Rodriguez v. Lumpkin et al
Petitioner: Rene E. Rodriguez and Rene E. Rodrigues
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Case Number: 5:2021cv00828
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Rene E. Rodriguez,it is ORDERED that Petitioners Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 5) is GRANTED. Petitioner has until Monday, November 15, 2021, to submit the required filing fee of $5.00 to the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 Pro-Se Motion for Extension of Time Regarding IFP & mailbox date filed by Rene E. Rodriguez, Pro-Se. (wg) Modified Event & Text per TJ on 10/25/2021 (wg).
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING re #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rene E. Rodriguez, Petitioner shall submit to the Clerk of the Court, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, the necessary $5 amount in payment of fees. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter to Rene E. Rodriguez. (dtg)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rene E. Rodriguez. (dtg)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Rene E. Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Cover Letter)(dtg)
August 27, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (dtg)
August 27, 2021 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE XAVIER RODRIGUEZ. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Lumpkin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rene E. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rene E. Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?