The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia v. Mallinckrodt PLC, et al
Plaintiff: The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Caremark RX, L.L.C., McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Mylan Institutional Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., Mallinckrodt LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., Insource, Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc., Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Cardinal Health, Inc., Caremark, L.L.C., Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., OptumRX, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Optum, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Does 1-100, Indivior Inc., WalMart Inc., Barr Laboratories, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Specgx LLC, Express Scripts, Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Eckerd Corporation, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01446
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 60 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #59 Notice of Appeal, (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (klau, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #58 Order,,, #54 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,, Order on Motion to Stay,,,,,,,,, #55 Clerk's Judgment by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0422-7014884. (Scott, Emily)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re #56 MOTION Clarification of January 3, 2020 Order ORDERED that the judgment entered with respect to the January 3 Order be, and the same, is STAYED until February 3, 2020 pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62(a) and the Clerk is directed not to execute on the January 3 Order, remanding this case back to the Circuit Court for Arlington County, Virginia, or the judgment entered therewith, until February 4, 2020. ORDERED that, unless directed otherwise by an intervening Order of this Court or the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, the Clerk shall execute on the January 3 Order on February 4, 2020 by mailing a certified copy of the January 3 Order to the clerk of the Circuit Court for Arlington County, together with the appropriate case file (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/6/2020. (klau, )
January 5, 2020 Filing 57 Memorandum in Support re #56 MOTION Clarification of January 3, 2020 Order (as to stay) filed by The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard)
January 5, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION Clarification of January 3, 2020 Order (as to stay) by The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard)
January 3, 2020 Filing 55 JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 58 in favor of the Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and against the Defendants. Entered by Clerk on 1/3/2020. (klau, )
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER the Removing Defendant's Motion for a Temporary Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigations Final Transfer Decision [Doc. 23] be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. ORDERED that Plaintiff The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia Motion for Remand [Doc. 17] be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. ORDERED that the Express Script Defendants' Conditional Motion for an Order Implementing the Automatic Stay under Fed. R. Civ. P. 62(a) [Doc. 35] be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. ORDERED that the judgment entered with respect to this Order be, and the same, is STAYED for a period of thirty (30) days from the date of this Order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62(a) and the Clerk is directed not to execute on this Order remanding this case back to the Circuit Court for Arlington County, Virginia, or the judgment entered therewith, until the 31st day after date of this Order ---- The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in Plaintiff's favor on this Order and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [Doc. 17] pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58 (see order for details) Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/3/20. (klau, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2019 re #23 MOTION to Stay Pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia, and #35 MOTION to Stay Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc. Counsel appeared for Plaintiff and Defendant. Motions argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter J. Egal)(dzir)
December 19, 2019 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CVS Health Corporation, Caremark RX, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel)
December 19, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Perry Coburn on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Coburn, Samuel)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Electronic Device Application (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/19/19. (klau, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 49 Reply to #35 MOTION to Stay Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay - Reply Memorandum in Support of Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
December 19, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Electronic Device Application by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
December 18, 2019 Filing 47 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Eckerd Corporation, Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.. (Booth, Emily)
December 18, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Walsh Booth on behalf of Eckerd Corporation, Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc. (Booth, Emily)
December 17, 2019 Filing 45 Opposition to #35 MOTION to Stay Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay filed by The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard)
December 17, 2019 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Gary, Brent)
December 17, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Michael Sizemore on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Sizemore, Justin)
December 17, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Ryan Gary on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Gary, Brent)
December 12, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Stay Pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision Reply in Support of Motion for Temporary Stay filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1. Updated Federal Officer Removed Cases, #2 Exhibit EX 2. Judge Greer Stay Order, #3 Exhibit EX 3. Order Granting and Motion to Strike Praecipe)(Scott, Emily)
December 12, 2019 Filing 40 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court CORRECTED Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1. Updated Federal Officer Removed Cases, #2 Exhibit EX 2. Cahill Declaration, #3 Exhibit EX. 3. ESI MHS Statement of Work, #4 Exhibit EX A. Blackline, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily)
December 11, 2019 Filing 39 Rebuttal Brief re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court Rebuttal Brief in Support of Motion to Remand filed by The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard)
December 6, 2019 Filing 38 Memorandum in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Stay Pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard)
December 6, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Stay Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (dvanm, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 37 Notice of Hearing Date on December 20, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. re #36 Memorandum in Support, #35 MOTION to Stay Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay (Scott, Emily)
December 5, 2019 Filing 36 Memorandum in Support re #35 MOTION to Stay Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
