Nyah Tchami William et al v. AES Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Nyah Tchami William, Business Group 4, Business Group 2, John 4 Doe, Motsebo, Jane 2 Doe, Jane 3 Doe, Fowouo Richard, John 3 Doe, Business Group 3, Nana Bamen Ngnangna Eugenie, Mendefo Youmeni Jean Jules, Kamga Justin, Business Group 1, John 2 Doe, Madame Mendefo Fridoline, John 1 Doe, Business Group 5, Jane 1 Doe and Jane 4 Doe
Defendant: AES Sonel, Actis Capital LLP and AES Corporation
Case Number: 1:2014cv00343
Filed: April 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James C Cacheris
Referring Judge: Thomas Rawles Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #75 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss defendant ACTIS. Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 7/31/14. (gwalk, )
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 7/23/14. (gwalk, )
July 22, 2014 Filing 75 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Defendant ACTIS by Business Group 1, Business Group 2, Business Group 3, Business Group 4, Business Group 5, Madame Mendefo Fridoline, Jane 1 Doe, Jane 2 Doe, Jane 3 Doe, Jane 4 Doe, Mendefo Youmeni Jean Jules, John 1 Doe, John 2 Doe, John 3 Doe, John 4 Doe, Kamga Justin, Motsebo, Nana Bamen Ngnangna Eugenie, Fowouo Richard, Nyah Tchami William. (Baxter, John)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDERED that defendant's The AES Corporation and AES Sonel's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint #56 is GRANTED; the Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with respect to Defendant AES; the Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with respect to Defendant Sonel. Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 6/26/2014. (rban, )
June 26, 2014 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 6/26/2014. (rban, )
June 12, 2014 Filing 72 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge James C. Cacheris: Motion Hearing held on 6/12/2014 re #56 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AES Sonel, AES Corporation. Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter J. Egal.)(dper)
June 11, 2014 Filing 71 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Emmanuel Nsahlai and Certification of Local Counsel J. Andrew Baxter Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3996796. by Business Group 1, Business Group 2, Business Group 3, Business Group 4, Business Group 5, Madame Mendefo Fridoline, Jane 1 Doe, Jane 2 Doe, Jane 3 Doe, Jane 4 Doe, Mendefo Youmeni Jean Jules, John 1 Doe, John 2 Doe, John 3 Doe, John 4 Doe, Kamga Justin, Motsebo, Nana Bamen Ngnangna Eugenie, Fowouo Richard, Nyah Tchami William. (Baxter, John)
May 27, 2014 Reset Deadlines as to #56 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2014 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (clar, )
May 23, 2014 Filing 70 Notice of Hearing Date (Amended) set for 06/12/2014 re #56 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Talotta, Jon)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 5/21/14. (gwalk, )
May 19, 2014 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #56 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Sonel. (Hoover, Craig)
May 19, 2014 Filing 67 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by AES Sonel. (Talotta, Jon)
May 19, 2014 Filing 66 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Erica K. Songer and Certification of Local Counsel Jon M. Talotta Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3968236. by AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Sonel. (Talotta, Jon)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #56 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Responses due by 5/12/2014 Replies due by 5/19/2014.. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 5/13/14. (gwalk, )
May 12, 2014 Filing 64 Opposition to #56 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Business Group 1, Business Group 2, Business Group 3, Business Group 4, Business Group 5, Madame Mendefo Fridoline, Jane 1 Doe, Jane 2 Doe, Jane 3 Doe, Jane 4 Doe, Mendefo Youmeni Jean Jules, John 1 Doe, John 2 Doe, John 3 Doe, John 4 Doe, Kamga Justin, Motsebo, Nana Bamen Ngnangna Eugenie, Fowouo Richard, Nyah Tchami William. (Baxter, John)
May 9, 2014 Filing 63 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #56 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Business Group 1, Business Group 2, Business Group 3, Business Group 4, Business Group 5, Madame Mendefo Fridoline, Jane 1 Doe, Jane 2 Doe, Jane 3 Doe, Jane 4 Doe, Mendefo Youmeni Jean Jules, John 1 Doe, John 2 Doe, John 3 Doe, John 4 Doe, Kamga Justin, Motsebo, Nana Bamen Ngnangna Eugenie, Fowouo Richard, Nyah Tchami William. (Baxter, John)
May 9, 2014 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by John Andrew Baxter on behalf of Business Group 1, Business Group 2, Business Group 3, Business Group 4, Business Group 5, Madame Mendefo Fridoline, Jane 1 Doe, Jane 2 Doe, Jane 3 Doe, Jane 4 Doe, Mendefo Youmeni Jean Jules, John 1 Doe, John 2 Doe, John 3 Doe, John 4 Doe, Kamga Justin, Motsebo, Nana Bamen Ngnangna Eugenie, Fowouo Richard, Nyah Tchami William (Baxter, John)
April 29, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #56 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2014 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (clar, )
April 28, 2014 Filing 61 Notice of Hearing Date re #56 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Talotta, Jon)
April 22, 2014 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE of Service re #57 Notice of Appearance by Jon Myer Talotta on behalf of AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Sonel (Talotta, Jon)
April 22, 2014 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE of Service (Amended) re #56 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Craig Alan Hoover on behalf of AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Sonel (Hoover, Craig)
April 22, 2014 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE of Service re #55 Notice of Appearance by Craig Alan Hoover on behalf of AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Sonel (Hoover, Craig)
