Mezran v. Taylor, District Director, et al
Plaintiff: Karim Mezran
Defendant: Sarah Taylor, District Director,, Christopher Wray, Matthew G. Whitaker, Kirstjen M. Nielsen and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2018cv01535
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Karim Mezran Proof of Service for Sarah Taylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse)
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Karim Mezran Corrected Proof of Service for Christopher Wray (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Karim Mezran Corrected Proof of Service for Hon. Kirstjen M. Nielsen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Karim Mezran Corrected Proof of Service for L. Francis Cissna (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Karim Mezran Corrected Proof of Service for G. Zachary Terwilliger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Karim Mezran Corrected Proof of Service for Matthew Whitaker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse)
January 11, 2019 Notice of Correction re #10 NOTICE Proof of Service Christopher Wray, #7 NOTICE Proof of Service G. Zachary Terwilliger, #8 NOTICE Proof of Service L. Francis Cissna, #9 NOTICE Proof of Service Honorable Kirstijen M. Nielsen, #6 NOTICE Proof of Service Michael Whitaker. The filer has been notified to provide signatures on DE #6 , #7 , #8 and DE #9 , #10 should be filed as non-fillable. (acha, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Karim Mezran Proof of Service for Christopher Wray (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Karim Mezran Proof of Service for Honorable Kirstjen M. Nielsen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Karim Mezran Proof of Service for L. Francis Cissna (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Karim Mezran Proof of Service for G. Zachary Terwilliger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Karim Mezran Proof of Service for Michael Whitaker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabagh, Denyse)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Sarah Taylor, District Director. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Sarah Taylor by Karim Mezran. (Sabagh, Denyse)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Karim Mezran Return of Unexecuted Summons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Return to Sender Notice)(Sabagh, Denyse)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Sarah Taylor, District Director,, Matthew G. Whitaker, Christopher Wray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
December 12, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (acha, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint For Mandamus and Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6403336.), filed by Karim Mezran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 thru 11, #2 Exhibit 12 thru 23, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Sabagh, Denyse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mezran v. Taylor, District Director, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karim Mezran
Represented By: Denyse Sabagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Taylor, District Director,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?