United States Of America v. Four (4) assorted firearms, assorted ammunition, and $7,100.00, more or less, in United States currency
Petitioner: United States Of America
Respondent: Four (4) assorted firearms, assorted ammunition, and $7,100.00, more or less, in United States currency
Case Number: 3:2020cv00208
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Frank Montalvo
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Stay Case Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Case Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wade, Kristal)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Warrant for Arrest of Property Issued for Property (jg1)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE, filed by United States Of America.(jg1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #1 Appendix A) (jg1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #2 notice) (jg1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #3 warrant for arrest of properties) (jg1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #4 proposed order) (jg1). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #5 civil cover sheet) (jg1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Four (4) assorted firearms, assorted ammunition, and $7,100.00, more or less, in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States Of America
Represented By: Kristal Melisa Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Four (4) assorted firearms, assorted ammunition, and $7,100.00, more or less, in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?