Casper III v. Krasnoff et al
Plaintiff: Willie L Casper III
Defendant: Douglas B. Robelen and Alan P. Krasnoff
Case Number: 1:2020cv00802
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that this action be and is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; to appeal this decision, plaintiff must file a Notice of Appeal ("NOA") with the Clerk's Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, including in the NOA the date of the Order plaintiff wants to appeal. Plaintiff need not explain the grounds for appeal until so directed by the appellate court. Failure to file a timely NOA waives the right to appeal this Order. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 09/10/2020. (choy, )(copies sent to plaintiff on 09/10/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to the court. (dvanm, )
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that the complaint be and is filed pending compliance with the requirements of this order; that plaintiff is assessed a filing fee of $350.00 and an administrative fee of $50.00, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1914(a); that plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is conditionally granted to the extent that plaintiff need not prepay the filing fee at this time. Plaintiff is directed to sign and return the attached Consent Form within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. If the Court grants plaintiff in forma pauperis status, he will be required to pay the filing fee in installments, after first paying an initial filing fee, and the administrative fee will be waived; that the Clerk request plaintiff's institution to provide an Inmate Account Report Form on plaintiff within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order; that plaintiff particularize and amend his complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order using the enclosed standardized 1983 complaint form by (I) naming every person he wishes to include as a defendant, (ii) submitting a short, detailed statement of background facts which describes the specific conduct of each defendant whom he alleges violated his constitutional rights, including the facts giving rise to his complaint, the dates of each incident, the persons involved, the injuries received, the reasons why he believes each defendant is liable to him, and the remedies sought, (iii) that plaintiff provide a copy of the underlying civil action as required by Christopher or describe that civil action in sufficient detail, including the procedural history of the claim and any related proceedings, to allow the Court to determine the "nonfrivolous" test, and (iv) submitting one original amended complaint on the standardized complaint form which will be provided to him. Plaintiff must include his civil action number, 1:20-CV-802(LO/TCB) on the first page of his amended complaint; that plaintiff's failure to comply with any part of this Order within THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, or failure to notify this Court immediately upon being transferred, released, or otherwise relocated, may result in the dismissal of this complaint. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 07/28/2020. (choy, )(Copies of this order, standardized 1983 complaint form, and a consent form mailed to plaintiff, and copies of order and Inmate Account Report Form sent to plaintiff's current institution of confinement on 07/28/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (choy, )(c/m to Plaintiff on 07/17/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Willie L Casper III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(choy, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Alan P. Krasnoff, Douglas B. Robelen (Filing fee $ 400 (pending IFP).), filed by Willie L Casper III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Prisoner Database, #3 Envelope)(choy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casper III v. Krasnoff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas B. Robelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan P. Krasnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie L Casper III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?