Holloway v. Lumpkin
Defendant: Dorothy Holloway and Bobby Lumpkin
Respondent: Director, TDCJ Bobby Lumpkin
Case Number: 5:2021cv00951
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Bobby Lumpkin answer due 12/13/2021. (mgr)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. Respondent shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before Monday, December 13, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg5)
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with brief in support by Bobby Lumpkin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wissinger, Jennifer)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Wissinger on behalf of Bobby Lumpkin. Attorney Jennifer Wissinger added to party Bobby Lumpkin(pty:res) (Wissinger, Jennifer)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing CORRECTED PETITIONER'S INITIAL CHALLENGE STATE DECISIONS AND FINDINGS by Dorothy Holloway (Burleson, Ashley)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Incorrect case number re #3 Miscellaneous Objection (mgr)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Incorrect case number re #2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ashley Byron Burleson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15304065) (mgr)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO ANSWER PETITION. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
October 12, 2021 Regenerated Doc #1 to Respondent. (mgr)
October 6, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
October 6, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Miscellaneous Objection PETITIONERS INITIAL CHALLENGE STATE DECISIONS AND FINDINGS by Dorothy Holloway. (Burleson, Ashley)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ashley Byron Burleson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15304065) by on behalf of Dorothy Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Burleson, Ashley)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0542-15304009), filed by Dorothy Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of James Taylor, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Theresa Holloway, #3 Memo in Support)(Burleson, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Holloway
Represented By: Ashley Byron Burleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Jennifer Wissinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?