Edwards v. 4JLJ, LLC
Plaintiff: Joshua Edwards, Francisco Gutierrez, Humberto J Morales, Ricky Martin, Ernesto Flores, Abel Castaneda, Andres Villarreal, Anthony Chapa, Armando Garcia, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Daniel Ybarra, Eric Riojas, Fred Esquivel, Jaime Mora, Jose Rene Ramirez, Juan Mares, Michael Sandoval, Michael Overstreet, Nefi Luna, Pedro Rodriguez, Robert Zarate, Steve Poff, Ethan Clendenen, Michael Perez, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Lyndon Jackson, Israel Banda, Luis Moreno, Roberto DeAlejandro, Miguel Noyola, Jose Losoya, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Cosme Perez, Guadalupe Buitron, Macedonia Rodriguez, Raul Moreno, Mark Canfield, Blake Morin, Cameron Dodson, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo and Flores Guadalupe, Jr.
Defendant: 4JLJ, LLC doing business as J4 Oilfield Services and John Jalufka
Consolidated Plaintiff: Rodrigo Tarango Jr.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00299
Filed: July 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Nueces
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER ON MOTION TO RECONSIDER COSTS granting #386 Motion for Reconsideration.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISREGARD THE MANDATE OR RECALL THE FINAL JUDGMENT. The Court RECALLS and VACATES the final judgment (D.E. #331 ) AND the Court REINSTATES AND GRANTS #324 MOTION for Judgment MOTION for New Trial ( Status Conference set for 4/27/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos)(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(legarza, 2)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 391 REPLY in Support of #387 MOTION to Alter Judgment, filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Moulton, James)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 390 REPLY in Support of #386 MOTION for Reconsideration of #385 Order, #387 MOTION to Alter Judgment, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Knight, Nolan)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 389 Amended PROPOSED ORDER re: #387 MOTION to Alter Judgment, filed.(Moulton, James)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 388 RESPONSE in Opposition to #386 MOTION for Reconsideration of #385 Order, filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Moulton, James)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 387 MOTION to Alter Judgment by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B, #2 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 386 MOTION for Reconsideration of #385 Order by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knight, Nolan)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER ON BILL OF COSTS denying #380 Bill of Costs (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amireles, 2)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 384 NOTICE of Ruling Re: Post-Remand Application for Entry of Costs re: #383 Order by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. (Knight, Nolan)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER re: #380 Bill of Costs (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(RochelleLimon, 2)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 382 OBJECTIONS to #381 Objections,,, Re Post-Remand Application for Costs, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Knight, Nolan)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 OBJECTIONS to #380 Bill of Costs , filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Moulton, James)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Costs Taxed in the amount of $ $694.40 re: #379 Bill of Costs, filed. (BrittanyPainschab, 2)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 380 BILL OF COSTS in total amount $4,272.85 by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Knight, Nolan)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 379 BILL OF COSTS in total amount $694.40, filed.(dterrell, 2)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 378 Order of USCA; OPINION - Judgment issued as mandate 10/13/2020 re: #351 Notice of Appeal - Cross Appeal, ; USCA No. 19-40553. We dismiss the employees' appeal and 4JLJ's cross appeal, filed. (Attachments: #1 Bill of Costs, #2 USCA Letter)(dterrell, 2)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 377 Order of USCA; Judgment issued as mandate 10/13/2020 re: #351 Notice of Appeal - Cross Appeal, ; USCA No. 19-40553. It is ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed in part and dismissed in part and the cause is REMANDED to the District Court for further proceedings. Case reopened on 10/13/2020, filed.(dterrell, 2)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #346 Notice of Appeal,,, #351 Notice of Appeal - Cross Appeal, to N. Knight, D. Pipitone and J. Moulton. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 19-40553), filed.(amireles, 2)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #346 Notice of Appeal,, #351 Notice of Appeal - Cross Appeal, USCA No. 19-40553, filed.(amireles, 2)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Trial EXHIBITS by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 61, #2 Exhibit 72, #3 Exhibit 74 (1), #4 Exhibit 74 (2), #5 Exhibit 75 (1), #6 Exhibit 75 (2), #7 Exhibit 75 (3), #8 Exhibit 75 (4), #9 Exhibit 76, #10 Exhibit 77, #11 Exhibit 78, #12 Exhibit 79, #13 Exhibit 80, #14 Exhibit 81 (1), #15 Exhibit 81 (2), #16 Exhibit 82 (1), #17 Exhibit 82 (2), #18 Exhibit 73 (1), #19 Exhibit 73 (2))(Moulton, James)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 Trial EXHIBITS by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 (1), #2 Exhibit 6 (2), #3 Exhibit 6 (3), #4 Exhibit 6 (4), #5 Exhibit 6 (5))(Moulton, James)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Trial EXHIBITS by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 85)(Moulton, James)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 Trial EXHIBITS by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 81 (1), #2 Exhibit 81 (2))(Moulton, James)
July 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Trial EXHIBITS by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 67)(Moulton, James)
July 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Trial EXHIBITS by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 66)(Moulton, James)
July 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Trial EXHIBITS by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 65 (1), #2 Exhibit 65 (2), #3 Exhibit 65 (3), #4 Exhibit 65 (4))(Moulton, James)
July 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 Trial EXHIBITS by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 60)(Moulton, James)
July 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Trial EXHIBITS by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51 (1), #2 Exhibit 51 (2), #3 Exhibit 51 (3), #4 Exhibit 51 (4))(Moulton, James)
July 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 Trial EXHIBITS by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 16, #4 Exhibit 20, #5 Exhibit 24, #6 Exhibit 34, #7 Exhibit 38)(Moulton, James)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 365 Trial EXHIBITS re: #307 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 143-2, #2 Exhibit 150, #3 Exhibit 151, #4 Exhibit 152, #5 Exhibit 153, #6 Exhibit 154, #7 Exhibit 155, #8 Exhibit 156, #9 Exhibit 157, #10 Exhibit 159)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 Trial EXHIBITS re: #307 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 141, #2 Exhibit 142, #3 Exhibit 143, #4 Exhibit 144, #5 Exhibit 145, #6 Exhibit 146, #7 Exhibit 148)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Trial EXHIBITS re: #307 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 133, #2 Exhibit 134, #3 Exhibit 135, #4 Exhibit 136, #5 Exhibit 137, #6 Exhibit 138, #7 Exhibit 139, #8 Exhibit 140, #9 Exhibit 140)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Trial EXHIBITS re: #307 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 124, #2 Exhibit 125, #3 Exhibit 126, #4 Exhibit 127, #5 Exhibit 128, #6 Exhibit 129, #7 Exhibit 130, #8 Exhibit 131, #9 Exhibit 132)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Trial EXHIBITS re: #307 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 110, #2 Exhibit 111, #3 Exhibit 112, #4 Exhibit 113, #5 Exhibit 114, #6 Exhibit 115, #7 Exhibit 116, #8 Exhibit 117, #9 Exhibit 118)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Trial EXHIBITS re: #307 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 74, #2 Exhibit 75, #3 Exhibit 76, #4 Exhibit 77, #5 Exhibit 78, #6 Exhibit 79, #7 Exhibit 80, #8 Exhibit 81, #9 Exhibit 82, #10 Exhibit 83, #11 Exhibit 84, #12 Exhibit 85, #13 Exhibit 86, #14 Exhibit 87, #15 Exhibit 88, #16 Exhibit 89, #17 Exhibit 90, #18 Exhibit 91, #19 Exhibit 92, #20 Exhibit 103, #21 Exhibit 104, #22 Exhibit 105, #23 Exhibit 106, #24 Exhibit 107, #25 Exhibit 108, #26 Exhibit 109)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Trial EXHIBITS re: #307 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 56, #2 Exhibit 57, #3 Exhibit 58, #4 Exhibit 59, #5 Exhibit 60, #6 Exhibit 61, #7 Exhibit 62, #8 Exhibit 63, #9 Exhibit 64, #10 Exhibit 65, #11 Exhibit 66, #12 Exhibit 67, #13 Exhibit 68, #14 Exhibit 69, #15 Exhibit 70, #16 Exhibit 71, #17 Exhibit 72, #18 Exhibit 73)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Trial EXHIBITS re: #307 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 55-1, #2 Exhibit 55-2, #3 Exhibit 55-3)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Trial EXHIBITS re: #307 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 54-1, #2 Exhibit 54-2)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Trial EXHIBITS re: #307 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 38, #2 Exhibit 39, #3 Exhibit 40, #4 Exhibit 41, #5 Exhibit 42, #6 Exhibit 43, #7 Exhibit 44, #8 Exhibit 45, #9 Exhibit 46, #10 Exhibit 47, #11 Exhibit 48, #12 Exhibit 49, #13 Exhibit 50, #14 Exhibit 51, #15 Exhibit 52, #16 Exhibit 53)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 355 Trial EXHIBITS re: #307 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 35, #2 Exhibit 36, #3 Exhibit 37)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Trial EXHIBITS re: #307 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16, #2 Exhibit 17, #3 Exhibit 18, #4 Exhibit 19, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit 22, #8 Exhibit 23, #9 Exhibit 24, #10 Exhibit 25, #11 Exhibit 26, #12 Exhibit 27, #13 Exhibit 28, #14 Exhibit 29, #15 Exhibit 30, #16 Exhibit 31, #17 Exhibit 32, #18 Exhibit 33, #19 Exhibit 34)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Trial EXHIBITS re: #307 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order *** 5 CDs containing exhibit no. 86 received from Plaintiffs. Exhibit is not imaged on docket sheet., filed. (bcortez, 2)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by James Moulton. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office regarding Trial transcript including all hearings, charging conference, voir dire, opening and closing, dates 2/19/19 through 2/26/19 before Judge Ramos. (A transcript is requested). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services. This order form relates to the following: #321 Transcript, #318 Transcript, #346 Notice of Appeal,,, #322 Transcript, #320 Transcript, #349 Transcript, #319 Transcript, #317 Transcript, #348 Transcript, filed.(Moulton, James)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #330 Order on Motion for Sanctions, #343 Order, #284 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #269 Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Amended Motion by 4JLJ, LLC (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-22670825), filed.(Knight, Nolan)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #349 Transcript, #348 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (idavis, 2)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 349 TRANSCRIPT re: JURY CHARGE CONFERENCE held on 2/25/19 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JAMES MOULTON Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2019., filed. (thudson, )
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 348 TRANSCRIPT re: JURY CHARGE CONFERENCE held on 2/22/19 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party JAMES MOULTON Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2019., filed. (thudson, )
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #346 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): ERO, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (amireles, 2)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Appeal Review Notes re: #346 Notice of Appeal,,,. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted.Hearings were held in the case. DKT13 transcript order form(s) due within 14 days of the filing of the notice of appeal., filed.(amireles, 2)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #341 Order on Motion for Judgment, Order on Motion for New Trial, #331 Final Judgment by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-22597279), filed.(Moulton, James)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by James Moulton for Transcript of Charge Conference for Edwards Trial 2/22/2019 and 2/25/2019. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Moulton, James) Audio and log notes have been electronically uploaded to Exceptional reporting by fc on 6.6.19 at 11:45 am.
