Feds for Medical Freedom et al v. Biden, Jr. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Feds for Medical Freedom, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Highland Engineering, Inc., Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jose Delgado, Jordan DeManss, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright and Patrick Mendoza York
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., The United States of America, Pete Buttigieg, Department of Transportation, Janet Yellen, Department of Treasury, Deb Haaland, Department of Interior, Bill Nelson, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Kilolo Kijakazi, Social Security Administration, Marcia Fudge, Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD), Denis McDonough, Department of Veterans Affairs, Lloyd J. Austin III, Department of Defense, Merrick B. Garland, Department of Justice, Alejandro Mayorkas, Department of Homeland Security, Samantha Power, United States Agency For International Development, Tom Vilsack, Department of Agriculture, Jennifer M. Granholm, Department of Energy, Antony Blinken, Department of State, William J. Burns, Central Intelligence Agency, Jeffrey Zients, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Lesley A. Field, Matthew C. Blum, Jeffrey A. Koses, John M. Tenaglia, Karla S. Jackson, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Shalanda D. Young, Office of Management and Budget, Robin Carnahan, General Services Administration, Kiran Ahuja, Office of Personnel Management, Avril Haines, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Daniel Hokanson, National Guard Bureau, Gina M. Raimondo, Department of Commerce, Secretary of Labor Marty Walsh and Department of Labor
Counter Claimant: Marcus William Thornton
Claimant: Joseph Charles Ainsworth
Case Number: 3:2021cv00356
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by John M. Tenaglia, The United States of America, United States Agency For International Development, Tom Vilsack, Marty Walsh, Janet Yellen, Shalanda D. Young, Jeffrey Zients, Department of Agriculture, Department of Commerce, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD), Department of Interior, Department of Justice, Department of Labor, Department of State, Department of Transportation, Department of Treasury, Department of Veterans Affairs, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, Marcia Fudge, Merrick B. Garland, General Services Administration, Jennifer M. Granholm, Deb Haaland, Avril Haines, Daniel Hokanson, Karla S. Jackson, Office of Management and Budget, Office of Personnel Management, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Samantha Power, Gina M. Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Antony Blinken, Matthew C. Blum, William J. Burns, Pete Buttigieg, Robin Carnahan, Central Intelligence Agency, Kilolo Kijakazi, Jeffrey A. Koses, Alejandro Mayorkas, Denis McDonough, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Guard Bureau, Bill Nelson, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gillingham, James)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #37 Notice of Appeal, to Jordan E. Pratt. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 22-40043), filed.(mperez, 1)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #37 Notice of Appeal to Charles W. Scarborough. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 22-40043), filed.(mperez, 1)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying #40 Motion to Stay.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order of USCA - PER CURIAM re: #37 Notice of Appeal; USCA No. 22-40043. It is ORDERED that Appellant's opposed motion to stay the injunction pending appeal is CARRIED WITH THE CASE, filed. (rnieto, 1)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #37 Notice of Appeal, USCA No. 22-40043, filed.(mperez, 1)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #37 Notice of Appeal to S. Carroll; G. Hamilton; R. T. McCotter; J. Pratt; C. Ross. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 22-40043), filed.(mperez, 1)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition to #40 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal, filed by Feds for Medical Freedom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 40)(McCotter, R.)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Antony Blinken, Matthew C. Blum, William J. Burns, Pete Buttigieg, Robin Carnahan, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Agriculture, Department of Commerce, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD), Department of Interior, Department of Justice, Department of Labor, Department of State, Department of Transportation, Department of Treasury, Department of Veterans Affairs, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, Marcia Fudge, Merrick B. Garland, General Services Administration, Jennifer M. Granholm, Deb Haaland, Avril Haines, Daniel Hokanson, Karla S. Jackson, Kilolo Kijakazi, Jeffrey A. Koses, Alejandro Mayorkas, Denis McDonough, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Guard Bureau, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Office of Personnel Management, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Samantha Power, Gina M. Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Social Security Administration, The United States of America, United States Agency For International Development, Tom Vilsack, Marty Walsh, Janet Yellen, Shalanda D. Young, Jeffrey Zients, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jason Miller, #2 Proposed Order)(Gillingham, James)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 22-40043 re: #37 Notice of Appeal, filed.(mperez, 1)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by James Gillingham. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office regarding Hearing on Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction on January 13, 2022 before Judge Brown. (No transcript is needed). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Laura Wells. This order form relates to the following: #31 Transcript, #37 Notice of Appeal,,,,, Minute Entry,, filed. (Gillingham, James)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #37 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: GOV, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (mperez, 1)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Appeal Review Notes re: #37 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: GOV. The appellant is a U.S. government agency, and no fee is required.Hearings were held in the case - transcripts were produced. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 1, filed.