Range v. Van Metre et al
Plaintiff: Davetta Lynn Range
Defendant: Amazon.com, Stacey, Magistrate Judge Michael Nachmanoff, Judge Anthony J. Trenga, Dana Van Metre, Twitter, The State of Maryland, Attorney Paul Sennott, DA LA County, Mark Ridley Thomas, Alameda County, University of Southern California, Blavity Mag., Black Lives Matter Philly, George Soros, BLUU & UUA Church, The State of Washington, Black Lives Matter Toronto, Judge Richard Gergel, San Antonio Black Lives Matter, Pastor Jamal Bryant, The State of Pennsylvania, The State of Florida, Ben Crump, Facebook, Alicia Garza; Patrisse Cullors;Opal Tometi, Rev Tony Lee, Google, NEA Ed Justice, Black Lives Matter 5280, The Movie: The Hate U Give, MacMillan Publishers, Movement for Black Lives Matter Action Fund, Black Lives Matter Vancover WA & CA, Bill Montgomery, Seattle WEA @OurVoiceWEA, Jesse Hagopian, The State of New York, Rep Barbara Lee-Odom, ACLU HQ, The State of North Carolina, Deray McKesson, Democratic National Committee & Convention, Pastor Otis Moss, III, Black Lives Matter At School, The NY Post & AP, AME Church, DCRA Dept of Consumer & Reg Affairs, Law for Black Lives, Act Blue PAC, Alfred Street Baptist Church, OIG Steve Linick, Democracy Alliance, Steny H. Hoyer, Black Lives Matter Memphis, Endurance International Group Inc, Asa Khalif, The State of Virginia, Larry Gossett, April Goggins, Sam Sinyangwe, United Nations, CAP President CEO John Podesta, US Commerce Dept MBDA, The State of New Jersey, NEA John C Stokes, The State of Georgia, Black Lives Matter VT LTD, Color of Change James Rucker, SA Rachel Rollins, Tufts University, Rep Anthony Brown, NFL Bonnie Jarrett, Black Lives Matter.Com, Black Lives Matter Foundation, Shaun King, The State of West Virginia, Robert C Bobby Scott, Judge Brian A. Jackson, The Taskforce on 21st Century Policing, The Washington Post, Rev DR Robert C Scott, Andrei Iancu, Southern Poverty Law Center, Black Lives Matter Greater Atlanta, Aspen Ideas, Tiffany Loftin, The State of Mississippi, The House Of Representatives, Viacom/BET, New York Black Lives Matter Inc, NAACP, Wikipedia & Wikimedia, Black Lives Matter Network Inc, Melanie Campbell and Data for Black Lives
Case Number: 1:2020cv00123
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record RE-Transmitted to 4CCA re: #40 Notice of Appeal, #39 Notice of Appeal (pmil, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 46 Letter to the Court from USCA requesting re-transmittal of record. (pmil, )
March 24, 2020 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted via email to 4CCA re #40 Notice of Appeal (lcre, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 45 Letter from the 4th Circuit requesting the transmittal of the record. (lcre, )
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER of USCA consolidating Notice of Appeal from case numbers 20-cv-123 and 19-cv-1647. (aott)
March 24, 2020 Per CMH chambers motions set for 3/27/2020 have been POSTPONED and CONTINUED In pursuant to the General Order No. 2020-04 (clar, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 43 USCA Case Number 20-1345 4th Circuit; Case Manager- Michael Radday for #40 Notice of Appeal filed by Davetta Lynn Range. (aott)
March 23, 2020 Filing 42 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re: #40 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (pmil, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 41 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re: #39 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (pmil, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #34 Order of 03/17/20 by Davetta Lynn Range. (No Order of 03/20/20 as stated in Notice of Appeal) (Appeal Filing Fee Not Paid) (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1(M) Certification)(pmil, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEAL of Orders of 01/23/20 and 02/05/20 by Davetta Lynn Range. (No orders of stated dates in Notice of Appeal) (Appeal Filing Fee Not Paid) (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1(M) Certification)(pmil, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Hearing on #37 MOTIONS : Writ of Coram Nobis: Judicial Review Requested by this Date and (Pt. 2) Writ of Mandamus (as on Docket for today) Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (pmil, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2020: #1 Local Rule 83.1(M) Certification) (pmil, ).