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 344 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by James Moulton for Transcript of Charge Conference for Edwards Trial 2/23/19. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Moulton, James) Transcript order cancelled due to the incorrect date. Per Moulton a 2nd transcript order was filed./jfa
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Corrective Entry: #343 Order was previously docketed at DE #342 . (mserpa, 2)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR BILL OF COSTS - Granting in Part #333 Bill of Costs, (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR BILL OF COSTS granting in part #333 Bill of Costs. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER denying #332 .(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amartinez, 2)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 NOTICE Regarding Their Motion for Entry of Bill of Costs by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting #336 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 338 REPLY to #335 Reply , filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits "A" and "B")(Moulton, James)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 337 RESPONSE in Opposition to #332 MOTION for Judgment MOTION for New Trial, filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knight, Nolan)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MOTION for Leave to File Objections by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 335 REPLY to #334 Objections,,, , filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Harvey, Michael)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 OBJECTIONS to #333 Bill of Costs , filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Moulton, James)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 BILL OF COSTS in total amount $$72,434.95 by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Harvey, Michael) Modified on 6/4/2019 (fcarbia, 2).
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MOTION for Judgment( Motion Docket Date 5/1/2019.), MOTION for New Trial by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B" part 1, #3 Exhibit "B" part 2, #4 Exhibit "B" part 3, #5 Exhibit "C", #6 Exhibit "D", #7 Exhibit "E", #8 Exhibit "F", #9 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 VACATED PER DE #392 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants 4JLJ, LLC d/b/a J4 Oilfield Services and John Jalufka. Case terminated on 3/27/2019(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) Modified on 3/15/2022 (legarza, 2).
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER AWARDING SANCTIONS (granting in part and denying in part) #325 Motion for Sanctions. The Court awards Plaintiffs $95,140.00 in attorneys' fees and $3,546.74 in expenses as sanctions against Defendants, jointly and severally. Defendants are ORDERED to pay said sanctions to Plaintiffs within 30 days of the date of this Order. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 Filing letter with Exhibits to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Harvey, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 RESPONSE to #324 MOTION for Judgment MOTION for New Trial filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harvey, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 327 RESPONSE to #325 MOTION for Sanctions filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Harvey, Michael)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 326 PROPOSED ORDER re: #325 MOTION for Sanctions, filed.(Moulton, James)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MOTION for Sanctions by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits "A" and "B")(Moulton, James)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MOTION for Judgment( Motion Docket Date 4/2/2019.), MOTION for New Trial by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B" part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit "B" part 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit "B" part 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit "C", #6 Exhibit Exhibit "D", #7 Exhibit Exhibit "E", #8 Exhibit Exhibit "F", #9 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Moulton, James) Modified on 3/15/2022 (legarza, 2).
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #321 Transcript, #318 Transcript, #322 Transcript, #320 Transcript, #317 Transcript, #319 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
March 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 322 TRANSCRIPT re: JURY TRIAL - DAY 5 held on 2/26/19 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party MICHAEL A. HARVEY Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2019., filed. (thudson, )
March 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 TRANSCRIPT re: JURY TRIAL - DAY 4 held on 2/25/19 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party MICHAEL A. HARVEY Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2019., filed. (thudson, )
March 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 320 TRANSCRIPT re: JURY TRIAL - DAY 3 held on 2/21/19 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party MICHAEL A. HARVEY Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2019., filed. (thudson, )
March 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 319 TRANSCRIPT re: JURY TRIAL - DAY 2 held on 2/20/19 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party MICHAEL A. HARVEY Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2019., filed. (thudson, )
March 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 TRANSCRIPT re: JURY SELECTION held on 2/19/19 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party MICHAEL A. HARVEY Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2019., filed. (thudson, )
March 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 317 TRANSCRIPT re: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE / JURY TRIAL - DAY 1 held on 2/19/19 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party MICHAEL A. HARVEY Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2019., filed. (thudson, )
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Opposed MOTION for Entry Judgment by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment)(Pipitone, Daniel)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 315 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daniel Pipitone for Transcript of Trial, February 19, 2019, Judge Ramo. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional on 2/27/2019 (grogan, 2).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER. The Court ORDERS the parties to file any motion for judgment and/or renewed motion for sanctions in the form of attorney's fees and expenses on or before March 12, 2019; any responses so such motion are due on or before March 19, 2019. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 JURY VERDICT (pages 16-26)(bcortez, 2) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2019: #1 Unredacted attachment) (bcortez, 2).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Jury Note No. 1(bcortez, 2) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2019: #1 Unredacted attachment) (bcortez, 2).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER to provide meal to jury on February 26, 2019(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. FIFTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 2/26/2019. Court orders lunch be provided to the jurors. Plaintiffs exhibit 6 admitted by agreement of parties. Closing arguments. Jury begins deliberations. Jury note no. 1. Jury reaches a verdict. Verdict published. Jury polled. Jury is excused. Appearances: Daniel Douglas Pipitone, Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton, Jeffery Richard Price.(Digital # 8:46-8:50, 9:00-10:41, 10:53-11:12, 1:15-1:25)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 COURT'S CHARGE TO THE JURY (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2019: #1 Unredacted attachment) (bcortez, 2).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Certification of Trial Exhibits signed by attorneys for Plaintiffs and Defendants (bcortez, 2)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Defendants' Jury Charge Conference Exhibits 1-4 by 4JLJ, LLC (bcortez, 2)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. JURY CHARGE CONFERENCE AND FOURTH day of JURY TRIAL held on 2/25/2019. Jury charge conference (jury not present). Parties submit their objections to the jury charge. Rulings made on the record. Defts submit Charge Conference exhibits 1-4. Charge Conference exhibits made part of the record but do not go to jury. Pltfs exhibits 1, 7, 16, 20, 34, 38, 61, 65, 66, 72-82, 86 admitted. Defts exhibits 1, 3-34, 37, 39-40, 42-44, 47-53, 55, 57-63, 65-80, 83-91, 103-116, 118, 124-141, 143-146, 148-157, 159 admitted. Witness: Juan G. Mares (by video deposition). Defts rest. Pltfs move for a directed verdict. Arguments heard. Court denies Pltfs motion for a directed verdict. Final jury instructions. Jury directed to return Tuesday at 9am for closing arguments and deliberations. Attys to be present at 8:45am on Tuesday morn ing. Court will provide lunch for jurors on Tuesday, February 26, 2019. Parties certify exhibits being sent to jury. Appearances: Daniel Douglas Pipitone, Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton, Jeffery Richard Price.(Digital # 9:00-9:05, 9:32-10:16, 10:46-10:52, 11:01-11:15, 12:56-2:24, 2:34-3:15)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order *** During review of exhibits, parties agreed to remove Defendants' exhibit 8. Defendants' exhibit 8 will not be part of the record or will not go to the jury., filed. (bcortez, 2)
February 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Proposed Jury Charge by 4JLJ, LLC(Pipitone, Daniel)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Proposed Jury Charge by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate(Moulton, James)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. JURY CHARGE CONFERENCE held on 2/22/2019. Parties to file any submissions and amendments to their proposed jury instructions by 12pm noon on Saturday, February 23rd. Defendants to let the Court and Plaintiffs' attorneys know the witnesses they will be calling for Monday ASAP. Court will instruct jury to be present at 1pm on Monday, February 25th. Attorneys to be present at 9am on Monday to continue discussing the jury charge. Attorneys to review the exhibit lists and advise the case manager which exhibits they agree to admit to the jury. Appearances: Daniel Douglas Pipitone, Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton, Jeffery Richard Price.(Digital # 10:22-10:55)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2) Modified on 2/22/2019 (bcortez, 2).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Proposed Jury Charge by 4JLJ, LLC(Pipitone, Daniel)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. THIRD day of JURY TRIAL held on 2/21/2019. Witnesses: Humberto J. Morales, Francisco Huerta Gutierrez, Jose R. Ramirez Jr., Steven G. Poff II, John Jalufka, Israel Banda. Defts exhibits 92, 82, 64, 117, 142, 36 admitted. Pltfs exhibit 51 admitted. Parties have agreed to a stipulation regarding Pltfs exhibit 67. Plaintiffs rest. Defts move for directed verdict. Arguments heard. Court grants Defts motion for directed verdict by agreement as to the per diem. Court denies the remainder of the Defts motion for directed verdict. Pltfs move for a directed verdict. Court denies Pltfs motion for directed verdict. Witness: Raul Moreno (by video deposition). Court advises jury we will not be in session on Friday, February 22nd. Jury is directed to return Monday, February 25th at 9am. Attys are to be present Friday at 10am to discuss jury charge. Appearances: Daniel Douglas Pipitone, Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton, Jeffery Richard Price.(Digital # 8:30-9:40, 9:49-11:56, 1:15-2:58, 3:11-4:14)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. SECOND day of JURY TRIAL held on 2/20/2019. Witnesses: Rebekkah Clark, Joshua Edwards, Armando Garcia, Humberto Morales. Plaintiffs exhibits 2, 12, 67, 71, 35, 8, 85, 24 admitted. Defts move for a mistrial for breach of a limine ruling. Court denies Defts motion for a mistrial. Defts exhibits 2, 35, 54, 56, 38, 41, 46, 45, 81 admitted. Jury directed to return Thursday at 8:30am. Appearances: Daniel Douglas Pipitone, Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton, Jeffery Richard Price.(Digital # 8:26-10:08, 10:20-12:08, 1:13-2:40, 2:55-5:11)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Defendants' Trial Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC(bcortez, 2)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibit List by Joshua Edwards(bcortez, 2) (Main Document 306 replaced on 2/26/2019) (bcortez, 2).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Defendants' Trial Witness List by 4JLJ, LLC(bcortez, 2)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Plaintiffs' Trial Witness List by Joshua Edwards(bcortez, 2)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 Defendants' Peremptory Challenges(bcortez, 2)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Plaintiffs' Peremptory Challenges(bcortez, 2)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. FIRST day of JURY TRIAL held on 2/19/2019. Parties announce ready for trial. ETT: 2 weeks. Plaintiff filed an amended exhibit list at D.E. 297; however, the Court will strike that document and use the exhibit list filed at D.E. 285-1, noting the omitted exhibits. Voir dire. 8 jurors selected. Jurors sworn. Preliminary jury instructions. Opening statements. Court recesses early to allow attorney to handle an emergency matter. Jury directed to return Wednesday, February 20th at 8:30am. Appearances: Daniel Douglas Pipitone, Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton, Jeffery Richard Price.(Digital # 8:28-8:58, 9:19-11:01, 11:21-11:35, 12:58-2:00)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Amended Exhibit List by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate(Moulton, James)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #295 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 TRANSCRIPT re: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/8/19 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party DANIEL D. PIPITONE Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2019., filed. (thudson, )
