Antonio M. Caballero v. Bobby Lumpkin
Petitioner: Antonio M Caballero and Antonio M. Caballero
Respondent: Major Bobby Lumpkin and Bobby Lumpkin
Case Number: 5:2021cv00933
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 State Court Records Filed. (Attachments: #1 1 DA01_ClkRecFld_Part1, #2 2 DA01_ClkRecFld_Part2, #3 3 DA01_ClkRecFld_Part3, #4 4 DA02_Rpt-Rec-V1, #5 5 DA03_Rpt-Rec-V2, #6 6 DA04_Rpt-Rec-V3, #7 7 DA05_Rpt-Rec-V4, #8 8 DA06_Rpt-Rec-V5, #9 9 DA07_Exhibt-V6_Part1, #10 10 DA07_Exhibt-V6_Part2, #11 11 DA07_Exhibt-V6_Part3, #12 12 DA07_Exhibt-V6_Part4, #13 13 DA07_Exhibt-V6_Part5, #14 14 DA07_Exhibt-V6_Part6, #15 15 DA07_Exhibt-V6_Part7, #16 16 DA07_Exhibt-V6_Part8)(Wawrzynski, Stephanie)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Bobby Lumpkin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wawrzynski, Stephanie)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie N. Wawrzynski on behalf of Bobby Lumpkin. Attorney Stephanie N. Wawrzynski added to party Bobby Lumpkin(pty:res) (Wawrzynski, Stephanie)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO ANSWER PETITION - The Respondent in this case is represented by the Office of the Attorney General (AG). In accordance with a standing agreement between the Court and the AG, the Court electronically served the designated AG representative, Edward L. Marshall, Assistant Attorney General, Chief of the Criminal Appeals Division, atedward.marshall@oag.texas.gov, as well as Laura Haney at laura.haney@oag.texas.gov. Respondent must answer the petition within thirty (30) days after receiving this order. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (rg)
September 30, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (rg)
September 30, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from Southern District of Texas; Case Number 4:21-cv-03138.
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Western District of Texas (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/30/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/30/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Antonio M Caballero.(BrendaLacy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/30/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Habeas Filing fee: $5.00 re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, receipt number HOU104675, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/30/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio M. Caballero v. Bobby Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio M Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio M. Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Major Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Represented By: Stephanie N. Wawrzynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?