Shafer v. Lumpkin et al
Plaintiff: Richard Scott Shafer
Defendant: Bobby Lumpkin, Senior Warden E. Holmes and Janet Salles
Case Number: 2:2023cv00053
Filed: February 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason B Libby
Referring Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2023 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Richard Scott Shafer on 04/05/2023 re: #12 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS, filed.(MaraGonzales, 2)
April 10, 2023 Filing 15 OBJECTIONS to #12 Memorandum and Recommendation To Retain Case and Dismiss Certain Claims, filed by Richard Scott Shafer. (MaraGonzales, 2)
April 10, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE TO THE COURT re: #11 Order by Richard Scott Shafer, filed. (Attachments: #1 TDCJ Correspondance/Contraband Denial Form, #2 Envelope)(MaraGonzales, 2)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR SERVICE ON TX ATTORNEY GENERAL (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) (Attachments: #1 (Copy of Complaint and Memorandum and Recommendation)) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
March 28, 2023 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint Objections to M&R due by 4/11/2023(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Copy of TDCJ Correspondence Denial due by 4/4/2023 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby). Parties notified. (MaraGonzales, 2)
March 21, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. EVIDENTIARY / SPEARS HEARING held on 3/21/2023 by video conference. Plaintiff sworn. Discussion held regarding lawsuit filed. Appearances:Richard Scott Shafer.(Digital # 10:32-11:19)(ERO:mara gonzales), filed.(KendraPearson, 2)
March 9, 2023 Filing 10 PLAINTIFF'S AMICUS CURIAE ADVISORY by Richard Scott Shafer, filed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (MaraGonzales, 2)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion Requesting Court's Local Rules. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
March 3, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION Requesting Court's Local RulesMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by Richard Scott Shafer, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/24/2023. (bcortez, 2)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing. Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/21/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. (MaraGonzales, 2)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Partial Filing Fee and Collection Order, as to Richard Scott Shafer; Granted #4 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. Copy Mailed to TDCJ Court Collections/Inmate Trust Fund. (MaraGonzales, 2)
February 16, 2023 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Richard Scott Shafer, filed. (SashaOzuna, 2)
February 16, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma PauperisMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by Richard Scott Shafer, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/9/2023. (SashaOzuna, 2)
February 16, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SashaOzuna, 2)
February 16, 2023 Filing 2 CLERKS NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (SashaOzuna, 2)
February 16, 2023 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Richard Scott Shafer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(SashaOzuna, 2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shafer v. Lumpkin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Scott Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Warden E. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Salles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?