Luvianos et al v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Rebollar Reyes and Margarita Juarez Luvianos
Defendant: Michael Paul, Mark Hazuda, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr, Donald Neufeld and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2019cv00477
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rodolfo Rebollar Reyes as to All Defendants by Margarita Juarez Luvianos, Rodolfo Rebollar Reyes #11 Summons Issued as to USA (Walker Gates, Jennifer) Modified on 6/7/2019 to correct event (td).
June 7, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #13 Certificate of Service. Filer selected wrong event, correction has been made. No further action is required. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (td)
June 7, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines as to all defendants. (td)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to William Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Mark Hazuda, Kevin McAleenan, Donald Neufeld, Michael Paul, U.S. Attorney. (td)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Margarita Juarez Luvianos. (Walker Gates, Jennifer)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Margarita Juarez Luvianos. (Walker Gates, Jennifer)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Margarita Juarez Luvianos. (Walker Gates, Jennifer)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Margarita Juarez Luvianos. (Walker Gates, Jennifer)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Margarita Juarez Luvianos. (Walker Gates, Jennifer)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Margarita Juarez Luvianos. (Walker Gates, Jennifer)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Margarita Juarez Luvianos. (Walker Gates, Jennifer)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Margarita Juarez Luvianos, Rodolfo Rebollar Reyes. (Walker Gates, Jennifer) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/3/2019 to flatten image) (dl).
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document, #4 Sealed Document, #5 Sealed Document, #6 Sealed Document, #7 Sealed Document) (Walker Gates, Jennifer)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12071625), filed by Margarita JUAREZ Luvianos, Rodolfo REBOLLAR REYES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Walker Gates, Jennifer)
May 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
May 3, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Margarita Juarez Luvianos, Rodolfo Rebollar Reyes. (cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luvianos et al v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hazuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Rebollar Reyes
Represented By: Jennifer Walker Gates
Represented By: Jodi Callaway Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Juarez Luvianos
Represented By: Jennifer Walker Gates
Represented By: Jodi Callaway Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?