayron, #5 Exhibit Beuck, #6 Exhibit Bonnen, #7 Exhibit Brunson, #8 Exhibit Camarillo, #9 Exhibit K. Davis, #10 Exhibit D. Davis, #11 Exhibit W. Davis, #12 Exhibit Duncan)(Scott, John)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 719 NOTICE of Filing Trial Designations by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Day 1 - AM, #2 Exhibit Day 1 - PM, #3 Exhibit Day 2, #4 Exhibit Day 3, #5 Exhibit Day 4)(Scott, John)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 718 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Designations by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rodriguez, #2 Exhibit Shorter, #3 Exhibit Stanart, #4 Exhibit Straus, #5 Exhibit Valdez-Cox, #6 Exhibit Williams, #7 Exhibit Zgabay)(Scott, John)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 717 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Designations by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ingram, #2 Exhibit Lydia, #3 Exhibit McCoy, #4 Exhibit Mora, #5 Exhibit Newman, #6 Exhibit Ortiz, #7 Exhibit Patrick, #8 Exhibit Peters)(Scott, John)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 716 NOTICE of Filing Deposition Designations by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Farinelli, #2 Exhibit Fraser, #3 Exhibit Gipson, #4 Exhibit Golando, #5 Exhibit Green, #6 Exhibit Guidry-Part1, #7 Exhibit Guidry-Part2, #8 Exhibit Guidry-Part3, #9 Exhibit Guidry-Part4, #10 Exhibit Guidry-Part5, #11 Exhibit Guidry-Part6, #12 Exhibit Guidry-Part7, #13 Exhibit Guidry-Part8, #14 Exhibit Guidry-Part9, #15 Exhibit Guidry-Part10, #16 Exhibit Guidry-Part11, #17 Exhibit Guidry-Part12, #18 Exhibit Harless, #19 Exhibit Harris, #20 Exhibit Hebert)(Scott, John)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 715 NOTICE of Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Notice of Filing of Deposition Designations by Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Haygood, Ryan)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 714 NOTICE Filing Deposition Designations by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Banks, #2 Exhibit Beuck, #3 Exhibit Cesinger, #4 Exhibit Cornish, #5 Exhibit Davidson, #6 Exhibit Davis, #7 Exhibit Dewhurst, #8 Exhibit Duncan)(Scott, John)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 713 NOTICE of Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Notice of Filing of Deposition Designations by Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Haygood, Ryan)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 712 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 711 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 710 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 709 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 708 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 707 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 706 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 705 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 704 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 703 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 702 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 701 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 700 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 699 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 698 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 697 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 696 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 695 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 694 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 693 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 692 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 691 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 690 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 689 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 688 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 687 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 686 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 685 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 684 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 683 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 682 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 681 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO WITHDRAW FRANCES WHITNEY DEASON granting #679 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 679 Unopposed MOTION for Frances Whitney Deason to Withdraw as Attorney by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, John)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 678 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 677 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 676 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23, #24 Attachment 24)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 675 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23, #24 Attachment 24, #25 Attachment 25)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 674 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23, #24 Attachment 24, #25 Attachment 25)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 673 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23, #24 Attachment 24, #25 Attachment 25, #26 Attachment 26)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 672 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23, #24 Attachment 24)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 671 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 670 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23, #24 Attachment 24, #25 Attachment 25)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 669 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23, #24 Attachment 24, #25 Attachment 25)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 668 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 667 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23, #24 Attachment 24, #25 Attachment 25)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 666 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23, #24 Attachment 24, #25 Attachment 25)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 665 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23, #24 Attachment 24)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 664 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23, #24 Attachment 24, #25 Attachment 25)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 663 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23, #24 Attachment 24, #25 Attachment 25, #26 Attachment 26)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 662 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23, #24 Attachment 24, #25 Attachment 25, #26 Attachment 26)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 661 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23, #24 Attachment 24, #25 Attachment 25)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 660 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Dallas County, Texas, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Attachment 2, #4 Attachment 3, #5 Attachment 4, #6 Attachment 5, #7 Attachment 6, #8 Attachment 7, #9 Attachment 8, #10 Attachment 9, #11 Attachment 10, #12 Attachment 11, #13 Attachment 12, #14 Attachment 13, #15 Attachment 14, #16 Attachment 15, #17 Attachment 16, #18 Attachment 17, #19 Attachment 18, #20 Attachment 19, #21 Attachment 20, #22 Attachment 21, #23 Attachment 22, #24 Attachment 23, #25 Attachment 24, #26 Attachment 25, #27 Attachment 26, #28 Attachment 27, #29 Attachment 28)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 659 ORDER granting #658 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer L Maranzano terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(sscotch, 2)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 658 MOTION for Jennifer Maranzano to Withdraw as Attorney by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maranzano, Jennifer)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 657 Letter from Robert Allensworth, filed. (lrivera, 2)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER granting #654 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lynn Eisenberg terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amireles, 2)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 655 DKT-13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Arthur C. D'Andrea. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office. This order form relates to the following: #634 Notice of Appeal, filed. (NO ORIGINAL SIGNATURE)(ssyler, 2)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 654 Unopposed Motion for Lynn Eisenberg to Withdraw as Attorney by Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/24/2014. Clerk notes: motion does not contain an original signature. (amireles, 2)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 653 DKT-13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Arthur C. D'Andrea. