VOTE.ORG v. CALLANEN et al
Plaintiff: VOTE.ORG
Defendant: JACQUELYN CALLANEN, BRUCE ELFANT, REMI GARZA and MICHAEL SCARPELLO
Intervenor Defendant: Ken Paxton
Intervenor: Lupe C. Torres and Terrie Pendley
Case Number: 5:2021cv00649
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Intervene by Ken Paxton.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
August 30, 2021 Filing 26 Partial Opposed Motion to Intervene by Lupe C. Torres, Terrie Pendley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel Nemecio Lopez for REMI GARZA. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
August 2, 2021 Filing 24 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid for Daniel Nemecio Lopez Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 500058364. (bc)
August 2, 2021 Reset Deadlines: JACQUELYN CALLANEN answer due 9/7/2021; BRUCE ELFANT answer due 9/7/2021; REMI GARZA answer due 9/7/2021; and MICHAEL SCARPELLO answer due 9/7/2021. (bc)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Docket Entry 23) entered by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Bexar County Elections Administrator Jacquelyn Callanen's, Travis County Tax Assessor-Collector Bruce Elfant's, Dallas County Elections Administrator Michael Scarpello's, and Cameron County Elections Administrator Remi Garza's deadline to file their answers/responses to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Docket Entry 1) is EXTENDED to SEPTEMBER 7, 2021. This is a text-only entry generated by the court. (wb)
July 31, 2021 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by JACQUELYN CALLANEN, BRUCE ELFANT, REMI GARZA, MICHAEL SCARPELLO.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Green, Robert)
July 30, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice-Daniel Nemecio Lopez by REMI GARZA.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
July 22, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VOTE.ORG. JACQUELYN CALLANEN served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Hardin, John)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Meaghan E. Mixon for VOTE.ORG. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Uzoma N. Nkwonta for VOTE.ORG. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
July 16, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Meaghan E. Mixon ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15021731) by on behalf of VOTE.ORG.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Hardin, John)
July 16, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VOTE.ORG. REMI GARZA served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (Hardin, John)
July 16, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Uzoma N. Nkwonta ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15020492) by on behalf of VOTE.ORG.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Hardin, John)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph N. Posimato for VOTE.ORG. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
July 15, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VOTE.ORG. MICHAEL SCARPELLO served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Hardin, John)
July 15, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Joseph N. Posimato ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15018530) by on behalf of VOTE.ORG.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Hardin, John)
July 14, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VOTE.ORG. BRUCE ELFANT served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Hardin, John)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan Patrick Hawley for VOTE.ORG. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kathryn E. Yukevich for VOTE.ORG. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Jonathan Patrick Hawley ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15000654) by on behalf of VOTE.ORG. (Hardin, John)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Letters sent to: Uzoma N. Nkwonta, Kathryn E. Yukevich, and Jonathan P. Hawley. (bc)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to JACQUELYN CALLANEN, BRUCE ELFANT, REMI GARZA, and MICHAEL SCARPELLO. (bc)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Kathryn E. Yukevich ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14996418) by on behalf of VOTE.ORG. (Hardin, John)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Constitutional Question by VOTE.ORG (Hardin, John)
July 8, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
July 8, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VOTE.ORG. (Hardin, John)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VOTE.ORG. (Hardin, John)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14993224), filed by VOTE.ORG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VOTE.ORG v. CALLANEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VOTE.ORG
Represented By: John Russell Hardin
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joseph N. Posimato
Represented By: Kathryn E. Yukevich
Represented By: Meaghan E. Mixon
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUELYN CALLANEN
Represented By: Robert D. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE ELFANT
Represented By: Leslie W. Dippel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REMI GARZA
Represented By: Daniel Nemecio Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL SCARPELLO
Represented By: Earl S. Nesbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Ken Paxton
Represented By: Cory A. Scanlon
Represented By: Michael Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Lupe C. Torres
Represented By: Chad Ennis
Represented By: Chance D. Weldon
Represented By: Robert E Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Terrie Pendley
Represented By: Chad Ennis
Represented By: Chance D. Weldon
Represented By: Robert E Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?