Gillis v. Wade et al
Appellee: Robert McIntosh, Brandon Jordan, Suzanne Wade and Jeffrey Tarkenton
Appellant: Brenda Coleman Gillis
Interested Party: USBC-Richmond (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00135
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - To the extent that Gillis asks the Court to construe her motion to proceed in forma pauperis as a motion to reconsider its decision dismissing her appeal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b), the Court DENIES the motion #9 . To the extent any other motions remain pending, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to terminate the motions. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 4/23/2020. (Copies distributed as directed) (smej, )
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of USCA as to #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Brenda Coleman Gillis, #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Brenda Coleman Gillis : The court grants leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (lbre, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Preparation of Transcripts at Government's Expense by Brenda Coleman Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Local Rule 83.1) (smej, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brenda Coleman Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1) (smej, )
April 8, 2020 USCA Case Number 20-1402 USCA Case manager Emily Borneisen for #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Brenda Coleman Gillis. (teva, )
April 7, 2020 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #5 Notice of Appeal. (lbre, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #5 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (lbre, )
April 7, 2020 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #4 Notice of Appeal. (lbre, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #4 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (lbre, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Substitution of Counsel of Ronald J. Guillot, Jr. by Ronald James Guillot, Jr on behalf of Brandon Jordan (Guillot, Ronald)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order, by Brenda Coleman Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1) (smej, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order, by Brenda Coleman Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1) (smej, )
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Gillis has not paid the filing fee, filed a motion to proceed informa pauperis, or showed cause why she had not paid the fee within the Court's deadline. Accordingly, the Court DISMISSES this case WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. To the extent that Gillis believes she has grounds to appeal this Order, she must file a written notice of appeal with the Clerk of Court within thirty (30) days of the date of entry. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 3/26/2020. (Copies distributed as directed in Order) (smej, )
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - Within fourteen (14) days of this Order, Gillis shall remit the filing fee as required by Rule 8003, file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, or show cause for why she has not paid the fee. The Court notes that it has previously determined that Gillis does not qualify for informa pauperis status. Thus, unless she can show a change in circumstances since the Court's previous determination, the Court will not revisit that decision. The Court again cautions Gillis that failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of her appeal. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 2/27/2020. (Copies distributed as directed) (smej, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-33270-KLP, filed by Brenda Coleman Gillis. (FEE NOT PAID) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (smej, ) Modified docket text on 3/2/2020 (smej, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2020: #2 USBC Order - 3-5-20) (jtho, ). Modified docket and Received USBC Order on 3/5/2020 (jtho, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillis v. Wade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert McIntosh
Represented By: Robert P. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brandon Jordan
Represented By: Brandon Ryan Jordan
Represented By: Ronald James Guillot, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Suzanne Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jeffrey Tarkenton
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Tarkenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Brenda Coleman Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USBC-Richmond (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?