Bennett et al v. Young et al
Plaintiff: Tim Bennett, Overtime Sports Management Biloxi, LLC and Timothy Bennett
Defendant: Kenneth J Young, Biloxi Baseball, LLC dba Biloxi Shuckers, KY Management, Inc., OVATIONS FOOD SERVICES, LP, Does 1-50, Ken Young and Biloxi Baseball, LLC doing business as Biloxi Shuckers
Case Number: 2:2023cv00156
Filed: April 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Referring Judge: Jamar K Walker
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granted In Part re #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs' responses to Young and Biloxi Baseball's motion to dismiss, ECF No. 10, and KY Management's motion to dismiss, ECF No. 13, must be filed no later than June 14,2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 6/5/2023. (Vpea)
May 31, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Leonard. #19 MOTION for Extension Time to File Opposition to MTD (Vpea)
May 31, 2023 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION for Extension Time to File Opposition to MTD filed by Tim Bennett, Overtime Sports Management Biloxi, LLC. (Budd, Kellie)
May 31, 2023 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Seal filed by Tim Bennett, Overtime Sports Management Biloxi, LLC. (Budd, Kellie)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Seal #7 is GRANTED and it is ORDERED that the Clerk shall maintain under SEAL the Settlement Agreement Filed in Support of Motion to Dismiss until the earlier of further order of this Court or forty-five days after the final resolution of this matter, at which point the sealed material should be returned to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 5/31/2023. (Vpea)
May 30, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION for Extension Time to File Opposition to MTD filed by KY Management, Inc.. (Belote, Clark)
May 30, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION for Extension Time to File Opposition to MTD filed by Biloxi Baseball, LLC, Kenneth J Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Belote, Clark)
May 30, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: #7 MOTION to Seal (Vpea)
May 27, 2023 Filing 20 Memorandum in Support re #19 MOTION for Extension Time to File Opposition to MTD filed by Tim Bennett, Overtime Sports Management Biloxi, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Budd, Kellie)
May 27, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension Time to File Opposition to MTD by Tim Bennett, Overtime Sports Management Biloxi, LLC. (Budd, Kellie)
May 16, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristan Boyd Burch on behalf of Biloxi Baseball, LLC, KY Management, Inc., Kenneth J Young (Burch, Kristan)
May 16, 2023 Filing 17 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by KY Management, Inc.. (Belote, Clark)
May 16, 2023 Filing 16 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Biloxi Baseball, LLC. (Belote, Clark)
May 16, 2023 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Public Version) filed by KY Management, Inc.. (Belote, Clark)
May 16, 2023 Filing 14 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Belote, Clark)
May 16, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by KY Management, Inc.. (Belote, Clark)
May 16, 2023 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Public Version) filed by Biloxi Baseball, LLC, Kenneth J Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Belote, Clark)
May 16, 2023 Filing 11 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Belote, Clark)
May 16, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Biloxi Baseball, LLC, Kenneth J Young. (Belote, Clark)
May 16, 2023 Filing 9 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by Biloxi Baseball, LLC, KY Management, Inc., Kenneth J Young re #7 MOTION to Seal (Belote, Clark)
May 16, 2023 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Seal filed by Biloxi Baseball, LLC, KY Management, Inc., Kenneth J Young. (Belote, Clark)
May 16, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal by Biloxi Baseball, LLC, KY Management, Inc., Kenneth J Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Belote, Clark)
April 14, 2023 Filing 6 Four (4) Summonses Issued as to Biloxi Baseball, LLC, KY Management, Inc., Ovations Food Services, LP, Kenneth J Young, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
April 13, 2023 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Jamar K. Walker and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
April 13, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Ovations Food Services, LP by Tim Bennett, Overtime Sports Management Biloxi, LLC. (Budd, Kellie)
April 13, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons KY Management, Inc. by Tim Bennett, Overtime Sports Management Biloxi, LLC. (Budd, Kellie)
April 13, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Kenneth Young by Tim Bennett, Overtime Sports Management Biloxi, LLC. (Budd, Kellie)
April 13, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Biloxi Baseball by Tim Bennett, Overtime Sports Management Biloxi, LLC. (Budd, Kellie)
April 13, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8890375.), filed by Tim Bennett, Overtime Sports Management Biloxi, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2)(Budd, Kellie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett et al v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Bennett
Represented By: Kellie Maxine Louise Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Overtime Sports Management Biloxi, LLC
Represented By: Kellie Maxine Louise Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Bennett
Represented By: Kellie Maxine Louise Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth J Young
Represented By: Clark James Belote
Represented By: Kristan Boyd Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biloxi Baseball, LLC dba Biloxi Shuckers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KY Management, Inc.
Represented By: Clark James Belote
Represented By: Kristan Boyd Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OVATIONS FOOD SERVICES, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Young
Represented By: Clark James Belote
Represented By: Kristan Boyd Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biloxi Baseball, LLC doing business as Biloxi Shuckers
Represented By: Clark James Belote
Represented By: Kristan Boyd Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?