UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. Flint Hills Resources Ingleside, LLC
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and STATE OF TEXAS
Defendant: Flint Hills Resources Ingleside, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00079
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319 Clean Water Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT DECREE/FINAL JUDGMENT. Upon approval and entry of this Consent Decree by the Court, this ConsentDecree shall constitute a final judgment of the Court. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified. (lg2)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Entry of Order. The Court will sign and enter the Consent Decree (Doc. 2-1).(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified. (lg2)
May 24, 2024 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Unopposed Motion to Enter Consent Decree by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/14/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Barbeau, Jason)
April 23, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by STATE OF TEXAS, filed. (Reeder, Clark)
April 23, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Barbeau, Jason)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/10/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified. (ntg2)
April 8, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Clark C. Reeder on behalf of STATE OF TEXAS, filed. (Reeder, Clark)
April 8, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T. Barbeau on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Barbeau, Jason)
April 8, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF LODGING CONSENT DECREE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Consent Decree) (Barbeau, Jason)
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Flint Hills Resources Ingleside, LLC filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barbeau, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. Flint Hills Resources Ingleside, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jason T Barbeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Clark Christopher Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint Hills Resources Ingleside, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?