Nolan v. Clarke et al

Plaintiff: Eugene D. Nolan
Defendant: Harold Clarke, Barry Marano, Vandermark, Christopher Lovern, Burke, Wallace, Melvin Davis, Mark Amonette, Correctional Officer Vanderschagt, Keith Dawkins, Rose Durbin, Cabell, Massenburg, Branch, Gibbs, Captain Gills, Tisdale and Mays
Case Number: 2:2018cv00552
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
1 Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 19 ORDER. If Plaintiff wishes his submission to be considered by the Court, he is DIRECTED to either remit the statutory filing fee of $350.00 or complete and submit an in forma pauperis application within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff's motions and related submissions ( #14 , #16 , #17 and #18 ) are HELD IN ABEYANCE pending Plaintiff's response to this Order. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he is FURTHER ORDERED to either sign the enclosed consent to collection of fees form and RETURN IT TO THE COURT or to submit the full filing fee of $350.00 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of "Selected Procedural Information for Prisoners Who Have Filed a Civil Rights Complaint" to Plaintiff. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to comply with the procedural requirements outlined in that document. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order, a copy of the Court's in forma pauperis application, a copy of "Selected Procedural Information for Prisoners Who Have Filed a Civil Rights Complaint," and the consent to collection of fees form to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/6/2018. Copies mailed 12/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Collection of Fees and Selected Procedural Information for Prisoners Who Have Filed a Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Affidavit in Support of Request to Proceed in forma pauperis)(jmey, )
November 30, 2018 18 Supplement to #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eugene D. Nolan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, )
November 13, 2018 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Eugene D. Nolan. (jmey, )
November 13, 2018 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eugene D. Nolan. (1 service copy provided.) (jmey, )
November 13, 2018 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Branch, Cabell, Gills, Vandermark, Wallace, filed by Eugene D. Nolan. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope) (No service copies provided.)(jmey, )
November 5, 2018 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Eugene D. Nolan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, )
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively terminate the following defendants on the docket in this matter: Harold Clarke, Rose Durbin, Barry Marano, Keith Dawkins, Mart Amonette, Christopher Lovern, Melvin Davis, Massengburg, Mays, Burke, Tisdale, Correctional Officer Vanderschagt, and Gibbs. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to provide specific answers. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of the Court's questionnaire to Plaintiff to assist him in filing his amended complaint. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 10/29/2018. Copies mailed 10/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Questionnaire)(jmey, )
October 16, 2018 12 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Western; Case Number 7:18-cv-00408. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER: For the reasons stated therein, Plaintiff's motion to amend #10 is GRANTED to correct deficiencies in the caption and add a supplemental claim against a new defendant. The Clerk shall note the supplement in the first docket entry. Warden Cabell, Officer Branch, Sgt. Branch, CHAP Wallace, Captain Gills, and ADA Coordinator Vandermark are JOINED as defendants, and all claims against them are SEVERED and TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia because these defendants and related claims are associated with the Sussex II State Prison in that federal judicial district. To the extent Plaintiff seeks preliminary injunctive relief concerning the conditions of confinement he experiences in Sussex II State Prison, he may make a request by motion in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(b) to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. Entered by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 10/15/2018. (slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/16/2018.]
October 10, 2018 10 MOTION to Amend/Supplement #1 Complaint by Eugene D. Nolan.Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(ck) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/16/2018.]
September 25, 2018 9 Response re #8 Letter requesting case status. (ck) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/16/2018.]
September 25, 2018 8 Letter requesting case status by Eugene D. Nolan (ck) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/16/2018.]
September 25, 2018 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Harold Clarke, et al on 9/25/2018. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2018.(tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/16/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 Order entered Directing the Clerk to attempt service of process upon the named defendants re #1 Complaint filed by Eugene D. Nolan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 9/25/2018. (tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/16/2018.]
August 28, 2018 5 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Eugene D. Nolan (slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/16/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal (Responses due by 9/12/2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 8/20/2018. (tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/16/2018.]
August 20, 2018 3 Inmate Account Report by Eugene D. Nolan (tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/16/2018.]
August 20, 2018 2 Statement of Assets by Eugene D. Nolan (tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/16/2018.]
August 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against All Defendants, filed by Eugene D. Nolan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits- Attachments)(tvt) SEE DE#10 regarding Supplemental Claim [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/16/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nolan v. Clarke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Marano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vandermark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Lovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Amonette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Vanderschagt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Dawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Gills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tisdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene D. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?