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office.. This order form relates to the following: #634 Notice of Appeal, filed.(grogan, 2)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER. Within 10 days of the outcome of the pending appeal, the parties shall meet and confer regarding establishing agreed-upon procedures for resolving the remaining issues. Further, within 14 days of the outcome of the pending appeal, the parties either shall file the agreed-upon proposed procedures or, if agreement is not reached, shall file their proposed procedures which may be accompanied by a memorandum in support. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 651 Unopposed MOTION to Enter Proposed Order Concerning Consideration of All Remaining Remedial Issues by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Westfall, Elizabeth)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 650 Letter from Robert Allensworth, filed. (lrivera, 2)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 649 Notice of Non-Compliance. DKT 13 needed. Party ntfd, filed. (amireles, 2)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER granting #644 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard F. Shordt terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order *** Telephone conference set for 10/28/14 has been cancelled. Parties continue to confer. Parties to advise the Court if the hearing needs to be reset., filed. (bcortez, 2)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 646 Letter re: voting ballots by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(lcayce, 2)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 645 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 10/28/2014 at 03:00 PM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 644 Unopposed MOTION for Richard Shordt to Withdraw as Attorney by IMANI CLARK, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shordt, Richard)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 643 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 10/27/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 648 Letter from Robert M Allensworth re: Voting Backup Ballot, filed. (Original document had faint text and could not be darkened further.) (glyons, 4)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 641 Letter from Robert M. Allensworth re: Voting, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER granting #639 Motion of Paintiffs to postpone the filing and briefing of any motions for attorneys fees, expenses and costs. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(sscotch, 2)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 642 Letter from Robert M. Allensworth, filed. (dgonzalez, 5)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 639 Unopposed MOTION to Hold in Abeyance by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/10/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunn, Chad)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 638 Order of USCA re: #634 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 14-41127. The State's emergency motion for stay pending appeal is GRANTED, as is its motion to file a brief exceeding page limits., filed.(lcayce, 2)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 637 Copy Request from Robert M Allensworth re: 2:13cv193 Docket Sheet from Feb 11 14. filed.
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 636 News from Oct 1 Ballot Access News, 415-922-9779 by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(amireles, 2)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 14-41127 re: #634 Notice of Appeal, filed.(amireles, 2)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 635 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #634 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): ERO, filed. (Attachments: #1 Final Judgment, #2 Docket Sheet) (amireles, 2) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/14/2014: #3 Notice of Appeal) (amireles, 2).
October 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 634 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #633 Final Judgment by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-13838105), filed. (Scott, John)
October 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 633 FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on October 11, 2014(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2)
October 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ADVISORY REGARDING GUIDANCE FOR THE NOVEMBER 2014 ELECTIONS by State Of Texas er al., filed.(bcortez, 2)
October 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORAL ORDER. The Court grants #629 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Advisory (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified. (bcortez, 2)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 630 RESPONSE to #629 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Advisory , filed by Maria Longoria Benavides, Michelle Bessiake, Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Rodney Ellis, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Belinda Ortiz, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, Aurica Washington. (Hebert, J)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 629 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Advisory by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Advisory)(Clay, John)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 628 OPINION (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 623 Order of USCA; USCA No. 14-40003. PER CURIAM, filed.(lrivera, 2)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 622 Order of USCA; USCA No. 14-40003. Judgment, filed.(lrivera, 2)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 621 Suggestion of Limited Voting by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(amireles, 2)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 619 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #617 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 618 NOTICE of ERRATA re: #611 Sealed Event by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Scott, John)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 617 TRANSCRIPT re: BENCH TRIAL - DAY 9 / CLOSING ARGUMENTS held on 9/22/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2014., filed. (thudson, )
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 620 Letter from Robert Allensworth re: documents requested, filed. (letter went to McAllen on 9/22/14, Texas) (lrivera, 2)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 616 NOTICE of ERRATA re: #610 Proposed Findings of Fact/Conclusions of Law,, by IMANI CLARK, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, filed. (Shordt, Richard)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 615 Letter re: voting by Robert M Allensworth, filed.(lcayce, 2)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. NINTH day of BENCH TRIAL held on 9/22/2014. Court GRANTS #590 Motion for Judicial Notice. Defendants exhibits 456, as revised, and 2756 admitted. Parties to replace expert reports exhibits filed on September 20th and 21st using the same exhibit number. Closing arguments. Appearances:Chad Dunn, Armand Derfner, Neil Baron, Gerry Hebert, Scott Brazil, Emma Simson, Anna Baldwin, Elizabeth Westfall, Dan Freeman, Richard Dellheim, Bruce Gear, Ezra Rosenberg, Mark Posner, Amy Rudd, Jose Garza, Robert Doggett, Marinda Van Dalen, Rolando Rios, Ryan Haygood, Natasha Korgaonkar, Kelly Dunbar, Danielle Conley, John Scott, Jennifer Roscetti, Reed Clay, Lindsey Wolf, Ronnie Keister, David Whitley, Ben Donnell, Whitney Deason, Stephen Tatum, Arthur DAndrea, Adam Aston, Leah Aden, Deuel Ross, Richard Shordt, Lynn Eisenberg, Avner Shapiro, Tania Faransso, Jennifer Clark, Vishal Agrahakar, Myrna Perez.(Digital # 8:28-10:14,10:30-12:12)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 614 NOTICE of Filing of Third Amended Expert Report and Second Amended Reply Report of Coleman Bazelon by IMANI CLARK, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Third Amended Expert Report of Coleman Bazelon, #2 Exhibit B - Second Amended Report of Coleman)(Haygood, Ryan)
September 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 613 Expert Report of Dr. M.V. (Trey) Hood III by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Hood Amended Second Supplemental Rebuttal)(Scott, John)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 612 Letter from Robert M. Allensworth re: Limited Voting Ballot, filed. (amireles, 2)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 611 Sealed Event, filed.