(mperez, 1)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #36 Memorandum and Order by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Antony Blinken, Matthew C. Blum, William J. Burns, Pete Buttigieg, Robin Carnahan, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Agriculture, Department of Commerce, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD), Department of Interior, Department of Justice, Department of Labor, Department of State, Department of Transportation, Department of Treasury, Department of Veterans Affairs, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, Marcia Fudge, Merrick B. Garland, General Services Administration, Jennifer M. Granholm, Deb Haaland, Avril Haines, Daniel Hokanson, Karla S. Jackson, Kilolo Kijakazi, Jeffrey A. Koses, Alejandro Mayorkas, Denis McDonough, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Guard Bureau, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Office of Personnel Management, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Samantha Power, Gina M. Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Social Security Administration, John M. Tenaglia, The United States of America, United States Agency For International Development, Tom Vilsack, Marty Walsh, Janet Yellen, Shalanda D. Young, Jeffrey Zients, filed. (Gillingham, James)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granted in part and denied in part #3 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Additional Exhibits re: #3 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Feds for Medical Freedom, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 39)(McCotter, R.)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #31 Transcript, #30 Transcript,. Party notified, filed. (lusmith, 3)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE (SUPPLEMENTAL) OF RELATED CASES re: #4 Notice (Other),,,, by Feds for Medical Freedom, filed. (McCotter, R.)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE to #29 Notice (Other) - Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Antony Blinken, Matthew C. Blum, William J. Burns, Pete Buttigieg, Robin Carnahan, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Agriculture, Department of Commerce, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD), Department of Interior, Department of Justice, Department of Labor, Department of State, Department of Transportation, Department of Treasury, Department of Veterans Affairs, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, Marcia Fudge, Merrick B. Garland, General Services Administration, Jennifer M. Granholm, Deb Haaland, Avril Haines, Daniel Hokanson, Karla S. Jackson, Kilolo Kijakazi, Jeffrey A. Koses, Alejandro Mayorkas, Denis McDonough, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Guard Bureau, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Office of Personnel Management, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Samantha Power, Gina M. Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Social Security Administration, John M. Tenaglia, The United States of America, United States Agency For International Development, Tom Vilsack, Marty Walsh, Janet Yellen, Shalanda D. Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Gillingham, James)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT re: Corrected Hearing on Motion held on January 13, 2022 before Judge Jeffrey V Brown. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura Wells. Ordering Party Mr. James Gillingham Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2022., filed. (lwells, )
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT re: Telephonic Hearing on Motion held on January 13, 2022 before Judge Jeffrey V Brown. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura Wells. Ordering Party Mr. James Gillingham Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2022., filed. (lwells, )
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities by Feds for Medical Freedom, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SCOTUS OSHA Opinion, #2 Exhibit SCOTUS CMS Opinion)(McCotter, R.)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey V Brown. Proceedings held on 1/13/2022. Preliminary Injunction hearing held taken under advisement. Appearances: James Garland Gillingham, R. Trent McCotter.(Court Reporter: Laura Wells), filed.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Jared M. Kelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Michael B. Buschbacher to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Jonathan A. Berry to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Seal.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY in Support of #3 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York. (McCotter, R.)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Seal ECF 21, Ex 18 by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Antony Blinken, Matthew C. Blum, William J. Burns, Pete Buttigieg, Robin Carnahan, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Agriculture, Department of Commerce, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD), Department of Interior, Department of Justice, Department of Labor, Department of State, Department of Transportation, Department of Treasury, Department of Veterans Affairs, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, Marcia Fudge, Merrick B. Garland, General Services Administration, Jennifer M. Granholm, Deb Haaland, Avril Haines, Daniel Hokanson, Karla S. Jackson, Kilolo Kijakazi, Jeffrey A. Koses, Alejandro Mayorkas, Denis McDonough, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Guard Bureau, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Office of Personnel Management, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Samantha Power, Gina M. Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Social Security Administration, John M. Tenaglia, The United States of America, United States Agency For International Development, Tom Vilsack, Marty Walsh, Janet Yellen, Shalanda D. Young, Jeffrey Zients, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Redacted Ex 18)(Gillingham, James)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Antony Blinken, Matthew C. Blum, William J. Burns, Pete Buttigieg, Robin Carnahan, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Agriculture, Department of Commerce, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD), Department of Interior, Department of Justice, Department of Labor, Department of State, Department of Transportation, Department of Treasury, Department of Veterans Affairs, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, Marcia Fudge, Merrick B. Garland, General Services Administration, Jennifer M. Granholm, Deb Haaland, Avril Haines, Daniel Hokanson, Karla S. Jackson, Kilolo Kijakazi, Jeffrey A. Koses, Alejandro Mayorkas, Denis McDonough, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Guard Bureau, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Office of Personnel Management, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Samantha Power, Gina M. Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Social Security Administration, John M. Tenaglia, The United States of America, United States Agency For International Development, Tom Vilsack, Marty Walsh, Janet Yellen, Shalanda D. Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cunningham Decl., #2 Exhibit 2 - Carpenter Decl., #3 Exhibit 3 - Cordero Decl., #4 Exhibit 4 - Arbeen Decl., #5 Exhibit 5 - Jackson Decl., #6 Exhibit 6 - Frost Decl., #7 Exhibit 7 - Christie Decl., #8 Exhibit 8 - Ramirez Decl., #9 Exhibit 9 - Moorman Decl., #10 Exhibit 10 - Bently Decl., #11 Exhibit 11 - Hankinson Decl., #12 Exhibit 12 - Martinez Decl., #13 Exhibit 13 - Nieto Decl., #14 Exhibit 14 - Glading Decl., #15 Exhibit 15 - Sternitzke Decl., #16 Exhibit 16 - Harris Decl., #17 Exhibit 17 - Greaney Decl., #18 Exhibit 18 - Hearn Decl., #19 Exhibit 19 - Ballance Decl., #20 Proposed Order)(Gillingham, James)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Antony Blinken, Matthew C. Blum, William J. Burns, Pete Buttigieg, Robin Carnahan, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Agriculture, Department of Commerce, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD), Department of Interior, Department of Justice, Department of Labor, Department of State, Department of Transportation, Department of Treasury, Department of Veterans Affairs, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, Marcia Fudge, Merrick B. Garland, General Services Administration, Jennifer M. Granholm, Deb Haaland, Avril Haines, Daniel Hokanson, Karla S. Jackson, Kilolo Kijakazi, Jeffrey A. Koses, Alejandro Mayorkas, Denis McDonough, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Guard Bureau, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Office of Personnel Management, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Samantha Power, Gina M. Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Social Security Administration, John M. Tenaglia, The United States of America, United States Agency For International Development, Tom Vilsack, Marty Walsh, Janet Yellen, Shalanda D. Young, Jeffrey Zients, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gillingham, James)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Jared M. Kelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2022. (McCotter, R.)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Michael B. Buschbacher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2022. (McCotter, R.)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Jonathan A. Berry to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2022. (McCotter, R.)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE (Second) of Additional Exhibits re: #3 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 36, #2 Exhibit 37, #3 Exhibit 38)(McCotter, R.)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #14 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (lusmith, 3)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT re: Telephonic Status Conference held on January 4, 2022 before Judge Jeffrey V Brown. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura Wells. Ordering Party Mr. James Gillingham Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2022., filed. (lwells, )
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Additional Exhibits re: #3 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 34, #2 Exhibit 35)(McCotter, R.)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Setting re: #3 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2022 at 10:30 AM in by telephone before Judge Jeffrey V Brown, filed. (GeorgeCardenas, 4)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey V Brown. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/4/2022. Agreed deadlines will stay in place. Hearing will be set for January 13th at 10:30am. Appearances:James Gillingham. R. Trent McCotter.(Court Reporter: Laura Wells), filed.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Setting re: #10 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 10:30 AM in by telephone before Judge Jeffrey V Brown, filed. (GeorgeCardenas, 4)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit McCotter)(McCotter, R.)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Agreed MOTION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCotter, R.)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York, filed.(McCotter, R.)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/9/2022 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York, filed. (McCotter, R.)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 EO14043, #2 Exhibit 2 Sept. 13 Task Force Employees, #3 Exhibit 3 Task Force FAQ Employees, #4 Exhibit 4 Oct. 1 OPM, #5 Exhibit 5 Agency Mandates, #6 Exhibit 6 EO14042, #7 Exhibit 7 Sept. 24 Task Force Contractors, #8 Exhibit 8 Sept. 28 First OMB Rule, #9 Exhibit 9 Sept. 30 FAR Council, #10 Exhibit 10 Nov. 10 Second OMB Rule, #11 Exhibit 11 Nov. 10 Task Force, #12 Exhibit 12 Chretien Affidavit, #13 Exhibit 13 Beebe Affidavit, #14 Exhibit 14 F4MF Affidavit, #15 Exhibit 15 Armbrust Affidavit, #16 Exhibit 16 Ball Affidavit, #17 Exhibit 17 Biggs Affidavit, #18 Exhibit 18 Clark Affidavit, #19 Exhibit 19 Dantuma Affidavit, #20 Exhibit 20 Divilbiss Affidavit, #21 Exhibit 21 Green Affidavit, #22 Exhibit 22 Klosterman Affidavit, #23 Exhibit 23 Lawson Affidavit, #24 Exhibit 24 McComis Affidavit, #25 Exhibit 25 Roberts Affidavit, #26 Exhibit 26 Rucker Reed Affidavit, #27 Exhibit 27 Ryan Affidavit, #28 Exhibit 28 Sams Affidavit, #29 Exhibit 29 Schaecher Affidavit, #30 Exhibit 30 Simpson Affidavit, #31 Exhibit 31 Vrtaric Affidavit, #32 Exhibit 32 Hunter Andrews Affidavit, #33 Proposed Order)(McCotter, R.)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit 84, #85 Exhibit 85, #86 Exhibit 86, #87 Exhibit 87, #88 Exhibit 88, #89 Exhibit 89, #90 Exhibit 90, #91 Exhibit 91, #92 Exhibit 92, #93 Exhibit 93, #94 Exhibit 94, #95 Exhibit 95, #96 Exhibit 96, #97 Exhibit 97, #98 Exhibit 98, #99 Exhibit 99, #100 Exhibit 100, #101 Exhibit 101, #102 Exhibit 102, #103 Exhibit 103, #104 Exhibit 104, #105 Exhibit 105, #106 Exhibit 106, #107 Exhibit 107, #108 Exhibit 108, #109 Exhibit 109, #110 Exhibit 110, #111 Exhibit 111, #112 Exhibit 112, #113 Exhibit 113, #114 Exhibit 114, #115 Exhibit 115, #116 Exhibit 116, #117 Exhibit 117, #118 Exhibit 118, #119 Exhibit 119, #120 Exhibit 120, #121 Exhibit 121, #122 Exhibit 122, #123 Exhibit 123, #124 Exhibit 124, #125 Exhibit 125, #126 Exhibit 126, #127 Exhibit 127, #128 Exhibit 128, #129 Exhibit 129, #130 Exhibit 130, #131 Exhibit 131, #132 Exhibit 132, #133 Exhibit 133, #134 Exhibit 134, #135 Exhibit 135, #136 Exhibit 136, #137 Exhibit 137, #138 Exhibit 138, #139 Exhibit 139, #140 Exhibit 140, #141 Exhibit 141, #142 Exhibit 142, #143 Exhibit 143, #144 Exhibit 144, #145 Exhibit 145, #146 Exhibit 146, #147 Exhibit 147, #148 Exhibit 148, #149 Exhibit 149, #150 Exhibit 150, #151 Exhibit 151, #152 Exhibit 152, #153 Exhibit 153, #154 Exhibit 154, #155 Exhibit 155, #156 Exhibit 156)(McCotter, R.)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27502819) filed by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCotter, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feds for Medical Freedom et al v. Biden, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feds for Medical Freedom