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daniel D. Pipitone for Transcript of Final Pre-Trial Conference on 2/12/17 before Judge Ramos. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional on 2/12/2019 (grogan, 2).
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/8/2019. Court address trial length. Court will be in session February 19-22, 25-28, and March 4-8. Discussion held regarding Plaintiffs testifying. Parties confer. All 9 plaintiffs will be present to testify. Arguments heard on objections to exhibits. Rulings made on the record. No objections to witness lists. Arguments heard on motions in limines #286 and #289 . Court made prior rulings on limines that still apply. Court grants Deft's limine 33 and denies Deft's limine 34. Court grants pltf's limine 11. Pltfs objection to deposition designations sustained. Parties to confer further on defts objections to deposition designations. Court will seat 8 jurors. 1 hr each for voir dire. 45 mins each for opening statements. Court will read the parties joint statement of case at D.E. 193 to potential jurors. Jury Selection and Trial set for 2/19/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Appearances: Daniel Douglas Pipitone, Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton, Jeffery Richard Price.(Digital # 9:04-9:12, 9:25-9:56, 10:32-10:41)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 Supplemental OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT LIST, filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Harvey, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, Designation of Deposition Testimony of Raul Moreno and Amended Motion in Limine, filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Harvey, Michael)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Designations of Excerpts from the Deposition of Raul Moreno by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed.(Moulton, James)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Objections to Defendants' Exhibits and Motion in Limine by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed.(Moulton, James)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Opposed MOTION In Limine of Defendants by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/15/2019. (Harvey, Michael)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Designation of Deposition Excerpts for Raul Moreno by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed.(Moulton, James)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Defendants' Designation of Deposition Testimony of Raul Moreno by 4JLJ, LLC, filed.(Harvey, Michael)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MOTION In Limine by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/15/2019. (Moulton, James)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Rodrigo Tarango Jr., Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D, #2 Plaintiffs' Proposed Jury Charge, #3 Defendants' Proposed Jury Charge)(Moulton, James)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER DENYING RECONSIDERATION OF SANCTIONS AND FURTHER DENYING PERMISSIVE APPEAL denying #277 Motion for Reconsideration.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Jury Trial set for 2/19/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. ETT: 3-6 days . Pltf Expert Witness List due by 1/25/2019. Deft Expert Witness List due by 1/25/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/25/2019. Objections due by 2/1/2019 Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE Joint Notice and Request to Court Regarding Production of FleetMatics Documents and Trial Setting by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION : Lead Case No. 2:15-CV-00299 and Member Case No. 2:18-CV-00078; granting #280 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 2:15-cv-00299 and Member Case No. 2:18-cv-00078 (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amireles, 2)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 2:15-cv-00299 and Member Case No. 2:18-cv-00078 by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
July 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 279 REPLY in Support of #277 MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 278 RESPONSE in Opposition to #277 MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Moulton, James)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MOTION for Reconsideration by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pipitone, Daniel)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 276 NOTICE of Discovery by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Harvey, Michael)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #274 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (idavis, 2)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 TRANSCRIPT re: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/25/18 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party DANIEL D. PIPITONE Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2018., filed. (thudson, )
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Hearing EXHIBITS re: #272 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-11)(amireles, 2)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daniel D. Pipitone for Transcript of Status Conference June 25, 2018 Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Hourly turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional on 6-25-18 by (grogan).
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC(fcarbia, 2)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/25/2018. Parties to confer and advise the Court what information is still needed from FleetMatics. Deft to file a motion to appeal within 1 week. Pltf to file response to motion 1 week after filing of motion. Deft's exhibits 1-11 admitted for purposes of hearing. The Court does not set a trial date at this time. Appearances: Daniel Douglas Pipitone, Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton, Jeffery Richard Price.(Digital # 10:00-10:41)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MEMORANDUM by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moulton, James)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 6/25/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. Parties to be prepared to discuss the Fleet Matics records. Parties to advise the Court if all records are available, the cost, who will bear the cost, how long it will take. (bcortez, 2)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting #225 Motion for Sanctions; denying as moot #252 Plaintiff's First Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(sylopez, 2)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Supplemental RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Supplement to Plaintiffs' Trial Brief, filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fifth Circuit Opinion)(Harvey, Michael)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 REPLY to #265 Supplement , filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Moulton, James)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 RESPONSE to #265 Supplement to Plaintiffs' Trial Brief on the Burden of Proof with Regards to the Effects of the TCA, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Pipitone, Daniel)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 SUPPLEMENT to #215 Trial Brief, by Joshua Edwards, et al, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(mserpa, 2)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 SUPPLEMENT to #225 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions by Joshua Edwards, et al, filed.(mserpa, 2)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting #250 Motion for Leave to File; granting #251 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 NOTICE of Vacation by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. (Harvey, Michael)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 SURREPLY to #252 First AMENDED #237 MOTION, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pipitone, Daniel)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 260 REPLY in Support of #252 First AMENDED #237 MOTION, filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Moulton, James)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 RESPONSE in Opposition to #252 First AMENDED #237 MOTION, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Proposed Order)(Pipitone, Daniel)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE of Vacation by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Moulton, James)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 APPENDIX re: #252 First AMENDED #237 MOTION by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 444, #2 Appendix 445-468, #3 Appendix 469-496, #4 Appendix 497-539)(Moulton, James)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 APPENDIX re: #252 First AMENDED #237 MOTION by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 299-317, #2 Appendix 318-333, #3 Appendix 334-389, #4 Appendix 390-443)(Moulton, James)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 APPENDIX re: #252 First AMENDED #237 MOTION by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 225-245, #2 Appendix 246-258, #3 Appendix 259-298)(Moulton, James)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 APPENDIX re: #252 First AMENDED #237 MOTION by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 81-97, #2 Appendix 98-128, #3 Appendix 129-150, #4 Appendix 151-171, #5 Appendix 172-203, #6 Appendix 204-224)(Moulton, James)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 APPENDIX re: #252 First AMENDED #237 MOTION by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 40-62, #2 Appendix 63-80)(Moulton, James)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 First AMENDED #237 MOTION by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Appendix 1-16, #3 Appendix 17-39)(Moulton, James)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Brief on Burden of Proof by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" to Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit "A" to Supplement, #3 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Motion for Sanctions by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by James Moulton for Transcript of Status Conference, 2/8/2018, Judge Nelva Ramos. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Moulton, James)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #247 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 TRANSCRIPT re: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 2/8/18 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party DANIEL D. PIPITONE Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018., filed. (thudson, )
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daniel D. Pipitone for Transcript of Telephone Conference, February 8, 2018, Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Hourly turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional on 2-8-18 by GR.
