Day et al v. Lumpkin
Plaintiff: George Wesley Savro, Shannon Day, Chrles Ray Jones, Kennet James Price and Michael Charles Soto
Defendant: Bobby Lumpkin
Case Number: 3:2021cv00015
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Dale Curtis re: #9 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to For a Preliminary Injunction and TRO, filed.(agould, 3)
March 19, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Jimmy Schoubroek re: #9 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to For a Preliminary Injunction and TRO, filed.(agould, 3)
March 19, 2021 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Kevin Goodwin re: #9 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to For a Preliminary Injunction and TRO, filed.(agould, 3)
March 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to For a Preliminary Injunction and TRO by Shannon Day, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(agould, 3)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Shannon Day re: conditions at the unit, filed. (ckrus, 4)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE to Prisoner. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (bgoolsby, 4)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Shannon Day re: return receipts for documents filed. (ltrevino, 3)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Shannon Day re: Error in Filing 3:21cv22, filed. (agould, 3)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Shannon Day, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/3/2021. (agould, 3)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Shannon Day. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 3/4/2021, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix) (bgoolsby, 4)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Bobby Lumpkin (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Shannon Day, (ltrevino, 3).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Day et al v. Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Wesley Savro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrles Ray Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennet James Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Charles Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?