April 21, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Myer Talotta on behalf of AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Corporation(The, which will do business in California as The Delaware AES Corporation, a California corporation), AES Sonel (Talotta, Jon)
April 21, 2014 Filing 56 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Corporation(The, which will do business in California as The Delaware AES Corporation, a California corporation), AES Sonel. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Hoover, Craig)
April 21, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Alan Hoover on behalf of AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Corporation(The, which will do business in California as The Delaware AES Corporation, a California corporation), AES Sonel (Hoover, Craig)
April 2, 2014 Filing 54 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:13-cv-02326. Original file and docket sheet received.
April 1, 2014 Filing 53 TRANSMITTAL of documents: Electronic Documents are accessible through Pacer. (bp) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Venue by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Because Defendant does not oppose the motion, the Court interprets this as Defendant's consent to transfer venue to the Eastern District of Virginia. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to transfer this action to the Eastern District of Virginia.granting #39 Motion for Order (bp) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNTIL 20 DAYS AFTER CASE IS DOCKETED IN EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendant's deadline to file a response to the Second Amended Complaint shall be extended until 20 days after this case is docketed in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia.granting #50 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Answer (bp) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
March 28, 2014 Filing 50 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extend Time to File Answer to 4/23/2014 re Amended Complaint #40 filed by Defendant AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maddigan, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Modifying Briefing Schedule re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Venue by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting in part and denying in part #47 Ex Parte Application to Continue: On March 24, 2014, Defendant AES Corporation ("Defendant") filed an ex parte request to continue the April 14, 2014 hearing date regarding Plaintiffs' motion to transfer venue, or, in the alternative, to modify the briefing schedule. See Dkt. No. 47. After considering Defendant's request, the Court finds it most appropriate to retain the April 14, 2014 hearing date, but to modify the briefing schedule in the following manner: Defendant's opposition brief shall be due at the close of business on March 28, 2014, and Plaintiffs' reply brief shall be due at the close of business on April 4, 2014. This briefing schedule provides Defendant enough time to file the straightforward response" it intends to file in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion, and to "finalize and obtain approval for that response from the appropriate people at AES." See Dkt. No. 47 at 3. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
March 24, 2014 Filing 47 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer Venue from April 14, 2014 to April 21, 2014 filed by defendant AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Handman In Support of the AES Corporation's Ex Parte Application to Modify Briefing Schedule Or, In The Alternative, To Continue Hearing Date For Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Proposed Order Granting The AES Corporation's Ex Parte Application to Modify Briefing Schedule Or, In the Alternative, To Continue Hearing Date for Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Venue)(Maddigan, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS CONTINUING OSC re: Service of Process upon AES SONEL Pursuant to Rule 4(m) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: On February 6, 2014, the Court ordered Plaintiffs to show cause ("OSC") as to why AES SONEL should not be dismissed from the instant action pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Dkt. No. 37. Plaintiffs responded to the OSC on March 10, 2014. See Dkt. No. 41. Plaintiffs explain that Cameroonian police services have been reluctant to assist Plaintiffs in effectuating service upon AES SONEL. Id. Due to this lack of success, Plaintiff further explains that he has hired a private bailiff to serve AES SONEL with the summons and first amended complaint. Id. Plaintiffs conclude that they "have been promised a copy of the 'Notification of Service' or proof of service on AES SONEL [on] or about March 10, 2014." Id. To date, however, Plaintiffs have not filed proof of service upon AES SONEL with the Court. Furthermore, Plaintiffs fail to clarify whether serving AES Sonel through a privately hired bailiff complies with the requirement of Rule 4(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 4(f). The Court therefore CONTINUES the OSC re: service of process upon AES SONEL until April 2, 2014. If Plaintiffs have not properly served AES SONEL pursuant to the requirements of Rule 4(f) by that time, the Court will dismiss AES SONEL from this action, without exception. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
March 21, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael M Maddigan on behalf of Defendant AES Corporation (Attorney Michael M Maddigan added to party AES Corporation(pty:dft))(Maddigan, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