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 610 Proposed Findings of Fact/Conclusions of Law by Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed.(Rosenberg, Ezra)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 609 NOTICE of Objections to Defendants' Eleventh Supplemental Exhibit List by United States Of America, filed. (Freeman, Daniel)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 608 NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiffs and Defendants Additional Deposition Designations by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Scott, John)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 607 NOTICE of (1) Defendants' Eleventh Supplemental Exhibit List and (2) Submission of Defendant's Combined Exhibit Lists to the Court by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Combined Trial Exhibit Lists)(Scott, John)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 606 NOTICE Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Objections to Defendants' Exhibits by Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 605 NOTICE Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Final Exhibit List by Anna Burns, IMANI CLARK, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 604 Expert Report of Dr. M.V. (Trey) Hood III by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Hood Report)(Scott, John)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 603 DECLARATION of Coleman Bazelon, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Report, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Reply Report)(Haygood, Ryan)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 602 Supplemental Exhibit List by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 601 Expert Report of Dr. Gerald R. Webster by United States Of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Webster Report, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appendix 2, #4 Appendix 3, #5 Appendix 4)(Freeman, Daniel)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 600 Expert Report of Stephen D. Ansolabehere by United States Of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Supplemental Expert Report, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Baldwin, Anna)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 599 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam W. Aston on behalf of Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Scott, John)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 598 Copy Request by Robert M Allensworth, filed. (Memo sent to Allensworth regarding total number of pages and copy cost for a copy of the docket sheet)(vrios, 2)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER granting #596 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Emma P Simson terminated.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amireles, 2)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 596 MOTION for Simson, Emma to Withdraw as Attorney by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/6/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hebert, J)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ADVISORY by State Of Texas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Scott, John)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 594 Amicus Curiae Brief by C. Richard Quade, filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 593 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #592 Transcript, #588 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (vrios, 2)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 592 TRANSCRIPT re: BENCH TRIAL - DAY 8 held on 9/11/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2014., filed. (thudson, )
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 591 Supplemental Exhibit List by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 590 Opposed MOTION Judicial Notice of Two Criminal Complaints Alleging Election Crimes by Steve McCraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/2/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Belinda Solis Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Veronica Salidvar Complaint)(Scott, John)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 589 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #582 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 588 TRANSCRIPT re: BENCH TRIAL - DAY 7 held on 9/10/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2014., filed. (thudson, )
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 587 NOTICE Corrected Advisory Concerning DPS Web Site by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Scott, John)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 586 NOTICE Corrected Advisory Concerning DPS Web Site by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Scott, John)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 585 NOTICE Advisory Concerning DPS Web Site by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Scott, John)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 584 Supplemental Exhibit List by Steve McCraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Scott, John)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. EIGHTH day of BENCH TRIAL held on 9/11/2014. Witnesses: John Crawford, Forrest Mitchell (depo),Tommy Williams (depo),Caroline Guidry (depo), Bryan Hebert (depo), Kenneth Smith (depo), Michelle Rudolph (depo). Defendants exhibit 2746 admitted. Defendants exhibits 2747, 2748 admitted under seal. Plaintiffs exhibit 1160 admitted under seal. Parties supplemental exhibits admitted by agreement. Defendants rest. Court accepts the experts. Closing arguments will be held on Monday, September 22, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Appearances:Chad Dunn, Armand Derfner, Neil Baron, Gerry Hebert, Scott Brazil, Emma Simson, Anna Baldwin, Elizabeth Westfall, Dan Freeman, Richard Dellheim, Bruce Gear, Ezra Rosenberg, Mark Posner, Amy Rudd, Jose Garza, Robert Doggett, Marinda Van Dalen, Rolando Rios, Ryan Haygood, Natasha Korgaonkar, Kelly Dunbar, Danielle Conley, John Scott, Jennifer Roscetti, Reed Clay, Lindsey Wolf, Ronnie Keister, David Whitley, Ben Donnell, Whitney Deason, Stephen Tatum, Arthur DAndrea, Leah Aden, Deuel Ross, Richard Shordt, Lynn Eisenberg, Avner Shapiro, Tania Faransso, Jennifer Clark, Vishal Agrahakar, Myrna Perez.(Digital # 8:00-10:24, 10:41-11:58, 1:30-1:49)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 583 NOTICE of Defendants' Eighth Supplemental Exhibit List by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF2746)(Scott, John)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 582 TRANSCRIPT re: BENCH TRIAL - DAY 6 held on 9/9/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2014., filed. (thudson, )
