UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. STATE OF TEXAS et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: STATE OF TEXAS and John Scott
Case Number: 3:2021cv00299
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Referring Judge: David C Guaderrama
2 Judge: Jerry E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE; GRANTING #4 Motion to Consolidate Case; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that for all purposes United States v. Texas, No. 3:21-CV-00299 (W.D. Tex.) is CONSOLIDATED with LULAC v. Abbott, No. 3:21-CV-00259(W.D. Tex.) under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States shall comply with the Court's "Order Requiring Parties to File a Proposed Scheduling Order" [ECF No. 75], filed in LULAC v.Abbott, No. 3:21-CV-00259 (W.D. Tex.). Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER appointing three judge panel to Judge David C Guaderrama, Judge Jerry E. Smith and Judge Jeffrey V. Brown. Signed by Judge Priscilla R. Owen, Chief Judge, U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. (em)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Request for Three Judges, in light of #16 Order Constituting Three-Judge Court. Entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phlc)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 It is ORDERED that the Court's "Order Requiring Briefing (ECF No. 8) is VACATED, Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mt)
December 8, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION Request for Three-Judge District Court by STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Sweeten, Patrick)
December 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Christine Rupp on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Michelle Christine Rupp added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla) (Rupp, Michelle)
December 7, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick K. Sweeten on behalf of STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party STATE OF TEXAS(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party John Scott(pty:dft) (Sweeten, Patrick)
December 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jasmin Camille Lott on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Lott, Jasmin)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly Frances Balsley Berlin on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Holly Frances Balsley Berlin added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla) (Berlin, Holly)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaye Allison Sitton on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Sitton, Jaye)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING BRIEFING. IT IS ORDERED that the United States SHALL FILE, by December 8, 2021, a brief that addresses the issues identified in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants MAY FILE a response to the brief filed by the United States pursuant to this Order not later than two (2) days after the United States serves its briefing on Defendants. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mg2)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacki Lynn Anderson on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Anderson, Jacki)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. STATE OF TEXAS served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021; John Scott served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Freeman, Daniel)
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to STATE OF TEXAS, Ken Paxton and John Scott. (dc)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Daniel)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jasmin Camille Lott on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Jasmin Camille Lott added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla) (Lott, Jasmin)
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Freeman, Daniel)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freeman, Daniel)
December 6, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (mt)
December 6, 2021 Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. STATE OF TEXAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Holly Frances Balsley Berlin
Represented By: Jacki Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Jaye Allison Sitton
Represented By: Thomas Christian Herren, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy F. Mellett
Represented By: Jasmin Camille Lott
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Freeman
Represented By: Michelle Christine Rupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Scott
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?