DiCarlo v. Huntsville Memorial Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Martin DiCarlo
Defendant: Stevan Parmar, Brian Collier and Huntsville Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 4:2020cv00886
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying Pauper Status and FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT as to Martin DiCarlo. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Martin DiCarlo re: Do not wish to waive right to proceed before district judge, filed. (sanderson, 4)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (mmapps, 4)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from Texas Eastern. Case Number 9:20-cv-00023; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
March 10, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. (ljw, )
February 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. The Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER this action to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 2/17/20. (ljw, )
February 17, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION REGARDING VENUE. Plaintiff's claims should be transferred to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 2/17/20. (ljw, )
February 10, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (ljw, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Martin DiCarlo. (ljw, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights) against All Defendants, filed by Martin DiCarlo.(ljw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiCarlo v. Huntsville Memorial Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevan Parmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsville Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin DiCarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?