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 2/8/2018. Parties have received approximately 10 of 55 key fob information for the vehicles. Deft would like to get the key fob information for the small vehicles (3-4 vans). Deft to get information within 30 days. Pltf to file a statement of that they will not be filing any additional MSJ briefing once the records are received. Deft will have 2 weeks for notice filing date to respond to MSJ. Court may order parties to mediation after reviewing MSJ filings. Appearances: Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton.(Digital # 10:17-10:43)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #243 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 NOTICE of Setting as to #240 Notice (Other),,,. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 2/8/2018 at 10:15 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Other EXHIBITS re: #240 Notice (Other),,, by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed.(Moulton, James)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Ethan Clendenen by Jose Rene Ramirez, Luis Moreno, Abel Castaneda, Robert Zarate, Guadalupe Buitron, Cipriano Sanchez, Humberto J Morales, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Joshua Edwards, Cameron Dodson, Jaime Mora, Israel Banda, Andres Villarreal, Pedro Rodriguez, Daniel Ybarra, Michael Perez, Eric Riojas, Anthony Chapa, Julio Quintanilla, Roberto DeAlejandro, Ethan Clendenen, Juan Mares, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Blake Morin, Francisco Gutierrez, Steve Poff, Jose Losoya, Ricky Martin, Macedonia Rodriguez, Cosme Perez, Miguel Noyola, Christopher Sanchez, Raul Moreno, Michael Overstreet, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Mark Canfield, Julio Quintanillo, Michael Sandoval, Lyndon Jackson, Nefi Luna, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Fred Esquivel, filed. (Moulton, James)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE Regarding Status of GPS Records by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Moulton, James)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting #238 Motion for Extension of Time Motion Filing due by 2/11/2018. Responses due by 2/27/2018..(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Summary Judgment and Response Deadlines by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pipitone, Daniel)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James) Modified on 3/19/2018 (bcortez, 2).
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/3/2018. Defts advise they are still working with Fleet Matics to obtain the records. Court grants #230 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Response to Motion are due within 30 days of motion filing. Court does not address #225 Motion for Sanctions at this time. Court suspends the current trial date of January 16, 2018. Trial will be reset after the records issue is resolved. Appearances: Daniel Douglas Pipitone, Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton, Jeffery Richard Price.(Digital # 8:51-8:57)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Reset Deadlines: Responses to #237 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/2/2018. (bcortez, 2)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 SURREPLY to #225 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pipitone, Daniel)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 REPLY in Support of #225 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions, filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Moulton, James)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 RESPONSE in Opposition to #225 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Pipitone, Daniel)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 REPLY to Response to #230 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Moulton, James)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 RESPONSE in Opposition to #230 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pipitone, Daniel)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER ; Motion-related deadline set re: #230 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Responses due by 12/22/2017.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit Coversheet for A, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Appendix pgs 1-4, #5 Appendix pgs 5-28, #6 Appendix pgs 29-56, #7 Appendix pgs 57-99, #8 Appendix pgs 100-155, #9 Appendix pgs 156-209, #10 Proposed Order Proposed Order on MSJ)(Moulton, James)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/8/2017. Discussion held regarding Fleetmatics records. Deft to file response to motion to sanctions by motion docket date. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/3/2018 at 08:45 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Appearances: Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton, Jeffery Richard Price.(Digital # 11:28-11:46)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/8/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #226 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE Regarding Compliance with the Court's October 17, 2017 Order to Submit Any Documents or Issues the Court Needs to Review by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 TRANSCRIPT re: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/17/17 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party DANIEL PIPITONE Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2018., filed. (thudson, )
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Exhibit G-I, #3 Exhibit J-O, #4 Exhibit Exhibit P part 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit P part 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #7 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daniel D. Pipitone for Transcript of Final Pre-Trial Conference, October 17, 2017, Judge Nelva Ramos. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. Forwarded copy order to Exceptional on 11-28-17 by GR.
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Edwards / James Moulton for Transcript of Final Pre-Trial Conference Hearing on 10/17/2017 before Judge Nelva Ramos. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Moulton, James) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional on 11-28-17 by GR.
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/17/2017. ETT: 7-10 days. Arguments heard on exhibits. Court sustains Defendants objection to Plaintiffs exhibit 46. Plaintiffs do not have any objections to Defendants exhibits. Parties to confer further on proposed jury instructions. Arguments heard on the burden of proof with regards to the effects of the TCA. Courts prior ruling stands. Discussion held regarding GPS tracking records. Court recesses to allow parties to try to obtain records. Resume. Defendants advise after speaking with a Fleet Matics representative, the records are deleted after 6 months. Defendants make oral motion in limine regarding Fleet Matics records. Court denies Defendants motion. Defendants move for a continuance of the trial in order to research the Fleet Matics records. Plaintiffs request cost for lodging be reimbursed by Defendants. Court does not rule on reimbursement issue at this time. Court grants continuance. Trial set for January 16, 2018 at 8:30am. Plaintiffs to send 30(b)6 notice within 45 days. Telephonic status conference set for December 6, 2017 at 9:00am. Parties to submit any documents or issues the Court needs to review by December 4, 2017. Appearances: Daniel Douglas Pipitone, Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton, Jeffery Richard Price.(Digital # 1:29-1:53, 2:28-2:38, 2:47-3:44)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Jury Selection and Trial set for 10/18/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 REPLY to #219 Response, #215 Trial Brief,,, Reply Brief and Response to Motion, filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Moulton, James)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 RESPONSE to #215 Trial Brief,,, or, in the Alternative, Opposed Motion to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Pipitone, Daniel)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 APPENDIX re: #216 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed.(Pipitone, Daniel)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Supplemental OBJECTIONS to #175 Exhibit List,, , filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Pipitone, Daniel)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Amended Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC(Pipitone, Daniel)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Burden of Proof by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Moulton, James)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order *** FPTC set for October 6, 2017 has been canceled. Case manager will advise parties at a later date if the trial on October 16, 2017 will proceed., filed. (bcortez, 2)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Regarding Burden of Proof at Trial; The Court does not accept letter briefs (see D.E. 27, p. 3) and Plaintiffs letter brief (D.E. 212) on this issue is STRICKEN. However, the Court GRANTS LEAVE to Plaintiffs to file a trial brief in pleading form addressing this issue. ( Brief due by 10/5/2017, Responses to Brief due by 10/12/2017.)(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Proposed Jury Charge by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra(Moulton, James)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE Re Developing Case Law by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E")(Moulton, James)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #210 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 TRANSCRIPT re: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 4/10/17 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party DANIEL D. PIPITONE Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2017., filed. (thudson, )
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #208 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (idavis, 2)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 TRANSCRIPT re: TELEPHONIC FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 4/17/17 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party DANIEL D. PIPITONE Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2017., filed. (thudson, )
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daniel D. Pipitone for Transcript of Final Pre-Trial Conference, April 10, 2017, Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel) Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting on 9-12-17 by GR.
