Rivens-Baker v. Riley et al
Plaintiff: Dwayne Rivens-Baker, Jr
Defendant: J. Riley, Warden R. Boyd, Captain Herra, Various John Does, John Doe, Jane Doe (Nurse), R. Boyd, 5 John Doe Correctional Officers, Lt. John Doe, Sgt. John Doe and Sgt. Jose H. Fernandez
Case Number: 5:2022cv01167
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Filing 17 PRO-SE PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL to #1 Complaint, by Dwayne Rivens-Baker, Jr. (wg)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING re #15 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Dwayne Rivens-Baker, Jr, The Clerk of Court is directed to file the entire document filed by Rivens-Baker (Dkt. No. 15) as a supplement to the original Complaint and to add Sergeant Jose H. Fernandez, TDCJ, as a defendant in this matter. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
December 9, 2022 Filing 15 PRO-SE MOTION to Amend Complaint by Dwayne Rivens-Baker, Jr. (wg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2022: #1 Supplement) (wg).
November 7, 2022 Filing 14 Letter/Correspondence from Dwayne Rivens-Baker, Jr. (wg)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Dwayne Rivens-Baker, Jr., GRANTED #2 filed by Dwayne Rivens-Baker, Jr., IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the TDCJ trust fund custodian must deduct $20.83from Rivens-Bakers institutional trust fund account and forward it to the U.S. Clerk of Court, IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall email a copy of this Order to Inmate Trust Fund Department of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg) (Main Document 12 replaced on 11/1/2022) (ju).
October 26, 2022 Filing 11 Case electronically transferred in from Southern District of Texas; Case Number 2:22-cv-00247.
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified.(SashaOzuna, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/26/2022.]
October 26, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
October 26, 2022 Interdistrict transfer to Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 10/26/2022, filed. (SashaOzuna, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/26/2022.]
October 26, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
October 25, 2022 Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (legarza, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/26/2022.]
October 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (legarza, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/26/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dwayne Rivens-Baker, Jr, filed. (legarza, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/26/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 6 Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents/InfoMotions referred to Mitchel Neurock. by Dwayne Rivens-Baker, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2022. (legarza, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/26/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of CounselMotions referred to Mitchel Neurock. by Dwayne Rivens-Baker, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2022. (legarza, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/26/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Dwayne Rivens-Baker, Jr., filed.(legarza, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/26/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO SUPPORT COMPLAINT by Dwayne Rivens-Baker, Jr, filed.(legarza, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/26/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Dwayne Rivens-Baker, Jr.(legarza, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/26/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Dwayne Rivens-Baker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(legarza, 2) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2022: #4 Summons) (legarza, 2). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/26/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivens-Baker v. Riley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Rivens-Baker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden R. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Herra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe (Nurse)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5 John Doe Correctional Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Jose H. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?