Munoz Gonzales v. LNU
Defendant: FNU LNU
Petitioner: Antonio Munoz Gonzales
Case Number: 3:2020cv00185
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Cardone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (mn)
June 30, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of New Mexico; Case Number 1:20-cv-00585.
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1 Petition for 2241 Relief and #2 Order. Mail sent to Antonio Munoz Gonzales. (gr) [Transferred from New Mexico on 6/30/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to Transfer by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. (plp) [Transferred from New Mexico on 6/30/2020.]
June 18, 2020 United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (arp) [Transferred from New Mexico on 6/30/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Antonio Munoz Gonzales. (arp) [Transferred from New Mexico on 6/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz Gonzales v. LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Munoz Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?