Launchip LLC v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Launchip LLC
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01167
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 13 CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint - Corrected COS (Jointly by Launchip LLC and) by Target Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland)
January 24, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint (by Launchip and) by Target Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Courtland C. Merrill. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen F. Fink for Courtland C. Merrill ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13011755) by on behalf of Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fink, Stephen)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Target Corporation answer due 1/27/2020. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
December 21, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Launchip LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office along with copy of Complaint. (dl)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Target Corporation. (dl)
November 27, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Launchip LLC. (dl)
November 27, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
November 27, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Launchip LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/27/2019 to flatten image) (dl).
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Launchip LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/27/2019 to flatten image) (dl).
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Launchip LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Launchip LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/27/2019 to flatten image) (dl).
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12901878), filed by Launchip LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Launchip LLC v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Launchip LLC
Represented By: Isaac Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Stephen F. Fink
Represented By: Courtland C. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?