Mecklenburg County, VA v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Plaintiff: Mecklenburg County, VA
Defendant: Caremark RX, L.L.C., McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Mylan Institutional Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., Insource, Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc., Does 1-100, Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Cardinal Health, Inc., Caremark, L.L.C., Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., OptumRX, Inc., Optum, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Indivior Inc., WalMart Inc., Barr Laboratories, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC,, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Specgx LLC, Express Scripts, Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Eckerd Corporation, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00175
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Staying Case) - For the foregoing reasons, Moving Defendants Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigations Final Transfer Decision #9 is hereby GRANTED. This case is hereby STAYED temporarily pending a decision by the JPML as to whether it will transfer this case to the Opiate MDL. Should the JPML decide not to transfer this case to the Opiate MDL, the stay will expire as of the day of the JPMLs decision. The parties shall notify the Court within three (3) days of the JPMLs transfer decision. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 4/7/2020. (smej, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Mecklenburg County, VA. (Conrod, Richard)
March 30, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner)
March 30, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner)
March 30, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner)
March 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner A. Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner)
March 26, 2020 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mecklenburg County, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ES Military Health System SOW, #2 Exhibit 2 - Decl. of William T. Cahill) (Conrod, Richard)
March 26, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mecklenburg County, VA. (Conrod, Richard)
March 26, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel)
March 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Perry Coburn on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Coburn, Samuel)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CTO-143, #2 Exhibit 2 - List of Opioid Cases, #3 Exhibit 3 - Stay Orders, #4 Exhibit 4 - J. Polster Federal Officer Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Fed Officer Removed Cases, #6 Exhibit 6 - Fed Officer Stay Orders, #7 Exhibit 7 - Commonwealth of Kentucky)(Scott, Emily)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edgar Spivey on behalf of Mecklenburg County, VA (Spivey, William)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 Response to #6 NOTICE of Related Case filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Mecklenburg County, VA Notice of Related Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Conrod, Richard)
March 12, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge David J. Novak. (smej, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company. (Scott, Emily)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-7117244), filed by Express Scripts, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Opioid Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - (1 of 2) State Court File, #3 Exhibit 2 - (2 of 2) State Court File, #4 Exhibit 3 - Civil Cover Sheet with attachment) (Scott, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mecklenburg County, VA v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Cheryl Mandel
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Emily Anne Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Cheryl Mandel
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Emily Anne Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Christopher Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Christopher Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Wells Huntington Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Michael Trucksess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC,
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Brent Ryan Gary
Represented By: Justin Michael Sizemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckerd Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Christopher Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mecklenburg County, VA
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?