March 20, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION Writ of Coram Nobis: Judicial Review Requested by this Date and (Pt. 2) Writ of Mandamus (as on Docket for today) by Davetta Lynn Range. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1(M) Certification)(pmil, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 36 II - ANSWER: CLAIMS/RELIEF by Davetta Lynn Range filed together w/III - Add A Solicitor General Respondent/Defendant to Serve Document and V - A-H OIG of Federal Courts document. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1(M) Certification, #2 Envelope)(pmil, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 35 Letter to the Court from Davetta Lynn Range. (pmil, )
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying as moot #28 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Prohibition, Certiorari, Quo Warranto and/or Duty of Care for the reasons stated in #22 Order dated 2/20/2020. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/17/2020. (aott,c/m 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying as moot #31 Motion to Transfer Jurisprudence & Jurisdiction to the Supreme Court of the United States of America for the reasons stated in #22 Order dated 2/20/2020. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/17/2020. (aott, c/m 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Per CMH chambers motions set for 3/20/2020 on the pleadings (clar, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #31 Motion to Transfer Jurisprudence & Jurisdiction to the Supreme Court of the United States of America Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (aott)
March 13, 2020 Filing 31 Motion to Transfer Jurisprudence & Jurisdiction to the Supreme Court of the United States of America by Davetta Lynn Range. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
March 11, 2020 Per CMH chambers motions set for 3/13/2020 on the pleadings (clar, )
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying as moot #25 Inquiry about the Procedures for the reasons stated in #22 Order dated 2/20/2020. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/6/2020. (aott,c/m3/6/2020)
March 5, 2020 Per CMH chambers motions set for 3/6/2020 on the pleadings (clar, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Hearing for #28 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus, Prohibition, Certiorari, Quo Warranto and/or Duty of Care :Hearing set for 3/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (aott)
March 4, 2020 Filing 28 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus, Prohibition, Certiorari, Quo Warranto and/or Duty of Care, filed by Davetta Lynn Range. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying as moot #23 MOTION for these to be an Ongoing Case Against Future Infringers for the reasons stated in #22 Order dated 2/20/2020. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/2/2020. (aott,c/m 2/20/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #25 Inquiry about the Procedures. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 28, 2020 Filing 25 Inquiry about the Procedures filed by Davetta Lynn Range. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 26, 2020 Per CMH chambers motions set for 2/20/2020 on the pleadings (clar, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #23 Motion for these to be an Ongoing Case Against Future Infringers : Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment B, #2 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 20, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for these to be an Ongoing Case Against Future Infringers filed by Davetta Lynn Range. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 20, 2020 This case has been consolidated with Civil Action 1:19-cv-1647 CMH-IDD . (aott)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #2 Amended Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for the limited purpose of reviewing the Complaint; granting #7 MOTION to Consolidate under 1:19-cv-1647; Dismissing Case as Frivolous. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 2/20/2020. (aott,c/m 2/20/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 21 CLAIM: Rights & Privileges (A-G) filed by Davetta Lynn Range (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Correction re #19 Motion for Default Judgment & Immediate Payments Due by Defendants (aott,c/m 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 19 Motion for Default Judgment & Immediate Payments Due by Defendants filed by Davetta Lynn Range. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 14, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Correction re #17 Memorandum of Law & Motion to Continue the Cases in Virginia. (aott,c/m 2/14/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 17 Memorandum of Law & Motion to Continue the Cases in Virginia by Davetta Lynn Range. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 13, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #16 Praecipe. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (aott)
February 13, 2020 Filing 16 Praecipe by Davetta Lynn Range (Attachments: #1 B, #2 C, #3 D, #4 E, #5 Local Rule 83.1(M) Certification)(aott)
February 12, 2020 Per CMH chambers motions set for 2/14/2020 on the pleadings (clar, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 15 Copy work Request: Fee $ 6.00, receipt number 14683083369. (Attachments: #1 Copy Request) (aott, documents mailed to D. Range at PO Box as requested on 2/12/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 14 Torts & Royalties Documents filed by Davetta Lynn Range (Attachments: #1 Attachment E (Part 1), #2 Attachment E (Part 2), #3 Local Rule 83.1 Certification) (aott) (*Attachment E was electronically split into Part 1 and 2, as its combined file size when scanned exceeded the capacity of the Courts Electronic Filing System**)
February 11, 2020 Filing 13 Civil Rights Documents filed by Davetta Lynn Range (Attachments: #1 Attachment C, #2 Local Rule 83.1 Certification) (aott, ).