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 581 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #578 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. SEVENTH day of BENCH TRIAL held on 9/10/2014. Parties have agreed that experts will file amended reports: Dr. Webster and Dr. Ansolahehere by close of business Tuesday, 9/16/14, Dr. Bazelon by close of business Wednesday, 9/17/14, and Hood by close of business Thursday, 9/18/14. Amended/Supplemental Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law will be filed by Thursday, 9/18/14. Witnesses: David Dewhurst (depo), Trey Hood, Dan Patrick (depo), Keith Ingram, Tony Fraser (depo). Appearances:Chad Dunn, Armand Derfner, Neil Baron, Gerry Hebert, Scott Brazil, Emma Simson, Anna Baldwin, Elizabeth Westfall, Dan Freeman, Richard Dellheim, Bruce Gear, Ezra Rosenberg, Mark Posner, Amy Rudd, Jose Garza, Robert Doggett, Marinda Van Dalen, Rolando Rios, Ryan Haygood, Natasha Korgaonkar, Kelly Dunbar, Danielle Conley, John Scott, Jennifer Roscetti, Reed Clay, Lindsey Wolf, Ronnie Keister, David Whitley, Ben Donnell, Whitney Deason, Stephen Tatum, Arthur DAndrea, Leah Aden, Deuel Ross, Richard Shordt, Lynn Eisenberg, Avner Shapiro, Tania Faransso, Jennifer Clark, Vishal Agrahakar, Myrna Perez.(Digital # 7:59-10:11, 10:28-12:00, 1:04-5:49)(ERO:G. Rogan/L. Cayce), filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 580 Letter from Robert M Allensworth, filed.(amireles, 2)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 579 Supplemental Exhibit List by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State of Texas and John Steen filed.(Scott, John) Modified on 9/9/2014 (amireles, 2). Added additional filers per request of John Scott's Office.
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 578 TRANSCRIPT re: BENCH TRIAL - DAY 5 held on 9/8/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2014., filed. (thudson, )
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 577 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #573 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. SIXTH day of BENCH TRIAL held on 9/9/2014. 6 Witnesses: Vernon Burton, Coleman Bazelon, Joe Peters (depo), Estela Espinoza (depo), Imani Clark (depo). Plaintiffs rest. Witnesses: Tony Rodriguez, Victor Farinelli. Appearances:Chad Dunn, Armand Derfner, Neil Baron, Gerry Hebert, Scott Brazil, Emma Simson, Anna Baldwin, Elizabeth Westfall, Dan Freeman, Richard Dellheim, Bruce Gear, Ezra Rosenberg, Mark Posner, Amy Rudd, Jose Garza, Robert Doggett, Marinda Van Dalen, Rolando Rios, Ryan Haygood, Natasha Korgaonkar, Kelly Dunbar, Danielle Conley, John Scott, Jennifer Roscetti, Reed Clay, Lindsey Wolf, Ronnie Keister, David Whitley, Ben Donnell, Whitney Deason, Stephen Tatum, Arthur DAndrea, Leah Aden, Deuel Ross, Richard Shordt, Lynn Eisenberg, Avner Shapiro, Tania Faransso, Jennifer Clark, Vishal Agrahakar, Myrna Perez.(Digital # 7:58-10:07, 10:24-12:04, 1:08-3:43, 4:03-6:25)(ERO:G. Rogan/L. Cayce), filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 576 Supplemental Exhibit List by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 575 Supplemental Exhibit List by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 574 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #569 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 573 TRANSCRIPT re: BENCH TRIAL - DAY 4 held on 9/5/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2014., filed. (thudson, )
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. FIFTH day of BENCH TRIAL held on 9/8/2014. Witnesses: Oscar Ortiz, Kevin Jewell, Daniel Chatman, Lorraine Minnite, Forrest Mitchell (depo), George Korbel, Ann McGeehan (depo), Ruby Barber (depo), Todd Smith (depo), Yannis Banks (depo), Vera Trotter (depo). Defendant presents exhibit 2737 as offer of proof. Appearances:Chad Dunn, Armand Derfner, Neil Baron, Gerry Hebert, Scott Brazil, Emma Simson, Anna Baldwin, Elizabeth Westfall, Dan Freeman, Richard Dellheim, Bruce Gear, Ezra Rosenberg, Mark Posner, Amy Rudd, Jose Garza, Robert Doggett, Marinda Van Dalen, Rolando Rios, Ryan Haygood, Natasha Korgaonkar, Kelly Dunbar, Danielle Conley, John Scott, Jennifer Roscetti, Reed Clay, Lindsey Wolf, Ronnie Keister, David Whitley, Ben Donnell, Whitney Deason, Stephen Tatum, Arthur DAndrea, Leah Aden, Deuel Ross, Richard Shordt, Lynn Eisenberg, Avner Shapiro, Tania Faransso, Jennifer Clark, Vishal Agrahakar, Myrna Perez.(Digital # 7:58-10:29, 10:45-12:01, 1:03-2:57, 3:14-5:57)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 571 STIPULATION re: Margarito Martinez Lara by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 570 STIPULATION re: Ken Gandy by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 569 TRANSCRIPT re: BENCH TRIAL - DAY 3 held on 9/4/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2014., filed. (thudson, )
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 568 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 567 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 566 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #563 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 565 NOTICE Service Fourth Supplemental Exhibit List by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Scott, John)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. FOURTH day of BENCH TRIAL held on 9/5/2014. Witnesses: Wendy Davis (depo), Allan Lichtman, Rodney Ellis, Ken Gandy, Margarito Lara, Maximina Lara, Gerald Webster, Rafael Anchia, Ana Hernandez-Luna, Naomi Eagleton (depo). Appearances:Chad Dunn, Armand Derfner, Neil Baron, Gerry Hebert, Scott Brazil, Emma Simson, Anna Baldwin, Elizabeth Westfall, Dan Freeman, Richard Dellheim, Bruce Gear, Ezra Rosenberg, Mark Posner, Amy Rudd, Jose Garza, Robert Doggett, Marinda Van Dalen, Rolando Rios, Ryan Haygood, Natasha Korgaonkar, Kelly Dunbar, Danielle Conley, John Scott, Jennifer Roscetti, Reed Clay, Lindsey Wolf, Ronnie Keister, David Whitley, Ben Donnell, Whitney Deason, Stephen Tatum, Arthur DAndrea, Leah Aden, Deuel Ross, Richard Shordt, Lynn Eisenberg, Avner Shapiro, Tania Faransso.(Digital # 7:58-9:59, 10:16-12:08, 1:08-4:00, 4:16-6:16)(ERO:G. Rogan, L. Cayce), filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw without Prejudice, Plaintiff Peggy Draper Herman re #564 .(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amireles, 2)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 564 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw by Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/25/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baron, Neil)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 563 TRANSCRIPT re: BENCH TRIAL - DAY 2 held on 9/3/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2014., filed. (thudson, )