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daniel D. Pipitone for Transcript of Final Pre-Trial Conference, April 17, 2017, Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel) Audio and log notes were electronically uploaded to Exceptional Reporting on 9/8/17 at 10:00 am by FC
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 REPLY in Support of #201 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Knight, Nolan)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT denying #201 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 RESPONSE in Opposition to #201 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-E, #3 Exhibit F part one, #4 Exhibit F part two, #5 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER. Response by party opposing Motion for Leave to Present Issues of Statutory Construction by Summary Judgment Submission [DE #201] is due on or before 8/24/2017. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(jalvarez, 2)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Knight, Nolan)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER denying #197 Motion to Reconsider Ruling on Burden of Proof with Regards to the MCA Exemption and the Effects of the TCA. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(jalvarez, 2)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 REPLY in Support of #197 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration of #196 MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Moulton, James)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 RESPONSE in Opposition to #197 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration of #196 MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harvey, Michael)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration of #196 MOTION for Reconsideration by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MOTION for Reconsideration . by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B, #2 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Trial set for 10/16/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (Reset by agreement of parties.)(bcortez, 2)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 OBJECTIONS to #190 Document Defendants' Deposition Excerpts, filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Moulton, James)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Joint Voir Dire Preliminary Statement by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed.(Pipitone, Daniel)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE to the Court Regarding "Illegible Copies" by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE to the Court Regarding "Illegible Copies" by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pipitone, Daniel)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (telephonic) held on 4/17/2017 granting Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 29. Defendant to provide requested photographs of vehicles to Plaintiff by Thursday, April 20, 2017. Defendants to provide to the Court the documents that were not readable by Plaintiffs by today, April 17, 2017. Plaintiff to file objections to Defendants' Designation of Deposition Testimony of Raul Moreno, D.E. 190, by Tuesday, April 18, 2017. Discussion re: Federal Rule of Evidence 801 issue regarding Declarations, D.E. 188, 189. Parties to confer and submit a brief joint statement of the case to be presented to prospective jurors. Appearances: Daniel Douglas Pipitone, Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton.(Digital # 9:01 - 9:25)(ERO:F. Carbia), filed.(grogan, 2)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Defendants' Designation of Deposition Testimony of Raul Moreno by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed.(Pipitone, Daniel)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 REPLY to #188 Response , filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Moulton, James)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Submissino to the Court Regarding Federal Rule of Evidence 801, filed by John Jalufka. (Pipitone, Daniel)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Miguel Noyola, Michael Sandoval, filed.(Moulton, James)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Amended Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Pipitone, Daniel)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Fourth Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Pipitone, Daniel)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE to the Court Regarding the Requested Utilization of the Deposition and Trial Testimony of Anthony Ferrara by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 4/10/2017. ETT: 7 days. This case is third on the trial docket. Court addresses exhibit lists. Defendant to provide Plaintiffs photos of J436, J437, J445, and J446 (entire vehicle and bed of truck with tailgate open) by April 14th. Plaintiffs will provide the supporting information to their charts and summaries by April 14th. Defendant to provide the documents that were not readable by April 14th. Arguments heard on Defendants objections to Plaintiffs deposition excerpts of Raul Moreno. Court sustains Defendants objections to page 17, line 23 through page 18, line 1. Court overrules Defendants objections to page 26, line 17 through page 27, line 9. Court excludes page 54, line 17 and lines 21 through 25. Defendant to file deposition excerpts of Moreno by April 14th. Arguments heard on trial briefs. Defendant has to establish the MCA exemption but Plaintiffs bear burden to show that they are covered employees under TCA. Plaintiffs have to show that the work in whole or in part involved duties with respect to motor vehicles weighing 10,000 pounds or less. The Court finds that the employee need only show that the duties included meaningful work with such vehicles for more than an insubstantial time or more than a de minimus manner. Regarding transporting hazardous material, the Court finds that the language in the statute indicates that actual hazardous material transport is required to except the work on that type of vehicle from being counted as light vehicle work. Regarding the joint employer issue, the Court finds that if Mr. Jalufka is found to be a joint employer of the Plaintiffs, hes entitled to the protections from the MC exemption. The Court denies Defendants motion in limine no. 27. Plaintiff may submit evidence of the alleged violations regarding accuracy of the information regarding calculation of pay. Parties to confer further on Defendants motion in limine no. 29. Parties to confer on dismissing without prejudice Plaintiffs Miguel Noyola and Michael Sandoval. Parties to confer and submit an agreement on a preliminary jury instruction for the jury. Parties to confer and submit a brief joint statement of the case to be presented to prospective jurors. Defendant to provide briefing on the Ferrara testimony by April 12th. Plaintiffs to file response by April 14th. Court will look into the employee declarations issues under 801(d)(2)(D). Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/17/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Appearances: Daniel Douglas Pipitone, Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton, Jeffery Richard Price.(Digital # 9:02-10:36)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
April 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Raul Moreno re: #173 Notice (Other),,, by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harvey, Michael)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Third Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix)(Harvey, Michael)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE re no Objections by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Moulton, James)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Defendants' Statement Confirming There are No Remaining Objections to Plaintiffs' First Amended Witness List by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed.(Harvey, Michael)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibit List and Designation of Deposition Testimony of Raul Moreno by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed.(Harvey, Michael)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER STRIKING BRIEFS re: #172 Reply, #177 Trial Brief,,, #176 Trial Brief,,,. Parties did not seek leave of court to file trial briefs after deadline.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 TRIAL BRIEF Response on de minimus by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Moulton, James)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 TRIAL BRIEF Sur-Reply and Reply by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate(Moulton, James)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Amended Exhibit List by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate(Moulton, James)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE of Designation of Deposition Excerpts by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, filed. (Moulton, James)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 REPLY to #162 Trial Brief,,, #155 Trial Brief,,, Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Bench Briefs and Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Trial Brief, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Pipitone, Daniel)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #169 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Trial ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, Jury Selection set for 4/24/2017 at 09:00AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, Jury Trial set for 4/24/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos)(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ANSWER to #146 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,, by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed.(Harvey, Michael)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of TrialMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harvey, Michael)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #167 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (idavis, 2)
January 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 TRANSCRIPT re: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/13/17 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party DANIEL D. PIPITONE Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2017., filed. (thudson, )
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 TRIAL BRIEF by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate(Moulton, James)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 TRIAL BRIEF by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka(Harvey, Michael)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 TRIAL BRIEF by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka(Harvey, Michael)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Amended Exhibit List by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate(Moulton, James)
January 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 TRIAL BRIEF in Response to Defendants' Briefs by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate(Moulton, James)
January 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Amended Exhibit List by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate(Moulton, James)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 TRIAL BRIEF by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Harvey, Michael)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 TRIAL BRIEF by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka(Harvey, Michael)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 TRIAL BRIEF by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka(Harvey, Michael)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 TRIAL BRIEF by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka(Harvey, Michael)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 TRIAL BRIEF on Calculation of Regular Rate by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moulton, James)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 TRIAL BRIEF by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Moulton, James)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Amended Witness List by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka(Pipitone, Daniel)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daniel D. Pipitone for Transcript of Status Conference, January 13, 2017, Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel) Transcript order emailed to Exceptional by jfa 1-17-17.
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/13/2017. This case is third on the docket. Discussion of witness and exhibit lists filed. Plaintiff to file amended exhibit list by 1/17/17. Discussion regarding Defendant taking supplemental depositions. Defendant withdraws request to take deposition of Anthony Ferrara. Plaintiff will have witnesses present for trial. Defendant presents issues regarding Jury Charge. Parties to file briefing on issues by 1-20-17. Appearances: Daniel Douglas Pipitone, Brenna Lermon Hill, James Burdett Moulton.(Digital # 9:10 - 9:35)(ERO:Frances Carbia), filed.(grogan, 2)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #148 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (idavis, 2)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 APPENDIX re: #147 Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Pipitone, Daniel)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Amended Witness List by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate(Moulton, James)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 TRANSCRIPT re: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/6/17 before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party DANIEL D. PIPITONE Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2017., filed. (thudson, )
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Amended Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC(Pipitone, Daniel)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Jose Rene Ramirez, Luis Moreno, Abel Castaneda, Robert Zarate, Guadalupe Buitron, Cipriano Sanchez, Humberto J Morales, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Joshua Edwards, Cameron Dodson, Jaime Mora, Israel Banda, Andres Villarreal, Pedro Rodriguez, Daniel Ybarra, Michael Perez, Eric Riojas, Anthony Chapa, Julio Quintanilla, Roberto DeAlejandro, Ethan Clendenen, Juan Mares, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Blake Morin, Francisco Gutierrez, Steve Poff, Jose Losoya, Ricky Martin, Macedonia Rodriguez, Cosme Perez, Miguel Noyola, Christopher Sanchez, Raul Moreno, Michael Overstreet, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Mark Canfield, Julio Quintanillo, Michael Sandoval, Lyndon Jackson, Nefi Luna, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Fred Esquivel. Related document: #33 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. filed by Joshua Edwards.(Moulton, James)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daniel D. Pipitone for Transcript of Final Pre-Trial Conference, January 6, 2017, Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order *** The Court granted Plaintiffs' motion to amend pleadings., filed. (bcortez, 2)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/6/2017. This case is fourth on the trial docket for January 30, 2017. ETT: 10 days. Arguments heard re: #134 Opposed MOTION In Limine , #137 MOTION In Limine . Rulings made on the record. Parties to file briefing on issues addressed by 1/13/17. Plaintiff to file amended witness list by 1/13/17. Plaintiff to file amended exhibit list by 1/17/17. Defendant to file amended witness and exhibits lists by 1/13/17. Parties are given one hour each for voir dire and 45 minutes each for opening statements. Court will seat 8 jurors. Status Conference set for 1/13/2017 at 09:15 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Appearances: Daniel Douglas Pipitone, Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton, Jeffery Richard Price.(Digital # 10:01-11:15)(ERO:G. Rogan), filed.(bcortez, 2)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Amended Exhibit List by 4JLJ, LLC (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Pipitone, Daniel)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER denying #124 Motion for Sanctions.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying #73 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #83 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot #90 Motion to Strike; denying #109 Motion to Strike.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 OBJECTIONS to #136 Proposed Pretrial Order, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Harvey, Michael)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 OBJECTIONS to #136 Proposed Pretrial Order,,, , filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Moulton, James)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 OBJECTIONS to #136 Proposed Pretrial Order,,, , filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Pipitone, Daniel)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION In Limine . by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2017. (Moulton, James)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Agreed Proposed Pretrial Order by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate (Attachments: #1 Jury Charge, #2 Exhibit A-D)(Moulton, James)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESPONSE in Opposition to #124 MOTION for Sanctions, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Pipitone, Daniel)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Opposed MOTION In Limine . by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2017. (Pipitone, Daniel)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #125 Motion to Compel.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #131 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (dterrell, 2)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 12/20/2016. Court advises he can hear arguments on the pending motion which would cancel the hearing set tomorrow; Counsel are ready to proceed. MOTION HEARING held on 12/20/2016 re: #125 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses. Discussion held and arguments heard. Ruling made on the record. Order to be entered. Appearances: James Burdett Moulton. Michael A Harvey. Brenna Lermon Hill. (Digital # 9:06:56-9:32:29)(ERO:jared marks), filed.(kbledsoe, 2)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 TRANSCRIPT re: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/29/16 before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party BRENNA L. HILL Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2017., filed. (thudson, )
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 REPLY to Response to #125 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses, filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Moulton, James)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Brenna L. Hill for Transcript of Status Conference, September 26, 2016, Magistrate Libby. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel) Modified on 12/14/2016 (lrivera, 2).Electronically forwarded to Exceptional Reporting 12/14/16.
