Dishon v. Berkshire Hathaway Automotive
Plaintiff: Brett Dishon
Defendant: Caroline Dishon-Goettl, Berkshire Hathaway Automotive and Zackery Taylor LeGate
Case Number: 3:2018cv00241
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: El Paso Office
Presiding Judge: Philip R Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 36 Certified Mail Receipt of #35 Order Dismissing Case (mg2)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2)
October 5, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE Notice of Dismissal by Brett Dishon (Dishon, Brett)
October 4, 2018 Filing 33 Certified RETURNED/RECD Mail Receipt of #30 Order on Motion to Dismiss, (mg2)
October 1, 2018 Filing 31 Certified Mail Receipt of #30 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Sent regular and Cert mail. (mg2)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #28 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party Caroline Dishon-Goettl (Attorney of Record). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is GRANTED LEAVE TO AMEND. Should he choose to amend this complaint, he must FILE his amended complaint no later than October 12, 2018 at 12:00 pm. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez.
September 17, 2018 Filing 29 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Brett Dishon, re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Caroline Dishon-Goettl (Dishon, Brett)
September 14, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Caroline Dishon-Goettl. (Carmona, Omar)
September 10, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing E-FILING AND E-NOTICING REGISTRATION FORM by Brett Dishon. He has emailed this form to the San Antonio, TX address at the bottom of the form. (mg2)
September 10, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brett Dishon. Zackery Taylor LeGate served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(mg2)
September 10, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brett Dishon. Caroline Dishon-Goettl served on 8/24/2018, answer due 9/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(mg2)
September 7, 2018 Filing 24 Certified RETURN/RECD Mail Receipt of #19 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (mg2)
September 4, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing NOTICE OF UPDATED SERVICE by Brett Dishon (mg2)
August 31, 2018 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Zackery Taylor LeGate. CORRECTED ADDRESS (mg2)
August 31, 2018 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Berkshire Hathaway Automotive. CORRECTED ADDRESS (mg2)
August 31, 2018 Filing 20 Certified Mail Receipt of #19 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (mg2)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Become an Electronic Filing User. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2)
August 30, 2018 Filing 18 Certified RECEIVED Mail Receipt of #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (mg2)
August 30, 2018 Filing 17 Certified RECEIVED Mail Receipt of Deficiency Notice, Terminate Motions (mg2)
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF UPDATED INFORMATION / ADDRESSES FOR BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY AUTOMOTIVE and ZACKERY TAYLOR LEGATE by Brett Dishon (mg2)
August 30, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION FOR APPROVAL TO BECOME AN ELECTRONIC FILING USER re #8 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically (*THIS IS CORRECTED MOTION W/PROPOSED ORDER INCLUDED) by Brett Dishon. (mg2)
August 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF UPDATED DEFENDANT ADDRESS for BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY AUTOMOTIVE INC. Registered Agent: CT CORPORATION SYSTEM 1999 BRYAN ST., STE. 900 DALLAS, TX 75201 by Brett Dishon. (mg2)
August 29, 2018 Filing 13 Certified Mail Receipt of #12 Order Striking Pleading (mg2)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Striking Pleading. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 Certified Mail Receipt of Deficiency Notice, Terminate Motions (mg2)
August 28, 2018 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #8 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically No Proposed Order attached. (LCR CV-5/CR-49(b). (mg2)
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 Certified Mail Receipt of #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis **CORRECTED ADDRESS** (mg2)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Brett Dishon. (mg2)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipt of #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (mg2)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Zackery Taylor LeGate. (mg2)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Caroline Dishon-Goettl. (mg2)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Berkshire Hathaway Automotive. (mg2)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 0 receipt number xxx), filed by Brett Dishon.(mg2)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brett Dishon. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(bg2)
August 16, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (bg2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dishon v. Berkshire Hathaway Automotive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Dishon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Dishon-Goettl
Represented By: Omar Carmona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Automotive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zackery Taylor LeGate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?