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 562 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #561 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. THIRD day of BENCH TRIAL held on 9/4/2014. Witnesses: Peter Johnson, Matt Barreto, Lionel Estrada, Lenard Taylor, Juanita Cox (depo), Jane Henrici, Carlos Uresti, T. Ransom Cornish, Barry Burden, Daniel Guzman. Plaintiffs exhibit 753.1 admitted. Appearances:Chad Dunn, Armand Derfner, Neil Baron, Gerry Hebert, Scott Brazil, Emma Simson, Anna Baldwin, Elizabeth Westfall, Dan Freeman, Richard Dellheim, Bruce Gear, Ezra Rosenberg, Mark Posner, Amy Rudd, Jose Garza, Robert Doggett, Marinda Van Dalen, Rolando Rios, Ryan Haygood, Natasha Korgaonkar, Kelly Dunbar, Danielle Conley, John Scott, Jennifer Roscetti, Reed Clay, Lindsey Wolf, Ronnie Keister, David Whitley, Ben Donnell, Whitney Deason, Stephen Tatum, Arthur DAndrea, Leah Aden, Deuel Ross, Richard Shordt, Lynn Eisenberg, Avner Shapiro.(Digital # 7:58-10:02, 10:17-12:03, 1:05-3:53, 4:08-6:10)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 561 TRANSCRIPT re: BENCH TRIAL - DAY 1 held on 9/2/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2014., filed. (thudson, )
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 560 STIPULATION re: Estela Garcia Espinoza by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 559 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #556 Transcript, #552 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 558 STIPULATION re: Eulalio Mendez, Jr. by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 557 STIPULATION re: Estela Garcia Espinoza by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. SECOND day of BENCH TRIAL held on 9/3/2014. Witnesses: Michael C. Herron, Eulalio Mendez, Ramona Bingham (depo), Kristina Mora, Yair Ghitza, Randall Buck Wood, Blake Green, Dawn White, Gordon Benjamin, Phyllis Washington (depo). Appearances:Chad Dunn, Armand Derfner, Neil Baron, Gerry Hebert, Scott Brazil, Emma Simson, Anna Baldwin, Elizabeth Westfall, Richard Dellheim, Bruce Gear, Ezra Rosenberg, Mark Posner, Amy Rudd, Jose Garza, Robert Doggett, Marinda Van Dalen, Rolando Rios, Ryan Haygood, Natasha Korgaonkar, Kelly Dunbar, Danielle Conley, John Scott, Jennifer Roscetti, Reed Clay, Lindsey Wolf, Ronnie Keister, David Whitley, Ben Donnell, Whitney Deason, Stephen Tatum, Arthur DAndrea, Leah Aden, Deuel Ross, Richard Shordt, Lynn Eisenberg, Avner Shapiro.(Digital # 7:59-10:08, 10:24-12:11, 1:10-3:41, 3:55-5:49)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 627 Plaintiff and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Witness List by Marc Veasey et al., filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 626 Defendants' Witness List by State Of Texas et al., filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 625 Defendants' Exhibit List by State Of Texas et al., filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 624 Plaintiff and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Exhibit List by Marc Veasey et al., filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 556 TRANSCRIPT re: MOTION HEARING held on 9/2/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2014., filed. (thudson, )
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER granting #554 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff Belinda Ortiz.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(sscotch, 2)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 554 Unopposed MOTION withdraw Belinda Ortiz as Plaintiff by Belinda Ortiz, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Dalen, Marinda)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 553 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #525 Transcript, #523 Transcript, #522 Transcript, #526 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 552 TRANSCRIPT re: MOTION HEARING held on 8/29/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2014., filed. (thudson, )
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 551 NOTICE of Third Supplemental Exhibit List by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Scott, John)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. FIRST day of BENCH TRIAL held on 9/2/2014. Arguments heard re: #546 Mtn to Compel. Court GRANTS #546 Mtn to Compel. Deposition may not exceed one hour. All exhibits NOT objected to admitted. Opening statements. Witnesses: Sammi Bates (depo), Calvin Carrier, Floyd Carrier, Trey Martinez Fischer, Stephen Ansolahehere, Marc Veasey, Elizabeth Gholar (depo), Linda Lydia (depo), Martin Golando (depo). Appearances:Chad Dunn, Armand Derfner, Neil Baron, Gerry Hebert, Scott Brazil, Emma Simson, Anna Baldwin, Elizabeth Westfall, Richard Dellheim, Bruce Gear, Ezra Rosenberg, Mark Posner, Amy Rudd, Jose Garza, Robert Doggett, Marinda Van Dalen, Rolando Rios, Ryan Haygood, Natasha Korgaonkar, Kelly Dunbar, Danielle Conley, John Scott, Jennifer Roscetti, Reed Clay, Lindsey Wolf, Ronnie Keister, David Whitley, Ben Donnell, Whitney Deason, Stephen Tatum, Arthur DAndrea.(Digital # 7:58-9:43, 9:58-12:11, 1:09-4:15, 4:28-6:15)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
September 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 550 STIPULATION re: LUPE by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
September 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 549 STIPULATION re: Gordon Benjamin by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
September 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 548 STIPULATION re: Floyd Carrier by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
September 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 547 STIPULATION re: The League of United Latin American Citizens by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
September 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 546 Opposed MOTION to Compel Deposition of Lenard Taylor by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order)(Whitley, Gregory)
September 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 545 STIPULATION re: TLYVEF by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
September 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 544 STIPULATION re: Plaintiff-Intervenor Imani Clark by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
August 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 543 NOTICE Service Second Supplemental Exhibit List re: #535 Notice (Other) by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Scott, John)
