Disability Rights Texas v. Alford
Plaintiff: Disability Rights Texas
Defendant: Richard Alford
Case Number: 6:2019cv00391
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:0794
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Richard Alford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Moos, Marvin)
July 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Richard Alford answer due 8/23/2019. (mc5)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Noting the lack of opposition, the Court extends Richard Alford's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint until August 23, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mdjm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Richard Alford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Moos, Marvin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Disability Rights Texas. Richard Alford served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Champion, Cassandra)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Richard Alford. (lad)
June 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Disability Rights Texas. (Champion, Cassandra)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12275877), filed by Disability Rights Texas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Champion, Cassandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Disability Rights Texas v. Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disability Rights Texas
Represented By: Cassandra Lang Champion
Represented By: Beth L. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Alford
Represented By: Marvin C. Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?