United States of America v. Petrone
Petitioner: United States Of America
Respondent: John Petrone
Case Number: 1:2019cv00732
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (afd)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Lane: Civil Matters Hearing held on 8/23/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold-ERO.)(afd)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT returned Executed as to John Petrone. (afd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Warrant Issued as to John Petrone (afd)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ISSUING BENCH WARRANT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Show Cause Hearing held on 8/19/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(afd)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to John Petrone. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/19/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel,. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
July 30, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Transfer Case Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Case by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Priver, Donald)
July 22, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin. (dl)
July 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons (Filing fee $ 400 - WAIVED). No Summons requested at this time, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Priver, Donald) (Attachment 5 replaced on 7/22/2019 to flatten image) (dl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Petrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States Of America
Represented By: Donald Priver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Petrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?