February 11, 2020 Filing 12 Antitrust Document filed by Davetta Lynn Range (#1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification) (aott).
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 New Defendants list re #1 Complaint by Davetta Lynn Range (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION to Consolidate under 1:19-cv-1647, #8 MOTION to bring Lunch, Electronics for Google Seaches etc, #5 MOTION to fine Amazon.com 1 Billion Dollars, #9 MOTION to use the Courthouse Law Library between 8:30-5pm with GSA Staff, especially if Ms Stacy Hyatt the Librarian is not in, #6 MOTION Freeze and Seize Amazon.com Goods : Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to use the Courthouse Law Library between 8:30-5pm with GSA Staff, especially if Ms Stacey Hyatt the Librarian is not in by Davetta Lynn Range. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to bring Lunch, Electronics for Google Seaches etc by Davetta Lynn Range. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate under 1:19-cv-1647 by Davetta Lynn Range. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Freeze and Seize Amazon.com Goods by Davetta Lynn Range. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Fine Amazon.com 1 Billion Dollars by Davetta Lynn Range. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 New Defendants Lists re #1 Complaint by Davetta Lynn Range. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Copyright Document filed by Davetta Lynn Range. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(aott)
February 5, 2020 Case Reassigned to District Judge Claude M. Hilton. District Judge T. S. Ellis, III no longer assigned to the case. (rban, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 Amended Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Davetta Lynn Range. (aott)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights & Negligence Injunction to not hinder my copyright directives against Amazon.com, Michael Nachmanoff, Stacey, Anthony J. Trenga, Dana Van Metre, filed by Davetta Lynn Range. (Attachments: #1 C, #2 D, #3 E, #4 F, #5 G, #6 H, #7 I, #8 J, #9 K, #10 Local Rule 83.1(M) Certification)(aott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Range v. Van Metre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magistrate Judge Michael Nachmanoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Anthony J. Trenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Van Metre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Paul Sennott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DA LA County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ridley Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Southern California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blavity Mag.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Lives Matter Philly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Soros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUU & UUA Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Lives Matter Toronto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Richard Gergel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Antonio Black Lives Matter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pastor Jamal Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Garza; Patrisse Cullors;Opal Tometi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rev Tony Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEA Ed Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Lives Matter 5280
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Movie: The Hate U Give
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacMillan Publishers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Movement for Black Lives Matter Action Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Lives Matter Vancover WA & CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle WEA @OurVoiceWEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Hagopian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rep Barbara Lee-Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACLU HQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deray McKesson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Democratic National Committee & Convention
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pastor Otis Moss, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Lives Matter At School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The NY Post & AP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AME Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCRA Dept of Consumer & Reg Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law for Black Lives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Act Blue PAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Street Baptist Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OIG Steve Linick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Democracy Alliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steny H. Hoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Lives Matter Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance International Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Khalif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Gossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Goggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Sinyangwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAP President CEO John Podesta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Commerce Dept MBDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEA John C Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Lives Matter VT LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Color of Change James Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SA Rachel Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tufts University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rep Anthony Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFL Bonnie Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Lives Matter.Com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Lives Matter Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of West Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C Bobby Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Brian A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Taskforce on 21st Century Policing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Washington Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rev DR Robert C Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrei Iancu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Poverty Law Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Lives Matter Greater Atlanta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Ideas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Loftin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The House Of Representatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom/BET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Black Lives Matter Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAACP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wikipedia & Wikimedia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Lives Matter Network Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Data for Black Lives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davetta Lynn Range
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?