Smith et al v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: Lane Smith and Jennifer Taylor-Smith
Defendant: unnamed/unknown black male, The City of San Antonio (San Antonio Police Department), Officer Robert Ferguson, Carla Clark, FBI, Officer Adam Rule and Alfred Lopez
Case Number: 5:2019cv00675
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, ( Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2019 2:30 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,) Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Attachments: #1 Consent)(aej)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Def Adam Rule's ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Deborah Lynne Klein added to party Adam Rule(pty:dft) by Adam Rule.(Klein, Deborah)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Def. Alfred Lopez's ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Deborah Lynne Klein added to party Alfred Lopez(pty:dft) by Alfred Lopez.(Klein, Deborah)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Assignment of Magistrate Judge. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within the earlier of 90 days after any defendant has been served or 60 days after anydefendant has appeared. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (aej)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant Robert Ferguson's ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney William L. Lewis added to party Robert Ferguson(pty:dft) by Robert Ferguson.(Lewis, William)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Taylor-Smith, Lane Smith. Carla Clark served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019; Robert Ferguson served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019; Alfred Lopez served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019; Adam Rule served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (aej)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carla Clark, Robert Ferguson, Alfred Lopez, Adam Rule, unnamed/unknown black male. (aej)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to Lane Smith and Jennifer Taylor-Smith. (dtg)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 500049655), filed by Jennifer Taylor-Smith, Lane Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dtg)
June 13, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (dtg)
June 13, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: unnamed/unknown black male
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of San Antonio (San Antonio Police Department)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Robert Ferguson
Represented By: William L. Lewis
Represented By: Deborah Lynne Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Adam Rule
Represented By: William L. Lewis
Represented By: Deborah Lynne Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Lopez
Represented By: Deborah Lynne Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lane Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Taylor-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?