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition to #125 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Pipitone, Daniel)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE OF SETTING as to #125 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses. Parties notified. Attorneys must appear in person. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2016 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. (kbledsoe, 2)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE OF SETTING. Parties notified. Telephone Conference re: status of discovery matters set for 12/20/2016 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. ***SPECIAL INSTRUCTIONS TO COUNSEL: Parties must call into the Courts meet-me-line phone number of 713-250-5332. This line will be open 5 minutes prior to the hearing. Once you call the number, you will be connected to the meet-me-line; there will be silence so please hold until the Case Manager calls in to connect all parties. Everyone must be on a land line. No cell phones or speaker phones are permitted. If more than one attorney/party is on the line, for clarity of the record, please state your name when responding to the Court. THESE CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS WILL ONLY BE PROVIDED IN THIS ELECTRONIC NOTICE.*** (kbledsoe, 2)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION to Compel Discovery ResponsesMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - F, #2 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE AND PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE held on 12/5/2016. Discussion held regarding discovery matters. Court orders the parties to confer on the pending discovery issues. If unable to resolve the issues, plaintiff's counsel must file motion within a week; any response shall be due one week after filing. Hearing will be set at a later date if necessary. Appearances: Daniel Douglas Pipitone. James Burdett Moulton.(Digital # 9:08:15-9:19:26)(ERO:jared marks), filed.(kbledsoe, 2)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION for SanctionsMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J, #2 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE OF SETTING. Parties notified. Telephonic Status Conference and Pre-Motion Conference set for 12/5/2016 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. ***SPECIAL INSTRUCTIONS TO COUNSEL: Parties must call into the Courts meet-me-line phone number of 713-250-5332. This line will be open 5 minutes prior to the hearing. Once you call the number, you will be connected to the meet-me-line; there will be silence so please hold until the Case Manager calls in to connect all parties. Everyone must be on a land line. No cell phones or speaker phones are permitted. If more than one attorney/party is on the line, for clarity of the record, please state your name when responding to the Court. THESE CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS WILL ONLY BE PROVIDED IN THIS ELECTRONIC NOTICE.*** (kbledsoe, 2)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE OF RESETTING. Parties notified. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/5/2016 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. ***SPECIAL INSTRUCTIONS TO COUNSEL: Parties must call into the Courts meet-me-line call in number of 713-250-5332. This line will be open 5 minutes prior to the hearing. Once you call the number, you will be connected to the meet-me-line; there will be silence so please hold until the Case Manager calls in to connect all parties. Everyone must be on a land line. No cell phones or speaker phones are permitted. If more than one attorney/party is on the line, for clarity of the record, please state you name when responding to the Court. THESE CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS WILL ONLY BE PROVIDED IN THIS ELECTRONIC NOTICE *** (kbledsoe, 2)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 OBJECTIONS to #119 Memorandum and Recommendations, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Pipitone, Daniel)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Opposed OBJECTIONS to #119 Memorandum and Recommendations, filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #90 MOTION to Strike #73 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part, #109 MOTION to Strike , #73 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment , #37 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment Objections to M&R due by 11/15/2016(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE OF RESETTING (TIME CHANGE). Parties notified. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/6/2016 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. ***SPECIAL INSTRUCTIONS TO COUNSEL: Parties must call into the Courts meet-me-line call in number of 713-250-5332. This line will be open 5 minutes prior to the hearing. Once you call the number, you will be connected to the meet-me-line; there will be silence so please hold until the Case Manager calls in to connect all parties. Everyone must be on a land line. No cell phones or speaker phones are permitted. If more than one attorney/party is on the line, for clarity of the record, please state you name when responding to the Court. THESE CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS WILL ONLY BE PROVIDED IN THIS ELECTRONIC NOTICE *** (kbledsoe, 2)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury Selection/Trial set for 1/30/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Status Conference set for 12/6/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/23/2016. Objections due by 12/30/2016 Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #115 Motion for Continuance.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/29/2016. Discussion held regarding the status of the case and pending defendant's opposed motion to continue. Court grants motion to continue trial. Trial will be reset to 1/30/17 at 9:00 a.m.; other deadlines announced in court. Order to be entered. Discussion held regarding discovery issues. Appearances: Michael A Harvey. Brenna Lermon Hill. James Burdett Moulton.(Digital # 3:20:44-3:18:59)(ERO:linda rivera), filed.(kbledsoe, 2)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Opposed MOTION for Continuance of Trial SettingMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2016. (Pipitone, Daniel)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE OF SETTING. Parties notified. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/29/2016 at 03:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. ***SPECIAL INSTRUCTIONS TO COUNSEL: Parties must call into the Courts meet-me-line phone number of 713-250-5332. This line will be open 5 minutes prior to the hearing. Once you call the number, you will be connected to the meet-me-line; there will be silence so please hold until the Case Manager calls in to connect all parties. Everyone must be on a land line. No cell phones or speaker phones are permitted. If more than one attorney/party is on the line, for clarity of the record, please state your name when responding to the Court. THESE CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS WILL ONLY BE PROVIDED IN THIS ELECTRONIC NOTICE.*** (kbledsoe, 2)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 RESPONSE in Opposition to #109 MOTION to Strike , filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Harvey, Michael)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SURREPLY to #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Moulton, James)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 REPLY in Support of #90 MOTION to Strike #73 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part, filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Harvey, Michael)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 APPENDIX re: #106 Reply in Support of Motion by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed.(Harvey, Michael)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION to Strike Motions referred to Jason B Libby. by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REPLY in Support of #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Harvey, Michael)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 SURREPLY to #73 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Harvey, Michael)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REPLY in Support of #90 MOTION to Strike #73 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part, filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Harvey, Michael)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 REPLY in Support of #73 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Moulton, James)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/3/2016. Discussion held regarding status of case. Appearances: Michael A Harvey. Brenna Lermon Hill. James Burdett Moulton.(Digital # 10:36:21-11:06:42)(ERO:judy alvarez), filed.(kbledsoe, 2)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition to #90 MOTION to Strike #73 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part, filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Motion to Strike, #2 Proposed Order Order on Motion for Leave, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A-I, #4 Exhibit Exhibit J, #5 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Moulton, James)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE OF RESETTING (TIME CHANGE). Parties notified. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/3/2016 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. ***SPECIAL INSTRUCTIONS TO COUNSEL: Parties must call into the Courts meet-me-line call in number of 713-250-5332. This line will be open 5 minutes prior to the hearing. Once you call the number, you will be connected to the meet-me-line; there will be silence so please hold until the Case Manager calls in to connect all parties. Everyone must be on a land line. No cell phones or speaker phones are permitted. If more than one attorney/party is on the line, for clarity of the record, please state you name when responding to the Court. THESE CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS WILL ONLY BE PROVIDED IN THIS ELECTRONIC NOTICE *** (kbledsoe, 2)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 PROPOSED ORDER re: #100 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed.(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 APPENDIX re: #95 Brief,,,, by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit P part 1, #2 Appendix Exhibit P part 2, #3 Appendix Exhibit P part 3, #4 Appendix Exhibit P part 4, #5 Appendix Exhibit P part 5, #6 Appendix Exhibit P part 6, #7 Appendix Exhibit P part 7, #8 Appendix Exhibit Q part 1, #9 Appendix Exhibit Q part 2, #10 Appendix Exhibit Q part 3, #11 Appendix Exhibit R)(Moulton, James)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition to #73 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka. (lcayce, 2)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #89 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 APPENDIX re: #95 Brief,,,, by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit O part 1, #2 Appendix Exhibit O part 2, #3 Appendix Exhibit O part 3, #4 Appendix Exhibit O part 4, #5 Appendix Exhibit O part 5, #6 Appendix Exhibit O part 6, #7 Appendix Exhibit O part 7, #8 Appendix Exhibit O part 8, #9 Appendix Exhibit O part 9)(Moulton, James)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 APPENDIX re: #95 Brief,,,, by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit K part 1, #2 Appendix Exhibit K part 2, #3 Appendix Exhibit L part 1, #4 Appendix Exhibit L part 2, #5 Appendix Exhibit M part 1, #6 Appendix Exhibit M part 2, #7 Appendix Exhibit M part 3, #8 Appendix Exhibit M part 4, #9 Appendix Exhibit M part 5, #10 Appendix Exhibit N part 1, #11 Appendix Exhibit N part 2, #12 Appendix Exhibit N part 3)(Moulton, James)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 APPENDIX re: #95 Brief,,,, by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit E part 1, #2 Appendix Exhibit E part 2, #3 Appendix Exhibit F, #4 Appendix Exhibit G, #5 Appendix Exhibit H part 1, #6 Appendix Exhibit H part 2, #7 Appendix Exhibit I, #8 Appendix Exhibit J part 1, #9 Appendix Exhibit J part 2)(Moulton, James)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 BRIEF Opposition re: #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Appendix Appendix Contents, #3 Appendix Exhibit A, #4 Appendix Exhibit B part 1, #5 Appendix Exhibit B part 2, #6 Appendix Exhibit C part 1, #7 Appendix Exhbibit C part 2, #8 Appendix Exhibit D part 1, #9 Appendix Exhibit D part 2)(Moulton, James)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 PROPOSED ORDER re: #89 MOTION for Leave to File to Exceed Page Limitation, filed.(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 APPENDIX re: #89 MOTION for Leave to File to Exceed Page Limitation by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibits N-P to Response)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 APPENDIX re: #89 MOTION for Leave to File to Exceed Page Limitation by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibits E-M to Response)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 APPENDIX re: #89 MOTION for Leave to File to Exceed Page Limitation by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibits A-D to Response)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION to Strike #73 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part Motions referred to Jason B Libby. by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION for Leave to File to Exceed Page LimitationMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #87 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (idavis, 2)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT re: TELEPHONIC PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE held on 7/6/16 before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. Court Reporter/Transcriber EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING. Ordering Party BRENNA L. HILL Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2016., filed. (thudson, )
