James v. Drinkwater
Plaintiff: Michael James
Defendant: Darrell A Drinkwater
Case Number: 1:2020cv00942
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 08/19/2020. (choy, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (choy, )(Copies mailed to Petitioner on 08/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael James. (choy, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Darrell A Drinkwater (Filing fee $ 400 (pending IFP).), filed by Michael James. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(choy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell A Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?