March 19, 2014 Filing 44 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #42 by Clerk of Court that the document is accepted as filed. The hearing date is rescheduled to 04/14/14 at 1:30 PM. Other: The clerk is directed to reset the motion on the Court's docket and calendar. The Order to Strike (DE43) is rendered moot RE: Plaintiffs' Motion To Transfer #39 , Response to OSC #41 . (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez re MOTION for Order for Motion to Transfer Venue #39 . The Court hereby ORDERS the documents be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Court's Local Rules, General Orders, and/or Case Management Order, as indicated: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. The 04/01/14 hearing date falls on a Tuesday. Civil motions are heard on Mondays at 1:30pm. Please see Judge's profile for available motion hearing dates. Certificate of Translation submitted but not e-filed. (cb) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
March 12, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Response to Order to Show Cause #41 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Miscellaneous Filings (Non-Motion)-Response (non-motion). Other error(s) with document(s): Response should be linked back to minutes. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
March 10, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order to Show Cause CV 13-02326 filed by Plaintiff Nyah Tchami William. Motion set for hearing on 4/14/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Nsahlai, Emmanuel) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
March 10, 2014 Filing 40 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Nyah Tchami William amending Complaint - (Discovery),,, #1 , filed by Plaintiff Nyah Tchami William (Nsahlai, Emmanuel) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
March 10, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Motion to Transfer Venue CV 13-02326 filed by Plaintiff Nyah Tchami William. Motion set for hearing on 4/14/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nsahlai, Emmanuel) Modified on 3/17/2014 (cb). Modified on 3/20/2014 (bm). [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #29 Motion to Dismiss Case; granting #29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendant AES Corporation's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiffs may submit an amended pleading no later than March 10, 2014. Failure to do so will result in the action being dismissed with prejudice. (see document for further details) (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re Order to Show Cause Why AES Sonel Should Not Be Dismissed Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Here, Plaintiffs named AES Sonel as a Defendant in this action. See Dkt. No. 17. To date, Plaintiffs have not filed adequate proof of service as to this Defendant. The Proof of Service attached to the Complaint and the FAC does not indicate whether AES Sonel has been served in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f), which instructs a party how to serve a foreign entity, such as AES Sonel. Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause no later than March 10, 2014 why AES Sonel should not be dismissed under Rule 4(m). (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
January 27, 2014 Filing 36 REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #29 filed by Defendants AES Corporation, AES Corporation. (Hoover, Craig) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
January 15, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Points and Authorities CV-13-02326 MRP (PLAx) filed by Plaintiff Nyah Tchami William. Motion set for hearing on 2/10/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Nsahlai, Emmanuel) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
December 11, 2013 Filing 34 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application #32 . See Order for further details. (wm) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
December 9, 2013 Filing 33 OPPOSITION to First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Order to Show Cause CV 13-02326 MRP (PLAx) #32 filed by Defendants AES Corporation, AES Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hoover, Craig) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
December 6, 2013 Filing 32 First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Order to Show Cause CV 13-02326 MRP (PLAx) filed by Plaintiff Nyah Tchami William. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Proposed Order)(Nsahlai, Emmanuel) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR THE AES CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re MOTION to Dismiss Case #29 , Stipulation, #30 : Upon consideration of the Joint Stipulation Concerning the Schedule for Briefing on The AES Corporation's Motion to Dismiss, which Motion is set for a hearing before this Court on Monday, February 10, 2014 at 1:30 P.M., and good cause showing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition papers on or before Monday, January 13, 2014. 2. Defendants shall file their reply papers on or before Monday, January 27, 2014. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
November 14, 2013 Filing 30 Joint STIPULATION for Order setting briefing schedule for motion to dismiss filed by Defendant AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Corporation(The, which will do business in California as The Delaware AES Corporation, a California corporation). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoover, Craig) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
November 14, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ( Motion set for hearing on 2/10/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez.), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Corporation(The, which will do business in California as The Delaware AES Corporation, a California corporation). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Attachment A--Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit Attachment B--Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Attachment C--Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Hoover, Craig) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #24 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher Handman on behalf of defendants, designating Barry Thompson as local counsel. (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #25 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mary Wimberly on behalf of AES Corporation, designating Barry Thompson as local counsel. (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, granting Stipulation to Extending the AES Corporation's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #21 , Defendants AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation) answer due 11/14/2013; AES Corporation(The, which will do business in California as The Delaware AES Corporation, a California corporation) answer due 11/14/2013. (lw) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