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Jury Trial reset for 11/28/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom of Honorable Nelva Gonzales Ramos before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Brenna L. Hill for Transcript of Pre Motion Hearing on 7/6/16 before Judge Libby. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #82 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff Lyndon Jackson's claims are dismissed, with prejudice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motions referred to Jason B Libby. by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/1/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Lyndon jackson's Claims, With Prejudice Motions referred to Jason B Libby. by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/1/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ADVISORY by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed.(Pipitone, Daniel)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER. Defts shall designate an alternate plaintiff for purposes of discovery no later than 5:00 p.m. on 7/8/16. Discovery regarding the alternate plaintiff is extended and shall be completed by 8/19/16. Should Defts seek sanction or other relief as to Pltff Lyndon Jackson, the Defts may file a written motion seeking appropriate relief no later than 7/11/16. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter Deft 4JLJ, LLC's Amended Answer as a separate entry on the Court's docket. (Clerk's note: please see DE 79, with file date of 5/10/16, for the Amended Answer) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE held on 7/6/2016. Discussion held regarding issues obtaining deposition of Plaintiff Jackson. Court orders parties to confer and select a substitute plaintiff for purposes of discovery. Defendants to select substitute plaintiff by 7/8/16 and parties to complete discovery on substitute plaintiff on or about 8/19/16. Order to be entered. Discussion held regarding other matters. Appearances: James Burdett Moulton. Brenna Lermon Hill. (Digital # 10:08:00)(ERO:judy alvarez), filed.(kbledsoe, 2)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 APPENDIX re: #73 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix U part 1, #2 Appendix U part 2, #3 Appendix U part 3, #4 Appendix V part 1, #5 Appendix V part 2, #6 Appendix V part 3, #7 Appendix V part 4)(Moulton, James)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 APPENDIX re: #73 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix O part 2, #2 Appendix O part 3, #3 Appendix O part 4, #4 Appendix O part 5, #5 Appendix O part 6, #6 Appendix P, #7 Appendix Q, #8 Appendix R, #9 Appendix S Part 1, #10 Appendix S part 2)(Moulton, James)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 APPENDIX re: #73 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix J part 2, #2 Appendix J Part 3, #3 Appendix K part 1, #4 Appendix K part 2, #5 Appendix L, #6 Appendix M, #7 Appendix N part 1, #8 Appendix N part 2)(Moulton, James)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 APPENDIX re: #73 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix E part 2, #2 Appendix F, #3 Appendix G Part 1, #4 Appendix G Part 2, #5 Appendix H, #6 Appendix I Part 1, #7 Appendix I Part 2, #8 Appendix J Part 1, #9 Appendix J Part 2, #10 Appendix J Part 3)(Moulton, James)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 BRIEF re: #73 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix Contents, #2 Appendix A part 1, #3 Appendix A part 2, #4 Appendix B part 1, #5 Appendix B part 2, #6 Appendix B part 3, #7 Appendix B part 4, #8 Appendix C Part 1, #9 Appendix C Part 2, #10 Appendix C Part 3, #11 Appendix C Part 4, #12 Appendix D)(Moulton, James)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment Motions referred to Jason B Libby. by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/26/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE OF SETTING. Parties notified. Telephonic Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/6/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. ***SPECIAL INSTRUCTIONS TO COUNSEL: Parties must call into the Courts meet-me-line call in number of 713-250-5332. This line will be open 5 minutes prior to the hearing. Once you call the number, you will be connected to the meet-me-line; there will be silence so please hold until the Case Manager calls in to connect all parties. Everyone must be on a land line. No cell phones or speaker phones are permitted. If more than one attorney/party is on the line, for clarity of the record, please state you name when responding to the Court. THESE CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS WILL ONLY BE PROVIDED IN THIS ELECTRONIC NOTICE *** (kbledsoe, 2)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Withdrawal re: #70 MOTION to Compel by 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION to Compel Motions referred to Jason B Libby. by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Proposed Order to Motion to Compel, #12 Proposed Order to Motion to Dismiss)(Pipitone, Daniel)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of De-Designation of John Robert Manville as a Testifying Expert Witness re: #67 Designation of Expert Witness List by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Pipitone, Daniel)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Vacation Letter by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Moulton, James)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pipitone, Daniel)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order ***Telephone call from Mr. Moulton requesting emergency hearing. Matter referred to Judge Ellington, filed. (grogan, 2)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington. STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DEPOSITION ISSUES held on 6/14/2016. Mr. Moulton and Mr. Harvey addressed the court. Court ordered- She will not limit deposition testimony at this time. Appearances: Michael A Harvey, James Burdett Moulton.(Digital # 4:03-4:27)(ERO:Genay Rogan), filed.(legarza, 2)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STATEMENT of Intent Regarding Mediation by 4JLJ, LLC, filed.(Pipitone, Daniel)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE Statement of Intent Regarding Mediation by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Flores Guadalupe, Jr, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Moulton, James)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action by Flores Guadalupe, Jr, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Moulton, James)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger S. Braugh, Jr., Craig M. Sico, Jeffrey H. Richter on behalf of 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Braugh, Roger)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE; granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time Discovery due by 6/16/2016..(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Discovery DeadlineMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/13/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harvey, Michael)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AMENDED ANSWER to #33 First Amended Collective Action Complaint by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (lcayce, 2)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Amend; denying as moot #49 Motion for Extension of Time; denying #51 Motion to Strike.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING held on 5/10/2016 re: #45 MOTION to Amend, #51 MOTION to Strike #50 Surreply to Motion, , #49 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Discovery Deadline and Modify the Current Scheduling Order in Light of Plaintiffs' Late Joinder of Defendant Jalufka. Discussion held regarding pending motions. Arguments heard. Court grants Defendant 4JLJ's motion for leave to file amended answer. Court denies Plaintiff's motion to strike Defendant's sur-reply. Motion to amend scheduling order has been withdrawn. Court advises parties that any replies and sur-replies are limited to 5 pages and they do not need leave of Court to file them. Court grants Attorney Moulton permission to file a revised motion for summary judgment and if filed, Court instructions Plaintiff's counsel to clarify that it replaces the previously filed motion for summary judgment and Defense counsel will have to file a response again. Appearances: Michael A Harvey. James Burdett Moulton.(Digital # 11:32:37-11:57:37)(ERO:judy alvarez), filed.(kbledsoe, 2) Modified on 5/10/2016 (kbledsoe, 2).
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF RESETTING (TIME CHANGE) as to #45 MOTION to Amend, #51 MOTION to Strike #50 Surreply to Motion, , #49 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Discovery Deadline and Modify the Current Scheduling Order in Light of Plaintiffs' Late Joinder of Defendant Jalufka. Parties notified. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2016 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. ***SPECIAL INSTRUCTIONS TO COUNSEL: Parties must call into the Courts meet-me-line phone number of 713-250-5332. This line will be open 5 minutes prior to the hearing. Once you call the number, you will be connected to the meet-me-line; there will be silence so please hold until the Case Manager calls in to connect all parties. Everyone must be on a land line. No cell phones or speaker phones are permitted. If more than one attorney/party is on the line, for clarity of the record, please state your name when responding to the Court. THESE CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS WILL ONLY BE PROVIDED IN THIS ELECTRONIC NOTICE.*** (kbledsoe, 2)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY in Support of #51 MOTION to Strike #50 Surreply to Motion, , filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Moulton, James)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF SETTING as to #45 MOTION to Amend, #51 MOTION to Strike #50 Surreply to Motion, , #49 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Discovery Deadline and Modify the Current Scheduling Order in Light of Plaintiffs' Late Joinder of Defendant Jalufka. Parties notified. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby, filed. ***SPECIAL INSTRUCTIONS TO COUNSEL: Parties must call into the Courts meet-me-line phone number of 713-250-5332. This line will be open 5 minutes prior to the hearing. Once you call the number, you will be connected to the meet-me-line; there will be silence so please hold until the Case Manager calls in to connect all parties. Everyone must be on a land line. No cell phones or speaker phones are permitted. If more than one attorney/party is on the line, for clarity of the record, please state your name when responding to the Court. THESE CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS WILL ONLY BE PROVIDED IN THIS ELECTRONIC NOTICE.*** (kbledsoe, 2)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY to #49 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Discovery Deadline and Modify the Current Scheduling Order in Light of Plaintiffs' Late Joinder of Defendant Jalufka and Notice of Withdrawal of His Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Modify the Current Scheduling Order in Light of Plaintiffs' Late Joinder of Defendant Jalufka, filed by John Jalufka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pipitone, Daniel)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RESPONSE to #49 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Discovery Deadline and Modify the Current Scheduling Order in Light of Plaintiffs' Late Joinder of Defendant Jalufka filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition to #51 MOTION to Strike #50 Surreply to Motion, , filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pipitone, Daniel)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY to Response to #45 MOTION to Amend, filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Bullock, Kenneth)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Harvey on behalf of 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Harvey, Michael)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION to Strike #50 Surreply to Motion, Motions referred to Jason B. Libby. by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order The Court hereby amends the previously entered scheduling order to include the following:Any party wishing to make any discovery motions should arrange for a premotion conference with the Court before the preparation and submission of any motion papers. That includes a motion to compel, to quash, or for protection. Email Mrs. Cortez at Brandy_Cortez@txs.uscourts.gov to arrange for a premotion conference. Notify your adversary of the date and time for the conference., filed. (dkellyadi, 4)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SURREPLY to #37 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Proposed Order)(Pipitone, Daniel)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Discovery Deadline and Modify the Current Scheduling Order in Light of Plaintiffs' Late Joinder of Defendant JalufkaMotions referred to Jason B. Libby. by John Jalufka, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pipitone, Daniel)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition to #45 MOTION to Amend, filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Price, Jeffery)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by John Jalufka, filed.(Pipitone, Daniel)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY in Support of #37 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Moulton, James)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Amend Motions referred to Jason B. Libby. by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/19/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Pipitone, Daniel)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE to #37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Pipitone, Daniel)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery R. Price on behalf of Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Price, Jeffery)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery R. Price on behalf of Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, filed. (Price, Jeffery)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allison E. Moore and Keith B Sieczkowski terminated. Daniel D. Pipitone substituted as counsel for 4JLJ, LLC d/b/a J4 Oilfield Services and John Jalufka.