Feds for Medical Freedom v. Blinken et al
Plaintiff: Feds for Medical Freedom, Marie Ballerini-Hougnon, Donald Carroll, Jane Chun, David Guererro, Homer Hawkins, William Hayes, Matthew Hilton, Daniel Jackson, Lisa Jones, Cheryl Koevoet, Nancy Mcgauvran, Christopher Miller, Karolina Miller, Kemmi Sadler, Kelly Medina Santiesteban, Marcus Thornton, Joel Zlotnik, Michael Ball, Salima Benabdi, Eric Burkett, Brock Fox, Chris Kelly, David Pemberton, Jeffrey Rusinek and Christina Williams
Defendant: Anthony J. Blinken, Department of State, Carol Perez and Marcia S. Bernicat
Case Number: 1:2023cv00266
Filed: February 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Patricia Tolliver Giles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Homer Hawkins, Kelly Medina Santiesteban, Chris Kelly, Marie Ballerini-Hougnon, Nancy Mcgauvran, Marcus Thornton, Feds for Medical Freedom, Christopher Miller, Brock Fox, Joel Zlotnik, Cheryl Koevoet, Matthew Hilton, Christina Williams, Michael Ball, Salima Benabdi, Jeffrey Rusinek, Jane Chun, William Hayes, Kemmi Sadler, Daniel Jackson, Lisa Jones, David Pemberton, Donald Carroll, Karolina Miller, David Guererro, Eric Burkett Marcia S. Bernicat served on 3/24/2023, answer due 4/14/2023 (Attachments: #1 Summons AG, #2 Summons AUSA)(Lloyd, Edward)
March 23, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Marcia S. Bernicat, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Attachments: #1 Summons Notice)(swil)
March 22, 2023 Filing 10 Proposed Summons re #7 Amended Complaint, by Marie Ballerini-Hougnon, Donald Carroll, Jane Chun, Feds for Medical Freedom, David Guererro, Homer Hawkins, William Hayes, Matthew Hilton, Daniel Jackson, Lisa Jones, Cheryl Koevoet, Nancy Mcgauvran, Kelly Medina Santiesteban, Christopher Miller, Karolina Miller, Kemmi Sadler, Marcus Thornton, Joel Zlotnik. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Lloyd, Edward)
March 22, 2023 Notice of Correction re #8 Proposed Summons. Filing user has been notified to file corrected summons (swil)
March 21, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE by Marie Ballerini-Hougnon, Donald Carroll, Jane Chun, Feds for Medical Freedom, David Guererro, Homer Hawkins, William Hayes, Matthew Hilton, Daniel Jackson, Lisa Jones, Cheryl Koevoet, Nancy Mcgauvran, Kelly Medina Santiesteban, Christopher Miller, Karolina Miller, Kemmi Sadler, Marcus Thornton, Joel Zlotnik re #7 Amended Complaint, Notice of Errata (Attachments: #1 Errata)(Lloyd, Edward)
March 21, 2023 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #7 Amended Complaint, by Marie Ballerini-Hougnon, Donald Carroll, Jane Chun, Feds for Medical Freedom, David Guererro, Homer Hawkins, William Hayes, Matthew Hilton, Daniel Jackson, Lisa Jones, Cheryl Koevoet, Nancy Mcgauvran, Kelly Medina Santiesteban, Christopher Miller, Karolina Miller, Kemmi Sadler, Marcus Thornton, Joel Zlotnik. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Lloyd, Edward) (Main Document 8 replaced on 3/22/2023) (swil, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/22/2023) (swil, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/22/2023) (swil, ).
March 20, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Homer Hawkins, Kelly Medina Santiesteban, Marie Ballerini-Hougnon, Nancy Mcgauvran, Marcus Thornton, Feds for Medical Freedom, Christopher Miller, Joel Zlotnik, Cheryl Koevoet, Matthew Hilton, Jane Chun, William Hayes, Daniel Jackson, Lisa Jones, Kemmi Sadler, Donald Carroll, David Guererro, Karolina Miller.(Lloyd, Edward)
March 10, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Homer Hawkins, Kelly Medina Santiesteban, Marie Ballerini-Hougnon, Nancy Mcgauvran, Marcus Thornton, Feds for Medical Freedom, Christopher Miller, Joel Zlotnik, Cheryl Koevoet, Matthew Hilton, Jane Chun, William Hayes, Daniel Jackson, Lisa Jones, Kemmi Sadler, Donald Carroll, David Guererro, Karolina Miller. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement)(Lloyd, Edward)
March 7, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Anthony J. Blinken, Department of State, Carol Perez, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Attachments: #1 Summons Notice)(swil)
March 6, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Marie Ballerini-Hougnon, Donald Carroll, Jane Chun, Feds for Medical Freedom, David Guererro, Homer Hawkins, William Hayes, Matthew Hilton, Daniel Jackson, Lisa Jones, Cheryl Koevoet, Nancy Mcgauvran, Kelly Medina Santiesteban, Christopher Miller, Karolina Miller, Kemmi Sadler, Marcus Thornton, Joel Zlotnik. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Lloyd, Edward) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/8/2023) (swil, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/8/2023) (swil, ).
March 6, 2023 Notice of Correction re #3 Proposed Summons. Filing user has been notified to file the remaining summons. (swil)
March 1, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Marie Ballerini-Hougnon, Donald Carroll, Jane Chun, Feds for Medical Freedom, David Guererro, Homer Hawkins, William Hayes, Matthew Hilton, Daniel Jackson, Lisa Jones, Cheryl Koevoet, Nancy Mcgauvran, Kelly Medina Santiesteban, Christopher Miller, Karolina Miller, Kemmi Sadler, Marcus Thornton, Joel Zlotnik. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Additional Summons, #2 Supplement Additional Summons)(Lloyd, Edward) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/8/2023) (swil, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/8/2023) (swil, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/8/2023) (swil, ).
February 28, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint by Marie Ballerini-Hougnon, Donald Carroll, Jane Chun, Feds for Medical Freedom, David Guererro, Homer Hawkins, William Hayes, Matthew Hilton, Daniel Jackson, Lisa Jones, Cheryl Koevoet, Nancy Mcgauvran, Kelly Medina Santiesteban, Christopher Miller, Karolina Miller, Kemmi Sadler, Marcus Thornton, Joel Zlotnik. (Lloyd, Edward)
February 28, 2023 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. Filing user has been notified to file a civil cover sheet. (swil)
February 27, 2023 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (swil)
February 27, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8822019.), filed by Feds for Medical Freedom.(Lloyd, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feds for Medical Freedom v. Blinken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feds for Medical Freedom
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Ballerini-Hougnon
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Carroll
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Chun
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Guererro
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homer Hawkins
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hayes
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Hilton
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jackson
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Jones
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Koevoet
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Mcgauvran
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Miller
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karolina Miller
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kemmi Sadler
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Medina Santiesteban
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Thornton
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Zlotnik
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ball
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salima Benabdi
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Burkett
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brock Fox
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Kelly
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pemberton
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Rusinek
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Williams
Represented By: Edward Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia S. Bernicat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?