November 4, 2013 Filing 25 APPLICATION for attorney Mary Helen Wimberly to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Barry) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
November 4, 2013 Filing 24 APPLICATION for attorney Christopher T. Handman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Barry) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
October 31, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rachel Anne Patta on behalf of Defendant AES Corporation (Attorney Rachel Anne Patta added to party AES Corporation(pty:dft))(Patta, Rachel) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
October 31, 2013 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Barry J Thompson on behalf of Defendant AES Corporation (Attorney Barry J Thompson added to party AES Corporation(pty:dft))(Thompson, Barry) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
October 24, 2013 Filing 21 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 11/14/2013 filed by Defendant AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Corporation(The, which will do business in California as The Delaware AES Corporation, a California corporation). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoover, Craig) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion forLeave to File First Amended Complaint by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez:.... TheCourt also notes that Plaintiffs Motion adequately shows that Plaintiffs' dilatoriness is not in bad faith, and that there are no other scheduling deadlines that will be upset by the delayed filing of Plaintiffs' FAC. As such, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion, and thus allows the filing ofPlaintiffs FAC. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' FAC shall be extended up to and including November 5, 2013. RE:granting #17 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint - (Discovery),,, #1 (PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS) (lw) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
October 7, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to First MOTION to AMEND 2:13-cv-02326-PSG-PLA #17 filed by Defendants AES Corporation, AES Corporation. (Hoover, Craig) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
September 6, 2013 Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ENTRY IN CHAMBERS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Order to Show Cause #12 is hereby discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
September 4, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION to AMEND 2:13-cv-02326-PSG-PLA filed by Plaintiff Nyah Tchami William. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Nsahlai, Emmanuel) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
September 4, 2013 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Nyah Tchami William 2:13-cv-02326-PSG-PLA (Nsahlai, Emmanuel) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: First MOTION for Leave First Amended Complaint #14 , for the following reasons: Th 09/09/13 hearing date was closed on 07/24/13-See "Closed Motion Date" hyperlink under Judges' Procedures before setting a hearing date. In light of the OSC deadline gave plaintiffs until 08/21/13 to file a motion for leave, plaintiffs must now seek leave of Court to re-file. Failure to comply with L.R. 504.5 re mandatory chambers copies.; (bp) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
August 21, 2013 Filing 14 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER DATED 8/23] NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION for Leave First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nyah Tchami William. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Nsahlai, Emmanuel) Modified on 8/26/2013 (bp). [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
August 21, 2013 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Nyah Tchami William Response to Order to Show Cause (Nsahlai, Emmanuel) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The AES Corporation's Application is granted. Plaintiffs are directed to respond to this Order on or before August 21, 2013, and in their response show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. If Plaintiffs wish proceed, they must file along with their response to the order to show cause a motion for leave to lodge their amended complaint out of time. In the event that Plaintiffs seek leave to file their amended complaint out of time and this Court grants the motion, The AES Corporation shall have 30 days from the date of that order to answer or move to dismiss the amended complaint. If Plaintiff does not respond on or before August 12, 2013, or they fail to show cause why the case should remain pending, the case will be dismissed without further notice.granting #11 Ex Parte Application for Order (bp) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