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PROPOSED ORDER re: #39 MOTION for Keith B. Sieczkowski to Withdraw as Attorney, filed.(Sieczkowski, Keith)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Keith B. Sieczkowski to Withdraw as AttorneyMotions referred to Jason B. Libby. by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/8/2016. (Sieczkowski, Keith)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 BRIEF re: #37 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix Contents, #2 Appendix 001-009, #3 Appendix 010-052, #4 Appendix 053-055, #5 Appendix 056-057, #6 Appendix 058-070, #7 Appendix 071-084, #8 Appendix 085-089, #9 Appendix 090-125)(Moulton, James)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motions referred to Jason B. Libby. by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Cameron Dodson, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Blake Morin, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Julio Quintanilla, Julio Quintanillo, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action by Blake Morin, Cameron Dodson, Julio Quintanilla, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moulton, James)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to John Jalufka served on 2/8/2016, answer due 4/8/2016, filed.(Moulton, James)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by 4JLJ, LLC, filed.(Moore, Allison)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 First AMENDED COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against 4JLJ, LLC, John Jalufka filed by Joshua Edwards. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Joshua Edwards.(mserpa, 2)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Amend.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE Joint Advisory Regarding Designated Representative Plaintiffs by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. (Moulton, James)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint Motions referred to Jason B. Libby. by Israel Banda, Guadalupe Buitron, Mark Canfield, Abel Castaneda, Anthony Chapa, Ethan Clendenen, Roberto DeAlejandro, Joshua Edwards, Fred Esquivel, Larnell Fitzpatrick, Ernesto Flores, Armando Garcia, Francisco Gutierrez, Lyndon Jackson, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Jose Losoya, Nefi Luna, Juan Mares, Ricky Martin, Jaime Mora, Humberto J Morales, Luis Moreno, Raul Moreno, Miguel Noyola, Michael Overstreet, Cosme Perez, Michael Perez, Steve Poff, Jose Rene Ramirez, Eric Riojas, Macedonia Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Michael Sandoval, Andres Villarreal, Daniel Ybarra, Robert Zarate, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action by Macedonia Rodriguez, Raul Moreno, Mark Canfield, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Moulton, James)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Corrective Entry: #28 Notice (Other) was recorded on the wrong docket, filed. Filed in error per A. Moore's office. (amireles, 2)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 (FILED IN ERROR)NOTICE (First Supplemental) of Selected Plaintiffs for Limited Discovery regarding the Motor Carrier Exemption by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Moore, Allison) Modified on 1/11/2016 (amireles, 2).
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER Jury Trial set for 11/14/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2016 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 5/13/2016. Deft Expert Witness List due by 6/14/2016. Demand Letter due by 5/31/2016 Mediation due by 6/9/2016. Discovery due by 6/9/2016. Status Conference set for 8/3/2016 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/11/2016. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/5/2016. Objections due by 10/28/2016 Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. The parties are ORDERED to file an advisory with the Court listing the ten representative Plaintiffs by January 21, 2016. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby. TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/7/2016. Discussion held regarding status of case and number of opt-in plaintiffs. Deadlines discussed. Scheduling order to be entered. Appearances: James Burdett Moulton. Keith B Sieczkowski. Allison E. Moore. (Digital # 10:38:40-10:53:43)(ERO:leticia garza), filed.(kbledsoe, 2)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF RESETTING (TIME CHANGE ONLY). Parties notified. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/7/2016 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby, filed. ***SPECIAL INSTRUCTIONS TO COUNSEL: Parties must call into the Courts meet-me-line call in number of 713-250-5332. This line will be open 5 minutes prior to the hearing. Once you call the number, you will be connected to the meet-me-line; there will be silence so please hold until the Case Manager calls in to connect all parties. Everyone must be on a land line. No cell phones or speaker phones are permitted. If more than one attorney/party is on the line, for clarity of the record, please state you name when responding to the Court. THESE CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS WILL ONLY BE PROVIDED IN THIS ELECTRONIC NOTICE ***(kbledsoe, 2)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action by Guadalupe Buitron, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Moulton, James)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Vacation Letter by 4JLJ, LLC, filed. (Moore, Allison)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action by Cosme Perez, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Moulton, James)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action by Ethan Clendenen, Michael Perez, Juan Ricardo Lopez, Lyndon Jackson, Israel Banda, Luis Moreno, Roberto DeAlejandro, Miguel Noyola, Jose Losoya, Larnell Fitzpatrick, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Moulton, James)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action by Abel Castaneda, Andres Villarreal, Anthony Chapa, Armando Garcia, Christopher Sanchez, Cipriano Sanchez, Daniel Ybarra, Eric Riojas, Fred Esquivel, Jaime Mora, Jose Rene Ramirez, Juan Mares, Michael Sandoval, Michael Overstreet, Nefi Luna, Pedro Rodriguez, Robert Zarate, Steve Poff, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Moulton, James)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 1/7/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby, filed. (kbledsoe, 2)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION granting #6 Motion.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby. INITIAL CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARING held on 10/9/2015 re: #6 MOTION for Notice to Potential Plaintiffs and Limited Expedited Discovery. Discussion held and arguments heard. Court grants, in part, the motion to certify class. Court approves the notice form, attached as exhibit B. Deadlines set in open court. Order to be entered. Appearances: Keith B Sieczkowski, James Burdett Moulton.(Digital # 3:07:36-4:07:54)(ERO:frenchie carbia), filed.(kbledsoe, 2)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF RESETTING (TIME CHANGE ONLY). Parties notified. Initial Conference and Motion Hearing as to #6 MOTION for Notice to Potential Plaintiffs and Limited Expedited Discovery set for 10/9/2015 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby, filed. ***Court will hear oral arguments on the plaintiff's motion for conditional certification (d.e. 6). Attorneys are to appear in person.*** (kbledsoe, 2)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF SETTING. Parties notified. Initial Conference and Motion Hearing as to #6 MOTION for Notice to Potential Plaintiffs and Limited Expedited Discovery set for 10/9/2015 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby, filed. Court will hear oral arguments on the plaintiff's motion for conditional certification (d.e. 6). Attorneys are to appear in person. (kbledsoe, 2)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order ***IPTC set for October 9, 2015 has been canceled. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Libby for pretrial matters. Hearing to be reset before Judge Libby., filed. (bcortez, 2)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY in Support of #6 MOTION Motion for Notice to Potential Plaintiffs and Limited Expedited Discovery, filed by Joshua Edwards. (Moulton, James)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by 4JLJ, LLC, filed.(Moore, Allison)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION Motion for Notice to Potential Plaintiffs and Limited Expedited Discovery, filed by 4JLJ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Denying Plaintiffs Motion, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion)(Moore, Allison)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to #6 MOTION Motion for Notice to Potential Plaintiffs and Limited Expedited Discovery by Joshua Edwards, filed.(Moulton, James)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Ernesto Flores by Joshua Edwards, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Moulton, James)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Ricky Martin by Joshua Edwards, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Moulton, James)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE Certificate of Discovery Initial Disclosures by Joshua Edwards, filed. (Moulton, James)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE Of Additional Consents by Joshua Edwards, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Moulton, James)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION Motion for Notice to Potential Plaintiffs and Limited Expedited Discovery by Joshua Edwards, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/15/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" through "C", #2 Proposed Order)(Moulton, James)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by 4JLJ, LLC, filed.(Sieczkowski, Keith)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by 4JLJ, LLC, filed.(Sieczkowski, Keith)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Joshua Edwards, filed.(Moulton, James)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/9/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-15127165) filed by Joshua Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moulton, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. 4JLJ, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Edwards
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Gutierrez
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humberto J Morales
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Martin
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Flores
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Castaneda
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Villarreal
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Chapa
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Garcia
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sanchez
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cipriano Sanchez
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ybarra
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Riojas
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Esquivel
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Mora
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Rene Ramirez
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Mares
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sandoval
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Overstreet
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nefi Luna
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Rodriguez
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Zarate
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Poff
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Clendenen
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Perez
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ricardo Lopez
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndon Jackson
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Banda
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Moreno
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto DeAlejandro
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Noyola
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Losoya
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larnell Fitzpatrick
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cosme Perez
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Buitron
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Macedonia Rodriguez
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Moreno
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Canfield
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Morin
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Dodson
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Quintanilla
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Quintanillo
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flores Guadalupe, Jr.
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rodrigo Tarango Jr.
Represented By: James Burdett Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4JLJ, LLC doing business as J4 Oilfield Services
Represented By: Brenna R Lermon
Represented By: Kenneth Wayne Bullock, II
Represented By: Roger Sherman Braugh, Jr
Represented By: Keith B Sieczkowski
Represented By: Allison E. Moore
Represented By: Daniel Douglas Pipitone
Represented By: Michael A Harvey
Represented By: Nolan C Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jalufka
Represented By: Daniel Douglas Pipitone
Represented By: Michael A Harvey
Represented By: Nolan C Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?