Rosen et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Alan and Judy Rosen, Judy Rosen and Alan Rosen
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Pfizer, Inc, HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., Walgreen Co., Hoffmann-La Roche Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., West Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation, C.R. Walgreen and Company, Roche, CVS, Inc. and CVS Distribution, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv02734
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pawelek, Mary)
September 24, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Hoffmann-La Roche Inc., filed.(Pawelek, Mary)
September 16, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Alan Rosen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siegel, Charles)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Amended MOTION to Stay . Case stayed pending final decision from the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation on whether to transfer this action.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
September 14, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed.(Scott, Robert)
September 14, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., filed.(Scully, John)
September 13, 2021 Filing 17 Amended AMENDED #8 MOTION( Motion Docket Date 10/4/2021.), MOTION to Stay by TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extension of Discovery-Case Management Deadlines - Motion to Stay, #2 Proposed Order Motion to Stay Except HLR Motion to Dismiss)(Scott, Robert)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER STRIKING MOTION TO STAY re: #8 Motion to Stay,, filed by Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Pfizer, Inc, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
September 10, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation, filed.(Smyser, Craig)
September 10, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., filed.(Eash, Katrina)
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Pfizer, Inc, filed.(Hicks, James)
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pfizer, Inc, filed.(Hicks, James)
September 10, 2021 Filing 11 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed.(Scott, Robert)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hoffmann-La Roche Inc., filed.(Pawelek, Mary)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay pending a final decision from Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation to transfer this action to In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, No. 1:17-md-2804,, filed by Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.. (Pawelek, Mary)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 ***STRICKEN PER #16 ORDER***Unopposed MOTION to Stay pending a final decision from Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation to transfer this action to In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, No. 1:17-md-2804, by Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Pfizer, Inc, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Motion to Stay pending a final decision from Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation to transfer this action to In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, No. 1:17-md-2804)(Scott, Robert) Modified on 9/13/2021 (jengonzalez, 4).
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 10/29/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 06/01/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 07/06/2022. Discovery due by 08/23/2022. Mediation due by 11/08/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 09/22/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 09/22/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/08/2022. Docket Call set for 01/23/2023 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (%(username)) (Entered: 09/03/2021)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant may file its answer or other responsive pleading thirty days after the later of: (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand this case; or (2) a final decision from the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation on whether to transfer this action to In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, No 1:17-mc-2804.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Walgreen Co., filed.(Griffis, John)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Hoffmann-La Roche Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pawelek, Mary)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eash, Katrina)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/29/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court 152nd, case number 2021-48225 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26927152) filed by TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A.1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A.2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A.3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A.4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A.5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A.6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A.7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit A.8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit A.9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit A.10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Scott, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosen et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan and Judy Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Rosen
Represented By: Susannah B Chester-Schindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Rosen
Represented By: Charles Stein Siegel
Represented By: Susannah B Chester-Schindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc
Represented By: Edward Donald Burbach
Represented By: James Kenneth Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Jerry D Mason
Represented By: John Philip Griffis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.
Represented By: Mary Renee Pawelek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Philip Scott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: John A Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: John A Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Represented By: Katrina Gallagher Eash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Katrina Gallagher Eash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Walgreen and Company
Represented By: Jerry D Mason
Represented By: John Philip Griffis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roche
Represented By: Mary Renee Pawelek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS, Inc.
Represented By: John A Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: John A Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?