August 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 542 NOTICE Corrected Exhibit 1 to Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenor's Joint Exhibit List re: #540 Notice (Other) by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Scott, John)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 541 NOTICE Deposition Designations by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Scott, John)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 540 NOTICE of Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' and Plaintiff-Intervenors Exhibit List by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Scott, John)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 539 Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Notice of Deposition Designations by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Ron Reynolds, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Veasey v. Perry - Deposition Designations, #2 Exhibit Texas v. Holder - Deposition Designations, #3 Exhibit Texas v. Holder - Trial Testimony Designations)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 538 Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Objections to Defendants' Exhbits by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, Roxanne Hernandez, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Lydia Lara, Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Belinda Ortiz, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Objections to Defendants' Exhibits)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 537 Exhibit List by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Estela Garcia Espinosa, Lionel Estrada, Jane Hamilton, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Inc., Margarito Martinez Lara, Maximina Martinez Lara, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Eulalio Mendez, Jr, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Belinda Ortiz, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Lenard Taylor, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, United States Of America, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Exhibit List)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the USM pay for the transportation and lodging expenses associated with all witnesses subpoenaed by the U.S. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 535 NOTICE of Service of Defendants' Supplemental Exhibit List by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Scott, John)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER Granting #527 Motion For Attorney Joshua Bone To Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(gchavez, 2)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 533 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by J. Gerald Hebert. This is to order a transcript of Trial held on September 2, 2014 to September 19, 2014 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting, filed. (grogan, 2)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 532 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Michelle Hart Yeary. This is to order a transcript of Trial held on September 2, 2014 to September 19, 2014 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting, filed. (grogan, 2)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 531 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by John B. Scott. This is to order a transcript of Entire trial held on September 2, 2014 to September 15, 2014 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting, filed. (grogan, 2)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 530 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Lynn Eisenberg. This is to order a transcript of Trial held on September 2, 2014 to September 19, 2014 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting, filed. (grogan, 2)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 529 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Elizabeth Westfall. This is to order a transcript of Trial held on September 2, 2014 to September 19, 2014 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting, filed. (grogan, 2)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 528 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by John B. Scott. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference held on August 29, 2014 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting, filed. (grogan, 2) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting on 8-29-14.
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 527 MOTION for Josh Bone to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/19/2014. (Hebert, J)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 526 TRANSCRIPT re: MOTION HEARING held on 08/28/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2014., filed. (gwintrow, )
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 525 TRANSCRIPT re: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 08/28/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2014., filed. (gwintrow, )
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 524 EXHIBITS by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Jane Hamilton, John Mellor-Crumley, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Marc Veasey, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Cornish Report, #2 Exhibit C to Cornish Report, #3 Appendix 2 to Korbel Report, #4 Appendix 3A to Korbel Report, #5 Appendix 3B to Korbel Report, #6 Appendix 3C to Korbel Report, #7 Appendix 3D to Korbel Report, #8 Appendix 3E to Korbel Report, #9 Appendix 3F to Korbel Report, #10 Appendix 4 to Korbel Report)(Hebert, J)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 523 TRANSCRIPT re: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 08/27/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2014., filed. (gwintrow, )
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 522 TRANSCRIPT re: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 08/27/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2014., filed. (gwintrow, )
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 521 Expert Report of Coleman Bazelon by Texas League of Young Voters Education Fund, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Amended Report)(Haygood, Ryan)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/29/2014. Arguments heard re: #459 United States' Motion to Determine. Court DENIES Government's Motion from 1-743. Appearances:Chad Dunn, Gerry Hebert, Emma Simson, Anna Baldwin, Daniel Freeman, Ezra Rosenberg, Robert Doggett, Kelly Dunbar, Danielle Conley, Lindsey Wolf, Ronnie Keister, Ben Donnell, Arthur D'Andrea.(Digital # 8:31-8:48)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 520 NOTICE of Stipulations re: #503 Sealed Event by United States Of America, filed. (Freeman, Daniel)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 519 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by John B. Scott. This is to order a transcript of Motion Hearing held on August 28, 2014 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting, filed. (grogan, 2) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting on 8-28-14.