Represented By: Jared M Kelson
Represented By: Jonathan A Berry
Represented By: Michael B Buschbacher
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highland Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Beebe, Jr.
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Armbrust
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. Anne Atkinson
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Badger
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ball
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craigan Biggs
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Brunstetter
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Canales
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Caramenico
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Chamberland
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Clark
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Countryman
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Dantuma
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Delgado
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan DeManss
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Demetriou
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keri Divilbiss
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercer Dunn IV
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Filkins
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Gragg
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryon Green
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas David Green
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Hebert
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Hennemann
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Horn
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey Hunter-Andrews
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tana Johnston
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Klosterman
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lawson
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Lewis
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Magill
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Ann Marceau
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalia Matos
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen May
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven McComis
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Miller
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Moore
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Moores
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Neugebauer
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Nicely
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Carl Petersen
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti Rivera
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Roberts
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Rodman
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Rutledge
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada Ryan
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Charles Sams III
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schaecher
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Schaff
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurtis Simpson
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barrett Smith
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaci ReNee Smith
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarod Smith
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jana Spruce
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tordai
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandor Vigh
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Vrtaric
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Weichel
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wentz
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Wilkerson
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Wright
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Mendoza York
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr.
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Buttigieg
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Transportation
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Yellen
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Interior
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Nelson
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Fudge
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD)
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis McDonough
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd J. Austin III
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Power
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Agency For International Development
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Agriculture
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer M. Granholm
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Energy
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Burns
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Zients
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safer Federal Workforce Task Force
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesley A. Field
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew C. Blum
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Koses
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Tenaglia
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla S. Jackson
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalanda D. Young
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Management and Budget
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Carnahan
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Services Administration
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiran Ahuja
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Personnel Management
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avril Haines
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hokanson
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Guard Bureau
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina M. Raimondo
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Commerce
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Labor Marty Walsh
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Labor
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Marcus William Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joseph Charles Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?