Grimes v. Collier et al
Plaintiff: John Alfred Grimes
Defendant: Brian Collier, Cause #007-1311-14, Bobby D. Mims, John Doe, State of Texas, Greg Abbott, Smith County Texas Law Enforcement, Tyler Police Department, D. Matt Bingham, Jeff Wood, Kerry L. Russell and Jason Cassell
Case Number: 5:2021cv00796
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING #22 Motion for TRO Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
October 8, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Renewed by John Alfred Grimes. (mgr)
September 30, 2021 Filing 21 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
September 27, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by John Alfred Grimes. (mgr)
September 27, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by John Alfred Grimes. (mgr)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING #15 Motion for Acquittal Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
September 20, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #15 MOTION Judgment of Acquittal by John Alfred Grimes. (mgr)
September 20, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION Judgment of Acquittal by John Alfred Grimes. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 envelope)(mgr)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #9 Motion for TRO Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING #10 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greg Abbott, Bobby D. Mims, State of Texas, Tyler Police Department amending #1 Complaint., filed by John Alfred Grimes.(mgr)
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 Brief Document/Introduction to Amended Complaint against Cause #007-1311-14, Brian Collier, John Doe, Bobby D. Mims amending #1 Complaint., filed by John Alfred Grimes.(mgr)
September 14, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel by John Alfred Grimes. (mgr)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by John Alfred Grimes. (mgr)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by John Alfred Grimes. (mgr)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by John Alfred Grimes. (mgr)
August 31, 2021 Remark: Copy of Show Cause Order, Blank 1983 Form & Blank 2254 Form sent to Plaintiff's listed address. (wg)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to John Alfred Grimes. It is ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, Grimes must show cause why his Complaint should not be dismissed as frivolous, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, or for want of jurisdiction by filing an amended complaint that cures the noted deficiencies. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide Grimes with a copy of the section 1983 form and a copyof the section 2254 form. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of John Alfred Grimes, GRANTED #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Alfred Grimes.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter to John Alfred Grimes. (dtg)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Alfred Grimes. (dtg)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by John Alfred Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Cover Letter, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Copy of Envelope)(dtg)
August 25, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (dtg)
August 25, 2021 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE XAVIER RODRIGUEZ. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. Collier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Alfred Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cause #007-1311-14
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby D. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith County Texas Law Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Matt Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry L. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?