August 14, 2013 Filing 11 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Plaintiffs to Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute filed by Defendant AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Corporation(The, which will do business in California as The Delaware AES Corporation, a California corporation). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum A. Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration B. Declaration of Christopher T. Handman, #3 Proposed Order C. Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit D. Proof of Service)(Hoover, Craig) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, ORDERING First Amended Complaint submitted by Plaintiffs Business Group 1, Business Group 2, Business Group 3, Business Group 4, Business Group 5, Madame Mendefo Fridoline, Jane 1 Doe, Jane 2 Doe, Jane 3 Doe, Jane 4 Doe, Mendefo Youmeni Jean Jules, John 1 Doe, John 2 Doe, John 3 Doe, John 4 Doe, Kamga Justin, Motsebo, Nana Bamen Ngnangna Eugenie, Fowouo Richard, Nyah Tchami William received on 7/5/13 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Other: Per Order dated 06/26/13 Plaintiffs' deadline to file an amended complaint shall be extended up to and including Monday, July 1, 2013. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES FOR THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSE TO THAT AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants' deadline to file a response to the current complaint shall be suspended due to the parties stipulation that Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint. 2. Plaintiffs' deadline to file an amended complaint shall be extended up to and including Monday, July 1, 2013. 3. Defendants deadline to respond to the amended complaint shall be extended up to and including Friday, August 30, 2013. re Stipulation for Extension of Time to Amend, Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #8 (lw) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
June 24, 2013 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint - (Discovery),,, #1 , Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Corporation(The, which will do business in California as The Delaware AES Corporation, a California corporation). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoover, Craig) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
June 20, 2013 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Corporation(The, which will do business in California as The Delaware AES Corporation, a California corporation), identifying The AES Corporation. (Hoover, Craig) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
June 20, 2013 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Craig A Hoover counsel for Defendants AES Corporation, AES Corporation. Adding Craig A. Hoover as attorney as counsel of record for The AES Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The AES Corporation. (Hoover, Craig) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
April 9, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(bp) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 08-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 13-02326 PSG(PLAx). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
April 1, 2013 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons filed by Plaintiffs Business Group 1, Business Group 2, Business Group 3, Business Group 4, Business Group 5, Madame Mendefo Fridoline, Jane 1 Doe, Jane 2 Doe, Jane 3 Doe, Jane 4 Doe, Mendefo Youmeni Jean Jules, John 1 Doe, John 2 Doe, John 3 Doe, John 4 Doe, Kamga Justin, Motsebo, Nana Bamen Ngnangna Eugenie, Fowouo Richard, Nyah Tchami William, (ghap) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
April 1, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Corporation(The, which will do business in California as The Delaware AES Corporation, a California corporation), AES Sonel.Case assigned to Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams.(Filing fee $ 350:PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Business Group 5, John 1 Doe, Business Group 4, Jane 3 Doe, Madame Mendefo Fridoline, Jane 2 Doe, Nyah Tchami William, John 4 Doe, Jane 1 Doe, Motsebo, Business Group 2, Business Group 1, Jane 4 Doe, Kamga Justin, Fowouo Richard, John 2 Doe, Nana Bamen Ngnangna Eugenie, John 3 Doe, Business Group 3, Mendefo Youmeni Jean Jules.(ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2013: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]
April 1, 2013 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),, #1 as to Defendants AES Corporation(The, a Delaware Corporation), AES Corporation(The, which will do business in California as The Delaware AES Corporation, a California corporation), AES Sonel. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 4/2/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nyah Tchami William et al v. AES Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nyah Tchami William
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Business Group 4
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Business Group 2
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John 4 Doe
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motsebo
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane 2 Doe
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane 3 Doe
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fowouo Richard
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John 3 Doe
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Business Group 3
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nana Bamen Ngnangna Eugenie
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mendefo Youmeni Jean Jules
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamga Justin
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Business Group 1
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John 2 Doe
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madame Mendefo Fridoline
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John 1 Doe
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Business Group 5
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane 1 Doe
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane 4 Doe
Represented By: John Andrew Baxter
Represented By: Emmanuel Nsahlai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AES Sonel
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Craig Alan Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actis Capital LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AES Corporation
Represented By: Michael M Maddigan
Represented By: Christopher T Handman
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Rachel Anne Patta
Represented By: Mary Helen Wimberly
Represented By: Craig Alan Hoover
Represented By: Barry J Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?