Texas State LULAC et al v. Elfant et al
Plaintiff: Texas State LULAC and Voto Latino
Defendant: Jacquelyn Callanen, Bruce Elfant, Isabel Longoria, Michael Scarpello, Lisa Wise and Yvonne Ramon
Petitioner: Lupe C. Torres, Terrie Pendley and Ken Paxton
Case Number: 1:2021cv00546
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Zack Goldberg. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christine Sun. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 16, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin M. Howell. (jkda)
August 13, 2021 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Isabel Longoria.(Birring, Sameer)
August 13, 2021 Filing 57 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jacquelyn Callanen.(Green, Robert)
August 13, 2021 Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lisa Wise.(Armon, Orion)
August 13, 2021 Filing 55 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Yvonne Ramon.(Ramirez, Josephine)
August 13, 2021 Filing 54 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael Scarpello.(Nesbitt, Earl)
August 13, 2021 Filing 52 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bruce Elfant.(Thomas, Sherine)
August 12, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION to Intervene by Ken Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Answer in Intervention, #3 Notice of Appearance)(dm)
August 12, 2021 Filing 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ranjana Natarajan for ZACK GOLDBERG ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15114553) by on behalf of Lisa Wise. (Natarajan, Ranjana)
August 12, 2021 Filing 50 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ranjana Natarajan for CHRISTINE SUN ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15114453) by on behalf of Lisa Wise. (Natarajan, Ranjana)
August 12, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ranjana Natarajan on behalf of Lisa Wise. Attorney Ranjana Natarajan added to party Lisa Wise(pty:dft) (Natarajan, Ranjana)
August 11, 2021 Filing 48 PARTIALLY OPPOSED MOTION to Intervene by Lupe C. Torres, Terrie Pendley. (Attachments: #1 Answer to Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(dm)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Angelica Lien Leo. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Beatriz Mejia. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Danielle C. Pierre. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kelsey Spector. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sharon Song. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kathleen Hartnett. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 6, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Orion Armon re Angelica Lien Leo ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15091046) by on behalf of Lisa Wise. (Armon, Orion)
August 6, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Orion Armon re Beatriz Mejia ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15091029) by on behalf of Lisa Wise. (Armon, Orion)
August 6, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Orion Armon re Danielle C. Pierre ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15091011) by on behalf of Lisa Wise. (Armon, Orion)
August 6, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Orion Armon re Kelsey Spector ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15090967) by on behalf of Lisa Wise. (Armon, Orion)
August 6, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Orion Armon re Sharon Song ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15090953) by on behalf of Lisa Wise. (Armon, Orion)
August 6, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Orion Armon re Kathleen Hartnett ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15090927) by on behalf of Lisa Wise. (Armon, Orion)
August 6, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Orion Armon on behalf of Lisa Wise. Attorney Orion Armon added to party Lisa Wise(pty:dft) (Armon, Orion)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint; Lisa Wise answer due 8/13/2021. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Meaghan E. Mixon. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph N. Posimato. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
July 16, 2021 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File /RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Lisa Wise. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Untereker, John) Modified on 7/16/2021 (lt).
July 16, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Meaghan E. Mixon ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15019590) by on behalf of Texas State LULAC, Voto Latino. (Hardin, John)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING Unopposed #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Jacquelyn Callanen answer due 8/13/2021. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING Unopposed #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Michael Scarpello answer due 8/13/2021. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING Unopposed #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Bruce Elfant answer due 8/13/2021. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
July 15, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Joseph N. Posimato ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15017601) by on behalf of Texas State LULAC, Voto Latino. (Hardin, John)
July 15, 2021 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Jacquelyn Callanen. (Green, Robert)
July 14, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Michael Scarpello. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nesbitt, Earl)
July 14, 2021 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant Bruce Elfant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Bruce Elfant. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Veidt, Cynthia)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING Unopposed #20 Motion for Extension of Time; Isabel Longoria's Answer or Response due 8/13/2021. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING Unopposed #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response ; Yvonne Ramon's Response due 8/13/2021. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
July 13, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Isabel Longoria. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Birring, Sameer)
July 13, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Yvonne Ramon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Yvonne Ramon's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file a Response to Plaintiffs Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief)(Ramirez, Josephine)
July 8, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas State LULAC, Voto Latino. Jacquelyn Callanen served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021. (Hardin, John)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Uzoma N. Nkwonta. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
July 1, 2021 Filing 16 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Texas State LULAC, Voto Latino. Michael Scarpello served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Hardin, John) Modified on 7/8/2021 to correct answer date(lt).
July 1, 2021 Filing 15 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Texas State LULAC, Voto Latino. Lisa Wise served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (Hardin, John) Modified on 7/8/2021 to correct answer date (lt).
July 1, 2021 Filing 14 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Texas State LULAC, Voto Latino. Isabel Longoria served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Hardin, John) Modified on 7/8/2021 to correct answer date (lt).
June 30, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Uzoma N. Nkwonta ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14969353) by on behalf of Texas State LULAC, Voto Latino. (Hardin, John)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kathryn E. Yukevich. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Texas State LULAC, Voto Latino. Yvonne Ramon served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Hardin, John) Modified on 7/8/2021 (lt).
June 25, 2021 Filing 10 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Texas State LULAC, Voto Latino. Bruce Elfant served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Hardin, John) Modified on 7/8/2021 (lt).
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Patrick Hawley. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Kathryn E. Yukevich ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14944971) by on behalf of Texas State LULAC, Voto Latino. (Hardin, John)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Jacquelyn Callanen, Bruce Elfant, Isabel Longoria, Yvonne Ramon, Michael Scarpello, Lisa Wise. (dm)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Constitutional Question by Texas State LULAC, Voto Latino (Hardin, John)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Texas State LULAC, Voto Latino. (Hardin, John)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Texas State LULAC, Voto Latino. (Hardin, John)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Jonathan Hawley ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14939073) by on behalf of Texas State LULAC, Voto Latino. (Hardin, John)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Domingo Garcia, Jonathan P. Hawley, Uzoma N. Nkwonta, and Kathryn E. Yukevich re: non-admitted status. (cj)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14937308). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Texas State LULAC, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, John)
June 22, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
June 22, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to a Magistrate Judge. (cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas State LULAC et al v. Elfant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquelyn Callanen
Represented By: Robert D. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Elfant
Represented By: Cynthia W. Veidt
Represented By: Leslie W. Dippel
Represented By: Sherine Elizabeth Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabel Longoria
Represented By: Sameer Singh Birring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scarpello
Represented By: Barbara S. Nicholas
Represented By: Earl S. Nesbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Wise
Represented By: Angelica Lien Leo
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Represented By: Christine Sun
Represented By: Danielle C. Pierre
Represented By: Jo Anne Bernal
Represented By: John Edward Untereker
Represented By: Kathleen Hartnett
Represented By: Kelsey Spector
Represented By: Orion Armon
Represented By: Sharon Song
Represented By: Zack Goldberg
Represented By: Ranjana Natarajan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne Ramon
Represented By: Josephine L. Ramirez
Represented By: Leigh Ann Tognetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas State LULAC
Represented By: Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.
Represented By: John Russell Hardin
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joseph N. Posimato
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Meaghan E. Mixon
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voto Latino
Represented By: John Russell Hardin
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joseph N. Posimato
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Meaghan E. Mixon
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lupe C. Torres
Represented By: Chad Ennis
Represented By: Chance D. Weldon
Represented By: Robert E Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrie Pendley
Represented By: Chad Ennis
Represented By: Chance D. Weldon
Represented By: Robert E Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ken Paxton
Represented By: Eric A. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?