December 5, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Stay Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily)
December 5, 2019 Filing 34 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Updated Fed Officer Removed Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cahill Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Statement of Work [DOD Contract], #4 Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily)
December 5, 2019 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Moving Defendants' deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended, and such deadline shall be fifteen (15) days following any remand order entered by this Court or final transfer decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/27/19. (klau, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily)
November 26, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Stay Pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision, #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (klau, )
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that the hearing on Plaintiff The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia's Motion to Remand [Doc. 17] and Defendants Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. and ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.'s Motion for a Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigations Final Transfer Decision [Doc. 23] currently scheduled for Thursday, December 12, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. be, and the same hereby is, CONTINUED to Friday, December 20, 2019 at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/26/19. (klau, )
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/25/19. (klau, )
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/25/19. (klau, )
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/25/19. (klau, )
November 25, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Stay Pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision, #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (klau, )
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that the hearing on Plaintiff The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia's Motion to Remand [Doc. 17] and Defendants Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. and ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.'s Motion for a Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigations Final Transfer Decision [Doc. 23] currently scheduled for Friday, December 13, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. be, and the same hereby is, ADVANCED to Thursday, December 12, 2019 at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/25/19. (klau, )
November 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Stay Pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision. Motion Hearing set for 12/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Hearing Date re #24 Memorandum in Support,, #23 MOTION to Stay Pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision (Scott, Emily)
November 22, 2019 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Stay Pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MDL Cherokee Nation Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Fed Officer Removed Cases, #3 Exhibit 3 - All Fed Officer Stays, #4 Exhibit 4 - List of Opioid Cases, #5 Exhibit 5 - Stay Orders (11-20 Updated), #6 Exhibit 6 - CTO-122, #7 Exhibit 7 - Kentucky, #8 Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily)
November 22, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay Pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
November 22, 2019 Filing 22 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew I. Menchel and Certification of Local Counsel Emily M. Scott Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6952922. by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Adriana Riviere-Badell and Certification of Local Counsel Emily M. Scott Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6952912. by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
November 22, 2019 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Julian W. Park and Certification of Local Counsel Emily M. Scott Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6952902. by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
November 22, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Hearing Date re #18 Memorandum in Support, #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Conrod, Richard)
November 21, 2019 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Conrod, Richard)
November 21, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Order Memorializing Parties Agreement Regarding Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint; directing that the moving defendant's shall file their answers or other responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's complaint not later than December 17, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/20/2019. (aott)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Sarah)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Cheryl Mandel on behalf of Mylan Institutional Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Mandel, Rebecca)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Institutional Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Talotta, Jon)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Myer Talotta on behalf of Mylan Institutional Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Talotta, Jon)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 Response to #5 NOTICE of Related Cases filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
November 15, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Anthony J Trenga. District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema no longer assigned to the case. (rban, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edgar Spivey on behalf of The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia (Spivey, William)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner A. Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia Notice of Related Case (Morris, Grant)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc. of filing of corrected Corporate Disclosure Statement (Scott, Emily)
November 14, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Scott, Emily) Modified on 11/14/2019 Counsel refiled corrected document as dkt. no. 4 (klau, ).
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Circuit Court of Arlington County ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6937222.), filed by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Waivers, #2 Exhibit 2 - List of Opioid Case, #3 Exhibit 3 - Part 1 of 6, #4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2 of 6, #5 Exhibit 3 - Part 3 of 6, #6 Exhibit 3 - Part 4 of 6, #7 Exhibit 3 - Part 5 of 6, #8 Exhibit 3 - Part 6 of 6, #9 Exhibit 4 - Civil Cover with attachment)(Scott, Emily) Modified text on 11/14/2019 (NO ANSWER FILED) (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia v. Mallinckrodt PLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Rebecca Cheryl Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Christopher Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Christopher Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Walsh Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic
Represented By: Emily Walsh Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Wells Huntington Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Walsh Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Michael Trucksess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Brent Ryan Gary
Represented By: Justin Michael Sizemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Rebecca Cheryl Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Represented By: Emily Walsh Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckerd Corporation
Represented By: Emily Walsh Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Christopher Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?