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 518 Exhibit List of: Non-Party Senators filed by Alice London, filed.(sscotch, 2) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2014: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (sscotch, 2). Modified on 11/4/2014 (sscotch, 2).
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 517 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by John Scott. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference held on August 28, 2014 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting, filed. (grogan, 2) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting on 8-28-14.
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 516 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by John Scott. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference held on August 27, 2014 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting, filed. (grogan, 2) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting on 8-28-14.
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 515 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by John B. Scott. This is to order a transcript of Pre-Trial Conference held on August 27, 2014 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting, filed. (grogan, 2) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting on 8-28-14.
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 514 NOTICE (Amended) re: #503 Sealed Event by United States Of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Freeman, Daniel)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 513 NOTICE re: #503 Sealed Event by United States Of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Freeman, Daniel)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 512 NOTICE Transcript Order Form for August 27, 2014 Pre-Trial Conference by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Scott, John)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 511 NOTICE Transcript Order Form for August 27, 2014 Status Conference by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Scott, John)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. MOTION HEARING held on 8/28/2014. Parties to further confer on #503 Sealed Event. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2014 at 08:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Appearances:Chad Dunn, Gerry Hebert, Emma Simson, Daniel Freeman, Ezra Rosenberg, Marinda Van Dalen, Ryan Haygood, Natasha Korgaonkar, Kelly Dunbar, Danielle Conley, Ronnie Keister, Ben Donnell, Arthur D'Andrea.(Digital # 1:28-1:50)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/28/2014. Arguments heard re: Defendants use of various members' documents at trial. Rulings made on the record. Appearances:Chad Dunn, Gerry Hebert, Daniel Freeman, Elizabeth Westfall, Ezra Rosenberg, Marinda Van Dalen, Kelly Dunbar, Danielle Conley, John Scott, Jennifer Roscetti, Reid Clay, Ben Donnell, Stephen Tatum, Alice London.(Digital # 10:00-10:44)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order *** Non-Party Senators' Exhibit 1-4 admitted for Status Conference., filed. (bcortez, 2)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/27/2014. Arguments heard on pending motions. Court GRANTS #491 MOTION In Limine to Admit Prior Deposition and Trial Testimony in its entirety. Court GRANTS #492 MOTION In Limine to Admit Declarations of County Officials, excluding Segura. Court DENIES #456 Opposed MOTION to Strike #417 Answer to Complaint, #407 Answer to Complaint ,. Court DENIES #462 Opposed MOTION to Strike #422 Answer to Complaint, #419 Answer to Complaint, #423 Answer to Complaint, #421 Answer to Complaint, #425 Answer to Complaint . Court entered an Order on #459 Motion to Determine. Parties to further confer. Parties to further confer on #503 Motion to Unseal. Hearing set for 8/28/2014 at 1:30 p.m. Each side will have 40 hours to present their evidence. Court will be in session 8 hours per day (8:00-12:00, 1:00-6:00). One hour total for opening statements. Three hours total for closing arguments. Objections to witnesses/exhibits due 8/29/2014. Court will reconvene at 1:30pm today to address the State's use of various members' documents at trial. Appearances:Whitney Deason. Rolando L Rios, Ryan Haygood, Natasha Korgaonkar, Danielle Conley, Kelly Dunbar, James B Eccles, Chad W Dunn, J Gerald Hebert, Armand Derfner, Alice London, Robert W Doggett, Marinda Van Dalen, John Barret Scott, Lindsey Elizabeth Wolf, Stephen Lyle Tatum, Jr, John Reed Clay, Jr, Arthur D'Andrea, Jennifer Marie Roscetti, Ben Addison Donnell, Amy Lynne Rudd, Ezra D Rosenberg, Myrna Perez, Mark A Posner, Bradley E Heard, Elizabeth S Westfall, Anna Baldwin, Richard Dellheim, Daniel J Freeman.(Digital # 9:01-10:22)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order ***Set Hearings: Motion Hearing re #503 Motion to Unseal set for 8/28/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (bcortez, 2)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/27/2014. Discussion held regarding Defendants use of various members' documents at trial. Rulings and agreements made on the record. Parties to further confer. Status Conference set for 8/28/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Appearances:Chad Dunn, Gerry Hebert, John Scott, Alice London.(Digital # 2:02-2:47)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 510 RESPONSE in Opposition to #503 Sealed Event, filed by Third Party Legislators. (D'Andrea, Arthur)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 509 REPLY in Support of #456 Opposed MOTION to Strike #417 Answer to Complaint, #407 Answer to Complaint , filed by United States Of America. (Heard, Bradley)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER granting in part #459 Motion for Entry of Order. The parties are ORDERED to confer re: the request for admission and to identify for the Court on or before 8/29/14 at 12:00 noon those that remain subject to genuine dispute. The remainder of the motion (D.E. 459) is taken UNDER ADVISEMENT pending the parties' report of matters remaining in dispute. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 507 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #489 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 506 Sealed Event, filed.
