Henrico County, VA v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Plaintiff: Henrico County, VA
Defendant: Caremark RX, L.L.C., McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Mylan Institutional Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., Insource, Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc., Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Cardinal Health, Inc., Caremark, L.L.C., Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., OptumRX, Inc., Optum, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Indivior Inc., WalMart Inc., Barr Laboratories, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC,, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Specgx LLC, Express Scripts, Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Eckerd Corporation, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Does 1 - 100, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00077
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) filed by Henrico County, VA. (Conrod, Richard)
March 11, 2020 Filing 29 Rebuttal Brief re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court Rebuttal Brief in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Henrico County, VA. (Conrod, Richard)
March 11, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edgar Spivey on behalf of Henrico County, VA (Spivey, William)
March 11, 2020 Filing 27 Rebuttal Brief re #18 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Henrico County, VA. (Conrod, Richard)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Staying Case) Moving Defendants' Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision (ECF No. 14) is hereby GRANTED. This case is hereby STAYED temporarily pending a decision by the JPML as to whether it will transfer this case to the Opiate MDL. Should the JPML decide not to transfer this case to the Opiate MDL, the stay will expire as of the day of the JPML's decision. The parties shall notify the Court within three (3) days of the JPML's transfer decision. Additionally, Express Scripts' Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) (ECF No. 23) is hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 03/09/2020. (tjoh, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 25 Memorandum in Opposition re #18 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (CTO-136), #2 Exhibit B (Wave 3 Stay Orders))(Coburn, Samuel)
March 5, 2020 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
March 5, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION Conditional Motion for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily)
March 5, 2020 Filing 22 Memorandum in Support of Express Scripts' Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Updated Federal Officer Removed Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Updated Diversity Based Removals, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cahill Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Statement of Work (DOD Contract), #5 Exhibit 5 - List of Opioid Cases)(Scott, Emily)
February 26, 2020 Filing 21 Reply Memorandum in Support of Moving Defendants' Motion for a Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Updated Federal Officer Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Judge Polster Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Martinsville Stay Order)(Scott, Emily)
February 20, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Henrico County, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Transcript of Nov 6, 2017 Hearing)(Conrod, Richard)
February 20, 2020 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support re #18 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Henrico County, VA. (Conrod, Richard)
February 20, 2020 Filing 18 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court by Henrico County, VA. (Conrod, Richard)
February 20, 2020 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Henrico County, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - ES Military Health System SOW)(Conrod, Richard)
February 20, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Henrico County, VA. (Conrod, Richard)
February 20, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CTO-136, #2 Exhibit 2 - List of Opioid Cases, #3 Exhibit 3 -Stay Orders, #4 Exhibit 4 - J. Polster Federal Officer Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Fed Officer Removed Cases, #6 Exhibit 6 - Fed Officer Stay Orders, #7 Exhibit 7 - Diversity Based Removals, #8 Exhibit 8 - NY Fraudulent Misjoinder Cases, #9 Exhibit 9 - Federal Question Removed Cases, #10 Exhibit 10 - CAFA Removed Cases, #11 Exhibit 11 - CAFA Stay Orders, #12 Exhibit 12 - Board of Commissioners Opinion, #13 Exhibit 13 - Commonwealth of Kentucky)(Scott, Emily)
February 20, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily)
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. [ SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL ] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Coburn, Samuel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Perry Coburn on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Coburn, Samuel)
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edgar Spivey on behalf of Henrico County, VA (Spivey, William)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner A. Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner)
February 7, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge David J. Novak. (tjoh, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company. (Scott, Emily)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7064429.), filed by Express Scripts, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Opioid Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Henrico State Court File, #3 Exhibit 3 - Civil Cover Sheet with attachment)(Scott, Emily) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/18/2020) (tjoh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henrico County, VA v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckerd Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henrico County, VA
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?