City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust v. Venator Materials PLC et al
Plaintiff: City of Miami General Employees & Sanitation Employees Retirement Trust
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Douglas D. Anderson, Huntsman (Holdings) Netherlands B.V., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc, Sir Robert J. Margetts, Russ R. Stolle, Huntsman Corporation, Huntsman International LLC, Simon Turner, Daniele Ferrari, Stephen Ibbotson, Venator Materials PLC, Peter R. Huntsman, Kathy D Patrick, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC and Kurt D. Ogden
Petitioner: Fresno County Employees Retirement Association and City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System
Case Number: 4:2019cv04266
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Referring Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 50 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Avi Josefson as to City of Miami General Employees & Sanitation Employees Retirement Trust, City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association re: #47 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (RTS; Not Deliverable as Addressed)(sguevara, 4)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES: Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-3494 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-4266 (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
November 8, 2019 Filing 48 Agreed MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-03464 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-04266 by Douglas D. Anderson, Citigroup Global Markets Inc, Daniele Ferrari, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Peter R. Huntsman, Huntsman (Holdings) Netherlands B.V., Huntsman Corporation, Huntsman International LLC, Stephen Ibbotson, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Sir Robert J. Margetts, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Kurt D. Ogden, Kathy D Patrick, Russ R. Stolle, Simon Turner, Venator Materials PLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Behrens, Richard)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4)
October 30, 2019 Filing 46 Case transferred in from New York Southern. Case Number 1:19-cv-07182; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
October 29, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Southern District of Texas (kv)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #44 Proposed Stipulation and Order, filed by City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association, City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. ENDORSEMENT: GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, it is hereby ordered that Defendants shall not be required to answer, move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the existing Complaint in this action and that this action is transferred to the Houston Division of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk of Court is requested to transfer the above-captioned Action and close it on the books of this Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/29/2019) (kv)
October 28, 2019 Filing 44 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust, City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association. (Josefson, Avi)
October 28, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Filing re: #37 MOTION to Appoint City of Miami General Employees & Sanitation Employees Retirement Trust, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association, and City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust, City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Venator LP Order (SD Texas))(Josefson, Avi)
October 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #42 Proposed Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. (ad)
October 15, 2019 Filing 42 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust, City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association. Related Document Number: [ECF No. 41]. (Josefson, Avi) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 15, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #37 MOTION to Appoint City of Miami General Employees & Sanitation Employees Retirement Trust, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association, and City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust, City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association. (Josefson, Avi)
October 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #40 Proposed Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
September 30, 2019 Filing 40 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust, City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association. Related Document Number: [ECF No. 37]. (Josefson, Avi) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 30, 2019 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Avi Josefson in Support re: #37 MOTION to Appoint City of Miami General Employees & Sanitation Employees Retirement Trust, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association, and City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust, City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certifications, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Charts, #3 Exhibit C - Joint Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - PSLRA Notice, #5 Exhibit E - BLB&G Resume)(Josefson, Avi)
September 30, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #37 MOTION to Appoint City of Miami General Employees & Sanitation Employees Retirement Trust, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association, and City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust, City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association. (Josefson, Avi)
September 30, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Appoint City of Miami General Employees & Sanitation Employees Retirement Trust, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association, and City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust, Fresno County Employees Retirement Association, City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System.(Josefson, Avi)
August 1, 2019 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Venator Materials PLC. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stephen Ibbotson. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sir Robert J. Margetts. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Simon Turner. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Russ R. Stolle. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peter R. Huntsman. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kurt D. Ogden. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kathy D. Patrick. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Huntsman (Holdings) Netherlands B.V.. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Huntsman International LLC. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Huntsman Corporation. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Douglas D. Anderson. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniele Ferrari. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Venator Materials PLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stephen Ibbotson, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sir Robert J. Margetts, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simon Turner, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Russ R. Stolle, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peter R. Huntsman, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kurt D. Ogden, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kathy D. Patrick, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Huntsman International LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Huntsman Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Huntsman (Holdings) Netherlands B.V., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Douglas D. Anderson, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daniele Ferrari, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Citigroup Global Markets Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Josefson, Avi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas D. Anderson, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Daniele Ferrari, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Peter R. Huntsman, Huntsman (Holdings) Netherlands B.V., Huntsman Corporation, Huntsman International LLC, Stephen Ibbotson, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Sir Robert J. Margetts, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Kurt D. Ogden, Kathy D. Patrick, Russ R. Stolle, Simon Turner, Venator Materials PLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17350457)Document filed by City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust.(Josefson, Avi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City Of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust v. Venator Materials PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey M Tillotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas D. Anderson
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsman (Holdings) Netherlands B.V.
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M Tillotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey M Tillotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sir Robert J. Margetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russ R. Stolle
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsman Corporation
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsman International LLC
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Turner
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniele Ferrari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Ibbotson
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venator Materials PLC
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter R. Huntsman
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy D Patrick
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M Tillotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt D. Ogden
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Miami General Employees & Sanitation Employees Retirement Trust
Represented By: Avi Josefson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fresno County Employees Retirement Association
Represented By: Avi Josefson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Pontiac General Employees Retirement System
Represented By: Avi Josefson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?