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 505 Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Witness List, #4 Exhibit Defendants' Witness List)(Scott, John)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 504 Proposed Findings of Fact/Conclusions of Law by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed.(Scott, John)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 503 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 502 Opposed RESPONSE in Opposition to #459 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Deeming Defendants' Respones to USA's RFAs Admitted, filed by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2.1, #3 Exhibit 2.2, #4 Exhibit 2.3, #5 Exhibit 2.4, #6 Exhibit 2.5, #7 Exhibit 2.6, #8 Exhibit 2.7, #9 Exhibit 2.8, #10 Exhibit 2.9, #11 Exhibit 2.10, #12 Exhibit 2.11, #13 Exhibit 2.12, #14 Exhibit 2.13, #15 Exhibit 2.14, #16 Exhibit 2.15, #17 Exhibit 2.16, #18 Exhibit 2.17, #19 Exhibit 2.18, #20 Exhibit 2.19, #21 Exhibit 2.20, #22 Exhibit 3, #23 Exhibit 4)(Scott, John)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR A.C. CUELLAR granting #493 Motion.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 500 RESPONSE to #456 Opposed MOTION to Strike #417 Answer to Complaint, #407 Answer to Complaint filed by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, John)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER granting #495 Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff-Intervenor Jose Flores.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER granting #496 Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff-Intervenor Joseph Palacios.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER Granting #494 Unopposed Motion To Withdraw Plaintiff-Intervenor Hector Palacios With Prejudice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(gchavez, 2)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 496 Unopposed MOTION by Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/12/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rios, Rolando)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 495 Unopposed MOTION by Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/12/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rios, Rolando)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 494 Unopposed MOTION Motion to withdraw Plaintiff Intervenor Hector Palaciis by Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/12/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rios, Rolando)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 493 Unopposed MOTION Withdraw Plaintiff-Intervenor AC Cuellar by Texas Association of Hispanic County Judges and County Commissioners, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/12/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rios, Rolando)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MOTION In Limine to Admit Declarations of County Officials by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/12/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Daniel)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 491 MOTION In Limine to Admit Prior Deposition and Trial Testimony by United States Of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/12/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Daniel)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 490 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/12/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Proposed Order)(Scott, John)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 489 TRANSCRIPT re: MOTION HEARING held on 8/21/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2014., filed. (thudson, )
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. MOTION HEARING held on 8/22/2014. Arguments heard re: #490 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production. Court GRANTS #490 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production. Appearances:Chad Dunn, Elizabeth Westfall, Bradley Heard, Ezra Rosenberg, Marinda Van Dalen, Natasha Korgaonkar, Lynn Eisenberg, Lindsey Wolf, David Whitley.(Digital # 2:14-2:27)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 488 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by John Scott. This is to order a transcript of Hearing held on August 21, 2014 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting, filed. (grogan, 2) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting on 8-21-14.
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. MOTION HEARING held on 8/21/2014. Arguments heard re: #441 Opposed MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Responsive to Defendants' Second and Fourth Requests for Production to the United States of America Related to Election Crimes and Voter Fraud. ORAL ORDER: Court GRANTS #441 Motion to Compel only as to what has already been produced by the Government regarding this issue and as to what the Government has further agreed to produce. Court DENIES the reminder of that motion. The Court finds that the Defendants request as it now stands before the Court, after parties have conferred and agreed on some matters, unduly burdensome regarding the search required in relation to the type or nature of information being requested at this time. Denial of motion moots the Governments motion for protective order. Parties may submit exhibits on CDs. Parties to submit excerpts of deposition transcripts only. Appearances:Chad Dunn, Bradley Heard, Ezra Rosenberg, Marinda Van Dalen, Rolando Rios, Natasha Korgaonkar, Deuel Ross, Kelly Dunbar, Lindsey Wolf, David Whitley, Ben Donnell.(Digital # 9:30-9:45)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ADVISORY by Steve McGraw, Rick Perry, State Of Texas, John Steen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Scott, John)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 486 NOTICE of Setting as to #441 Opposed MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Responsive to Defendants' Second and Fourth Requests for Production to the United States of America Related to Election Crimes and Voter Fraud. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 485 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #482 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order ***Court will hear arguments on D.E. 386 at August 21, 2014 hearing if parties are unable to reach an agreement., filed. (bcortez, 2)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ADVISORY by United States Of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Ltr. to Tex (Aug. 14, 2014), #2 Errata Tex. Email to U.S. (Aug. 14, 2014), #3 Errata U.S. Ltr. to Tex. (Aug. 15, 2014))(Heard, Bradley)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 483 Expert Report of Matt Barreto, PhD and Gabriel Sanchez, PhD by Anna Burns, Floyd Carrier, Sergio DeLeon, Jane Hamilton, League Of United Latin American Citizens, John Mellor-Crumley, Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, Michael Montez, Oscar Ortiz, Koby Ozias, Penny Pope, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Marc Veasey, filed.(Dunn, Chad)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 482 TRANSCRIPT re: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/14/14 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JOHN SCOTT Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2014., filed. (thudson, )
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 481 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 480 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order